Brian Collins, et al v. Avion Catering Group, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Rachel Bentley and Brian Collins
Defendant: Avion Catering Group, LLC, Does 1 through 20, inclusive and Eli Bensoussan
Case Number: 2:2017cv04288
Filed: June 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Manuel L Real
Referring Judge: Andrew J Wistrich
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION PURSUANT TO FRCP, RULE 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii) by Judge Manuel L. Real. ORDER TO THE INTERESTED PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEYS OF RECORD: Based on the Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice as to Entire Action #15 , pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The entire action is dismissed with prejudice. (iv)
July 20, 2017 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendants Avion Catering Group, LLC, Eli Bensoussan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fisher, Timothy)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Manuel L. Real. THE COURT having been advised by the counsel for the parties that the above entitled action has been settled #13 ; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 45 days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all dates set in this action are hereby vacated. The Court reserves its jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing the settlement. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv)
July 18, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement OF ENTIRE CASE filed by Defendants Avion Catering Group, LLC, Eli Bensoussan. (Fisher, Timothy)
June 13, 2017 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Avion Catering Group, LLC, Eli Bensoussan, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #10 PROOF OF SERVICE RE: ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL served on June 13, 2017. (Fisher, Timothy)
June 12, 2017 Filing 11 SCHEDULING NOTICE RE: DUE DATE OF EARLY MEETING REPORT/JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT by Judge Manuel L. Real. An Answer has been filed in this matter. Pursuant to this Court's Order Re: Notice to Counsel, a Joint Rule 26(f) Report/ Early Meeting Report is due on or before 7/25/2017. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (clee) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (clee)
June 12, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1446(d) filed by Defendants Avion Catering Group, LLC, Eli Bensoussan. (Fisher, Timothy)
June 9, 2017 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Avion Catering Group, LLC, Eli Bensoussan, re Declaration #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #4 , Declaration #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 PROOF OF SERVICE IN SUPPORT OF REMOVAL AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS served on June 9, 2017. (Fisher, Timothy)
June 9, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (esa)
June 8, 2017 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendants Avion Catering Group, LLC, Eli Bensoussan. (esa)
June 8, 2017 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendants Avion Catering Group, LLC, Eli Bensoussan.(esa)
June 8, 2017 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Avion Catering Group, LLC, Eli Bensoussan, Does 1 through 20, inclusive, filed by plaintiffs Elizabeth Rachel Bentley, Brian Collins. (esa)
June 8, 2017 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Avion Catering Group, LLC (Fisher, Timothy)
June 8, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Avion Catering Group, LLC, identifying Brian Collins, Elizabeth Rachel Bentley, Eli Bensoussan, Avion Catering Group, LLC. (Fisher, Timothy)
June 8, 2017 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Avion Catering Group, LLC. (Fisher, Timothy)
June 8, 2017 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Sholom Levitin re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Avion Catering Group, LLC. (Fisher, Timothy)
June 8, 2017 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Eli Bensoussan re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Avion Catering Group, LLC. (Fisher, Timothy)
June 8, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Los Angeles, case number BC659717 Receipt No: 0973-19991582 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Avion Catering Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Answer, #3 First Amended Answer) (Attorney Timothy M Fisher added to party Avion Catering Group, LLC(pty:dft))(Fisher, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Collins, et al v. Avion Catering Group, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avion Catering Group, LLC
Represented By: Daniel C Whang
Represented By: Timothy M Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Bensoussan
Represented By: Daniel C Whang
Represented By: Timothy M Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Rachel Bentley
Represented By: Samantha F Lamberg
Represented By: Richard C Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Collins
Represented By: Samantha F Lamberg
Represented By: Richard C Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?