Nicholas Hopewell v. Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen Inc et al

Plaintiff: Nicholas Hopewell
Defendant: Does and Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv07390
Filed: October 10, 2017
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Dale S. Fischer
Referring Judge: Alexander F. MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court having previously issued an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution and Plaintiff not having timely responded 15 , IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff take nothing and that the action be dismissed without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lom)
March 1, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 3/19/2018. (dp)
January 29, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 2/12/2018. (dp)
January 9, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 1/29/2018. (dp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholas Hopewell v. Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Hopewell
Represented By: John Yunhwan Kim
Represented By: Jason T Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?