Star Fabrics Inc. v. Hem and Thread Inc et al
Plaintiff: |
Star Fabrics Inc. |
Defendant: |
1st Impression, Does, Everard's Clothing, GM Fashion USA Inc, Hem and Thread, Inc., Lolo, Ruche Inc and S.S.G. Fashions Ltd. |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv03041 |
Filed: |
April 21, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Andre Birotte |
Presiding Judge: |
Alexander F. MacKinnon |
Nature of Suit: |
Copyright |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 1, 2017 |
Filing
43
ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: On 8/24/2017, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution 35 . No response having been filed to the Co urt's Order to Show Cause, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the case is dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and for failure to comply with the orders of the Court, pursuant to Local Rule 41. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
|
August 24, 2017 |
Filing
35
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before September 7, 2017, why this action should not be dismi ssed for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of Plaintiff(s) response. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. (iv)
|
July 12, 2017 |
Filing
31
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before July 25, 2017, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of Plaintiff(s) response. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. (iv)
|
June 21, 2017 |
Filing
23
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before July 3, 2017, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecuti on. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of Plaintiff(s) response. Failure to r espond to this Order to Show Cause will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. Defendant(s) Ruche Inc, Lolo, and 1st Impression did not answer the complaint, yet Plaintiff(s) have failed to request entry of default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Plaintiff(s) can satisfy this order by seeking entry of default or by dismissing the complaint. (smo)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?