Securities and Exchange Commission v. Adrew T.E. Coldicutt et al
Respondent: Andrew T.E. Coldicutt and Law Office of Andrew Coldicutt
Movant: Securities and Exchange Commission
Case Number: 2:2017cv03888
Filed: May 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Alexander F. MacKinnon
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTES OF Order to Show Cause Why an Order Compelling Compliance with Investigative Subpoenas Should Not Be Issued Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Because respondents have represented to the Court that their counsel has prepared and c ould produce a privilege log that lacks only the Category 5 information, see Opp'n at 3, the Court ORDERS respondents to produce to the SEC forthwith, and no later than 8/3/2017, an amended privilege log in accordance with the Court's June 8 Order, excluding any Category 5 information that respondents have not yet determined. Respondents shall produce to the SEC on or before 8/28/2017 a complete amended privilege log. See document for specific details. Failure to timely comply with the Court's order will constitute a waiver of attorney-client privilege and any other objection to the SEC's subpoenas. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY AN ORDER COMPELLING COMPLIANCE WITH INVESTIGATIVE SUBPOENAS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED by Judge Christina A. Snyder. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Securities and Exchange Commission's ("SEC") Application for an Order to Show Cause and an Application for Order Compelling Compliance with Investigative Subpoenas against Respondents Andrew T.E. Coldicutt and the Law Office of Andrew Coldicutt 16 is GRANTED. Respondents shall appear on 7/31/2017 10:00 AM before Judg e Christina A. Snyder, to show cause, if there be any, why this Court should not issue an Order ("Order Compelling Compliance"). Response to Order to Show Cause due by no later than 5:00 PM on 7/17/2017. Reply papers in support of the issuance of the Order Compelling Complaint shall be filed by the Respondents no later than 5:00 PM on 7/24/2017. See document for further details. (gk)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY AN ORDER COMPELLING COMPLIANCE WITH INVESTIGATIVE SUBPOENAS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court finds this motion appropriate for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, th e hearing date of 6/12/2017 is vacated, and the matter is hereby taken under submission. On 5/8/2017, the Court issued an order to show cause why an order compelling compliance with the SEC's investigative subpoenas should not be issued 8 . Res pondents may not rely on the Fifth Amendment, the attorney-client privilege, California ethics rules, or the joint defense privilege to withhold the information the SEC requests. Thus, the Court concludes that respondents have failed to show cause wh y an order compelling compliance with the SEC's investigative subpoenas should not be issued. Respondents shall produce to the SEC an amended privilege log that includes: (1) the author; (2) the date; (3) the subject matter; (4) the name of the person who possesses the item or the last person known to have it; (5) the names of everyone who ever had the item or a copy of it, and names of everyone who was told of the item's contents; (6) the reason for not producing the item; and (7) the specific request in the subpoena to which the document relates. the Court ORDERS respondents to comply with the SEC's investigative subpoenas and produce an amended privilege log within 14 days of the date of this order, 6/22/2017. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) RESPONDENTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING by Judge Christina A. Snyder: On 5/8/2017, the Court issued an order to show cause ("OSC"), set a hearing date of 6/5/2017, and directed respondents to file an opposition no later than 5/22/2017 8 . On 5/23/2017, respondents filed the instant ex parte application to continue the deadline for their opposition to 6/15/2017 and the hearing date to the week of 7/3/2017 9 . The Court continues the hearing on this matter to 6/12/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Respondents shall file any papers in opposition to the OSC on or before 5/31/2017. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Adrew T.E. Coldicutt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrew T.E. Coldicutt
Represented By: Estevan R Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Law Office of Andrew Coldicutt
Represented By: Estevan R Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Lynn M Dean
Represented By: Roberto A Tercero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?