Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc. v. One Life America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1 through 20 and One Life America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00122
Filed: January 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, Re Stipulation #41 . (vdr)
December 17, 2018 Filing 41 STIPULATION File to Seal Incorrectly Filed Document Under Seal filed by Plaintiff Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Campo, Joseph)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Case Terminated; Made JS-6) (vdr)
November 20, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc.. (Campo, Joseph)
November 20, 2018 Filing 38 Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Settlement #37 filed by Plaintiff Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc.. (Campo, Joseph)
November 20, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc.. (Campo, Joseph)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE STIPULATION #35 TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (BEFORE PRIVATE MEDIATOR) DEADLINE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Settlement Conference Completion Date is hereby continued to November 16, 2018. (iv)
October 11, 2018 Filing 35 STIPULATION to Continue settlement conference from November 2 to November 16 filed by Defendant One Life America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pitha, Martin)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RE: STIPULATION #33 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for continued deadlines.* (vdr)
August 3, 2018 Filing 33 STIPULATION to Modify Scheduling and Case Management Order to Continue Discovery Settlement Conference and Expert Related Dates filed by Plaintiff Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Campo, Joseph)
May 18, 2018 Filing 32 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss #24 is taken off the 5/24/18 calendar and placed under submission. No court appearances are required on 5/24/2018. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING MODIFIED VERSION OF STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. re Stipulation for Protective Order #30 . (sbou)
May 17, 2018 Filing 30 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Campo, Joseph)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. ORDER DENYING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER WITHOUT PREJUDICE (DOCKET NO. 28). The parties' Stipulation for Protective Order ("Proposed Order") which was executed by counsel on March 19, 2018, but was not submitted to the Court until today has been referred to the magistrate judge and is denied without prejudice. (See document for further details.) #28 . (sbou)
May 15, 2018 Filing 28 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Campo, Joseph)
May 10, 2018 Filing 27 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Declaration of Martin L. Pitha in support #24 filed by Defendant One Life America, Inc.. (Pitha, Martin)
May 1, 2018 Filing 26 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Declaration of Martin L. Pitha in support #24 filed by Plaintiff Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc.. (Campo, Joseph)
April 16, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Proposed Order re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Declaration of Martin L. Pitha in support #24 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pitha, Martin)
April 16, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Declaration of Martin L. Pitha in support filed by Defendant One Life America, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/24/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Pitha, Martin)
April 10, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE TO PARTIES by U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Effective, April 11, 2018, Judge Chooljian will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse ("Roybal Building"), located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 750 on the 7th floor of the Roybal Building. All mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside of the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Building. Paper civil and criminal documents exempted from electronic filing shall be filed in Room 180 on the Terrace Level of the Roybal Building. Magistrate Judge Chooljian's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Kerri Hays, may be reached at (213) 894-2921. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 30, 2018 Filing 22 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS One Life America, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Campo, Joseph)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that the Motion to Dismiss #13 is appropriate for decision without oral argument. For the reasons stated herein, the Court grants the motion; the Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend, and the hearing set for 3/22/2018 is vacated. *See Order for deadlines.* (cw)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (cw)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the Scheduling Conference hearing. Jury Trial is set for 4/2/2019 at 9:00 AM (counsel must appear at 8:45 AM); the Final Pretrial Conference/Motions in Limine hearing is set for 3/15/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for other deadlines and requirements.* (cw)
March 8, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #13 filed by Defendant One Life America, Inc.. (Pitha, Martin)
March 5, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE Joint Report and Discovery Plan Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P.26(F) filed by Plaintiff Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc.. (Campo, Joseph)
March 1, 2018 Filing 16 TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #13 filed by Plaintiff Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc.. (Campo, Joseph)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
February 20, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant One Life America, Inc. One Life America, Inc., identifying Heartland Financial Group, Inc.. (Pitha, Martin)
February 20, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant One Life America, Inc. One Life America, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/22/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pitha, Martin)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Bernard Allen Garner APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant One Life America, Inc, designating Martin Pitha as local counsel. (lt)
January 29, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bernard Allen Garner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant One Life America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21171963) filed by Defendant One Life America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Central District Form Proposed Order) (Pitha, Martin)
January 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Martin L Pitha on behalf of Defendant One Life America, Inc. (Attorney Martin L Pitha added to party One Life America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Pitha, Martin)
January 26, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to One Life America, Inc. answer now due 2/20/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc..(Campo, Joseph)
January 12, 2018 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 9, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant One Life America, Inc. (jtil)
January 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
January 8, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil)
January 5, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc.. (Campo, Joseph)
January 5, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc., identifying None. (Campo, Joseph)
January 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc.. (Campo, Joseph)
January 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21058005 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Joseph C Campo added to party Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc.(pty:pla))(Campo, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc. v. One Life America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lead Masters Insurance Marketing and Financial Network, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph C Campo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Life America, Inc.
Represented By: Martin L Pitha
Represented By: Bernard Alalen Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?