Chris Langer v. Eric Paik et al
Plaintiff: |
Chris Langer |
Defendant: |
Does, Nissi Restaurant and Bakery Corporation and Eric Paik |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv04818 |
Filed: |
June 30, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Paul L. Abrams |
Presiding Judge: |
Manuel L. Real |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 2, 2017 |
Filing
16
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Manuel L. Real. THE COURT having been advised by the counsel for the parties that the above-entitled action has been settled 15 ; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without costs and without pr ejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 60 days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all dates set in this action are hereby vacated. The Court reserves its jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing the settlement. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv)
|
September 26, 2017 |
Filing
14
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Manuel L. Real. Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than October 3, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In accord ance with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, no oral argument on this Order to Show Cause will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order will result in the dismissal of the action. (iv)
|
August 4, 2017 |
Filing
10
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Manuel L. Real. Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than AUGUST 18, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In accordance with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, no oral argument on this Order to Show Cause will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order will result in the dismissal of the action. (iv)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?