Charles Keller Cooper Jr. v. Toms et al
Plaintiff: |
Charles Keller Cooper, Jr |
Defendant: |
Deputy McClain, Sergeant Toms, Unknown Deputy 1, Unknown Deputy 2 and Unknown Deputy 3 |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv02639 |
Filed: |
April 6, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Fernando M. Olguin |
Presiding Judge: |
Alicia G. Rosenberg |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 30, 2020 |
Filing
171
JUDGMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, Related to: Order of Dismissal 166 . IT IS ADJUDGED that judgment is entered for Defendants and the entire action is dismissed without prejudice. (see document for further details) (hr)
|
August 21, 2020 |
Filing
166
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. All pending motions are denied as moot. 2. This action is dismissed without prejudice. This order is without prejudice to Plaintiff's ability to file a motion to re open the case within 30 days after entry of this order. Failure to file a motion to reopen within 30 days of the filing of this Order shall result in the entry of judgment dismissing the case without prejudice. (see document for further details). Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (hr)
|
August 9, 2019 |
Filing
145
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that, on or before September 9, 2019, Plaintiff shall show good cause, if there be any, why this act ion should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute and/or failure to comply with a court order. Filing a Notice of Current Address on or before September 9, 2019, shall be deemed compliance with this Order to Show Cause. (See Order for Further Details) (kl)
|
July 12, 2018 |
Filing
84
(IN CHAMBERS): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEPUTIES THOMPSON AND BROWN SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROVIDE INFORMATION NECESSARY FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause in writing, on or before August 10, 2018. Plaintiff should provide any additional information he has about Brown and Thompson so that they can be served with process. (see order for further details) (hr)
|
June 26, 2017 |
Filing
15
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SOLE NAMED DEFENDANTS, AND THE ACTION, SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROVIDE INFORMATION NECESSARY FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall s how cause in writing, on or before July 26, 2017, why the Defendants should not be dismissed from this action without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m). Plaintiff should provide any additional information he has about Toms, McClain, and the Unknown defendants so that they can be served with process. (See Order for details.) (mp)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?