Jay Beynon Family Trusted DTD 10/23/98 et al v. Comerica Bank
Plaintiff: Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch and Freda B. Lynch
Defendant: Comerica Bank
Case Number: 2:2018cv00103
Filed: January 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M. Gee
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 112 SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1); Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #111 filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee.(Jenkins, Gayle)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Defendant's Application to File the Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint ("MTD") Under Seal #108 is GRANTED. The redacted version of the MTD #110 shall remain on the public docket. Consistent with this Order, and pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.2.2(c), Defendant shall e-file the unredacted version of the MTD no later than three days from the date of this Order. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case re Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Redacted) filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gayle I. Jenkins, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Proposed Order) (Jenkins, Gayle)
November 1, 2019 Filing 109 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion to Dismiss under seal #108 filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - UNREDACTED Motion to Dismiss)(Jenkins, Gayle)
November 1, 2019 Filing 108 APPLICATION to file document Motion to Dismiss under seal filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jenkins, Gayle)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Steven H. Stodghill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Comerica Bank, designating Gayle I. Jenkins as local counsel #99 , #103 . (gk)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION IN MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #96 , the Court HEREBY ORDERS that Comerica may have up to 35 pages for its Memorandum of Points of Authorities that Comerica will file with Comerica's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs may have up to the same number of pages used by Comerica for Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points of Authorities that Plaintiffs will file with their opposition to Comerica's Motion to Dismiss. (gk)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas M. Melsheimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Comerica Bank, designating Gayle I. Jenkins as local counsel #98 , #102 . (gk)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Rex A. Mann APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Comerica Bank, designating Gayle I. Jenkins as local counsel #97 , #101 . (gk)
October 29, 2019 Filing 103 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven H. Stodghill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Comerica Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 10/28/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24682025) filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Jenkins, Gayle)
October 29, 2019 Filing 102 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas M. Melsheimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Comerica Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 10/28/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24681904) filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Jenkins, Gayle)
October 29, 2019 Filing 101 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rex A. Mann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Comerica Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 10/28/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24681703) filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Jenkins, Gayle)
October 29, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven H. Stodghill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Comerica Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24682025) #99 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rex A. Mann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Comerica Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24681703) #97 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas M. Melsheimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Comerica Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24681904) #98 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): No signature on Application. Local counsel failed to sign the application. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
October 28, 2019 Filing 99 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven H. Stodghill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Comerica Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24682025) filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Jenkins, Gayle)
October 28, 2019 Filing 98 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas M. Melsheimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Comerica Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24681904) filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Jenkins, Gayle)
October 28, 2019 Filing 97 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rex A. Mann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Comerica Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24681703) filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Jenkins, Gayle)
October 28, 2019 Filing 96 Joint STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Motion To Dismiss Briefing filed by Defendant Comerica Bank.(Jenkins, Gayle)
October 25, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli. (Kramer, Elizabeth)
October 23, 2019 Filing 94 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen R Smerek counsel for Defendant Comerica Bank. Stephen R. Smerek is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. (Smerek, Stephen)
October 23, 2019 Filing 93 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gayle I Jenkins counsel for Defendant Comerica Bank. Adding Gayle I. Jenkins as counsel of record for Defendant Comerica Bank for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. (Attorney Gayle I Jenkins added to party Comerica Bank(pty:dft))(Jenkins, Gayle)
October 3, 2019 Filing 92 SEALED DOCUMENT Consolidated Class Action Complaint re Consolidated Complaint, #91 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #89 filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mark Baker, Alan Gordon, Marlene Gordon, Joseph C Hull, Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley, Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch.(Kramer, Elizabeth)
October 3, 2019 Filing 91 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT Redacted related to: #17 Amended Complaint/Petition,, filed by Plaintiffs Lilly Shirley, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Nancy Landman, Albert M. Lynch, Marlene Gordon, Alan Gordon, Lois M. Carli, Freda B. Lynch, Joseph C Hull, Robert J Prince, Lloyd Landman, Richard J. Carli, Mark Baker(Kramer, Elizabeth)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION RE PLAINTIFFS' EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #88 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton, LLP is appointed to Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (gk)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 9/19/2019, Plaintiffs filed an application to file portions of their Consolidated Amended Complaint under seal #82 . Plaintiffs' sealing application is GRANTED. The unredacted version of the Consolidated Amended Complaint shall remain under seal. Consistent with this Order and pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.2.2(c), Plaintiffs shall e-file the Consolidated Amended Complaint with the redactions described in paragraph seven of the Smerek Declaration (Doc. No. 87) no later than three days from the date of this Order. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
September 30, 2019 Filing 88 STIPULATION for Leave to Appoint Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton, LLP to Plaintiffs' Executive Committee filed by Plaintiffs Mark Baker, Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Alan Gordon, Marlene Gordon, Joseph C Hull, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Girard, Daniel)
September 27, 2019 Filing 87 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Consolidated Class Action Complaint under seal #82 filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document : Exhibit A to Smerek Decl. (Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint) [corrects and replaces #85 ))(Smerek, Stephen)
September 27, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. correcting Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #85 (Smerek, Stephen)
September 27, 2019 Filing 85 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Consolidated Class Action Complaint under seal #82 filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit A - Consolidated Class Action Complaint)(Smerek, Stephen)
September 20, 2019 Filing 84 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Declaration Regarding Plaintiffs' Application to File Under Seal [Dkt. 82] filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smerek, Stephen)
September 19, 2019 Filing 83 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Consolidated Class Action Complaint under seal #82 filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mark Baker, Alan Gordon, Marlene Gordon, Joseph C Hull, Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley, Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Consolidated Class Action Complaint)(Kramer, Elizabeth)
September 19, 2019 Filing 82 APPLICATION to file document Consolidated Class Action Complaint under seal filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mark Baker, Alan Gordon, Marlene Gordon, Joseph C Hull, Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley, Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Consolidated Class Action Complaint)(Attorney Elizabeth A Kramer added to party Mark Baker(pty:conpla))(Kramer, Elizabeth)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER RE STIPULATION LIFTING STAY AND SETTING SCHEDULE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #80 , the Court HEREBY ORDERS that: (1) The stay of proceedings is lifted; (2) Plaintiffs will file their consolidated complaint by 9/19/2019; (3) Comerica will respond by 11/1/2019; If Comerica responds to the complaint by motion: (4) Plaintiffs will file their opposition by 12/2/2019; (5) Comerica will file its reply by 12/23/2019; (6) A hearing on the motion, if necessary, is set for 1/24/2020 at 10:00 AM; (7) Subject to No. 10 below, no discovery will commence against Plaintiffs or Comerica until after the anticipated date for a hearing on Comerica's motion to dismiss scheduled for 1/24/2020; (8) If Comerica moves to dismiss, Plaintiffs will not serve discovery on Comerica before the hearing on Comerica's motion scheduled for 1/24/2020; (9) If the Court does not hold a hearing on Comerica's motion to dismiss on 1/24/2020, the Parties may serve discovery after that date; (10) If Comerica serves an answer to the forthcoming complaint and does not move to dismiss, the Parties may serve discovery after the date of service of Comerica's answer. See document for further details. (gk)
August 20, 2019 Filing 80 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Consolidated Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Mark Baker, Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Alan Gordon, Marlene Gordon, Joseph C Hull, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Girard, Daniel)
August 20, 2019 Filing 79 STATUS REPORT filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mark Baker, Alan Gordon, Marlene Gordon, Joseph C Hull, Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley, Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. (Girard, Daniel)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court has reviewed and considered the parties' Joint Status Report #77 . The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report within seven (7) days after the Bankruptcy Court's ruling on Plaintiffs' motion or September 12, 2019, whichever is sooner. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 14, 2019 Filing 77 STATUS REPORT filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mark Baker, Alan Gordon, Marlene Gordon, Joseph C Hull, Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley, Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. (Girard, Daniel)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case directly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-00103 DMG(MRWx). (rn)
April 10, 2019 Filing 75 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lance A Harke counsel for Consol Plaintiff Mark Baker. Daniel E. Tropin is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Mark Baker. (Harke, Lance)
April 10, 2019 Filing 74 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lance A Harke counsel for Consol Plaintiff Mark Baker. Barbara C. Lewis is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Mark Baker. (Harke, Lance)
March 25, 2019 Filing 73 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeff S Westerman counsel for Consol Plaintiffs Alan Gordon, Marlene Gordon. Times Wang is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintffs Alan Gordon and Marlene Gordon. (Westerman, Jeff)
March 22, 2019 Filing 72 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06), #68 , Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06), #67 , Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06), #70 , Text Only Scheduling Notice, 66 , Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06), #69 e-mailed to twang@cohenmilstein.com bounced due to 550 5.1.1 RESOLVER.ADR.RecipNotFound; not found. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 22, 2019 Filing 71 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06), #68 , Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06), #67 , Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06), #70 , Text Only Scheduling Notice, 66 , Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06), #69 e-mailed to blewis@harkelaw.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.4.1 [blewis@harkelaw.com]: Recipient address rejected: Access denied [BY2NAM05FT028.eop-nam05.prod.protection.outlook.com]' (delivery attempts: 0), 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.4.1 [blewis@harkelaw.com]: Recipient address rejected: Access denied [CO1NAM05FT017.eop-nam05.prod.protection.outlook.com]' (delivery attempts: 0), 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.4.1 [blewis@harkelaw.com]: Recipient address rejected: Access denied [BY2NAM05FT049.eop-nam05.prod.protection.outlook.com]' (delivery attempts: 0), 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.4.1 [blewis@harkelaw.com]: Recipient address rejected: Access denied [CO1NAM05FT063.eop-nam05.prod.protection.outlook.com]' (delivery attempts: 0), 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.4.1 [blewis@harkelaw.com]: Recipient address rejected: Access denied [DM3NAM05FT060.eop-nam05.prod.protection.outlook.com]' (delivery attempts: 0). The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 20, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Brittany DeJong counsel for Consol Plaintiffs Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman. Changing address to 750 B Street, Suite 1820, San Diego, CA 92101. Filed by Plaintiffs Lloyd & Nancy Landman. (DeJong, Brittany)
March 20, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Marisa C Livesay counsel for Consol Plaintiffs Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman. Changing address to 750 B Street, Suite 1820, San Diego, CA 92101. Filed by Plaintiffs Lloyd & Nancy Landman. (Livesay, Marisa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Rachele R Byrd counsel for Consol Plaintiffs Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman. Changing address to 750 B Street, Suite 1820, San Diego, CA 92101. Filed by Plaintiffs Lloyd & Nancy Landman. (Byrd, Rachele)
March 20, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Betsy C Manifold counsel for Consol Plaintiffs Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman. Changing address to 750 B Street, Suite 1820, San Diego, CA 92101. Filed by Plaintiffs Lloyd & Nancy Landman. (Manifold, Betsy)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court has reviewed and considered the parties' Joint Status Report #65 . The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report within seven (7) days of the Bankruptcy Courts ruling on Plaintiffs motion or June 14, 2019, whichever is sooner. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 15, 2019 Filing 65 STATUS REPORT filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mark Baker, Alan Gordon, Marlene Gordon, Joseph C Hull, Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley, Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. (Girard, Daniel)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Status Report #62 . The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by March 15, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 18, 2018 Filing 63 Notice of Electronic Filing re Status Report, #62 e-mailed to Daniel E Tropin at dtropin@harkelaw.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.1.1 <: Recipient address rejected. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 14, 2018 Filing 62 STATUS REPORT filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mark Baker, Alan Gordon, Marlene Gordon, Joseph C Hull, Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley, Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. (Girard, Daniel)
October 2, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Elizabeth A Kramer counsel for Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. Changing Firm Name to Girard Sharp LLP. Changing e-mail to ekramer@girardsharp.com. Filed by Plaintiffs Jay Beynon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Richard J. Carli, Lois M. Carli, Albert M. Lynch, and Freda B. Lynch. (Kramer, Elizabeth)
October 2, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Adam E Polk counsel for Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. Changing Firm Name to Girard Sharp LLP. Changing e-mail to apolk@girardsharp.com. Filed by Plaintiff Jay Beynon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Richard J. Carli, Lois M. Carli, Albert M. Lynch, and Freda B. Lynch. (Polk, Adam)
October 2, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Jordan Elias counsel for Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. Changing Firm Name to Girard Sharp LLP. Changing e-mail to jelias@girardsharp.com. Filed by Plaintiff Jay Beynon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Richard J. Carli, Lois M. Carli, Albert M. Lynch, and Freda B. Lynch. (Elias, Jordan)
October 2, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Daniel C Girard counsel for Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. Changing Firm Name to Girard Sharp LLP. Changing e-mail to dgirard@girardsharp.com. Filed by Plaintiffs Jay Beynon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Richard J. Carli, Lois M. Carli, Albert M. Lynch, and Freda B. Lynch. (Girard, Daniel)
August 20, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by Barbara A Podell attorney for Consol Plaintiffs Joseph C Hull, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley. Changing firm name to Berger Montague PC and address to 1818 Market Street, Suite 3600, Philadelphia, PA 19103. Filed by Consol Plaintiffs Joseph C Hull, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley. (Podell, Barbara)
August 20, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by Michael C Dell'Angelo attorney for Consol Plaintiffs Joseph C Hull, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley. Changing firm name to Berger Montague PC and address to 1818 Market Street, Suite 3600, Philadelphia, PA 19103. Filed by Consol Plaintiffs Joseph C Hull, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley. (Dell'Angelo, Michael)
August 14, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by Michael C Dell'Angelo attorney for Consol Plaintiffs Joseph C Hull, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley. Changing firm name to Berger Montague and address to 1818 Market St., Suite 3600, Philadelphia, PA 19103. Filed by Consol Plaintiffs Joseph C Hull, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley. (Dell'Angelo, Michael)
August 14, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by Barbara A Podell attorney for Consol Plaintiffs Joseph C Hull, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley. Changing firm name to Berger Montague and address to 1818 Market St., Suite 3600, Philadelphia, PA 19103. Filed by Consol Plaintiffs Joseph C Hull, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley. (Podell, Barbara)
July 25, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Rachele R Byrd counsel for Consol Plaintiffs Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman. Changing name to Rachele R. Byrd. Changing e-mail to byrd@whafh.com. Filed by Plaintiffs Lloyd Landman and Nancy Landman. (Byrd, Rachele)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Stay Proceedings #51 is GRANTED. All further proceedings in the above-captioned action are STAYED pending an order from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware on Plaintiffs' motion to lift the injunction or further application of the parties. The parties shall file a joint status report by no later than 12/14/2018. (gk)
June 15, 2018 Filing 51 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending an order from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware filed by Plaintiffs Mark Baker, Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Alan Gordon, Marlene Gordon, Joseph C Hull, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley. Motion set for hearing on 6/29/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Girard, Daniel)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson re Stipulation for Protective Order #49 . (see order for details) (hr)
May 30, 2018 Filing 49 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Mark Baker, Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Alan Gordon, Marlene Gordon, Joseph C Hull, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Daniel C Girard added to party Mark Baker(pty:conpla))(Girard, Daniel)
May 16, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Alan Gordon, Marlene Gordon, Joseph C Hull, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley, identifying Jay Beynon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Richard J. Carli, Lois M. Carli, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch, Robert J. Prince, Lilly Shirley, Joseph C. Hull, Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman, Alan Gordon, Marlene Gordon, Mark Baker, Cornerstone Growth, LP, Dennis Ryan, Carole Ryan, Leona Pomroy, and Comerica Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Attorney Elizabeth A Kramer added to party Alan Gordon(pty:conpla), Attorney Elizabeth A Kramer added to party Marlene Gordon(pty:conpla), Attorney Elizabeth A Kramer added to party Joseph C Hull(pty:conpla), Attorney Elizabeth A Kramer added to party Lloyd Landman(pty:conpla), Attorney Elizabeth A Kramer added to party Nancy Landman(pty:conpla), Attorney Elizabeth A Kramer added to party Robert J Prince(pty:conpla), Attorney Elizabeth A Kramer added to party Lilly Shirley(pty:conpla))(Kramer, Elizabeth)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Joint Stipulation for Consolidation #46 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: (1) Mark Baker, et al. v. Comerica Bank, et al., Case No.: CV 18-3533-DMG (KSx) shall be consolidated into In re Woodbridge Investments Litigation, No. CV 18-103-DMG (KSx). (2) The Clerk is directed to administratively close the following case: Mark Baker, et al. v. Comerica Bank, et al., Case No.: CV 18-3533-DMG (KSx). (gk)
May 8, 2018 Filing 46 Joint STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 2:18-cv-03533 filed by Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Alan Gordon, Marlene Gordon, Joseph C Hull, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Girard, Daniel)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION CONCERNING DISCOVERY by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #44 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs may obtain the production of the materials that the Debtor provided to the SEC and other relevant documents in the possession, custody or control of the Debtor, and Plaintiffs shall provide any such production to Comerica contemporaneously upon receipt. See document for further details. This stipulation and agreement will apply equally to this consolidated action and all other cases that may hereinafter be consolidated into this consolidated action, including but not limited to Mark Baker, et al. v. Comerica Bank, et al., Civil Action No. CV 18-3533-DMG. (gk)
April 30, 2018 Filing 44 STIPULATION for Discovery as to Parties and Non-Parties filed by Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Alan Gordon, Marlene Gordon, Joseph C Hull, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Girard, Daniel)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DEEMING MOTION MOOT AND VACATING THE 5/31/2018, HEARING SESSION ORDER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. IT IS ORDERED that the motion filed by plaintiffs Mark Baker and Cornerstone Growth, LP, seeking centralization of the actions on the attached schedule, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1407, in the United States District Court of the Southern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings, is DEEMED MOOT. (gk)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #41 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs will file their consolidated complaint by 6/28/2018. Defendant will respond bye 8/13/2018. If Defendant responds to the complaint by motion, Plaintiffs will file their opposition by 9/10/2018, and Defendant will file its reply by 10/1/2018. A hearing on the motion, if necessary, will be held on 10/26/2018 at 10:00 AM. (gk)
April 18, 2018 Filing 41 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Consolidated Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Alan Gordon, Marlene Gordon, Joseph C Hull, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Lloyd Landman, Nancy Landman, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch, Robert J Prince, Lilly Shirley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Daniel C Girard added to party Alan Gordon(pty:conpla), Attorney Daniel C Girard added to party Marlene Gordon(pty:conpla), Attorney Daniel C Girard added to party Joseph C Hull(pty:conpla), Attorney Daniel C Girard added to party Lloyd Landman(pty:conpla), Attorney Daniel C Girard added to party Nancy Landman(pty:conpla), Attorney Daniel C Girard added to party Robert J Prince(pty:conpla), Attorney Daniel C Girard added to party Lilly Shirley(pty:conpla))(Girard, Daniel)
April 5, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS OR PROCEEDINGS (L.R. 83-1.4.2) filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smerek, Stephen)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION AND APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon unopposed Motion for Consolidation and Appointment of Lead Counsel, filed by Plaintiffs Jay Beynon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Richard J. Carli, Lois M. Carli, Albert M. Lynch, and Freda B. Lynch #31 , the following Actions pending in this District shall be consolidated for all purposes, including pretrial proceedings, trial, and appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a) (hereafter the "Consolidated Action"): (a) Jay Beynon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, et al. v. Comerica Bank, et al., No.: CV 18-103-DMG (KSx); (b) Robert J. Prince, et al. v. Comerica Bank, No.: CV 18-430-DMG (KSx); (c) Lloyd Landman, et al. v. Comerica Bank, No.: CV 18-471-DMG (MRWx); and (d) Alan Gordon, et al v. Comerica Bank, et al, No.: CV 18-1298-DMG (KSx). All papers filed in the Consolidated Action must be filed under Case No.: CV 18-103-DMG (KSx), the number assigned to the first-filed case, and must bear the following caption: IN RE WOODBRIDGE INVESTMENTS LITIGATION. The case file for the Consolidated Action will be maintained under Master File No.: CV 18-103-DMG (KSx). The Clerk is directed to administratively close the following related cases: CV 18-430-DMG (KSx), CV 18-471-DMG (MRWx), and CV 18-1298-DMG (KSx). The Court appoints Girard Gibbs LLP as Lead Counsel, and to serve as interim class counsel. The Court appoints Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP; Berger & Montague, P.C.; Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC; Sonn Law Group; and Levine Kellogg Lehman Schneider & Grossman LLP as an Executive Committee. Within 14 days after entry of this Order, the parties will propose a case schedule that includes a date for the filing of a consolidated complaint and a deadline for defendants to respond. Defendants need not respond to any complaint pending in the Consolidated Action except the consolidated complaint. The 4/6/2018 hearing is VACATED. See document for further details. (gk)
April 3, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. Pendency of Other Actions Related Case(s): 18-cv-60524 (S.D. Fla) (Girard, Daniel)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas B. Walsh IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Comerica Bank, designating Stephen R. Smerek as local counsel #35 . (gk)
March 30, 2018 Filing 36 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Comerica Bank, (Smerek, Stephen)
March 30, 2018 Filing 35 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas B. Walsh IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Comerica Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21507883) filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Orde r) (Attorney Stephen R Smerek added to party Comerica Bank(pty:dft)) (Smerek, Stephen)
March 15, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiffs Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Lois M. Carli, Freda B. Lynch, Richard J. Carli pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Diana Balayan, Tacara Degley, Lianna Iranossian, Cathy Jones, Adriane Moffit, Nina Pedersen, Kimberly A. Pelger, Yolanda Sandoval. (Girard, Daniel)
March 9, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Lois M. Carli, Freda B. Lynch, Richard J. Carli pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Annette Do, Janine M. Fleigle, Donna M. Lombardo. (Girard, Daniel)
March 7, 2018 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Daniel C. Girard in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:18-cv-00430, 2:18-cv-00471, and 2:18-cv-01298, #31 filed by Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Girard, Daniel)
March 7, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:18-cv-00430, 2:18-cv-00471, and 2:18-cv-01298, filed by Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. Motion set for hearing on 4/6/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Girard, Daniel)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jason Kellogg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Albert M. Lynch and Freda B. Lynch, designating Jeff S. Westerman as local counsel #27 . (gk)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey C. Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Albert M. Lynch and Freda B. Lynch, designating Jeff S. Westerman as local counsel #26 . (gk)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence A. Kellogg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Albert M. Lynch and Freda B. Lynch, designating Jeff S. Westerman as local counsel #25 . (gk)
March 6, 2018 Filing 27 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jason Kellogg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 3/6/2018, Receipt No. 0973-21367398) filed by Plaintiffs Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kramer, Elizabeth)
March 6, 2018 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey C. Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21367345) filed by Plaintiffs Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. L ynch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kramer, Elizabeth)
March 6, 2018 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence A. Kellogg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21367291) filed by Plaintiffs Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Ly nch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kramer, Elizabeth)
February 23, 2018 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Lois M. Carli, Freda B. Lynch, Richard J. Carli. upon Comerica Bank waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/22/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen R. Smerek. (Kramer, Elizabeth)
February 22, 2018 Filing 23 21-Day Summons Issued re Amended Class Action Complaint #17 as to Defendants Comerica Bank, Nina Pedersen, Kimberly A. Pelger, Donna M. Lombardo, Janine M. Fleigle, Cathy Jones, Tacara Degley, Annette Do, Diana Balayan, Lianna Iranossian, Adriane Moffit, and Yolanda Sandoval. (gk)
February 21, 2018 Filing 22 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 filed by Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. (Girard, Daniel)
February 21, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Amended Class Action Complaint #17 . The following error(s) was found: The section of the Summons that reads, "TO: (Defendant's name and address)" should list at least one defendant's name, before indicating, "See Attached." The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk)
February 20, 2018 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 filed by Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. (Girard, Daniel)
February 16, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Amended Class Action Complaint #17 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The phrase "et. al," should not be used on the Summons form. Please indicate under the words, "SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION," "ON THE AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT.". The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk)
February 15, 2018 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 filed by Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. (Girard, Daniel)
February 9, 2018 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Comerica Bank, Nina Pedersen, Kimberly A. Pelger, Donna M. Lombardo, Janine M. Fleigle, Cathy Jones, Tacara Degley, Annette Do, Diana Balayan, Lianna Iranossian, Adriane Moffit, Yolanda Sandoval amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Freda B. Lynch, Lois M. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Richard J. Carli, Albert M. Lynch(Girard, Daniel)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey R. Sonn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jay Beynon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998; Richard J. Carli; Lois M. Carli; Albert M. Lynch; and Freda B. Lynch, designating Jeff S Westerman as local counsel #15 . (iv)
January 22, 2018 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey R. Sonn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21133029) filed by plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Westerman, Jeff)
January 19, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-00430 and 2:18-cv-00471 (Girard, Daniel)
January 16, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynchto Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #8 (Kramer, Elizabeth)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Scott L. Silver to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jay Beynon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998; Richard J Carli; Lois M Carli; Albert M Lynch; and Freda B Lynch, designating Jeff S Westerman as local counsel #11 . (iv)
January 12, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Scott L. Silver to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21092407) filed by plaintiff Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jeff S Westerman added to party Lois M. Carli(pty:pla), Attorney Jeff S Westerman added to party Richard J. Carli(pty:pla), Attorney Jeff S Westerman added to party Albert M. Lynch(pty:pla), Attorney Jeff S Westerman added to party Freda B. Lynch(pty:pla)) (Westerman, Jeff)
January 12, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeff S Westerman counsel for Plaintiff Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998. Adding Jeff S. Westerman as counsel of record for JAY BEYNON FAMILY TRUST DTD 10/23/1998, RICHARD J. CARLI, LOIS M. CARLI, ALBERT M. LYNCH, AND FREDA B. LYNCH for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs JAY BEYNON FAMILY TRUST DTD 10/23/1998, RICHARD J. CARLI, LOIS M. CARLI, ALBERT M. LYNCH, AND FREDA B. LYNCH. (Attorney Jeff S Westerman added to party Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998(pty:pla))(Westerman, Jeff)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
January 8, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey R Sonn. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
January 8, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Scott L Silver. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
January 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 8, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
January 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Beynon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. Pendency of Other Actions Related Case(s): 1:17-cv-24624-MGC (S.D. Fla.) and 17-62551 (S.D. Fla.) (Girard, Daniel)
January 4, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Beynon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch, identifying Plaintiff Jay Beynon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Plaintiff Richard J. Carli, Plaintiff Lois M. Carli, Plaintiff Albert M. Lynch, Plaintiff Freda B. Lynch, and Defendant Comerica Bank. (Girard, Daniel)
January 4, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Lois M. Carli, Richard J. Carli, Jay Beynon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Albert M. Lynch, Freda B. Lynch. (Girard, Daniel)
January 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21053796 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Jay Beynon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998, Freda B. Lynch, Richard J. Carli, Albert M. Lynch, Lois M. Carli. (Attorney Daniel C Girard added to party Lois M. Carli(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C Girard added to party Richard J. Carli(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C Girard added to party Jay Beynon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C Girard added to party Albert M. Lynch(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C Girard added to party Freda B. Lynch(pty:pla))(Girard, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jay Beynon Family Trusted DTD 10/23/98 et al v. Comerica Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois M. Carli
Represented By: Jordan Elias
Represented By: Daniel C Girard
Represented By: Elizabeth A Kramer
Represented By: Adam E Polk
Represented By: Scott L Silver
Represented By: Jeffrey R Sonn
Represented By: Jeff S Westerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Carli
Represented By: Jordan Elias
Represented By: Daniel C Girard
Represented By: Elizabeth A Kramer
Represented By: Adam E Polk
Represented By: Scott L Silver
Represented By: Jeffrey R Sonn
Represented By: Jeff S Westerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Byenon Family Trust DTD 10/23/1998
Represented By: Jordan Elias
Represented By: Daniel C Girard
Represented By: Elizabeth A Kramer
Represented By: Adam E Polk
Represented By: Scott L Silver
Represented By: Jeffrey R Sonn
Represented By: Jeff S Westerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert M. Lynch
Represented By: Jordan Elias
Represented By: Daniel C Girard
Represented By: Elizabeth A Kramer
Represented By: Adam E Polk
Represented By: Scott L Silver
Represented By: Jeffrey R Sonn
Represented By: Jeff S Westerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freda B. Lynch
Represented By: Jordan Elias
Represented By: Daniel C Girard
Represented By: Elizabeth A Kramer
Represented By: Adam E Polk
Represented By: Scott L Silver
Represented By: Jeffrey R Sonn
Represented By: Jeff S Westerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comerica Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?