Ticketmaster L.L.C. v. Prestige Entertainment Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ticketmaster L.L.C.
Defendant: Does, Steven K. Lichtman, Nicholas Lombardi, Prestige Entertainment West, Inc., Prestige Entertainment. Inc. and Renaissance Ventures LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv07232
Filed: October 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Presiding Judge: Otis D. Wright
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER RE: PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO FASTSOFTWARE SOLUTIONS,LLC ONLY 81 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II . (lc) Modified on 11/6/2018 .(lc).
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDEDCOMPLAINT 37 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. 45 (sbou)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS 24 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Dismissal is with leave to amend, except as to Ticketmasters second claim for copyright infringement to the extent it relies on Defendants TOU violations described in this Order. Should Ticketmaster wish to file an amended complaint, it must do so within twenty-one days of the date of this Order. Ticketmaster must also lodge with the Court, and serve on Defendants, a redlined copy of the amended pleading so that the Court can decipher the amendments to its complaint. (lc). Modified on 1/31/2018 (lc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ticketmaster L.L.C. v. Prestige Entertainment Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven K. Lichtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Entertainment West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Entertainment. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renaissance Ventures LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ticketmaster L.L.C.
Represented By: Donald R Brown
Represented By: Alexandra Hill
Represented By: Mark Steven Lee
Represented By: Robert H Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?