In re Sara Aura Menjivar
Appellant: Sara Aura Menjivar
In Re Debtor: Sara Aura Menjivar
Appellee: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 2:2017cv04090
Filed: September 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: David O. Carter
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER AFFIRMING BANKRUPTCY COURT'S ORDER ON WELLS FARGO'S PROOF OF CLAIM AND DISMISSAL OF CHAPTER 13 PROCEEDINGS 14 by Judge David O. Carter. For the foregoing reasons, the Bankruptcy Court's order on the Debtor's objection to the Amended Proof of Claim and dismissal of the Chapter 13 case is AFFIRMED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge David O. Carter. Appellant filed his opening brief on October 2, 2017. To date, Appellee has not filed a reply brief. Accordingly, Appe llee is hereby ordered to show cause in writing, on or before October 25, 2017, why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with the Courts order. Failure of Appellee to make an adequate and/or timely response to this Order will result in the dismissal of the appeal. (dv)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge David O. Carter: Accordingly, Appellant is hereby ordered to show cause in writing, on or before September 18, 2017, why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with the Courts order. Failure of Appellant to make an adequate and/or timely response to this Order will result in the dismissal of the appeal. *Refer to Order. (es)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Sara Aura Menjivar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sara Aura Menjivar
Represented By: Philip E Koebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re debtor: Sara Aura Menjivar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Darlene C Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?