WFG National Title Insurance Company v. Tamara Dadyan et al
Plaintiff: WFG National Title Insurance Company
Defendant: Arthur Abrahamov, Hovanes Yesayan, Rose Avakian, Vartan Akopyan, Tetiana Vovk, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Angela Simon, Jose Alonza, Alak Mikaelyan, Tamara Dadyan, Arthur Abraham, Escrow Doc Co., Konstantine Kabilakfas, K-Astron Ventures, Karapet Emboyan, Roza Avakian, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Adeliya Timirova, Adeliya Timirova Investments, Inc., Tatiana Vovk, Secureline Realty and Funding, Inc., United Escrow Co., Jubilio Escalera, Hovhannes Yesayan, Ara Haritunian, William Parent, Epraksi Gevorkian, Does 1-50, inclusive, Rosa Avakian, Vardan Akopyan, Anush Ferakhyan, Tandem Mortgage, Inc., MJF Funding Corporation, Quality Loan Services Corporation, Nerses Nakshchyan, Anait Akopyan, Rose Avakian an individual also known as Rosa Avakian also known as Roza Avakian doing business as Escrow Doc also known as Escrow Doc Co., Arthur Abrahamov an individual doing business as Escrow Doc also known as Escrow Doc Co. also known as Arthur Abraham and K-Astron Ventures a California corporation doing business as Konstant Closings
Case Number: 2:2017cv04784
Filed: June 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2017 Filing 28 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. (cr)
August 31, 2017 Filing 27 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF WFG NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO REMAND #12 held before Judge George H. Wu: Court hears oral argument. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED and this action is remanded to the Los Angeles County Superior Court (BC640157). The Court denies Defendants' request for attorney's fees. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (cr)
August 31, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Change of address by Scott R Laes attorney for Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 601 S. Figueroa St., Ste 4625 Los Angeles, CA 90017. Filed by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Laes, Scott)
August 23, 2017 Filing 25 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint as to Quality Loan Service Corporation #14 filed by Defendant Quality Loan Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Corriveau, Julie)
August 21, 2017 Filing 24 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint as to Quality Loan Service Corporation #14 filed by Plaintiff WFG National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Claudia Mourad, #2 Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Jean)
August 18, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF'S FILED OBJECTION TO QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION'S DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS filed by Plaintiff WFG National Title Insurance Company. (Wilcox, Jean)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Hearing #19 . Upon consideration, and good cause appearing therein, the Court hereby GRANTS the parties' Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.'s; and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Trustee, for Park Place Securities, Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-WCW2's (erroneously sued as "Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the Benefit of the Certificate Holders, Park Place Securities, Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-WCWS") Motion to Dismiss to September 28, 2017 at 8:30 a.m., and the Opposition and Reply deadlines for said Motion to Dismiss shall run from the new hearing date. (smo)
August 17, 2017 Filing 21 REPLY to Untimely Opposition (Doc. 17) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court #12 filed by Plaintiff WFG National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jean C. Wilcox)(Wilcox, Jean)
August 15, 2017 Filing 20 Opposition In Opposition To re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court #12 filed by Defendants Anait Akopyan, Vartan Akopyan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Stoller, #2 Declaration of Anait Akopyan, #3 Declaration of Vartan Akopyan)(Stoller, Michael)
August 15, 2017 Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #6 filed by Plaintiff WFG National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Proof of Service)(Wilcox, Jean)
August 14, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Requests > Leave to File Document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
August 11, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE Notice of Request for Permission to File Late Opposition filed by Defendants Anait Akopyan, Vartan Akopyan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stoller, Michael)
August 10, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court #12 filed by Defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Laes, Scott)
July 17, 2017 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint as to Quality Loan Service Corporation #14 filed by Defendant Quality Loan Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-Z, #2 Proof of Service)(Corriveau, Julie)
July 17, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint as to Quality Loan Service Corporation filed by Defendant Quality Loan Services Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 9/11/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service) (Corriveau, Julie)
July 17, 2017 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Quality Loan Services Corporation, (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Julie Ellen Corriveau added to party Quality Loan Services Corporation(pty:dft))(Corriveau, Julie)
July 14, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff WFG National Title Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Claudia Mourad, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Supplement Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, #5 Supplement Proof of Service) (Attorney Jean C Wilcox added to party WFG National Title Insurance Company(pty:pla)) (Wilcox, Jean)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (mrgo)
July 13, 2017 Filing 10 TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu:This action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE GEORGE H. WU, United States District Judge and the Honorable Karen L. Stevenson, United States Magistrate Judge. Judge Wu is located in Courtroom 9D, at the First Spring Courthouse, on the Spring Street level of the United States Courthouse at 350 West 1st Street, Los Angeles, California. Additional information about Judge Wus procedures and schedule can be found on the Court s website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. DEFENDANTS SPS AND THE TRUSTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(B)(6) #6 , set for September 6, 2017 is CONTINUED to September 7, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 7, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:17-cv-04784 GW(KSx). (rn)
July 6, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., identifying SPS Holding Corp.; Credit Suisse AG; Credit Suisse Group AG; Wells Fargo & Company. (Laes, Scott)
July 6, 2017 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #6 filed by Defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Laes, Scott)
July 6, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 9/6/2017 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attorney Scott R Laes added to party Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Scott R Laes added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft)) (Laes, Scott)
July 3, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 11C Statement of Consent Proceed) (ghap)
June 30, 2017 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Arthur Abrahamov, Adeliya Timirova Investments, Inc., Anait Akopyan, Vartan Akopyan, Jose Alonza, Rose Avakian, Tamara Dadyan, Does, Karapet Emboyan, Jubilio Escalera, Anush Ferakhyan, Epraksi Gevorkian, Ara Haritunian, K-Astron Ventures, Konstantine Kabilakfas, MJF Funding Corporation, Alak Mikaelyan, Nerses Nakshchyan, William Parent, Quality Loan Services Corporation, Secureline Realty and Funding, Inc., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Angela Simon, Tandem Mortgage, Inc., Adeliya Timirova, United Escrow Co., Tetiana Vovk, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Hovanes Yesayan amending Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by plaintiff WFG National Title Insurance Company. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/28/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A)(ghap)
June 30, 2017 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Parties (Stoller, Michael)
June 30, 2017 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. 0973-20113619 for $400 filing fee. (Stoller, Michael)
June 29, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
June 28, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Anait Akopyan, Vartan Akopyan. (Stoller, Michael)
June 28, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC640157 with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Defendants Anait Akopyan, Vartan Akopyan. (Attorney Michael Thomas Stoller added to party Anait Akopyan(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Thomas Stoller added to party Vartan Akopyan(pty:dft))(Stoller, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WFG National Title Insurance Company v. Tamara Dadyan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Abrahamov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hovanes Yesayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Avakian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vartan Akopyan
Represented By: Michael Thomas Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tetiana Vovk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Shanon J McGinnis
Represented By: Scott R Laes
Represented By: Mark L Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Alonza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alak Mikaelyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara Dadyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escrow Doc Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konstantine Kabilakfas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-Astron Ventures
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karapet Emboyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roza Avakian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Shanon J McGinnis
Represented By: Scott R Laes
Represented By: Mark L Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adeliya Timirova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adeliya Timirova Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatiana Vovk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secureline Realty and Funding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Escrow Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jubilio Escalera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hovhannes Yesayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ara Haritunian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Parent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epraksi Gevorkian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Avakian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vardan Akopyan
Represented By: Michael Thomas Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anush Ferakhyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tandem Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJF Funding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Services Corporation
Represented By: Julie Ellen Corriveau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nerses Nakshchyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anait Akopyan
Represented By: Michael Thomas Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Avakian an individual also known as Rosa Avakian also known as Roza Avakian doing business as Escrow Doc also known as Escrow Doc Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Abrahamov an individual doing business as Escrow Doc also known as Escrow Doc Co. also known as Arthur Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-Astron Ventures a California corporation doing business as Konstant Closings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WFG National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Claudia Mourad
Represented By: Jean C Wilcox
Represented By: Lori C Hershorin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?