Williams et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: B. S. C., He Lana R.N. Williams, Yolanda Y. Williams, Parker N.J. Williams, Donald B. Williams, Successors of Donald B. Williams and or The Williams Family Trust s, T. R. W., D. L. C., Christopher E.A. Williams and Donald B. Williams, II
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Washington Mutual Bank, David Hoffman, David St. John, Steven Cooley, Reliable Trust Deed Services, Michael P. Judge, David St. John, Inc., David Hoffman, Incorporated, Peter Baer, Berjis Heidari, Maria Carvajal, Victor Sanchez, Pablo E. Carvajal, Home Servicing of America, RESS Finanical Corporation, William Billotti, Patrick Gallegos, Lane Nussbaum, Steven K. Lubbell, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Stanley Kesselman, Masako Okuda, Home Savings of America, Strunzo Development Corporation, Strategic Acquisitions, David Hoffman, Inc., Bruce Beasley, Michael Timman, Huntington Law Group, LLC, Maria Sanchez, Tracy Kann, Deleta Drummer, Nilda Paloma, Pasquale P. Caiazza, California Reconveyance Corp., Central Mortgage Company, Christopher Loria, Leroy Baca, Nancy Curry, Peter Pencherli, Does 1 thru 10, Inclusive, Chicago Title Insurance Company, Briann Timman, EWR Investments, Inc. and Ashlyn Barnett
Case Number: 2:2017cv09210
Filed: December 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 30 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order, #29 , Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #18 , CCA # 18-55730. The judgment of this Court, entered December 20, 2018, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (car)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #18 filed by Yolanda Y. Williams, Donald B. Williams. CCA # 18-55730. The Ninth Circuit denies appellants' motion to proceed in forma pauperis, and dismisses this appeal as frivolous. (gk)
August 15, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEAL AMENDED to 9th CIRCUIT filed by plaintiffs Donald B. Williams, II, Yolanda Y. Williams. Amending Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #18 Filed On: 6/1/18; Entered On: 6/7/18; (mat)
July 30, 2018 Filing 27 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Plaintiff Donald B. Williams, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #18 . (mat)
July 30, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to docket entry #25 has been modified to indicate the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis was denied as it indicates on the document. (mat)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real: denying #23 MOTION for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis (mat) Modified on 7/30/2018 (mat).
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Manuel L. Real: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's 5/4/2018 Order(s)/Ruling Due to Clear Error #17 is DENIED. See document for further details. (gk)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION ON THE PAPERS WITHOUT NEED OF ORAL ARGUMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court has determined that Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order 5/4/2018 Ruling Due to Clear Error #17 set for hearing on July 2, 2018 at 10:00 A.M. is suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties without the need for oral argument. Therefore, the said Motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed and the hearing date of July 2, 2018 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 26, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION and Affidavit for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis filed by plaintiff Donald B. Williams. (mat)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #18 filed by Yolanda Y. Williams, Donald B. Williams. CCA # 18-55730. Accordingly, proceedings in this court are held in abeyance pending the district court's resolution of the pending May 29, 2018 motion. The 9th CCA Clerk shall serve this order on the district court. [See document for more details.] (mat)
June 8, 2018 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 18-55730 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #18 as to plaintiffs Donald B. Williams, Yolanda Y. Williams. (mat)
June 7, 2018 Filing 19 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to defendants Donald B. Williams, II, Yolanda Y..Williams, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #18 . (mat)
June 1, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiffs Donald B. Williams, Yolanda Y. Williams. Appeal of Order to Show Cause #14 Filed On: 5/4/18; Entered On: 5/10/18; Filing fee $ 505 billed. (mat)
May 29, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION AND REQUEST for Reconsideration(s) of the Court's 5/4/2018 Order(s)/Ruling Due to Clear Error #14 filed by Plaintiff Donald B. Williams. Motion set for hearing on 7/2/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (gk)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, ORDERING Notice of Plaintiff's Reply in Opposition to the Court's 5/4/2018 Order and Opposition to the Court's Order to Show Cause submitted by Plaintiffs Donald B. Williams, Yolanda Y. Williams received on 5/21/2018 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Case closed. (gk)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Manuel L. Real. Plaintiff was ordered to show cause in writing by not later than May 10, 2018 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution; WHEREAS, this period has elapsed without any action by plaintiff. The Court hereby DISMISSES this instant action for lack of prosecution. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (cch)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Manuel L. Real. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 5/10/2018. (cch)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER(IN CHAMBERS) DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE CERTIFICATION AND (DCKT. NO. 11), AND PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE FOR SUBPOENAS ON INTERESTED PARTIES (DCKT. NO. 12) by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court hereby DENIES Plaintiffs Donald B. Williams and Yolanda Y. Williams' Request for Extension of Time to File Certification and Notice of Interested Parties (Dckt. No. 11) and Plaintiffs' Notice of Request for Extension of Time to File for Subpoenas on Interested parties (Dckt. No. 12). IT IS SO ORDERED. (cch)
April 20, 2018 Filing 12 Notice of REQUEST for extension of time to file for subpoenas on interested parties filed by plaintiffs Donald B. Williams, Yolanda Y. Williams. (lc)
April 19, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REQUEST for Order for EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE CERTICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiffs Donald B. Williams, Yolanda Y. Williams. (lc)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, ORDERING Notice of Motion and Motion to Issue Summons; Notice of Motion and Motion for Subpoenas submitted by Plaintiff Donald B. Williams received on 2/20/2018 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Written notice of motion lacking or timeliness of notice incorrect, Local Rule 6-1. Both documents fail to comply with Local Rule 6 and 7. Motion to Issue Summons must comply with Local Rule 4. Plaintiff must submit a completed summons for issuance along with request. (gk)
February 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Request for Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Donald B. Williams. (gk)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:17-cv-09210 R(Ex). (rn)
January 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: #3 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): Summons caption does not match complaint caption verbatim. If party names do not fit in caption space provided, enter only the name of the first party and write "see attached," then attach face page of complaint or addendum to summons. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
January 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
January 25, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Defendants Leroy Baca, Peter Baer, Ashlyn Barnett, Bruce Beasley, William Billotti, Pasquale P. Caiazza, California Reconveyance Corp., Maria Carvajal, Pablo E. Carvajal, Central Mortgage Company, Chicago Title Insurance Company, Steven Cooley, Nancy Curry, David Hoffman, Inc., David Hoffman, Incorporated, David St. John, Inc., Does, Deleta Drummer, EWR Investments, Inc., Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Patrick Gallegos, Berjis Heidari, David Hoffman, Home Savings of America, Home Servicing of America, Huntington Law Group, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Michael P. Judge, Tracy Kann, Stanley Kesselman, Christopher Loria, Steven K. Lubbell, Lane Nussbaum, Masako Okuda, Nilda Paloma, Peter Pencherli, RESS Finanical Corporation, Reliable Trust Deed Services, Maria Sanchez, Victor Sanchez, David St. John, Strategic Acquisitions, Strunzo Development Corporation, Briann Timman, Michael Timman, Washington Mutual Bank(a Washington Corp.), Washington Mutual Bank.Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (Filing fee $ 400 FEE PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Yolanda Y. Williams, Donald B. Williams. [Summons not Issued on 1/25/2018] (Attachments: #1 Summons) (et)
January 24, 2018 Filing 2 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $400.00 filing fee from Donald B. Williams. Re: Notice Re: Discrepancies with Lodging of Complaint (CV-47),, #1 . Receipt number LA166342. (ek)
December 26, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE RE: DISCREPANCIES WITH LODGING OF COMPLAINT mailed to Upon submission of your complaint it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the CV 60 form attached. If you do not respond within 30 days of the date of this letter your action will be dismissed. Re Lodged Complaint (Attachments: #1 CV 60) (esa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2017: #2 Lodged Complaint, #3 Summons) (esa).
December 26, 2017 LODGED COMPLAINT: Complaint sought to be filed by Plaintiffs B. S. C., D. L. C., T. R. W., Christopher E.A. Williams, Donald B. Williams, Donald B. Williams, II, He Lana R.N. Williams, Parker N.J. Williams, Yolanda Y. Williams. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Trust Deed Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P. Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David St. John, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hoffman, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berjis Heidari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo E. Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Servicing of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESS Finanical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Billotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven K. Lubbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Kesselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masako Okuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Savings of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strunzo Development Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Acquisitions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hoffman, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Timman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Law Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Kann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deleta Drummer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nilda Paloma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasquale P. Caiazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconveyance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Loria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Pencherli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 thru 10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briann Timman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EWR Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashlyn Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. S. C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: He Lana R.N. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Y. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker N.J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Successors of Donald B. Williams and or The Williams Family Trust s
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. R. W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. L. C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher E.A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald B. Williams, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?