Mike Sarieddine v. D and A Distribution, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sarieddine
Defendant: D&A DISTRIBUTION, LLC, D and A Distribution, LLC, RRV Enterprises LLC, Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co., Ltd., Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, Vapetrik LLC, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Vapetrik LLC a North Carolina limited liability company doing business as Rip Tripper, RRV Enterprises LLC an Oklahoma limited liability company doing business as Vapor World, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc a California corporation doing business as VaporDNA, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc a New York corporation doing business as Wholesale Vapor and D and A Distribution, LLC a Georgia limited liability company doing business as Strictly E-CIG
Counter Defendant: Mike Sarieddine
Counter Claimant: E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC, LA Vapor, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Vapor Authority, Inc, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd and AMV Holdings, LLC
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Gail M. Title
Case Number: 2:2017cv02390
Filed: March 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
2 Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2022 Filing 211 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing). (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation of Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)) (jp)
July 25, 2018 Filing 210 MEDIATION REPORT filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Gail M. Title: A mediation did not take place because the case settled before the session occurred.(Killefer, Gail)
May 29, 2018 Filing 209 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine.(McConnell, Valerie)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #206 Non-Resident Attorney Michael F. Hurley APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants E-Cig Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc., Vapor Range, Inc., Vapor Authority, Inc., Electronic Cigarettes, Inc., VAPRO Supply, LLC, D&A Distribution, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Lan & Mike International Trading Inc., LA Vapor, Inc., designating Tom K. Kohan as local counsel. (pso)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 (In Chambers) ORDER GRANTING in PART and DENYING in PART Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims (Dkt. 195) by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
April 23, 2018 Filing 206 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael F. Furley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapetrik LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC, Counter Claimants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapetrik LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21632213) filed by Defendants D and A Distr ibution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC(a North Carolina limited liability company), Vapetrik LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney K Tom Kohan added to party Vapetrik LLC(pty:cc)) (Kohan, K)
April 18, 2018 Filing 205 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion to Dismiss set for April 23, 2018 off calendar and under submission. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 9, 2018 Filing 204 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Mike Sarieddine's Counterclaims #195 filed by Defendant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd. (Hosp, F)
April 9, 2018 Filing 203 NOTICE TO PARTIES by U.S. Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. Effective, April 12, 2018, Judge Kim will be located at the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, COURTROOM 540 on the 5th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 540 of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse. Magistrate Judge Kim's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Connie Lee, may be reached at (213) 894-4436. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL (ECF NO. #194 ) by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The parties remain free to extend by agreement the 21-day deadline ordered herein or any other mutually-agreed discovery deadline, provided they strictly comply with the court-ordered deadlines imposed by the assigned District Judge. The hearing on this matter set for April 11, 2018 is vacated. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (clee)
April 2, 2018 Filing 201 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Mike Sarieddine's Counterclaims #195 filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McConnell, Valerie)
April 2, 2018 Filing 200 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney K Tom Kohan counsel for Defendants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC. Changing address to 3415 S. Sepulveda Blvd., Suite 460, Los Angeles, CA 90034. Filed by Defendants Distributor Defendants. (Kohan, K)
March 28, 2018 Filing 199 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Document Requests and Interrogatories #194 filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McConnell, Valerie)
March 23, 2018 Filing 198 SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Valerie McConnell) re MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Document Requests and Interrogatories #194 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #196 filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine.(McConnell, Valerie)
March 23, 2018 Filing 197 SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Valerie McConnell) re MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Document Requests and Interrogatories #194 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #196 filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine.(McConnell, Valerie)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL #192 by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Application to File Documents Under Seal is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall promptly file Exhibit 14 and Exhibit 18 under seal in accordance with Local Rule 79-5.2.2(c). IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (clee)
March 21, 2018 Filing 195 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Mike Sarieddine's Counterclaims filed by defendant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 4/23/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hosp, F)
March 21, 2018 Filing 194 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Document Requests and Interrogatories filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. Motion set for hearing on 4/11/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Joint Stipulation Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration of Valerie McConnell in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit 1 to McConnell Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to McConnell Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to McConnell Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to McConnell Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to McConnell Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to McConnell Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to McConnell Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 to McConnell Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 to McConnell Declaration, #12 Exhibit 10 to McConnell Declaration, #13 Exhibit 11 to McConnell Declaration, #14 Exhibit 12 to McConnell Declaration, #15 Exhibit 13 to McConnell Declaration, #16 Exhibit 14 to McConnell Declaration, #17 Exhibit 15 to McConnell Declaration, #18 Exhibit 16 to McConnell Declaration, #19 Exhibit 17 to McConnell Declaration, #20 Exhibit 18 to McConnell Declaration, #21 Exhibit 19 to McConnell Declaration, #22 Exhibit 20 to McConnell Declaration, #23 Exhibit 21 to McConnell Declaration, #24 Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #25 Declaration of Freda Wong, #26 Proposed Order)(McConnell, Valerie)
March 21, 2018 Filing 193 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 14 and 18 to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Document Requests and Interrogatories under seal #192 filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit 14, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit 18)(McConnell, Valerie)
March 21, 2018 Filing 192 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 14 and 18 to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Document Requests and Interrogatories under seal filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McConnell, Valerie)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 (IN CHAMBERS) Order DENYING Motion for Pretrial Consolidation (Dkt. 181) by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (SEE MEMORANDUM FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
February 28, 2018 Filing 190 AMENDED ANSWER and AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM to Amended Counterclaim, #184 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B)(McArthur, Stephen)
February 26, 2018 Filing 189 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Mike Sarieddine. (Attachments: #1 Supplement two additional trademarks)(McArthur, Stephen)
February 26, 2018 Filing 188 ANSWER to Amended Counterclaim, #184 and Counterclaims against SMOK for cancellation of SMOK marks filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine.(McArthur, Stephen)
February 26, 2018 Filing 187 REPLY in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:17-cv-989-DSF & 2:17-CV-8342-PA, #181 filed by Defendant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd. (Hosp, F)
February 23, 2018 Filing 186 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #172 filed by Counterdefendant Mike Sarieddine.(McConnell, Valerie)
February 22, 2018 Filing 185 NOTICE of Decision: By Other Court in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Consolidate filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McConnell, Valerie)
February 20, 2018 Filing 184 CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff and counterclaim defendant Mike Sarieddine amending Amended Counterclaim #140 , filed by counterclaimant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Hosp, F)
February 14, 2018 Filing 183 OPPOSITION to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:17-cv-989-DSF & 2:17-CV-8342-PA, #181 filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McConnell, Valerie)
February 12, 2018 Filing 182 SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff and counterclaim defendant Mike Sarieddine amending Amended Counterclaim #140 , filed by counterclaimant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd(Hosp, F)
February 7, 2018 Filing 181 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:17-cv-989-DSF & 2:17-CV-8342-PA, filed by defendant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co., Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 3/12/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Hosp, F)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #176 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan B. Turpin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Shenxhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd fka Shenzhen Smok Technology Co., Ltd., designating F. Phillip Hosp as local counsel. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
February 7, 2018 Filing 179 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Change of Address #177 . The following error(s) was/were found: Blank document attached In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
February 5, 2018 Filing 178 NOTICE of Change of address by Stephen Charles McArthur attorney for Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. Changing attorneys address to 400 Corporate Pointe, Suite 300, Culver City, CA 90230. Filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
February 5, 2018 Filing 177 NOTICE of Change of address by Stephen Charles McArthur attorney for Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. Changing attorneys address to 400 Corporate Pointe, Suite 300, Culver City, CA 90230. Filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
February 5, 2018 Filing 176 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan B. Turpin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Counter Claimant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21212694) filed by defendant and counter-claimant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hosp, F)
February 2, 2018 Filing 175 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapetrik LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC. correcting Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #172 (Kohan, K)
February 1, 2018 Filing 174 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,, #165 and Counterclaims. filed by Defendants/Counterclaimants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapetrik LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC.(Kohan, K)
February 1, 2018 Filing 172 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,, #165 , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Defendants Vapor Range, Inc, Vapor Authority, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, D and A Distribution, LLC, Vapro Supply, LLC, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, Vapetrik LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc.(Attorney Lawrence S Rosenthal added to party Vapetrik LLC(pty:dft))(Rosenthal, Lawrence)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SHENZHEN IVPS TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.'S APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO AMEND COUNTERCLAIMS AGAINST PLAINTIFF by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #171 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to Amend. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
January 29, 2018 Filing 171 First APPLICATION for Extension of Time to Amend Amended Counterclaim #140 filed by defendant and counter-claimant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Furton Re: Good Cause, #2 Proposed Order) (Hosp, F)
January 18, 2018 Filing 170 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,, #165 filed by defendant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co., Ltd..(Hosp, F)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Dale S. Fischer, #168 . Refer to the Court's order for specifics. (iv)
January 18, 2018 Filing 168 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 1/18/2018 re Amended Complaint/Petition,, #165 filed by defendant and counter-claimant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Corrected])(Hosp, F)
January 18, 2018 Filing 167 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT: Document No. 166 filed on 1/17/18 is stricken. The Judge's title is incorrect. The correct title is United States District Judge. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 17, 2018 Filing 166 ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN ** Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 1/18/18 re Amended Complaint/Petition,, #165 filed by defendant and counter-claimant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint)(Hosp, F) Modified on 1/18/2018 (dp).
January 3, 2018 Filing 165 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd, Vapetrik LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(McConnell, Valerie)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (Dkt. 159) by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (SEE MEMORANDUM FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
December 26, 2017 Filing 163 NOTICE OF ERRATA re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Complaint #159 filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McConnell, Valerie)
December 25, 2017 Filing 162 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Complaint #159 filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(McArthur, Stephen)
December 23, 2017 Filing 161 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Complaint #159 filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Valerie McConnell ISO Reply to Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint)(McConnell, Valerie)
December 18, 2017 Filing 160 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Complaint #159 filed by Counter Claimants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC, Defendants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapetrik LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lawrence S. Rosenthal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Rosenthal Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Rosenthal Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Rosenthal Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Rosenthal Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Rosenthal Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Rosenthal Declaration)(Attorney Max Moskowitz added to party Vapetrik LLC(pty:dft))(Moskowitz, Max)
November 29, 2017 Filing 159 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. Motion set for hearing on 1/8/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Proposed] First Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration of Valerie McConnell in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #3 Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint) (McConnell, Valerie)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. In re: Stipulation for Protective Order #157 (mkr)
November 9, 2017 Filing 157 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Valerie Michelle McConnell added to party Mike Sarieddine(pty:pla))(McConnell, Valerie)
October 23, 2017 Filing 156 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Gail M. Title has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT SHENZHEN TECHNOLOGY CO. LTD.'S THIRD COUNTERCLAIM FOR TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE WITH BUSINESS RELATIONS by Judge Dale S. Fischer #141 . Refer to the Court's order for specifics. (pso)
October 12, 2017 Filing 154 STIPULATION for Order Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant Shenzhen Technology Co. Ltd.'s Third Counterclaim for Tortious Interference with Business Relations filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hosp, F)
October 10, 2017 Filing 153 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Gail Migdal Title may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine(McConnell, Valerie)
September 19, 2017 Filing 150 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #148 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Trial Estimate: 3 days.Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2019 03:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 8/13/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (dp)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 5/20/19. (pso)
September 18, 2017 Filing 151 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Refer to the document for specifics. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (pso)
September 14, 2017 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Valerie Michelle McConnell on behalf of Counter Defendant Mike Sarieddine (Attorney Valerie Michelle McConnell added to party Mike Sarieddine(pty:cd))(McConnell, Valerie)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 16-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:17-cv-00989 DSF(SKx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for DISCOVERY. The case number will now read as follows: 2:17-cv-02390 DSF(SKx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (rn)
September 12, 2017 Filing 146 CORRECTED JOINT REPORT of 26(f) filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
September 12, 2017 Filing 145 JOINT REPORT of 26(f) filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER APPROVING THE STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES FOR LEAD COUNSEL FOR DISTRIBUTOR DEFENDANTS TO APPEAR AT THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE VIA TELEPHONE #142 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: The stipulation is granted. See Order for specifics. (ah)
September 12, 2017 Filing 143 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd. Related Case(s): 2:17-cv-00989-DSF-SK and 2:17-cv-03779-GW-SS (Hosp, F)
September 6, 2017 Filing 142 STIPULATION for Order for Lead Counsel for Distributor Defendants to Appear via Telephone at the Scheduling Conference filed by Defendants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapetrik LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kohan, K)
August 22, 2017 Filing 141 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant SMOK's Third Counterclaim for Tortious Interference filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Mike Sarieddine. Motion set for hearing on 10/16/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service) (McArthur, Stephen)
August 8, 2017 Filing 140 FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Mike Sarieddine amending Counterclaim #126 , filed by Defendant and Counter-Claimant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd(Hosp, F)
August 8, 2017 Filing 139 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd. (Hosp, F)
July 20, 2017 Filing 138 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Vapetrik LLC identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Rosenthal, Lawrence)
July 20, 2017 Filing 137 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant LA Vapor, Inc identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Rosenthal, Lawrence)
July 20, 2017 Filing 136 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Lan and Mike International Trading Inc identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Rosenthal, Lawrence)
July 20, 2017 Filing 135 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Madvapes Holdings, LLC identifying Alohma Holding Company, LLC and VTM-MV Holdings, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Rosenthal, Lawrence)
July 20, 2017 Filing 134 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant D and A Distribution, LLC identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Rosenthal, Lawrence)
July 20, 2017 Filing 133 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Vapro Supply, LLC identifying Final Round Ventures, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Rosenthal, Lawrence)
July 20, 2017 Filing 132 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Electronic Cigarettes, Inc identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Rosenthal, Lawrence)
July 20, 2017 Filing 131 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Vapor Authority, Inc identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Rosenthal, Lawrence)
July 20, 2017 Filing 130 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Vapor Range, Inc identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Rosenthal, Lawrence)
July 20, 2017 Filing 129 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Rosenthal, Lawrence)
July 19, 2017 Filing 128 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant and Counter-Claimant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd, (Hosp, F)
July 19, 2017 Filing 127 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd (Hosp, F)
July 19, 2017 Filing 126 COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Mike Sarieddine, filed by Defendant and Counter-Claimant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd.(Hosp, F)
July 19, 2017 Filing 125 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd.(Hosp, F)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 9/18/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (dp)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM (In Chambers) Order DENYING Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Judge Dale S. Fischer #71 . Refer to the Court's order for specifics. (pso)
July 12, 2017 Filing 122 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Vapetrik LLC, (Kohan, K)
July 12, 2017 Filing 121 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Vapetrik LLC.(Attorney K Tom Kohan added to party Vapetrik LLC(pty:dft))(Kohan, K)
July 11, 2017 Filing 120 Counterdefendant's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #93 filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine.(McArthur, Stephen)
July 10, 2017 Filing 119 MINUTES OF Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction #71 held before Judge Dale S. Fischer. The matter is called and counsel state their appearances. The Court hears oral argument. The matter is under submission and a written ruling will issue. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (lom)
July 6, 2017 Filing 118 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings June 26, 2017 at 1:32 p.m. re Transcript #117 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Cuneo, Patricia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 6, 2017 Filing 117 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on June 26, 2017 at 1:32 p.m. Court Reporter: PAT CUNEO CSR 1600, OFFICIAL REPORTER, website www.patcuneo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/27/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/7/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2017. (Cuneo, Patricia)
June 29, 2017 Filing 116 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd served on 6/28/2017, answer due 7/19/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon F. Phillip Hosp, attorney of record in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (McArthur, Stephen)
June 29, 2017 Filing 115 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd served on 6/28/2017, answer due 7/19/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon F. Phillip Hosp, attorney of record in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (McArthur, Stephen)
June 28, 2017 Filing 114 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Sealed Document, #108 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp)
June 28, 2017 Filing 113 Objection Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Trademark Infringement . Motion #71 re: late filing of Plaintiff's reply brief (Docket Entry No. 111) filed by Counter Claimants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC, Defendants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC. (Moskowitz, Max)
June 27, 2017 Filing 111 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Trademark Infringement . Motion #71 filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (Attachments: #1 McArthur Decl and Ex. A, #2 Sarieddine Decl. and Exs. A-B)(McArthur, Stephen)
June 26, 2017 Filing 112 MINUTES OF Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction #71 Motion Hearing held before Judge Dale S. Fischer: The matter is called and counsel state their appearances. The Court hears oral argument. The matter is under submission and a written ruling will issue. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (bp)
June 25, 2017 Filing 109 OPPOSITION opposition re: REQUEST for Leave to file To File Supplemental Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #102 filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (Attachments: #1 Declaration McArthur Decl and Exhibits A-J, #2 Declaration Sarieddine Decl and Exhibits A-C)(McArthur, Stephen)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #104 Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence S. Rosenthal EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants, E-Cig Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc., Vapor Range, Inc., Vapor Authority, Inc., Electronic Cigarettes, Inc., VAPRO Supply, LLC, D&A Distribution, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Lan & Mike International Trading, Inc., LA Vapro, Inc., designating K. Tom Kohan as local counsel. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS) (bp)
June 23, 2017 Filing 108 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhbits E, O and P re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #73 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #101 filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(McArthur, Stephen)
June 23, 2017 Filing 107 AMENDED ANSWER and Amended counterclaim to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #93 filed by Defendants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC. (Moskowitz, Max)
June 20, 2017 Filing 106 STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant RRV Enterprises LLC filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McArthur, Stephen)
June 20, 2017 Filing 105 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patrick F Bright counsel for Defendant RRV Enterprises LLC. Adding Patrick Bright as counsel of record for RRV for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant RRV. (Attorney Patrick F Bright added to party RRV Enterprises LLC(pty:dft))(Bright, Patrick)
June 20, 2017 Filing 104 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence S. Rosenthal to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC, Counter Claimant Lan and Mike International Trading Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20048933) filed by Defendants/Cross-claima nt D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Kohan, K)
June 19, 2017 Filing 103 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Trademark Infringement . Motion #71 filed by Counter Claimants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC, Defendants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Rosenthal, #2 Exhibit A-J of Rosenthal Decl., #3 Exhibit K-R of Rosenthal Decl., #4 Exhibit S-V of Rosenthal Decl., #5 Exhibit W-Z of Rosenthal Decl., #6 Declaration of Jacqueline Villanueva, #7 Exhibit A-B of Villanueva Decl., #8 Declaration of Keri K. Fukui, #9 Exhibit A-K of Fukui Decl.)(Attorney Max Moskowitz added to party Vapro Supply, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Max Moskowitz added to party Vapro Supply, LLC(pty:cc))(Moskowitz, Max)
June 16, 2017 Filing 102 REQUEST for Leave to file To File Supplemental Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd. Request set for hearing on 6/26/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of John Druska, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of John Druska, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of John Druska, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of John Druska, #6 Declaration of Sam Ellinger, #7 Exhibit A to Declaration of Sam Ellinger, #8 Declaration of Welfer OuYang, #9 Exhibit A to Declaration of Welfer OuYang, #10 Declaration of Linda Swiedler, #11 Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #12 Exhibit A to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #13 Exhibit B to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #14 Exhibit C to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #15 Exhibit D to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #16 Exhibit E to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #17 Exhibit F to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #18 Declaration of Christopher Hill, #19 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #20 Exhibit B to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #21 Exhibit C to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #22 Exhibit D to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #23 Exhibit E to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #24 Exhibit F to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #25 Exhibit G to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #26 Exhibit H to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #27 Exhibit I to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #28 Exhibit J to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #29 Exhibit K to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #30 Exhibit L to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #31 Exhibit M to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #32 Exhibit N to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #33 Exhibit O to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #34 Exhibit P to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #35 Exhibit Q to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #36 Exhibit R to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #37 Exhibit S to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #38 Exhibit T to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #39 Exhibit U to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #40 Exhibit V to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #41 Exhibit W to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #42 Exhibit X to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #43 Exhibit Y to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #44 Exhibit Z to Declaration of Christopher Hill, #45 Proposed Order) (Hosp, F)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #72 APPLICATION to Seal Document (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
June 12, 2017 Filing 100 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Trademark Infringement . Motion #71 filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (Attachments: #1 McArthur Decl and Exhibits, #2 Sarieddine Decl and Exhibits)(McArthur, Stephen)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFICS CASE by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #94 Non-Resident Attorney Max Moskowitz APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants, E-Cig Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc., Vapor Range, Inc., Vapor Authority, Inc., Electronic Cigarettes, Inc., VAPRO Supply, LLC, D&A Distribution, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Lan & Mike International Trading Inc., LA Vapor, Inc., designating K. Tom Kohan as local counsel. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS) (bp)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order DENYING Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temorary Restraining Order (Dkt. 74) and CONTINUING Preliminary Injunction Hearing to July 10, 2017 (Dkt. 85) by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (SEE MEMORANDUM FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
June 6, 2017 Filing 94 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Max Moskowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC, Defendants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 6/6/2017, Receipt No. 0973-19970589) filed by Defendants/Cross-claimant D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Kohan, K)
June 5, 2017 Filing 98 MINUTES OF Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issuen Hearing held before Judge Dale S. Fischer: Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #89 Non-Resident Attorney David T. Van Der Laan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defednants, Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co., LTD, designating F. Philip Hosp as local counsel. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #87 Non-Resident Attorney Matthew T. Furton APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co., LTD., designating F. Philip Hosp as local counsel. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
June 5, 2017 Filing 93 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Mike Sarieddine filed by Defendants/Cross-claimant Vapor Authority, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC.(Kohan, K)
June 5, 2017 Filing 92 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Trademark Infringement . Motion #71 filed by Defendants Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #10 Exhibit I to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #11 Exhibit J to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #12 Exhibit K to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #13 Exhibit L to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #14 Exhibit M to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #15 Exhibit N to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #16 Exhibit O to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #17 Exhibit P to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #18 Exhibit Q to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #19 Exhibit R to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #20 Exhibit S to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #21 Exhibit T to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #22 Exhibit U to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #23 Exhibit V to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #24 Exhibit W to Declaration of David T. Van Der Laan, #25 Declaration of Welffer Ouyang, #26 Exhibit A to Declaration of Welfer Ouyang)(Hosp, F)
June 5, 2017 Filing 91 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew T. Furton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 6/2/2017, Receipt No. 0973-19954686) filed by Defendants Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hosp, F)
June 2, 2017 Filing 90 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew T. Furton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19954686) #87 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (lt)
June 2, 2017 Filing 89 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David T. Van Der Laan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19954738) filed by De fendants Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hosp, F)
June 2, 2017 Filing 88 REPLY in support of Corrected EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction from 6/26/2017 to 7/10/2017 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Trademark Infringement . Motion #71 #85 filed by Defendants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Rosenthal)(Kohan, K)
June 2, 2017 Filing 87 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew T. Furton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19954686) filed by Defend ants Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hosp, F)
June 2, 2017 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Corrected EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction from 6/26/2017 to 7/10/2017 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Trademark Infringement . Motion #71 #85 filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Exhibits)(McArthur, Stephen)
June 1, 2017 Filing 85 Corrected EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction from 6/26/2017 to 7/10/2017 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Trademark Infringement . Motion #71 filed by Defendants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Rosenthal, #2 Proposed Order) (Kohan, K)
June 1, 2017 Filing 84 Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to trademark infringement #74 (corrected as to formatting) filed by Defendants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Rosenthal)(Kohan, K)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENTS by Judge Dale S. Fischer: Document Nos. #78 and #80 filed on May 31, 2017 are stricken for failure to comply with L.R. 5-4.3.1 - which requires that the PDF image for a document filed with the Court must be created by using word processing software and published to PDF. PDF images created by scanning paper documents are prohibited. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 1, 2017 Filing 82 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd, (Hosp, F)
June 1, 2017 Filing 81 REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to trademark infringement #74 filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (Attachments: #1 Decl. and Exhibit A, #2 Declaration)(McArthur, Stephen)
May 31, 2017 Filing 80 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DKT. 83) EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction from 6/26/2017 to 7/10/2017 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Trademark Infringement . Motion #71 filed by Defendants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Rosenthal, #2 Proposed Order) (Kohan, K) Modified on 6/1/2017 (ah).
May 31, 2017 Filing 79 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC, (Kohan, K)
May 31, 2017 Filing 78 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DKT. 83) Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to trademark infringement #74 filed by Defendants D and A Distribution, LLC, E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc, Electronic Cigarettes, Inc, LA Vapor, Inc, Lan and Mike International Trading Inc, Madvapes Holdings, LLC, Vapor Authority, Inc, Vapor Range, Inc, Vapro Supply, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Rosenthal)(Attorney K Tom Kohan added to party D and A Distribution, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney K Tom Kohan added to party E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney K Tom Kohan added to party Electronic Cigarettes, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney K Tom Kohan added to party LA Vapor, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney K Tom Kohan added to party Lan and Mike International Trading Inc(pty:dft), Attorney K Tom Kohan added to party Madvapes Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney K Tom Kohan added to party Vapor Authority, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney K Tom Kohan added to party Vapor Range, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney K Tom Kohan added to party Vapro Supply, LLC(pty:dft))(Kohan, K) Modified on 6/1/2017 (ah).
May 31, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd. correcting Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #75 (Hosp, F)
May 31, 2017 Filing 76 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to trademark infringement #74 filed by Defendants Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd. (Hosp, F)
May 31, 2017 Filing 75 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to trademark infringement #74 filed by Defendants Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd. (Attorney F Phillip Hosp added to party Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd(pty:dft), Attorney F Phillip Hosp added to party Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd(pty:dft))(Hosp, F)
May 30, 2017 Filing 74 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to trademark infringement filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. Ex Parte Application set for hearing on 6/5/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order) (McArthur, Stephen)
May 26, 2017 Filing 73 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits E, O and P to Declaration of Mike Sarieddine In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction under seal #72 filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit E, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit O, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit P)(McArthur, Stephen)
May 26, 2017 Filing 72 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits E, O and P to Declaration of Mike Sarieddine In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction under seal filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit E, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit O, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit P)(McArthur, Stephen)
May 26, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Trademark Infringement . Motion filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. Motion set for hearing on 6/26/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Mike Sarieddine, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Declaration Of Stephen McArthur, #21 Exhibit A, #22 Exhibit B, #23 Exhibit C, #24 Exhibit D, #25 Exhibit E, #26 Exhibit F, #27 Exhibit G, #28 Exhibit H, #29 Exhibit I, #30 Exhibit J, #31 Proposed Order) (McArthur, Stephen)
May 14, 2017 Filing 70 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant Madvapes Holdings, LLC served on 4/27/2015, answer due 5/18/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mark Hoogendoorn, CEO in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. MadVapes (McArthur, Stephen)
May 14, 2017 Filing 69 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant Vapetrik LLC served on 5/2/2017, answer due 5/23/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon North Carolina Secretary of State, agent for service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Vapetrik (McArthur, Stephen)
May 11, 2017 Filing 68 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant Lan and Mike International Trading Inc served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe, co-occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Lan & Mike (McArthur, Stephen)
May 10, 2017 Filing 67 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant Vapro Supply, LLC served on 4/17/2017, answer due 5/8/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon agent, Capitol Corporate Services Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Vapro Supply (McArthur, Stephen)
May 10, 2017 Filing 66 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jerry Thruman in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Vapor Range (McArthur, Stephen)
May 10, 2017 Filing 65 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriel Medina, agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Vapor Authority (McArthur, Stephen)
May 10, 2017 Filing 64 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John, manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. RRV Enterprise (McArthur, Stephen)
May 10, 2017 Filing 63 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lily Zhou, agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. LA Vapor, Inc. (McArthur, Stephen)
May 10, 2017 Filing 62 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ryan Sullivan, agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Electronic Cigarettes, Inc. (McArthur, Stephen)
May 8, 2017 Filing 61 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lupe Mares, agent for service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McArthur, Stephen)
May 8, 2017 Filing 60 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McArthur, Stephen)
May 5, 2017 Filing 59 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #58 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #51 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp)
May 4, 2017 Filing 58 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant RRV Enterprises LLC served on 4/17/2017, answer due 5/8/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John, manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McArthur, Stephen)
May 4, 2017 Filing 57 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant Electronic Cigarettes, Inc served on 4/11/2017, answer due 5/2/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ryan Sullivan, agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McArthur, Stephen)
May 4, 2017 Filing 56 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant LA Vapor, Inc served on 4/14/2017, answer due 5/5/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lily Zhou, agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McArthur, Stephen)
May 4, 2017 Filing 55 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant Vapro Supply, LLC served on 4/13/2017, answer due 5/4/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sparre Process Serving in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McArthur, Stephen)
May 4, 2017 Filing 54 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant Vapor Range, Inc served on 4/12/2017, answer due 5/3/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jerry Thruman in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McArthur, Stephen)
May 4, 2017 Filing 53 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant Vapor Authority, Inc served on 4/17/2017, answer due 5/8/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriel Medina, agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McArthur, Stephen)
May 4, 2017 Filing 52 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc served on 4/14/2017, answer due 5/5/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lupe Mares, agent for service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McArthur, Stephen)
May 4, 2017 Filing 51 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, upon Defendant D and A Distribution, LLC served on 4/17/2017, answer due 5/8/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert Ali in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McArthur, Stephen)
April 6, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) #49 . Order filed in the incorrect case. Document No. 49 is stricken. (ah)
April 5, 2017 Filing 49 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (ah)
April 4, 2017 Filing 48 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Vapor Range, Inc. (bp)
April 4, 2017 Filing 47 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Vapetrik LLC. (bp)
April 4, 2017 Filing 46 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd. (bp)
April 4, 2017 Filing 45 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Vapor Authority, Inc. (bp)
April 4, 2017 Filing 44 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant RRV Enterprises LLC. (bp)
April 4, 2017 Filing 43 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Vapro Supply, LLC. (bp)
April 4, 2017 Filing 42 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd. (bp)
April 4, 2017 Filing 41 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Madvapes Holdings, LLC. (bp)
April 4, 2017 Filing 40 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Lan and Mike International Trading Inc. (bp)
April 4, 2017 Filing 39 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant LA Vapor, Inc. (bp)
April 4, 2017 Filing 38 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Electronic Cigarettes, Inc. (bp)
April 4, 2017 Filing 37 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc. (bp)
April 4, 2017 Filing 36 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant D and A Distribution, LLC. (bp)
April 4, 2017 Filing 35 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
April 4, 2017 Filing 34 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
April 4, 2017 Filing 33 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
April 4, 2017 Filing 32 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
April 4, 2017 Filing 31 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
April 4, 2017 Filing 30 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
April 4, 2017 Filing 29 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
April 3, 2017 Filing 28 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
April 3, 2017 Filing 27 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
April 3, 2017 Filing 26 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
April 3, 2017 Filing 25 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
April 3, 2017 Filing 24 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
April 3, 2017 Filing 23 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
April 3, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #17 , Summons Request #11 , Summons Request #9 , Summons Request #15 , Summons Request #10 , Summons Request #16 , Summons Request #19 , Summons Request #14 , Summons Request #8 , Summons Request #13 , Summons Request #7 , Summons Request #18 , Summons Request #12 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (bp)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Courts website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judges Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (ah)
March 29, 2017 Filing 20 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
March 29, 2017 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
March 29, 2017 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
March 29, 2017 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
March 29, 2017 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
March 29, 2017 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
March 29, 2017 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
March 29, 2017 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
March 29, 2017 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
March 29, 2017 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
March 29, 2017 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
March 29, 2017 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
March 29, 2017 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
March 29, 2017 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
March 29, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et)
March 29, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
March 29, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et)
March 28, 2017 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine, (McArthur, Stephen)
March 28, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (McArthur, Stephen)
March 28, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19587224 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Mike Sarieddine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Settlement Agreement) (Attorney Stephen Charles McArthur added to party Mike Sarieddine(pty:pla))(McArthur, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mike Sarieddine v. D and A Distribution, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarieddine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&A DISTRIBUTION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D and A Distribution, LLC
Represented By: Michael F Hurley
Represented By: K Tom Kohan
Represented By: Lawrence S Rosenthal
Represented By: Max Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RRV Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Patrick F Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co., Ltd.
Represented By: David T Van Der Laan
Represented By: Matthew T Furton
Represented By: Jonathan B Turpin
Represented By: Franz Phillip Hosp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Cigarettes, Inc
Represented By: Michael F Hurley
Represented By: K Tom Kohan
Represented By: Lawrence S Rosenthal
Represented By: Max Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vapetrik LLC
Represented By: Michael F Hurley
Represented By: K Tom Kohan
Represented By: Max Moskowitz
Represented By: Lawrence S Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lan and Mike International Trading Inc
Represented By: Michael F Hurley
Represented By: K Tom Kohan
Represented By: Lawrence S Rosenthal
Represented By: Max Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madvapes Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Michael F Hurley
Represented By: K Tom Kohan
Represented By: Lawrence S Rosenthal
Represented By: Max Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vapetrik LLC a North Carolina limited liability company doing business as Rip Tripper
Represented By: Lawrence S Rosenthal
Represented By: Max Moskowitz
Represented By: K Tom Kohan
Represented By: Michael F Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RRV Enterprises LLC an Oklahoma limited liability company doing business as Vapor World
Represented By: Patrick F Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lan and Mike International Trading Inc a California corporation doing business as VaporDNA
Represented By: K Tom Kohan
Represented By: Lawrence S Rosenthal
Represented By: Max Moskowitz
Represented By: Michael F Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Cigarettes, Inc a New York corporation doing business as Wholesale Vapor
Represented By: K Tom Kohan
Represented By: Lawrence S Rosenthal
Represented By: Max Moskowitz
Represented By: Michael F Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D and A Distribution, LLC a Georgia limited liability company doing business as Strictly E-CIG
Represented By: Max Moskowitz
Represented By: Lawrence S Rosenthal
Represented By: K Tom Kohan
Represented By: Michael F Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Mike Sarieddine
Represented By: Stephen Charles McArthur
Represented By: Valerie Michelle McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: E-CIG Gallery Wholesale and Distribution, Inc
Represented By: Michael F Hurley
Represented By: K Tom Kohan
Represented By: Lawrence S Rosenthal
Represented By: Max Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Vapro Supply, LLC
Represented By: Michael F Hurley
Represented By: K Tom Kohan
Represented By: Lawrence S Rosenthal
Represented By: Max Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: LA Vapor, Inc
Represented By: Michael F Hurley
Represented By: K Tom Kohan
Represented By: Lawrence S Rosenthal
Represented By: Max Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Vapor Range, Inc
Represented By: Michael F Hurley
Represented By: K Tom Kohan
Represented By: Lawrence S Rosenthal
Represented By: Max Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co. Ltd
Represented By: David T Van Der Laan
Represented By: Matthew T Furton
Represented By: Jonathan B Turpin
Represented By: Franz Phillip Hosp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Vapor Authority, Inc
Represented By: Michael F Hurley
Represented By: K Tom Kohan
Represented By: Lawrence S Rosenthal
Represented By: Max Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Shenzhen Smok Technology Co. Ltd
Represented By: Franz Phillip Hosp
Represented By: Matthew T Furton
Represented By: David T Van Der Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: AMV Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence S Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Gail M. Title
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?