Errol Joseph Scorza v. State of California
Plaintiff: Errol Joseph Scorza, IV
Defendant: State of California
Case Number: 2:2017cv04044
Filed: August 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Presiding Judge: Alexander F. MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS OF FACT signed by Judge Percy Anderson. (mrgo)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGMENT by Judge Percy Anderso: The action is dismissed without prejudice Re Order Accepting Report and Recommendations 18 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (ib)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 10/17/2017. (See document for details). (ib)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Errol Joseph Scorza v. State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Errol Joseph Scorza, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?