Adam Lake v. Laboratory Express, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Adam Lake
Defendant: Does and Laboratory Express, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01486
Filed: February 23, 2017
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Dale S. Fischer
Referring Judge: Alexander F. MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Refer to the Judgment for details. 30 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (pso)
November 6, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM: Proceedings: (In Chambers) Order to Show Cause re Adequacy of Counsel by Judge Dale S. Fischer: Plaintiff's counsel are ordered to show cause why they would be adequate counsel to represent the class if a class were certified. (SEE A TTACHMENT OF THIS ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). The Court requires that each attorney and firm seeking here to be named as class counsel answer separately (but not necessarily in a separate document). In addition, counsel must provide all information responsive to items 4, 5, and 6 regarding any applicable case or circumstance involving a former law firm, but based on the conduct of the individual attorney seeking here to be named as class counsel. (jp)
May 31, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 6/12/2017. (dp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adam Lake v. Laboratory Express, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laboratory Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Lake
Represented By: Christopher J Hamner
Represented By: Anthony James Nunes
Represented By: Amy Tai Wootton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?