Wixen Music Publishing, Inc. v. Spotify USA Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Wixen Music Publishing, Inc.
Defendant: Spotify USA Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv09288
Filed: December 29, 2017
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Gail J. Standish
Presiding Judge: George H. Wu
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2018 23 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu re: Order,, Order Extending Answer Due Deadline, 22 . This order is to clarify and amend the August 1, 2018 "Order re: Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Submit Joint Discovery Plan" (Docket No. 22). While said order provides inter alia that "the parties shall have until October 12, 2018 to submit a joint discovery plan... ; and... the Court shall issue a scheduling order on October 19, 2018, it did not specifically take the August 20, 2018 scheduling conference off-calendar. Therefore, the Court herein continues that scheduling conference to October 18, 2018 at 8:30 a.m., and counsel may appear either in person or telephonically with advanced notice to the Court Clerk. (mrgo)
August 1, 2018 22 Featured Case ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND SUBMIT JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) 21 . Spotify USA Inc. shall have until October 19, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint; the parties shall have until October 12, 2018 to submit a joint discovery plan, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(2)-(3). (mrgo)
July 30, 2018 21 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 19, 2018 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John)
July 9, 2018 20 Featured Case ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 18 Non-Resident Attorney Allison L. Stillman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Spotify USA Inc, designating John Nadolenco as local counsel. (mrgo)
July 9, 2018 19 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allison L. Stillman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Spotify USA Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22046808) 16 by Clerk of Court. Docket No. 16 is stricken for the reason stated in the Notice 17 filed on July 6, 2018. (mrgo)
July 9, 2018 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allison L. Stillman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Spotify USA Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 7/6/2018, Receipt No. 26APN9J2) filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Nadolenco, John)
July 6, 2018 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allison L. Stillman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Spotify USA Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22046808) 16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (lt)
July 6, 2018 16 [DOCUMENT ORDERED STRICKEN PER DOC. NO. 19] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allison L. Stillman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Spotify USA Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22046808) filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Nadolenco, John) Modified on 7/9/2018 (mrgo).
June 12, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND SUBMIT JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN 14 by Judge George H. Wu. The Court set the following deadlines: (i) Spotify USA Inc. shall have until August 20, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint, (ii) the parties shall have until August 13, 2018 to submit a joint discovery plan; and (iii) the Court shall hold a scheduling conference and issue a scheduling order on August 20, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. (lom)
June 11, 2018 14 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 20, 2018 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John)
May 25, 2018 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc., identifying Spotify USA Inc.; Spotify AB; Spotify Technology S.A.; and Wixen Music Publishing, Inc.. (Nadolenco, John)
May 25, 2018 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Spotify USA Inc. answer now due 6/20/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc..(Attorney John Nadolenco added to party Spotify USA Inc.(pty:dft))(Nadolenco, John)
March 23, 2018 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Wixen Music Publishing, Inc.. upon Spotify USA Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/21/2018, answer due 5/21/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Allison Stillman. (Schacht, Daniel)
January 10, 2018 10 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
December 29, 2017 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wixen Music Publishing, Inc., identifying None other than Plaintiff Wixen Music Publishing, Inc.. (Wong, Jonathan)
December 29, 2017 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint 1 as to defendant Spotify USA Inc. (esa)
December 29, 2017 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
December 29, 2017 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
December 29, 2017 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa)
December 29, 2017 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Wixen Music Publishing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Attachment to AO-121)(Schacht, Daniel)
December 29, 2017 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Wixen Music Publishing, Inc.. (Schacht, Daniel)
December 29, 2017 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff Wixen Music Publishing, Inc.. (Schacht, Daniel)
December 29, 2017 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21033857 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Wixen Music Publishing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Daniel J Schacht added to party Wixen Music Publishing, Inc.(pty:pla))(Schacht, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wixen Music Publishing, Inc. v. Spotify USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spotify USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wixen Music Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Scott MacKay
Represented By: Daniel J Schacht
Represented By: Daniel Hurst Senter
Represented By: Jonathan McNeil Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?