P. N. J.W. v. I Dig My Dog et al
Plaintiff: |
Christopher E. A. Williams, P. N. J.W. and Donald B. Williams |
Defendant: |
Lundy Leigh Dengate, Does and I Dig My Dog |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv09264 |
Filed: |
December 15, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Manuel L. Real |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew J. Wistrich |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Fraud |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 1, 2017 |
Filing
20
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Manuel L. Real. Plaintiff was ordered to show cause in writing by not later than August 15, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution 19 ; WHEREAS, this period has elapsed without any action by plaintiff. The Court hereby DISMISSES this instant action for lack of prosecution. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv)
|
August 8, 2017 |
Filing
19
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Manuel L. Real. Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than August 15, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In accor dance with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, no oral argument on this Order to Show Cause will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order will result in the dismissal of the action. (iv)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing
17
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Manuel L. Real. Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than May 9, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Th e Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: - Proof of Service of summons and complaint In accordance with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7 -15, no oral argument on this Order to Show Cause will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order will result in the dismissal of the action. (clee)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?