Securities and Exchange Commission v. JustInfo LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Securities and Exchange Commission |
Defendant: |
Scott Allensworth, JustInfo LLC and David Weddle |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv07426 |
Filed: |
October 11, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of California |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael R. Wilner |
Presiding Judge: |
Otis D. Wright |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 13, 2018 |
Filing
35
FINAL JUDGEMENT AS TO DEFENDANT SCOTT ALLENSWORTH 34 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall, in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission against Scott Allensworth: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant is permanently restrained and enjoined. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant is liable for disgorgement of $335,260 representing profits gained as a result of the conduct alleged in the Complaint, together with prejudgment interest thereon in the amount of $11,269.83, for a total of $346,529.83. Defendant shall satisfy this obligation by paying $346,529.83 to the Securities and Exchange Commission within 14 days after entry of this Final Judgment. (see document for further details) Related to: Stipulation for Judgment 34 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (bm)
|
October 24, 2017 |
Filing
16
AMENDED FINAL JUDGEMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AS TO DEFENDANT JUSTINFO LLC UPON CONSENT 5 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II :Defendant is liable for disgorgement, jointly and severally with Defendant David Weddle, of $375,037.00, representing profi ts gained as a result of the conduct alleged in the Complaint, together with prejudgment interest thereon in the amount of $13,285.34, for a total of $388,322.34.Defendant shall pay a civil penalty in the amount of $905,353.00 to the Securities and Exchange CommissionRelated to: REQUEST to Alter Judgment re Consent Judgment,, 11 . Unopposed Request to Correct Final Judgment as to Defendant Justinfo LLC 15 (lc)
|
October 17, 2017 |
Filing
12
FINAL JUDGEMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AS TO DEFENDANT AS TO DEFENDANT DAVID WEDDLE 6 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II : Defendant is liable for disgorgement, jointly and severally with Defendant JustInfo LLC, of $375,037, representing profits g ained as a result of the conduct alleged in the Complaint, together with prejudgment interest thereon in the amount of $13,285.34, for a total of $388,322.34. Defendant shall pay a civil penalty in the amount of $375,037.00 to the Securities and Exchange Commission. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lc) Modified on 10/17/2017 (lc).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?