Rebecca Castillo v. Sees Candies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Castillo
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive and Sees Candies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv04413
Filed: June 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2017 Filing 9 Receipt of Acknowledgment of remand documents by Los Angeles Superior Court, case no. KC069283. (lom)
June 16, 2017 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (mrgo)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: remanding case to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case number KC069283. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (See document for details) (mrgo)
June 15, 2017 Filing 6 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (mrgo)
June 14, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 14, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap)
June 14, 2017 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rebecca Castillo, upon Defendant Sees Candies, Inc. served on 5/16/2017, answer due 6/6/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Turczo, CFO, White Male, 40 Years Old, Brown Hair, 5 Feet 11 Inches, 160 Pounds in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/23/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
June 14, 2017 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Sees Candies, Inc., Does 1-10, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Rebecca Castillo. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/2/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHE EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
June 14, 2017 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant See's Candies, Inc. identifying Birkshire Hathaway as Corporate Parent. (Grunvald, Hayley)
June 14, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant See's Candies, Inc.. (Grunvald, Hayley)
June 14, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number KC069283 Receipt No: 0973-20018037 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant See's Candies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Complaint) (Attorney Hayley S Grunvald added to party See's Candies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Grunvald, Hayley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rebecca Castillo v. Sees Candies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sees Candies, Inc.
Represented By: Hayley S Grunvald
Represented By: Hayley Singer Grunvald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Castillo
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Represented By: Michael John Manning
Represented By: Tristan Paul Jankowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?