Sahibzada Akhtar v. Air France-KLM et al
Plaintiff: Sahibzada Akhtar
Defendant: Air France-KLM, Airbus DS GEO Inc., Air France-KLM Group Ads, B/E Aerospace Inc, Societe Air France, Zodiac Seats U.S. LLC, Airbus Americas, Inc., B/E AEROSPACE, INC., Airbus Defense and Space, Inc., Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Airbus Group SE, Societe Air France S.A., Airbus SAS and Airbus Group HQ Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02045
Filed: March 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
2 Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2018 Filing 83 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case #82 . The following error(s) was/were found: The exhibit contains personal identifiers and does not comply with L.R. 5-4.3.2 Redaction. It is the responsibility of the filer to ensure full compliance with the redaction requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and L.R. 5.2-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
March 29, 2018 Filing 82 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to 41(a)(1)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Zivari, Pedram)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court has been advised by counsel that this matter has settled. The parties have ten (10) days from the date of this order or until the next scheduled court appearance, whichever is shorter, to file with the court a dismissal of the action or to appear, in-person or telephonically with their clients, to place the settlement on the record. The parties may contact the deputy clerk of the court to calendar the appearance. If the parties do not dismiss the action or do not place the settlement on the record, the matter will remain on the Court's active trial calendar with all pretrial and trial dates in effect. (smo)
March 20, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar. (Zivari, Pedram)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than (See Schedule of Trial Dates). (mrgo)
February 20, 2018 Filing 78 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 3. Parties request for private mediation. Filed by Defendant Societe Air France S.A.(Kende, Christopher)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. (Discovery cut-off 4/16/2018. Motions due by 4/23/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. Jury Trial set for 6/26/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
February 12, 2018 Filing 76 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Percy Anderson. Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates: Amended Pleadings due by 11/16/2017. Discovery cut-off 4/16/2018. Exhibit List due by 5/18/2018. Witness List due by 5/18/2018. Motions due by 4/23/2018. Motions in Limine to be filed by 6/1/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/18/2018. Status Report due by 5/18/2018. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 4/30/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. Jury Trial set for 6/26/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (mrgo)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson re: Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #74 . For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court grant's B/E Aerospace's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Because it is clear from the parties submissions that B/E Aerospace is not subject to either general or specific personal jurisdiction, B/E Aerospace is dismissed without leave to amend. (See document for details) (mrgo)
February 7, 2018 Filing 74 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Percy Anderson re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Court grants the motion. A more detailed order will follow. The status conference scheduled for February 12, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. remains on the Court's calendar. Defendant B/E Aerospace, Inc. need not appear at the status conference. (mrgo)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SOCIETE AIR FRANCE'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY by Judge Percy Anderson re: #72 Motion for Leave to Appear as to counsel for Defendant Societe Air France at Status Conference for Defendant Societe Air France S.A. (mrgo)
February 5, 2018 Filing 72 REQUEST for Leave of DEFENDANT SOCIETE AIR FRANCE to Appear for Status Conference filed by Defendant Societe Air France. Request set for hearing on 2/12/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANT SOCIETE AIR FRANCES REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY) (Attorney Megan Rae Peitzke added to party Societe Air France(pty:dft)) (Peitzke, Megan)
February 1, 2018 Filing 71 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Miscellaneous Document #69 by Judge Percy Anderson. The document is stricken. Counsel are referred to Local Rule 83-2.5; No letters to Judge. In addition, for such request, an incorrect event was selected, and a proposed order was not submitted as a separate attachment. (cr)
February 1, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #69 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Incorrect event selected. Failed to comply with Local Rule 83-2.5 In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (kss)
February 1, 2018 Filing 69 **DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S ORDER OF 02/01/2018**Letter to Hon. Percy Anderson re appearance at the conference by telephone re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Hearing,,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,, #67 (Dowgin, Laura) Modified on 2/2/2018 (cr).
January 26, 2018 Filing 68 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) #60 filed by Defendant B/E AEROSPACE, INC.. (Motlagh, Jasmin)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. The hearing on defendant B/E Aerospace, Inc.'s motion to dismiss (Docket No. 60) currently scheduled for February 9, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. is continued to February 12, 2018, at 1:30 p.m., before United States District Judge Percy Anderson, in Courtroom 9A. The briefing schedule remains the same. Additionally, on its own motion, the Court sets a status conference for February 12, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. Counsel for all parties are ordered to appear. (mrgo)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASEAND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES.This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. Please refer to the Court's order for additional information. (cr)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:17-cv-02045 PA(SKx). (rn)
January 19, 2018 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) #60 filed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pedram Zivari, #2 Exhibit to Declaration of Pedram Zivari)(Zivari, Pedram)
January 19, 2018 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) #60 filed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar. (Zivari, Pedram)
January 10, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant B/E Aerospace Inc, identifying Rockwell Collins, Inc., the parent corporation of B/E Aerospace, Inc.; Those Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London subscribing to B/E Aerospace's relevant policy of insurance, including Chubb and Global Aerospace. (Aubert, Garth)
January 9, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) #60 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 2, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) filed by Defendant B/E AEROSPACE, INC.. Motion set for hearing on 2/9/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jasmin F. Motlagh, #2 Exhibit A to Motlagh Declaration, #3 Declaration Michael E. Smith, #4 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jasmin F Motlagh added to party B/E AEROSPACE, INC.(pty:dft)) (Motlagh, Jasmin)
December 13, 2017 Filing 59 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar, upon Defendant B/E AEROSPACE, INC. served on 12/11/2017, answer due 1/2/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montengro Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Zivari, Pedram)
November 29, 2017 Filing 58 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #54 filed by Defendant Societe Air France.(Attorney Laura B Dowgin added to party Societe Air France(pty:dft))(Dowgin, Laura)
November 17, 2017 Filing 57 21-Day Summons Issued re Second Amended Complaint #54 as to Defendants Societe Air France, B/E Aerospace, Inc., and Does 1 through 20, inclusive. (gk)
November 17, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint/Petition #54 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 19-1 Complaint/Petition includes more than 10 Does or fictitiously named parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
November 16, 2017 Filing 55 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #54 filed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar. (Zivari, Pedram)
November 16, 2017 Filing 54 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Societe Air France S.A. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Amended Complaint/Petition #35 , filed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar(Zivari, Pedram)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO CONTINUE THE CURRENT TRIAL DATE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #52 , the Court Orders that Plaintiff may file the Second Amended Complaint within three days of this Order. The parties shall file an updated Joint Rule 26(f) Report with proposed new pretrial and trial dates and deadlines after Defendant B/E Aerospace, Inc. files its Answer. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 3/12/2018. Expert disclosures due 4/16/2018. (gk)
November 9, 2017 Filing 52 First STIPULATION to Amend filed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Second Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Zivari, Pedram)
October 13, 2017 Filing 51 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: First Amended Complaint #35 . The following error(s) was found: The filer seeks a summons issued as to the First Amended Complaint for B/E Aerospace Inc. The First Amended Complaint does not name a defendant B/E Aerospace, Inc., and it appears that the docket does not reflect an Order allowing an amendment to name that party as a defendant. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk)
October 10, 2017 Filing 50 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #35 filed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar. (Zivari, Pedram)
October 10, 2017 Filing 49 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar, upon Defendant B/E AEROSPACE, INC. served on 9/13/2017, answer due 10/4/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mary E. Warner in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons returned. (Zivari, Pedram)
June 28, 2017 Filing 48 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Zodiac Seats U.S. LLC. (Zivari, Pedram)
June 16, 2017 Filing 47 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Zodiac Seats U.S. LLC answer now due 7/14/2017, re Amended Complaint/Petition #35 filed by Defendant Zodiac Seats U.S. LLC.(Attorney Dylan S Kornbluth added to party Zodiac Seats U.S. LLC(pty:dft))(Kornbluth, Dylan)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: 2-20-18. Joint status report re settlement due by 2-27-18; no appearance necessary. For ADR Procedure No. 3, counsel are responsible for contacting the private mediator at the appropriate time to arrange for further proceedings. (lom)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2017. Discovery cut-off 12/12/2017. Exhibit List due by 2/27/2018. Motions in Limine to be filed by 2/27/2018. Motions due by 12/22/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/27/2018. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 2/20/2018. Status Report due by 2/27/2018. Witness List due by 2/27/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 4/17/2018 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates - Jury Trial) (lom) Modified on 6/15/2017 (lom).
June 2, 2017 Filing 44 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar.. (Zivari, Pedram)
May 30, 2017 Filing 43 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Airbus Americas, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar.(Zivari, Pedram)
May 18, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First Amended Complaint #35 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 19-1 Complaint/Petition includes more than 10 Does or fictitiously named parties. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (iv)
May 17, 2017 Filing 41 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #35 as to Defendants Societe Air France S.A., Airbus Americas, Inc., Airbus Defense and Space, Inc., Airbus DS GEO Inc., Airbus Group HQ Inc., Airbus Group SE, Airbus SAS, Zodiac Seats U.S. LLC, and Does 1 through 100, inclusive. (gk)
May 16, 2017 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Air France-KLM, Air France-KLM Group Ads, Societe Air France S.A., re Miscellaneous Document #39 served on May 15, 2017. (Lorenz, Amanda)
May 16, 2017 Filing 39 Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Defendants Air France-KLM, Air France-KLM Group Ads, Societe Air France S.A. (Lorenz, Amanda)
May 15, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Jonathan Weiner on behalf of Defendants Airbus Americas, Inc., Airbus DS GEO Inc., Airbus Defense and Space, Inc., Airbus Group HQ Inc., Airbus Group SE, Airbus SAS (Attorney David Jonathan Weiner added to party Airbus Americas, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Jonathan Weiner added to party Airbus DS GEO Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Jonathan Weiner added to party Airbus Defense and Space, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Jonathan Weiner added to party Airbus Group HQ Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Jonathan Weiner added to party Airbus Group SE(pty:dft), Attorney David Jonathan Weiner added to party Airbus SAS(pty:dft))(Weiner, David)
May 15, 2017 Filing 37 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #35 filed by Defendant Societe Air France S.A..(Dowgin, Laura)
May 12, 2017 Filing 36 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #35 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #34 filed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar. (Attachments: #1 Appendix ATTACHMENT TO REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS)(Zivari, Pedram)
May 12, 2017 Filing 35 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar(Zivari, Pedram)
May 12, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: First Amended Complaint #23 . The following error(s) was found: The First Amended Complaint was stricken. See the Response by the Court to Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically Filed Documents, document number 33. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk)
May 12, 2017 Filing 33 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: First Amended Complaint filed 4/24/2017 #23 . The First Amended Complaint ("FAC") is hereby STRICKEN. The Court extends the deadline to file the FAC to 5/17/2017. (gk)
May 12, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First Amended Complaint filed 4/24/2017 #23 . The following error(s) was found: Defendants named on the face page (caption) are not the same as the body of the filing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 9, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint By Not More Than 30 Days filed 4/28/2017 #26 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Stipulations - Extending Time to Answer (more than 30 days). First Amended Complaint filed 4/24/2017. Proposed Order not submitted herewith. Stipulations - Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) event was utilized in docketing this filing. The "30 days or less" event is used for Stipulations as to an initial complaint, pursuant to Local Rule 8-3. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 8, 2017 Filing 30 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #23 , Summons Request #3 filed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar. (Attachments: #1 Appendix ATTACHMENT TO REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS)(Zivari, Pedram)
May 5, 2017 Filing 29 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (clee)
May 4, 2017 Filing 28 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #23 filed by Defendant Societe Air France S.A..(Dowgin, Laura)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #25 by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court, having determined whether the required fee has been paid, and having reviewed the Application of Non-Resident attorney to appear in a specific case pro hac vice filed by #25 Non-Resident Attorney Laura B. Dowgin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Air France-KLM; Air France KLM-Group ADS; and Societe Air France S.A. and designating Mark S. Roth as local counsel. The court hereby GRANTS the application. (yl)
April 28, 2017 Filing 26 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Airbus Defense and Space, Inc. answer now due 5/31/2017; Airbus DS GEO Inc. answer now due 5/31/2017; Airbus Group SE answer now due 5/31/2017; Airbus Group HQ Inc. answer now due 5/31/2017; Airbus SAS answer now due 5/31/2017; Airbus Americas, Inc. answer now due 5/31/2017, re Amended Complaint/Petition #23 filed by Defendants Airbus Defense and Space, Inc.; Airbus DS GEO Inc.; Airbus Group SE; Airbus Group HQ Inc.; Airbus SAS; Airbus Americas, Inc..(Attorney Sean O Morris added to party Airbus Americas, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sean O Morris added to party Airbus DS GEO Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sean O Morris added to party Airbus Defense and Space, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sean O Morris added to party Airbus Group HQ Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sean O Morris added to party Airbus Group SE(pty:dft), Attorney Sean O Morris added to party Airbus SAS(pty:dft))(Morris, Sean)
April 28, 2017 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Laura B. Dowgin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Air France-KLM, Air France-KLM Group Ads, Societe Air France S.A. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19764417) filed by Defendant s Air France-KLM, Air France-KLM Group Ads, Societe Air France S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Roth, Mark)
April 26, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mark S Roth on behalf of Defendants Air France-KLM, Air France-KLM Group Ads, Societe Air France S.A. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Mark S Roth added to party Air France-KLM(pty:dft), Attorney Mark S Roth added to party Air France-KLM Group Ads(pty:dft), Attorney Mark S Roth added to party Societe Air France S.A.(pty:dft))(Roth, Mark)
April 24, 2017 Filing 23 * STRICKEN * First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar(Zivari, Pedram) ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS FILED 4/24/2017 #33 . Modified on 5/12/2017 (gk).
April 17, 2017 Filing 22 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Air France-KLM Group Ads answer now due 5/5/2017; Air France-KLM answer now due 5/5/2017; Societe Air France S.A. answer now due 5/5/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Air France Air France-KLM Group Ads; Air France-KLM; Societe Air France S.A..(Kende, Christopher)
April 17, 2017 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar, upon Defendant Airbus Group HQ Inc. served on 4/7/2017, answer due 4/28/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriella Sanchez - Process Specialist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons returned. (Zivari, Pedram)
April 17, 2017 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar, upon Defendant Airbus DS GEO Inc. served on 4/7/2017, answer due 4/28/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriella Sanchez - Process Specialist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons returned. (Zivari, Pedram)
April 17, 2017 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar, upon Defendant Airbus Defense and Space, Inc. served on 4/7/2017, answer due 4/28/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriella Sanchez - Process Specialist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons returned. (Zivari, Pedram)
April 12, 2017 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Air France-KLM, Air France-KLM Group Ads, Societe Air France S.A., re Notice of Appearance, #17 served on April 12, 2017. (Kende, Christopher)
April 12, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher B Kende on behalf of Defendants Air France-KLM, Air France-KLM Group Ads, Societe Air France S.A. (Attorney Christopher B Kende added to party Air France-KLM(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher B Kende added to party Air France-KLM Group Ads(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher B Kende added to party Societe Air France S.A.(pty:dft))(Kende, Christopher)
April 11, 2017 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Air France-KLM, Air France-KLM Group Ads, Societe Air France S.A., re Notice of Appearance, #15 served on April 11, 2017. (Lorenz, Amanda)
April 11, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amanda Macy Lorenz on behalf of Defendants Air France-KLM, Air France-KLM Group Ads, Societe Air France S.A. (Attorney Amanda Macy Lorenz added to party Air France-KLM(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Macy Lorenz added to party Air France-KLM Group Ads(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Macy Lorenz added to party Societe Air France S.A.(pty:dft))(Lorenz, Amanda)
April 6, 2017 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar, upon Defendant Societe Air France S.A. served on 3/31/2017, answer due 4/21/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe - Supervisor in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons returned. (Zivari, Pedram)
April 6, 2017 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar, upon Defendant Air France-KLM served on 3/31/2017, answer due 4/21/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe - Supervisor in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons returned. (Zivari, Pedram)
April 6, 2017 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar, upon Defendant Air France-KLM Group Ads served on 3/31/2017, answer due 4/21/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe - Supervisor in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons returned. (Zivari, Pedram)
March 20, 2017 Filing 11 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendants Air France-KLM, Air France-KLM Group Ads, Societe Air France S.A., Airbus Americas, Inc., Airbus Defense and Space, Inc., Airbus DS GEO Inc., Airbus Group HQ Inc., Airbus Group SE, Airbus SAS, and Does 1 through 100, inclusive. (gk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (clee)
March 15, 2017 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #7 filed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar. (Attachments: #1 Appendix ATTACHMENT TO REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS)(Zivari, Pedram)
March 15, 2017 Filing 8 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sahibzada Akhtar. (Zivari, Pedram)
March 15, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The term "et al" cannot be used on a summons caption.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car)
March 15, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should have been e-filed separately and in its own event category of Civil Cover Sheet located under Civil Events - Other filings - Miscellaneous filings. (car)
March 15, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 15, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car)
March 14, 2017 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff SAHIBZADA AKHTAR. (Zivari, Pedram)
March 14, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SAHIBZADA AKHTAR, (Zivari, Pedram)
March 14, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19515996 - Fee: $400, filed by Attorney SAHIBZADA AKHTAR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Pedram Zivari added to party SAHIBZADA AKHTAR(pty:pla))(Zivari, Pedram)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sahibzada Akhtar v. Air France-KLM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sahibzada Akhtar
Represented By: Pedram Zivari
Represented By: Sepehr Daghighian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air France-KLM
Represented By: Christopher B Kende
Represented By: Amanda Macy Lorenz
Represented By: Laura B Dowgin
Represented By: Mark S Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airbus DS GEO Inc.
Represented By: Sean O Morris
Represented By: David Jonathan Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air France-KLM Group Ads
Represented By: Christopher B Kende
Represented By: Amanda Macy Lorenz
Represented By: Laura B Dowgin
Represented By: Mark S Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B/E Aerospace Inc
Represented By: Jasmin F Motlagh
Represented By: Garth W Aubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Societe Air France
Represented By: Laura B Dowgin
Represented By: Megan Rae Peitzke
Represented By: Christopher B Kende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zodiac Seats U.S. LLC
Represented By: Dylan S Kornbluth
Represented By: Shalem A Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airbus Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Sean O Morris
Represented By: David Jonathan Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B/E AEROSPACE, INC.
Represented By: Jasmin F Motlagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airbus Defense and Space, Inc.
Represented By: Sean O Morris
Represented By: David Jonathan Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airbus Group SE
Represented By: Sean O Morris
Represented By: David Jonathan Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Societe Air France S.A.
Represented By: Christopher B Kende
Represented By: Amanda Macy Lorenz
Represented By: Laura B Dowgin
Represented By: Mark S Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airbus SAS
Represented By: Sean O Morris
Represented By: David Jonathan Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airbus Group HQ Inc.
Represented By: Sean O Morris
Represented By: David Jonathan Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?