Grasshopper House, LLC v. Clean and Sober Media LLC et al

Plaintiff: Grasshopper House, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-10, Clean and Sober Media LLC, Richard L. Taite and Cliffside Malibu
Counter Defendant: Pax Prentiss, Chris Prentiss and Passages Silver Strand, LLC
Counter Claimant: Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu 3, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services and Sunset Malibu
Case Number: 2:2018cv00923
Filed: February 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 449 NOTICE of Errata re Docket No.446 filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Stiglitz, Steven)
September 11, 2019 Filing 448 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 19-56008, 19-56072 Cross Appeals assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #446 , and Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #447 . (mrgo)
September 11, 2019 Filing 447 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendants Cliffside Malibu, Clean & Sober Media LLC, and Richard Taite Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,, Order on Motion to Strike, #51 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #432 , Order on Motion in Limine to Exclude,,,, Order on Motion in Limine to Limit,,,, Order on Motion in Limine to Preclude,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event),,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Exclude,,, #306 , Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law #433 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24421176.) (Attachments: #1 FORM 1, #2 ATTACHMENT TO CLIFFSIDE MALIBU, CLEAN & SOBER MEDIA, LLC, AND RICHARD TAITES NOTICE OF CROSS-APPEAL, IDENTIFYING ORDERS FROM WHICH THE CROSS-APPEAL ARISES, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Stiglitz, Steven)
September 11, 2019 Filing 446 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 53 filed 8/1/2018)). Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,, Order on Motion to Strike, #51 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #432 , Order on Motion in Limine to Exclude,,,, Order on Motion in Limine to Limit,,,, Order on Motion in Limine to Preclude,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event),,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Exclude,,, #306 , Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law #433 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24420719.) (Attachments: #1 ATTACHMENT FORM 1, #2 ATTACHMENT TO CLIFFSIDE MALIBU, CLEAN & SOBER MEDIA, LLC, AND RICHARD TAITES NOTICE OF CROSS-APPEAL, IDENTIFYING ORDERS FROM WHICH THE CROSS-APPEAL ARISES, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Stiglitz, Steven)
August 29, 2019 Filing 445 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 19-56008 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #444 as to Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (et)
August 28, 2019 Filing 444 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiffs Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC. Appeal of Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #432 , Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law #433 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24345792.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judgment, #2 Exhibit Amended Judgment, #3 Exhibit Representation Statement)(Levin, Jason)
August 2, 2019 Filing 443 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Libretta P Stennes counsel for Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Libretta P. Stennes is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Grasshopper House, LLC. (Stennes, Libretta)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 442 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson - To address the parties' recent filings #434 #435 #439 , the Court clarifies the findings of fact and conclusions of law #433 as follows: First, the Court's award of $60,000 in its equitable discretion was meant to be hypothetical, in the event that Cliffside's Lanham Act violations were found to be willful. Because the Court held that Cliffside's violations were not willful, disgorgement is not an available remedy to Passages, and Passages is not entitled to any monetary relief on its Lanham Act claims. Second, the Court's reference to each party bearing its own "expenses" was intended to encompass both attorneys' fees and costs. Neither party is entitled to recover costs or attorneys' fees from the other. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 30, 2019 Filing 441 SCHEDULING NOTICE re: APPLICATION for Order for award of Defendants' costs and fees and denial of Plaintiff's application for costs #435 - Hearing on the motion previously scheduled for 08/26/2019 at 1:30 PM has been rescheduled to 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 30, 2019 Filing 440 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendants and/or Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 53 filed 8/1/2018)), Cliffside Malibu, Cliffsid #434 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Levin, Jason)
July 29, 2019 Filing 439 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law #433 . filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment, #2 Declaration of John Stokes, #3 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment) (O'Connell, Victor)
July 29, 2019 Filing 438 Objection re: APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendants and/or Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 53 filed 8/1/2018)), Cliffside Malibu, Cliffsid #434 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Stokes in support of Defendants' objections to Passages' application for costs, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of John Stokes)(O'Connell, Victor)
July 19, 2019 Filing 437 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Defendants Motion and Application for Costs and Fees #435 set for hearing 8/19/19 is CONTINUED to 8/26/19 at 1:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #54 filed by Clean and Sober Media LLC, Richard L. Taite, Cliffside Malibu. CCA # 18-56111. Appellants' motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. [See document for more details.] (mat)
July 15, 2019 Filing 435 APPLICATION for Order for award of Defendants' costs and fees and denial of Plaintiff's application for costs filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Application set for hearing on 8/19/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Application for Costs and Fees, #2 Declaration of Shaun Martin, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Proposed Order) (O'Connell, Victor)
July 15, 2019 Filing 434 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendants and/or Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 53 filed 8/1/2018)), Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Richard L. Taite re: Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law #433 , filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (Part 1 of 2), #3 Exhibit 2 (Part 2 of 2), #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5 (Part 1 of 3), #7 Exhibit 5 (Part 2 of 3), #8 Exhibit 5 Part 3 of 3)) (Levin, Jason)
July 1, 2019 Filing 433 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (yl)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 432 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTAND MOTIONS IN LIMINE #153 #155 #156 #159 #160 #165 #173 #260 #265 #281 #284 #285 #384 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: On February 15, 2019, the Court issued a Minute Order to explain briefly the Courts rulings on the various motions in limine and motions for summary judgment filed by the parties. See Dkt. 306. This Order elaborates on the legal bases for some of the Courts rulings and provides clarity on several subsequent evidentiary rulings made during the ensuing trial. (See minutes for further details) (yl)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #54 filed by Clean and Sober Media LLC, Richard L. Taite, Cliffside Malibu. CCA # 18-56111. Appellants' motion for a 60-day extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief is due July 15, 2019. The answering brief is due August 14, 2019. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. (mrgo)
April 1, 2019 Filing 430 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE CITED IN PLAINTIFFS POST-TRIAL BRIEF filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu re: Objection, #425 (O'Connell, Victor)
April 1, 2019 Filing 429 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLCto Objection, #425 Defendants' Objection to Evidence Cited in Plaintiff's Post Trial Brief (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of William Andrichik, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B)(Andrichik, William)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 428 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: On 2/26/2018 the Court continued the bench trial to 4/1/2019. The continued date is vacated and off-calendar. The matter is under submission, and an order will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 25, 2019 Filing 427 SEALED DOCUMENT Defendants' Response To Plaintiff's Post-Trial Brief and Supporting Exhibits re APPLICATION to file document under seal #423 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #426 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Trial Exhibit 2006-A (Sealed), #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit H (Sealed))(O'Connell, Victor)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: GRANTING #423 APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL. The COURT hereby ORDERS that Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs are GRANTED leave to file under seal: Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Post-Trial Brief. Trial Exhibit 2006-A. Excerpts of the Deposition of Mark Alan Bailey. (shb)
March 22, 2019 Filing 425 OBJECTIONS to Trial Brief, #402 Plaintiff's Post-Trial Brief filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (O'Connell, Victor)
March 22, 2019 Filing 424 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #423 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Post-Trial Brief, #2 Unredacted Document Trial Exhibit 2006-A, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit H)(O'Connell, Victor)
March 22, 2019 Filing 423 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H (Redacted), #2 Trial Exhibit 2006-A (Redacted), #3 Proposed Order)(O'Connell, Victor)
March 22, 2019 Filing 422 DECLARATION of Victor O'Connell re Trial Brief, #421 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit A, #10 Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit C, #12 Exhibit D, #13 Exhibit E, #14 Exhibit F, #15 Exhibit G, #16 Exhibit H (Redacted), #17 Exhibit I, #18 Trial Exhibit 112, #19 Trial Exhibit 113, #20 Trial Exhibit 114, #21 Trial Exhibit 115, #22 Trial Exhibit 123, #23 Trial Exhibit 170, #24 Trial Exhibit 172, #25 Trial Exhibit 201, #26 Trial Exhibit 214, #27 Trial Exhibit 257, #28 Trial Exhibit 258, #29 Trial Exhibit 259, #30 Trial Exhibit 260, #31 Trial Exhibit 261, #32 Trial Exhibit 262, #33 Trial Exhibit 263, #34 Trial Exhibit 264, #35 Trial Exhibit 265, #36 Trial Exhibit 1033, #37 Trial Exhibit 1125, #38 Trial Exhibit 1764, #39 Trial Exhibit 1874, #40 Trial Exhibit 1898, #41 Trial Exhibit 1905, #42 Trial Exhibit 1916, #43 Trial Exhibit 1947, #44 Trial Exhibit 1950, #45 Trial Exhibit 1953, #46 Trial Exhibit 2006-A (Redacted), #47 Trial Exhibit 2443, #48 Trial Exhibit 2451, #49 Trial Exhibit 2567, #50 Trial Exhibit 2571, #51 Trial Exhibit 2579, #52 Trial Exhibit 2602, #53 Trial Exhibit 2662)(O'Connell, Victor)
March 22, 2019 Filing 421 TRIAL BRIEF Defendants' Response To Plaintiff's Post-Trial Brief filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite.. (O'Connell, Victor)
March 22, 2019 Filing 420 BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. Plaintiff's Post-Trial Reply Brief regarding Trial Brief, #405 , Sealed Document,, #418 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Andrichik, #2 Exhibit A to Andrichik Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Andrichik Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Andrichik Decl., #5 Exhibit D to Andrichik Decl., #6 Exhibit E to Andrichik Decl., #7 Exhibit F to Andrichik Decl., #8 Exhibit G to Andrichik Decl., #9 Exhibit H to Andrichik Decl.)(Levin, Jason)
March 22, 2019 Filing 419 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff's Post-Trial Brief re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #416 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC.(Ayerh, Melanie)
March 21, 2019 Filing 418 SEALED DOCUMENT re APPLICATION to file document under seal #407 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #417 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Unredacted Document, #3 Unredacted Document, #4 Unredacted Document, #5 Unredacted Document, #6 Unredacted Document)(O'Connell, Victor)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR POST-TRIAL BRIEF #407 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court Orders are GRANTED leave to file under seal: 1.Unredacted Defendants' Post-Trial Brief; 2.Unredacted Trial Exhibit 2006-A to F. (lom)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLAINTIFF'S POST-TRIAL BRIEF by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #403 APPLICATION. The Court hereby GRANTS the Application and permits Plaintiff to file that document under seal. (lom)
March 19, 2019 Filing 415 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 02-19-19, 9:47 AM, VOL 1 OF 2; 02-20-19, 1:11 PM, VOL 2 OF 2; 02-21-19, 9:38 AM, VOL 1 OF 3; 02-21-19, 3:27 PM, VOL 3 OF 3; 02-26-19, 10:23 AM, VOL 1 OF 2 re Transcript #414 , #411 , #413 , #412 , #410 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Algorri, Miranda) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 19, 2019 Filing 414 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02-26-19, 10:23 AM, VOL 1 OF 2. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Miranda Algorri, phone number/email mirandaalgorri@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2019. (Algorri, Miranda)
March 19, 2019 Filing 413 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02-21-19, 3:27 PM, VOL 3 OF 3. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Miranda Algorri, phone number/email mirandaalgorri@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2019. (Algorri, Miranda)
March 19, 2019 Filing 412 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02-21-19, 9:38 AM, VOL 1 OF 3. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Miranda Algorri, phone number/email mirandaalgorri@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2019. (Algorri, Miranda)
March 19, 2019 Filing 411 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02-20-19, 1:11 PM, VOL 2 OF 2. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Miranda Algorri, phone number/email mirandaalgorri@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2019. (Algorri, Miranda)
March 19, 2019 Filing 410 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02-19-19, 9:47 AM, VOL 1 OF 2. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Miranda Algorri, phone number/email mirandaalgorri@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2019. (Algorri, Miranda)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 409 SCHEDULING NOTICE/IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson - The hearings on Cliffside's motions to exclude expert testimony of Dr. Michael Williams #281 , Chris Silver Smith #284 , and Dr. Russell Winer #285 are vacated and off-calendar. The Court will address these motions in an Order elaborating on the bases for the Court's rulings in the February 15, 2019 Minute Order #306 addressing the parties' motions for summary judgment and evidentiary motions in limine. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 12, 2019 Filing 408 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #407 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Defendants' Post-Trial Brief, #2 Unredacted Document Trial Exhibit 2006-A, #3 Unredacted Document Trial Exhibit 2006-B, #4 Unredacted Document Trial Exhibit 2006-C, #5 Unredacted Document Trial Exhibit 2006-D, #6 Unredacted Document Trial Exhibit 2006-E, #7 Unredacted Document Trial Exhibit 2006-F)(O'Connell, Victor)
March 12, 2019 Filing 407 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Defendants' Post-Trial Brief, #2 Redacted Document Trial Exhibit 2006-A, #3 Redacted Document Trial Exhibit 2006-B, #4 Redacted Document Trial Exhibit 2006-C, #5 Redacted Document Trial Exhibit 2006-D, #6 Redacted Document Trial Exhibit 2006-E, #7 Redacted Document Trial Exhibit 2006-F, #8 Proposed Order)(O'Connell, Victor)
March 12, 2019 Filing 406 DECLARATION of Victor O'Connell re Trial Brief, #405 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Trial Exhibit 112, #2 Trial Exhibit 113, #3 Trial Exhibit 114, #4 Trial Exhibit 115, #5 Trial Exhibit 116, #6 Trial Exhibit 117, #7 Trial Exhibit 123, #8 Trial Exhibit 157, #9 Trial Exhibit 225, #10 Trial Exhibits 257-265, #11 Trial Exhibit 288, #12 Trial Exhibit 900, #13 Trial Exhibit 1033, #14 Trial Exhibit 1764, #15 Trial Exhibit 1874, #16 Trial Exhibit 1896, #17 Trial Exhibit 1898, #18 Trial Exhibit 1916, #19 Trial Exhibit 1939, #20 Trial Exhibit 1950, #21 Trial Exhibit 2006-A (Redacted), #22 Trial Exhibit 2006-B (Redacted), #23 Trial Exhibit 2006-C (Redacted), #24 Trial Exhibit 2006-D (Redacted), #25 Trial Exhibit 2006-E (Redacted), #26 Trial Exhibit 2006-F (Redacted), #27 Trial Exhibit 2454, #28 Trial Exhibit 2455, #29 Trial Exhibit 2486, #30 Trial Exhibit 2504, #31 Trial Exhibit 2513, #32 Trial Exhibit 2551, #33 Trial Exhibit 2563, #34 Trial Exhibit 2571, #35 Exhibit 3, #36 Exhibit 4, #37 Exhibit 5, #38 Exhibit 6, #39 Exhibit 8, #40 Exhibit 9, #41 Exhibit 10, #42 Exhibit 11, #43 Exhibit A, #44 Exhibit B, #45 Exhibit C, #46 Exhibit D, #47 Exhibit E, #48 Exhibit F)(O'Connell, Victor)
March 12, 2019 Filing 405 TRIAL BRIEF Defendants' and Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Post-Trial Brief (REDACTED VERSION) filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite.. (O'Connell, Victor)
March 12, 2019 Filing 404 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Redacted Post-Trial Brief under seal #403 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Plaintiff's Post-Trial Brief)(Levin, Jason)
March 12, 2019 Filing 403 APPLICATION to file document Redacted Post-Trial Brief under seal filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Plaintiff's Post-Trial Brief)(Levin, Jason)
March 12, 2019 Filing 402 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiff's Post-Trial Brief filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Andrichik, #2 Exhibit A to Andrichik Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Andrichik Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Andrichik Decl., #5 Exhibit D to Andrichik Decl., #6 Exhibit E to Andrichik Decl., #7 Exhibit F to Andrichik Decl.)(Levin, Jason)
February 28, 2019 Filing 401 SEALED DOCUMENT Trial Declaration of Jason Levin re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #395 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 196, #2 Exhibit 197, #3 Exhibit 204, #4 Exhibit 206, #5 Exhibit 290, #6 Exhibit 406, #7 Exhibit 407, #8 Proof of Service)(Ayerh, Melanie)
February 28, 2019 Filing 400 SEALED DOCUMENT Trial Declaration of Pax Prentiss re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #390 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proof of Service)(Ayerh, Melanie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 399 RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS to Counsel Upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial; Pursuant to stip of counsel and/or by Order of the Court, all exhibits listed on Joint exhibits list are returned to counsel for respective party(ies). (mrgo)
February 26, 2019 Filing 398 MINUTES OF COURT TRIAL (1st Day) held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Witneses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Bench Trial continued to 4/1/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Briefing schedule: Simultaneous Opening Briefs shall be filed no later than 3/12/2019, and simultaneous response briefs are due 3/22/2019. No brief shall be more than 25 pages. Court Reporter: Miranda Algorri/Maria Bustillos. (mrgo)
February 26, 2019 Filing 397 SEALED DOCUMENT re APPLICATION to file document Plaintiff's Phase III Trial Brief under seal #387 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #394 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ayerh, Melanie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 396 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits to Andrichik Trial Declaration under seal #377 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2741, #2 Exhibit 2742, #3 Exhibit 2743, #4 Proof of Service)(Ayerh, Melanie)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Application for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Trial Declaration of Jason Levin #375 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (jp)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Application for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Phase III Trial Brief #387 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (jp)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Application for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Trial Declaration of William Andrichik #377 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (jp)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER GRANTING Defendants Application to File Under Seal Certain Documents in support of the Declaration of Russell W Mangum #373 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (jp)
February 26, 2019 Filing 391 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #367 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service)(Ayerh, Melanie)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Application for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Trial Declaration of Pax Prentiss - Third Phase of Trial on Equitable Issues #370 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (jp)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Application for Leave to File Under Seal Designated Deposition Transcript of Richard Taite #367 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (jp)
February 26, 2019 Filing 388 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Plaintiff's Phase III Trial Brief under seal #387 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Plaintiff's Phase III Trial Brief)(Andrichik, William)
February 26, 2019 Filing 387 APPLICATION to file document Plaintiff's Phase III Trial Brief under seal filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Plaintiff's Phase III Trial Brief, #3 Exhibit A to Trial Brief, #4 Exhibit B to Trial Brief, #5 Exhibit C to Trial Brief, #6 Exhibit D to Trial Brief)(Andrichik, William)
February 26, 2019 Filing 386 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC of Certified deposition transcript of Richard Taite taken before a certified court reporter in Los Angeles, California on December 20, 2018. (Ayerh, Melanie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 385 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC of A digital copy saved to CD of certain portions of the deposition testimony from Richard Taite, taken on December 20, 2018.. (Ayerh, Melanie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 384 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Declarations of Defendants' Rebuttal Experts Mangum and Hanson and to Exclude their Testimony from Phase III of Trial Declaration #365 , Declaration, #366 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Andrichik, William)
February 26, 2019 Filing 383 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. correcting Declaration, #360 of Allison McCabe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corrected Declaration of Allison McCabe)(O'Connell, Victor)
February 26, 2019 Filing 382 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiff's Designation of Deposition Testimony from Richard Taite for use in Phase III of Trial filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Stiglitz, Steven)
February 26, 2019 Filing 381 OBJECTIONS to Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #371 of Pax Prentiss filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Stiglitz, Steven)
February 26, 2019 Filing 380 OBJECTIONS to Declaration #369 of Arun Thach filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Stiglitz, Steven)
February 26, 2019 Filing 379 OBJECTIONS to Declaration, #357 , Declaration, #360 , Declaration #365 , Declaration, #366 , Declaration, #362 , Declaration, #355 , Declaration, #359 , Declaration, #361 , Declaration,,, #364 , Declaration, #363 , Declaration, #356 Evidentiary Objections filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Andrichik, William)
February 26, 2019 Filing 378 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits to Andrichik Trial Declaration under seal #377 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2741, #2 Exhibit 2742, #3 Exhibit 2743)(Andrichik, William)
February 26, 2019 Filing 377 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits to Andrichik Trial Declaration under seal filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of William Andrichik, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit 2741, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit 2742, #5 Redacted Document Exhibit 2743)(Andrichik, William)
February 25, 2019 Filing 376 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits to Levin Declaration under seal #375 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 196, #2 Exhibit 197, #3 Exhibit 204, #4 Exhibit 206, #5 Exhibit 290, #6 Exhibit 406, #7 Exhibit 407)(Andrichik, William)
February 25, 2019 Filing 375 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits to Levin Declaration under seal filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jason Levin for use at Phase III of trial, #3 Exhibit 215, #4 Exhibit 216, #5 Exhibit 220, #6 Exhibit 225, #7 Exhibit 230, #8 Exhibit 288, #9 Exhibit 291, #10 Exhibit 294, #11 Exhibit 301, #12 Exhibit 305, #13 Exhibit 306, #14 Exhibit 699, #15 Exhibit 745, #16 Exhibit 900, #17 Exhibit 952, #18 Exhibit 971, #19 Exhibit 974, #20 Exhibit 1033, #21 Exhibit 1125, #22 Exhibit 1696, #23 Exhibit 1719, #24 Exhibit 2451, #25 Exhibit 2452, #26 Exhibit 2454, #27 Exhibit 2455, #28 Exhibit 2745, #29 Exhibit 2746, #30 Exhibit 196 (Redacted), #31 Exhibit 197 (Redacted), #32 Exhibit 201, #33 Exhibit 204 (Redacted), #34 Exhibit 206 (Redacted), #35 Exhibit 251, #36 Exhibit 257, #37 Exhibit 258, #38 Exhibit 259, #39 Exhibit 260, #40 Exhibit 261, #41 Exhibit 262, #42 Exhibit 263, #43 Exhibit 264, #44 Exhibit 265, #45 Exhibit 266, #46 Exhibit 267, #47 Exhibit 270, #48 Exhibit 271, #49 Exhibit 290 (Redacted), #50 Exhibit 406 (Redacted), #51 Exhibit 407 (Redacted), #52 Exhibit 2749)(Andrichik, William)
February 25, 2019 Filing 374 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits A, B, and C to the Russell W. Mangum Declaration under seal #373 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit A, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit B, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit C)(O'Connell, Victor)
February 25, 2019 Filing 373 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits A, B, and C to the Russell W. Mangum Declaration under seal filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B (Redacted), #3 Exhibit C (Redacted), #4 Proposed Order)(O'Connell, Victor)
February 25, 2019 Filing 372 Index filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Melanie A. Ayerh, #2 Exhibit B)(Ayerh, Melanie)
February 25, 2019 Filing 371 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Trial Declaration in Support of Phase III of Trial under seal #370 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Prentiss Decl., #2 Exhibit B to Prentiss Decl., #3 Exhibit C to Prentiss Decl.)(Andrichik, William)
February 25, 2019 Filing 370 APPLICATION to file document Trial Declaration in Support of Phase III of Trial under seal filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Declaration of Pax Prentiss, #3 Redacted Document Exs. A-C of Prentiss Decl.)(Andrichik, William)
February 25, 2019 Filing 369 DECLARATION of Arun Thach for use in Phase III of trial filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Thach Declaration)(Andrichik, William)
February 25, 2019 Filing 368 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #367 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Ayerh, Melanie)
February 25, 2019 Filing 367 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ayerh, Melanie)
February 25, 2019 Filing 366 DECLARATION of Russell W. Mangum III, PH.D. for use in Phase III of trial filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (O'Connell, Victor)
February 25, 2019 Filing 365 DECLARATION of Dr. Ward Hanson for use in Phase III of trial filed by Counter Claimants Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Defendant Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(Berkowitz, Dana)
February 25, 2019 Filing 364 DECLARATION of Truman Hedding for use in Phase III of trial filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W)(Berkowitz, Dana)
February 25, 2019 Filing 363 DECLARATION of Richard Taite for use in Phase III of trial filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Berkowitz, Dana)
February 25, 2019 Filing 362 DECLARATION of John Peloquin for use in Phase III of trial filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Berkowitz, Dana)
February 25, 2019 Filing 361 DECLARATION of Kelly Stephenson for use in Phase III of trial filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Berkowitz, Dana)
February 25, 2019 Filing 360 DECLARATION of Allison McCabe for use in Phase III of trial filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Berkowitz, Dana)
February 25, 2019 Filing 359 DECLARATION of Jay Levin for use in Phase III of trial filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Berkowitz, Dana)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 358 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Passages' motion to present evidence of injury and damages to the jury #345 is DENIED. The Court will proceed to hear the outstanding equitable issues in this case in a Court Trial on February 26, 2019, as the Court previously held. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 25, 2019 Filing 357 DECLARATION of Hunter Slaton for use in Phase III of trial filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Berkowitz, Dana)
February 25, 2019 Filing 356 DECLARATION of William Nordlund for use in Phase III of trial filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berkowitz, Dana)
February 25, 2019 Filing 355 DECLARATION of Andrew Bick for use in Phase III of trial filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Berkowitz, Dana)
February 25, 2019 Filing 348 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Submit Phase II Evidence to Jury #345 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victor O'Connell, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit D)(O'Connell, Victor)
February 22, 2019 Filing 347 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 1 and 2 in support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Tulin Erdem and Dr. Ward Hanson under seal #319 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Proof of Service)(Ayerh, Melanie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 346 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits D, E and F under seal #315 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit Exhibit F, #4 Proof of Service)(Ayerh, Melanie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 345 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Submit Phase II Evidence to Jury filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Levin, #2 Exhibit A to Levin Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Levin Decl., #4 Proposed Order) (Levin, Jason)
February 22, 2019 Filing 344 SEALED DOCUMENT Request for Judicial Notice and Exhibits A-B re APPLICATION to file document ECF Dkt. 332 under seal #333 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #339 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stiglitz, Steven)
February 22, 2019 Filing 343 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 3rd Day held and completed before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Closing arguments made. Court instructs jury. Bailiff sworn. Jury retires to deliberate. Verdict reached. Jury FINDS: for plaintiff(s) and defendant(s). Jury polled. Case continued to 2/26/2019, at 9:00 a.m. Court concluded jury portion of trial is complete. Parties ordered back for equitable matters to be resolved by Court. Jurors service concluded as of today. Court Reporter: Miranda Algorri/Maria Bustillos. (mrgo)
February 21, 2019 Filing 354 AMENDED MINUTES held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: Jury Trial - Completed,, #343 . [Corrected as to Date] (mrgo)
February 21, 2019 Filing 353 SEALED UNREDACTED Special Verdict Form filed re: Jury Verdict #352 . (mrgo)
February 21, 2019 Filing 352 REDACTED SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. (mrgo)
February 21, 2019 Filing 351 SEALED UNREDACTED Jury Note filed re: Jury Notes #350 . (mrgo)
February 21, 2019 Filing 350 REDACTED Jury Note filed. (mrgo)
February 21, 2019 Filing 349 COURT'S INSTRUCTIONS TO THE JURY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (mrgo)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS AND COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN DOCUMENT IN SUPPORT OF THEIR REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #333 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANTS' EXPERT WITNESSES, TULIN ERDEM AND WARD HANSON by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #330 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
February 21, 2019 Filing 337 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - THE COURT'S POSITION RE: CLIFFSIDE'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RECONSIDERATION #327 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Applying Jarrow Formulas, Cliffside's application for reconsideration is denied. (See document for details) (mrgo)
February 21, 2019 Filing 334 SEALED DOCUMENT re Request for Judicial Notice,, #332 , APPLICATION to file document ECF Dkt. 332 under seal #333 , Protective Order #83 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document RJN, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit A, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit B)(Stiglitz, Steven)
February 21, 2019 Filing 333 APPLICATION to file document ECF Dkt. 332 under seal filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document, #2 Exhibit A (Redacted), #3 Exhibit B (Redacted), #4 Proposed Order)(Stiglitz, Steven)
February 21, 2019 Filing 332 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ariel Murphy, #2 Exhibit A (Redacted), #3 Exhibit B (Redacted), #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Proposed Order)(Stiglitz, Steven)
February 20, 2019 Filing 331 SEALED OPPOSITION RE Objection/Opposition (Motion related),, #329 , Protective Order #83 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #2 Unredacted Document Ex. 1, #3 Unredacted Document Ex. 2)(Stiglitz, Steven)
February 20, 2019 Filing 330 APPLICATION to file document ECF Dkt. 329 under seal filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Opposition to Motion, #2 Redacted Document Ex. 1, #3 Redacted Document Ex. 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Stiglitz, Steven)
February 20, 2019 Filing 329 Opposition to Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Tulin Erdem and Dr. Ward Hanson Filed Pursuant to Court's February 15 Order #318 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of Opposition, #2 Redacted Document Ex. 1, #3 Redacted Document Ex. 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Stiglitz, Steven)
February 19, 2019 Filing 328 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite for Court Reporter. Court will contact Steven Stiglitz at steven.stiglitz@strismaher.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Stiglitz, Steven)
February 19, 2019 Filing 327 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion in Limine to Exclude,,,, Order on Motion in Limine to Limit,,,, Order on Motion in Limine to Preclude,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event),,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Exclude,,, #306 seeking clarification or reconsideration regarding Defendants' affirmative defense of statute of limitations filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Stiglitz, Steven)
February 19, 2019 Filing 326 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Justin Hewitt's Hearsay Testimony #309 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Stiglitz, Steven)
February 19, 2019 Filing 325 NOTICE of Manual Filing or Lodging filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Notice of Manual Lodging of Original transcripts of the depositions of the following persons, all of which were taken in Los Angeles, CA: (1) Pax Prentiss as Person Most Knowledgeable for Grasshopper House, LLC taken on November 30, 2018; (2) Pax Prentiss, an individual, taken on December 10, 2018; (3) Pax Prentiss and Jim Heilsberg as Person Most Knowledgeable at Grasshopper House Regarding Damages taken on December 14, 2018; (4) Arun Thatch taken on December 12, 2018; (5) Michael Shaner taken on December 12, 2018; and (6) Mark Bailey taken on December 4, 2018. (Stiglitz, Steven)
February 19, 2019 Filing 324 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss of Notice of Lodging of Original Deposition Transcript of Kathryn Bello. (Ayerh, Melanie)
February 19, 2019 Filing 323 Proposed Order re MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Justin Hewitt's Hearsay Testimony #309 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Ayerh, Melanie)
February 18, 2019 Filing 322 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Exclusion of the Live Testimony of Certain Witnesses at Trial , Third Party EX PARTE APPLICATION to Quash Third Party Trial Subpoena filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Stiglitz, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order) (Stiglitz, Steven)
February 18, 2019 Filing 321 APPLICATION for Order for for exclusion of live testimony of certain witnesses at trial , APPLICATION to Quash third party trial subpoena filed by Defendants' Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order) (Stiglitz, Steven)
February 18, 2019 Filing 320 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 1 and 2 in support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Tulin Erdem and Dr. Ward Hanson under seal #319 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Ayerh Decl., #2 Exhibit 2 to Ayerh Decl.)(Ayerh, Melanie)
February 18, 2019 Filing 319 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 1 and 2 in support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Tulin Erdem and Dr. Ward Hanson under seal filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ayerh, Melanie)
February 18, 2019 Filing 318 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Tulin Erdem and Dr. Ward Hanson Filed Pursuant to Court's February 15 Order filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie Ayerh, #2 Exhibit 3 to Ayerh Decl., #3 Proposed Order)(Ayerh, Melanie)
February 18, 2019 Filing 317 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Chris Silver Smith #284 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Russell Winer #285 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Russell Winer #285 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Michael Williams #281 , N #291 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Michael Williams #281 filed by Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie Ayerh, #2 Exhibit A to Ayerh Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Ayerh Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Ayerh Decl.)(Ayerh, Melanie)
February 18, 2019 Filing 316 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits D, E and F under seal #315 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D to Ayerh Decl., #2 Exhibit E to Ayerh Decl., #3 Exhibit F to Ayerh Decl.)(Ayerh, Melanie)
February 18, 2019 Filing 315 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits D, E and F under seal filed by Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application, #3 Declaration of Melanie Ayerh, #4 Exhibit A to Ayerh Decl., #5 Exhibit B to Ayerh Decl., #6 Exhibit C to Ayerh Decl.)(Ayerh, Melanie)
February 18, 2019 Filing 314 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Proposed Demonstrative filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (O'Connell, Victor)
February 18, 2019 Filing 313 Joint Amended Exhibit List filed by Parties Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss.. (Andrichik, William)
February 18, 2019 Filing 312 OBJECTIONS to Defendants' and Counterplaintiffs' Proposed Demonstrative Exhibits filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Andrichik, William)
February 18, 2019 Filing 311 Index of Deposition Testimony filed by Counter Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss, Richard L. Taite, Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC (Andrichik, William)
February 18, 2019 Filing 310 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss.. (Andrichik, William)
February 18, 2019 Filing 309 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Justin Hewitt's Hearsay Testimony filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Motion set for hearing on 2/19/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson.(Ayerh, Melanie)
February 16, 2019 Filing 308 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings FEBRUARY 14, 2019, 11:53 a.m. re Transcript #307 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (MacNeil, Sandra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 16, 2019 Filing 307 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on FEBRUARY 14, 2019, 11:53 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: SANDRA MACNEIL, phone number 213-894-5949; MACNEILSANDY@GMAIL.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2019. (MacNeil, Sandra)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) RE: MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE #153 #155 #156 #157 #158 #159 #160 #165 #173 #178 #184 #260 #265 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (See document for various rulings). As stated in the Pretrial Conference on February 14, 2019, Passages is permitted to file briefs on Monday, February 18, 2019, responding to Cliffside's motions to exclude the testimony of Dr. Michael Williams, Dkt. 281, Chris Silver Smith, Dkt. 284, and Dr. Russell Winer, Dkt. 285. Passages is also permitted to file new motions to exclude any of Cliffside's expert witnesses relevant for the second phase of trial by February 18, 2019. The Court will reserve further rulings on damages as relevant for the second phase of trial until after the first phase of trial is completed. (mrgo)
February 14, 2019 Filing 305 SEALED DOCUMENT re APPLICATION to file document Unredacted Memorandum of Law and Related Exhibits under seal #282 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #301 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit E)(O'Connell, Victor)
February 14, 2019 Filing 304 SEALED DOCUMENT re APPLICATION to file document Unredacted Memorandum of Law and Related Exhibits under seal #289 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #299 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(O'Connell, Victor)
February 14, 2019 Filing 303 SEALED DOCUMENT re APPLICATION to file document Unredacted Memorandum of Law and Related Exhibits under seal #286 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #298 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F)(O'Connell, Victor)
February 14, 2019 Filing 302 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss for Court Reporter. Court will contact Allison Romero at aromero@steptoe.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Edelstein, Laura)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS AND COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. MICHAEL WILLIAMS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #282 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS AND COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. RUSSELL WINER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #287 APPLICATION for Leave to File. (mrgo)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS AND COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. RUSSELL WINER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #289 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER ON DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF CHRIS SILVER SMITH by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #286 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO SEAL RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO DEPOSE THIRD PARTY LAURA ALTMAN by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #270 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
February 14, 2019 Filing 295 SEALED DOCUMENT re EX PARTE APPLICATION to depose third party Laura Altman #265 , Order on Motion for Leave #274 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit 4)(Berkowitz, Dana)
February 14, 2019 Filing 294 SEALED DOCUMENT re Trial Brief, #266 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #275 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit I, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit J, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit K, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit L, #5 Unredacted Document Exhibit M, #6 Unredacted Document Exhibit O, #7 Unredacted Document Exhibit Q, #8 Unredacted Document Exhibit R, #9 Unredacted Document Exhibit X, #10 Unredacted Document Exhibit Z)(Berkowitz, Dana)
February 14, 2019 Filing 293 SEALED DOCUMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Dr. Jacqueline Nolan #260 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #273 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit A)(Berkowitz, Dana)
February 13, 2019 Filing 292 REPLY In Support Of Motions Filed at ECF Nos. 260, 263, and 265; and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Request in ECF No. 277 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Dr. Jacqueline Nolan #260 to February 14, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. #263 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Dr. Jacqueline Nolan #260 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to depose third party Laura Altman #265 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victor O'Connell, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(O'Connell, Victor)
February 13, 2019 Filing 291 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Russell Winer #285 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Michael Williams #281 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Chris Silver Smith #284 to February 14, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 53 filed 8/1/2018)), Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Connell, Victor)
February 13, 2019 Filing 290 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Unredacted Memorandum of Law and Related Exhibits under seal #289 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum of Law, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit A, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit B, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit C)(O'Connell, Victor)
February 13, 2019 Filing 289 APPLICATION to file document Unredacted Memorandum of Law and Related Exhibits under seal filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Memorandum of Law, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit A, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit B, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(O'Connell, Victor)
February 13, 2019 Filing 288 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Unredacted Memorandum of Law and Related Exhibits under seal #286 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Berkowitz, Dana)
February 13, 2019 Filing 287 APPLICATION for Leave to file Unredacted Memorandum of Law and Related Exhibits filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 53 filed 8/1/2018)), Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Memorandum of Law, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit A, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit B, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order) (O'Connell, Victor)
February 13, 2019 Filing 286 APPLICATION to file document Unredacted Memorandum of Law and Related Exhibits under seal filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Memorandum of Law, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit A, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit B, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit D, #5 Redacted Document Exhibit E, #6 Redacted Document Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Dana)
February 13, 2019 Filing 285 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Russell Winer filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 53 filed 8/1/2018)), Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Motion set for hearing on 3/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Victor O'Connell, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit A, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit B, #5 Redacted Document Exhibit C, #6 Proposed Order) (O'Connell, Victor)
February 13, 2019 Filing 284 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Chris Silver Smith filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 53 filed 8/1/2018)), Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Motion set for hearing on 3/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Victor O'Connell, #3 Exhibit A (Redacted), #4 Exhibit B (Redacted), #5 Exhibit C (Part 1), #6 Exhibit C (Part 2), #7 Exhibit C (Part 3), #8 Exhibit C (Part 4), #9 Exhibit D (Redacted), #10 Exhibit E (Redacted), #11 Exhibit F (Redacted), #12 Proposed Order) (Berkowitz, Dana)
February 13, 2019 Filing 283 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Unredacted Memorandum of Law and Related Exhibits under seal #282 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum of Law, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit A, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit B, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit E)(Berkowitz, Dana)
February 13, 2019 Filing 282 APPLICATION to file document Unredacted Memorandum of Law and Related Exhibits under seal filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Memorandum of Law, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit A, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit B, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit E, #5 Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Dana)
February 13, 2019 Filing 281 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Michael Williams filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 53 filed 8/1/2018)), Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Motion set for hearing on 3/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Victor O'Connell, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F (Part 1), #9 Exhibit F (Part 2), #10 Exhibit F (Part 3), #11 Exhibit F (Part 4), #12 Proposed Order) (Berkowitz, Dana)
February 13, 2019 Filing 280 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Laura J Edelstein on behalf of Counter Claimants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss, Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss (Attorney Laura J Edelstein added to party Grasshopper House, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Laura J Edelstein added to party Grasshopper House, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Laura J Edelstein added to party Grasshopper House, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Laura J Edelstein added to party Passages Silver Strand, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Laura J Edelstein added to party Passages Silver Strand, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Laura J Edelstein added to party Chris Prentiss(pty:cc), Attorney Laura J Edelstein added to party Chris Prentiss(pty:cd), Attorney Laura J Edelstein added to party Pax Prentiss(pty:cc), Attorney Laura J Edelstein added to party Pax Prentiss(pty:cd))(Edelstein, Laura)
February 13, 2019 Filing 279 DECLARATION of Melanie A. Ayerh in opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Dr. Jacqueline Nolan #260 to February 14, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. #263 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to depose third party Laura Altman #265 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Ayerh, Melanie)
February 13, 2019 Filing 278 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff and Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss for Court Reporter. Court will contact Allison Romero at aromero@steptoe.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Levin, Jason)
February 13, 2019 Filing 277 Opposition Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Dr. Jacqueline Nolan #260 to February 14, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. #263 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to depose third party Laura Altman #265 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Ayerh, Melanie)
February 13, 2019 Filing 276 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. correcting Sealed Document, #268 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to depose third party Laura Altman #265 (Maher, Brendan)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS AND COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR TRIAL BRIEF by Judge Stephen V. Wilson RE: #269 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO SEAL RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO DEPOSE THIRD PARTY LAURA ALTMAN by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #265 EX PARTE APPLICATION. (mrgo)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS AND COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN DOCUMENT IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. JACQUELINE NOLAN by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #261 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
February 13, 2019 Filing 272 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION to file document Unredacted Trial Brief and Unredacted related exhibits under seal #269 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Connell, Victor)
February 13, 2019 Filing 271 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Unredacted Trial Brief and Unredacted related exhibits under seal #269 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Trial Brief, #2 Unredacted Document I, #3 Unredacted Document J, #4 Unredacted Document K, #5 Unredacted Document L, #6 Unredacted Document M, #7 Unredacted Document O, #8 Unredacted Document Q, #9 Unredacted Document R, #10 Unredacted Document X, #11 Unredacted Document Z)(O'Connell, Victor)
February 13, 2019 Filing 270 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Stiglitz, #2 Redacted Document Ex Parte Application for Leave to Depose Laura Altman, #3 Exhibit 4 (redacted) of Berkowitz Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Maher, Brendan)
February 13, 2019 Filing 269 APPLICATION to file document Unredacted Trial Brief and Unredacted related exhibits under seal filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Exhibit I, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit J, #3 Redacted Document Exhibit K, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit L, #5 Redacted Document Exhibit M, #6 Redacted Document Exhibit O, #7 Redacted Document Exhibit Q, #8 Redacted Document Exhibit R, #9 Redacted Document Exhibit X, #10 Redacted Document Exhibit Z, #11 Redacted Document Trial Brief)(O'Connell, Victor)
February 12, 2019 Filing 268 SEALED DOCUMENT re EX PARTE APPLICATION to depose third party Laura Altman #265 , Protective Order #83 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of Ex Parte Application for leave to depose Laura Altman, #2 Exhibit 4 of Berkowitz declaration)(Maher, Brendan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 267 DECLARATION of Ariel Murphy re Trial Brief, #266 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA)(O'Connell, Victor)
February 12, 2019 Filing 266 TRIAL BRIEF filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 53 filed 8/1/2018)), Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite.. (O'Connell, Victor)
February 12, 2019 Filing 265 EX PARTE APPLICATION to depose third party Laura Altman filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dana Berkowitz, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4 (redacted), #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Proposed Order) (Maher, Brendan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 264 TRIAL BRIEF filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss.. (Ayerh, Melanie)
February 12, 2019 Filing 263 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Dr. Jacqueline Nolan #260 to February 14, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 53 filed 8/1/2018)), Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Connell, Victor)
February 12, 2019 Filing 262 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Unredacted Memorandum of Law and Unredacted Exhibit A associated with ECF No. 260 under seal #261 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Jacqueline Nolan, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit A)(O'Connell, Victor)
February 12, 2019 Filing 261 APPLICATION to file document Unredacted Memorandum of Law and Unredacted Exhibit A associated with ECF No. 260 under seal filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Jacqueline Nolan, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(O'Connell, Victor)
February 12, 2019 Filing 260 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony Of Dr. Jacqueline Nolan filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 53 filed 8/1/2018)), Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. Motion set for hearing on 3/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Dana Berkowitz, #3 Exhibit A (Redacted), #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Proposed Order) (O'Connell, Victor)
February 11, 2019 Filing 296 MINUTES OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; #153 MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Exclude David E. Smith, M.D./ MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Limit David E. Smith, M.D. filed by Plaintiff; #155 MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Preclude Lay Witness Specualtion Regarding Drug Use filed by Plaintiff; #156 MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Preclude Quality of Care Evidence from Non-surveyed Witnesses filed by Plaintiff; #157 MOTION IN LIMINE (6) to Preclude Evidence of other unrelated lawsuits filed by Plaintiff; #158 MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Preclude Evidence Not Contained in Pleadings filed by Plaintiff #159 MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Helpline Referral Evidence filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs; #160 MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Call Center Evidence filed by Defendants #165 MOTION in Limine 1 to Exclude Testimony Under Seal filed by Counter Defendants; #173 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff; #178 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaims filed by Defendants; #182 MOTION to Dismiss Counter-Counterclaim filed by Defendants; #184 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Conference held. Counsel are advised as to how the Court intends to rule on the pending motions. The Court also intends to bifurcate trial to segregate liability from damages. The parties are ordered to produce expert reports and expert depositions to the Court promptly. The Court sets a further pretrial conference for February 14, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (bm)
February 8, 2019 Filing 259 SCHEDULING NOTICE: The Court advances the Pretrial Conference and the hearing on all motions ( #184 , #160 , #156 , #153 , #155 , #165 , #153 , #159 , #157 , #157 , #178 , #173 , and #158 ) from 2/11/2019 at 3:00 p.m. to 2/11/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 8, 2019 Filing 258 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by Plaintiff and Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss, Richard L. Taite.. (Ayerh, Melanie)
February 8, 2019 Filing 257 PROPOSED JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiff and Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss, Richard L. Taite. (Andrichik, William)
February 5, 2019 Filing 256 SEALED DOCUMENT re APPLICATION to file document Evidentiary Objections to Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact and Statement of Additional Facts that Create a Genuine Dispsute of Material Fact under seal #247 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #252 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Levin, Jason)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Pursuant to the Court's order of January 29, 2019 (Docket No. #241 ), counsel for Defendants provided to the Court certain documents related to Plaintiffs attempt to depose Maer Roshan for an in camera review. Having reviewed the documents, the Court concludes that Defendants did not prevent or otherwise impede service of Plaintiff's subpoena on Mr. Roshan. (hr)
February 5, 2019 Filing 254 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss, re Sealed Document,,,, #253 served on January 26, 2019 and January 27, 2019. (Andrichik, William)
February 5, 2019 Filing 253 SEALED DOCUMENT Passages' Corrected Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #184 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #240 filed by Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Evidentiary Objections, #2 Exhibit Opposition to Statement of Facts, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 21, #15 Exhibit 22, #16 Exhibit 23, #17 Exhibit 25, #18 Exhibit 26, #19 Exhibit 27, #20 Exhibit 32, #21 Exhibit 37, #22 Exhibit 40, #23 Exhibit 41, #24 Exhibit 42, #25 Exhibit 47, #26 Exhibit 49, #27 Exhibit 50, #28 Exhibit 51, #29 Exhibit 52, #30 Exhibit 53, #31 Exhibit 56)(Cooper, Bennett)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER GRANTING PASSAGES' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES OF MATERIAL FACT AND STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL FACTS THAT CREATE A GENUINE DISPUTE OF MATERIAL FACT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #247 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
February 2, 2019 Filing 251 COMPACT DISC Order for date of proceedings 12/11/2018 to 12/11/2018 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Court will contact Steven B.F. Stiglitz at steven.stiglitz@strismaher.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: Discovery Conference 12/11/2018. FEE PAID. (Stiglitz, Steven)
February 2, 2019 Filing 250 EXHIBIT B to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #184 as well as further exhibits filed in connection with Defendants' Reply In Support Of Summary Judgment, ECF No. 249, filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit AB, #9 Exhibit AC, #10 Exhibit AD, #11 Exhibit AG, #12 Exhibit AH, #13 Exhibit AI, #14 Exhibit AJ)(O'Connell, Victor)
February 1, 2019 Filing 249 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #184 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Reply Statement, #2 Exhibit of Dana Berkowitz, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit J, #5 Exhibit L, #6 Exhibit M, #7 Exhibit N, #8 Exhibit O, #9 Exhibit P, #10 Exhibit Q, #11 Exhibit R, #12 Exhibit S, #13 Exhibit T, #14 Exhibit U, #15 Exhibit V, #16 Exhibit W, #17 Exhibit X, #18 Exhibit Y, #19 Exhibit Z, #20 Exhibit AA, #21 Exhibit AE, #22 Exhibit AF)(O'Connell, Victor)
February 1, 2019 Filing 248 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Evidentiary Objections to Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact and Statement of Additional Facts that Create a Genuine Dispsute of Material Fact under seal #247 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Proof of Service)(Cooper, Bennett)
February 1, 2019 Filing 247 APPLICATION to file document Evidentiary Objections to Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact and Statement of Additional Facts that Create a Genuine Dispsute of Material Fact under seal filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document, #2 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Bennett)
February 1, 2019 Filing 246 REPLY In Support Of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaim #173 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Cooper, Bennett)
February 1, 2019 Filing 245 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaims #178 filed by Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (O'Connell, Victor)
February 1, 2019 Filing 244 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Counter Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss, Richard L. Taite, Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A to [Proposed] Final Pretrial Conference Order)(Andrichik, William)
January 29, 2019 Filing 243 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Counterclaim Plaintiffs Cliffside Malibu((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 53 filed 8/1/2018)), Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, re Sealed Document,,, #242 served on January 29, 2019. (O'Connell, Victor)
January 29, 2019 Filing 242 SEALED DOCUMENT Opposition to Counterclaim Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Counterclaims re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #215 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #239 filed by Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact & Statement of Additional Facts that Create a Genuine Dispute of Material Fact, #2 Exhibit Q, #3 Exhibit R, #4 Exhibit S, #5 Exhibit U, #6 Exhibit W, #7 Exhibit Y, #8 Exhibit AJ, #9 Exhibit AV, #10 Exhibit AW, #11 Exhibit BP, #12 Exhibit BQ, #13 Exhibit BU, #14 Exhibit BV, #15 Exhibit BW, #16 Exhibit CA, #17 Exhibit CB, #18 Exhibit CC)(O'Connell, Victor)
January 29, 2019 Filing 241 MINUTES AND ORDER RE: TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING settling #210 Motion re: Informal Discovery Dispute held before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. 1. Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Ms. Stephenson: As stated on the record, Plaintiff must apply to the assigned district judge for the specific relief sought in its letter brief regarding this issue. 2. Ability to Depose Maer Roshan: Counsel for Defendants are directed to provide the relevant email correspondence and other documents, along with Ms. Berkowitz's declaration, to the Court for in camera review by no later than January 30, 2019, at 9 a.m. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 1/29/2019. (hr)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER GRANTING PASSAGES' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #224 APPLICATION to Seal Document. The Court hereby GRANTS the Application and instructs the Clerk to seal the record as to Passages Opposition to Summary Judgment filed on January 25, 2019 in the above-captioned litigation. (mrgo)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER GRANTING COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN DOCUMENTS FILED IN OPPOSITION TO COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE COUNTERCLAIMS. by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #223 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (See document for details) (mrgo)
January 29, 2019 Filing 238 NOTICE of Change of address by Melanie Atswei Ayerh attorney for Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Changing attorneys address to Steptoe & Johnson LLP, 633 West Fifth Street, Suite 1900, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Ayerh, Melanie)
January 28, 2019 Filing 237 REPLY in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Call Center Evidence #160 , MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Helpline Referral Evidence #159 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dana Berkowitz, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(O'Connell, Victor)
January 28, 2019 Filing 236 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Preclude Evidence of other unrelated lawsuits #157 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ayerh in support of Reply, #2 Exhibit to Declaration of Ayerh)(Ayerh, Melanie)
January 28, 2019 Filing 235 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Preclude Quality of Care Evidence from Non-surveyed Witnesses #156 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Ayerh, Melanie)
January 28, 2019 Filing 234 REPLY in support of SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION in Limine #1 re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #163 #165 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Ayerh, Melanie)
January 28, 2019 Filing 233 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Preclude Lay Witness Specualtion Regarding Drug Use #155 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Ayerh, Melanie)
January 28, 2019 Filing 232 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Preclude Evidence Not Contained in Pleadings #158 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Ayerh, Melanie)
January 28, 2019 Filing 231 REPLY in support of motion MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude David E. Smith, M.D. MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Limit David E. Smith, M.D. #153 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Ayerh, Melanie)
January 28, 2019 Filing 230 BRIEF filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Cliffside Malibu((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 53 filed 8/1/2018)), Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. re Informal Discovery Conference (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victor O'Connell in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(O'Connell, Victor)
January 27, 2019 Filing 229 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Oppositions to Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Accompanying Exhibits under seal #224 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Corrected Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Cooper, Bennett)
January 27, 2019 Filing 228 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. correcting Response in Opposition to Motion, #216 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,,,, #225 , APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Oppositions to Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Accompanying Exhibits under seal #224 Corrected Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Cooper, Bennett)
January 27, 2019 Filing 227 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss. correcting APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Oppositions to Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Accompanying Exhibits under seal #224 Revised Redacted Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact (Cooper, Bennett)
January 27, 2019 Filing 226 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. correcting Response in Opposition to Motion, #216 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,,,, #225 , APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Oppositions to Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Accompanying Exhibits under seal #224 (Cooper, Bennett)
January 26, 2019 Filing 225 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Oppositions to Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Accompanying Exhibits under seal #224 filed by Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to Stennes Decl., #2 Exhibit 3 to Stennes Decl., #3 Exhibit 4 to Stennes Decl., #4 Exhibit 5 to Stennes Decl., #5 Exhibit 6 to Stennes Decl., #6 Exhibit 7 to Stennes Decl., #7 Exhibit 8 to Stennes Decl., #8 Exhibit 9 to Stennes Decl., #9 Exhibit 10 to Stennes Decl., #10 Exhibit 11 to Stennes Decl., #11 Exhibit 12 to Stennes Decl., #12 Exhibit 13 to Stennes Decl., #13 Exhibit 21 to Stennes Decl., #14 Exhibit 22 to Stennes Decl., #15 Exhibit 23 to Stennes Decl., #16 Exhibit 25 to Stennes Decl., #17 Exhibit 26 to Stennes Decl., #18 Exhibit 27 to Stennes Decl., #19 Exhibit 32 to Stennes Decl., #20 Exhibit 37 to Stennes Decl., #21 Exhibit 40 to Stennes Decl., #22 Exhibit 41 to Stennes Decl., #23 Exhibit 42 to Stennes Decl., #24 Exhibit 47 to Stennes Decl., #25 Exhibit 49 to Stennes Decl., #26 Exhibit 50 to Stennes Decl., #27 Exhibit 51 to Stennes Decl., #28 Exhibit 52 to Stennes Decl., #29 Exhibit 53 to Stennes Decl., #30 Exhibit 56 to Stennes Decl, #31 Unredacted Document Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #32 Unredacted Document Evidentiary Objections to Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #33 Unredacted Document Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact in Support of Opposition)(Cooper, Bennett)
January 26, 2019 Filing 224 APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Oppositions to Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Accompanying Exhibits under seal filed by Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Redacted Document Evidentiary Objections to Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #4 Redacted Document Statement of Disputes of Material Fact, #5 Unredacted Document Declaration of Mark Bailey, #6 Unredacted Document Exhibit 1 to Bailey Decl., #7 Unredacted Document Declaration of Bennett Cooper, #8 Unredacted Document Exhibit 1 to Cooper Dec., #9 Unredacted Document Exhibit 14 to Cooper Decl., #10 Unredacted Document Exhibit 15 to Cooper Decl., #11 Unredacted Document Exhibit 16 to Cooper Decl., #12 Unredacted Document Exhibit 17 to Cooper Decl., #13 Unredacted Document Exhibit 18 to Cooper Decl., #14 Unredacted Document Exhibit 19 to Cooper Decl., #15 Unredacted Document Exhibit 20 to Cooper Decl., #16 Unredacted Document Exhibit 24 to Cooper Decl., #17 Unredacted Document Exhibit 28 to Cooper Decl., #18 Unredacted Document Exhibit 29 to Cooper Decl., #19 Unredacted Document Exhibit 30 to Cooper Decl., #20 Unredacted Document Exhibit 31 to Cooper Decl., #21 Unredacted Document Exhibit 33 to Cooper Decl., #22 Unredacted Document Exhibit 34 to Cooper Decl., #23 Unredacted Document Exhibit 35 to Cooper Decl., #24 Unredacted Document Exhibit 36 to Cooper Decl., #25 Unredacted Document Exhibit 38 to Cooper Decl., #26 Unredacted Document Exhibit 39 to Cooper Decl., #27 Unredacted Document Exhibit 43 to Cooper Decl., #28 Unredacted Document Exhibit 44 to Cooper Decl., #29 Unredacted Document Exhibit 45 to Cooper Decl., #30 Unredacted Document Exhibit 46 to Cooper Decl., #31 Unredacted Document Exhibit 48 to Cooper Decl., #32 Unredacted Document Exhibit 54 to Cooper Decl., #33 Unredacted Document Exhibit 55 to Cooper Decl.)(Cooper, Bennett)
January 26, 2019 Filing 223 APPLICATION to file document Unredacted Version of Counterclaim Plaintiffs Opposition to Counterclaim Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Counterclaims; Unredacted Version of Counterclaim Plaintiffs Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact; Counterclaim Plaintiffs Statement of Additional Facts that Create a Genuine Dispute of Material Fact; Unredacted Version of the following exhibits to the Declaration of Dana Berkowitz, filed in Support of Counterclaim Plaintiffs Opposition to Counterclaim Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Counterclaims: Q, R, S, U, W, Y, AJ, AV, AW, BU, BP, BQ, BU, BV, BW, CA, CB, CC under seal filed by Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Dana)
January 26, 2019 Filing 222 EXHIBIT CA in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaim #173 as well as Exhibits CB to CD (referenced in the Declaration of Dana Berkowitz, ECF No. 217) filed by Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CB, #2 Exhibit CC, #3 Exhibit CD)(Berkowitz, Dana)
January 26, 2019 Filing 221 EXHIBIT BA filed in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaim #173 as well as Exhibits BB to BZ (referenced in the Declaration of Dana Berkowitz, ECF No. 217) filed by Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BB, #2 Exhibit BC, #3 Exhibit BD, #4 Exhibit BE, #5 Exhibit BF, #6 Exhibit BG, #7 Exhibit BH (part 1), #8 Exhibit BH (part 2), #9 Exhibit BH (part 3), #10 Exhibit BI, #11 Exhibit BJ, #12 Exhibit BK, #13 Exhibit BL, #14 Exhibit BM, #15 Exhibit BN, #16 Exhibit BO, #17 Exhibit BP, #18 Exhibit BQ, #19 Exhibit BR, #20 Exhibit BS, #21 Exhibit BT, #22 Exhibit BU, #23 Exhibit BV, #24 Exhibit BW, #25 Exhibit BX, #26 Exhibit BY, #27 Exhibit BZ)(Berkowitz, Dana)
January 26, 2019 Filing 220 EXHIBIT AA filed in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaim #173 as well as Exhibits AB to AZ (referenced in the Declaration of Dana Berkowitz, ECF No. 217) filed by Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AB, #2 Exhibit AC, #3 Exhibit AD, #4 Exhibit AE, #5 Exhibit AF, #6 Exhibit AG, #7 Exhibit AH, #8 Exhibit AI, #9 Exhibit AJ, #10 Exhibit AK, #11 Exhibit AL, #12 Affidavit AM, #13 Exhibit AN, #14 Exhibit AO, #15 Exhibit AP, #16 Exhibit AQ, #17 Exhibit AR, #18 Exhibit AS, #19 Exhibit AT (part 1), #20 Exhibit AT (part 2), #21 Exhibit AU, #22 Exhibit AV, #23 Exhibit AW, #24 Exhibit AX, #25 Exhibit AY, #26 Exhibit AZ)(Berkowitz, Dana)
January 26, 2019 Filing 219 EXHIBIT A filed in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaim #173 as well as Exhibits B to Z (referenced in the Declaration of Dana Berkowitz, ECF No. 217) filed by Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L (part 1), #12 Exhibit L (part 2), #13 Exhibit L (part 3), #14 Exhibit L (part 4), #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z)(Berkowitz, Dana)
January 26, 2019 Filing 217 DECLARATION of Dana Berkowitz in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaim #173 filed by Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Berkowitz, Dana)
January 26, 2019 Filing 216 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #184 filed by Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Cooper, Bennett)
January 25, 2019 Filing 218 STATEMENT of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact; Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Statement of Additional Facts that Create a Genuine Dispute of Material Fact; Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Response to Counterclaim Defendants' Asserted Conclusions of Law NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaim #173 filed by Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (O'Connell, Victor)
January 25, 2019 Filing 215 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaim #173 filed by Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (O'Connell, Victor)
January 25, 2019 Filing 214 Evidentiary Objections to Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Facts Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaims #178 filed by Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Cooper, Bennett)
January 25, 2019 Filing 213 STATEMENT of of Genuine Disputes Regarding Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaims #178 filed by Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Cooper, Bennett)
January 25, 2019 Filing 212 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaims #178 filed by Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bennett Cooper, #2 Exhibit 1 to Cooper Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Cooper Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Cooper Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 to Cooper Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 to Cooper Decl., #7 Exhibit 6 to Cooper Decl., #8 Exhibit 7 to Cooper Decl.)(Cooper, Bennett)
January 23, 2019 Filing 211 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver re: MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE #210 . At the request of the parties, a telephonic discovery conference is set for January 29, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Revised call-in information provided via email.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dml) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 23, 2019 Filing 210 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE (hr)
January 22, 2019 Filing 209 BRIEF filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. re Informal Discovery Confernece (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Andrichik, #2 Exhibit A to Andrichik Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Andrichik Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Andrichik Decl., #5 Exhibit D to Andrichik Decl., #6 Exhibit E to Andrichik Decl., #7 Exhibit F to Andrichik Decl., #8 Exhibit G to Andrichik Decl., #9 Exhibit H to Andrichik Decl., #10 Exhibit I to Andrichik Decl., #11 Exhibit J to Andrichik Decl., #12 Exhibit K to Andrichik Decl., #13 Exhibit L to Andrichik Decl., #14 Exhibit M to Andrichik Decl., #15 Exhibit N to Andrichik Decl., #16 Exhibit O to Andrichik Decl., #17 Exhibit P to Andrichik Decl., #18 Exhibit Q to Andrichik Decl., #19 Exhibit R to Andrichik Decl., #20 Exhibit S to Andrichik Decl., #21 Exhibit T to Andrichik Decl., #22 Exhibit U to Andrichik Decl., #23 Exhibit V to Andrichik Decl., #24 Exhibit W to Andrichik Decl., #25 Exhibit X to Andrichik Decl., #26 Exhibit Y to Andrichik Decl., #27 Exhibit Z to Andrichik Decl., #28 Exhibit AA to Andrichik Decl., #29 Exhibit BB to Andrichik Decl., #30 Exhibit CC to Andrichik Decl., #31 Exhibit DD to Andrichik Decl., #32 Exhibit EE to Andrichik Decl.)(Andrichik, William)
January 19, 2019 Filing 208 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 53 filed 8/1/2018)), Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite, re Sealed Document,,, #207 , Sealed Document,, #204 , Sealed Opposition,, #205 , Sealed Opposition, #203 , Sealed Opposition,, #206 served on 01/19/2019. (O'Connell, Victor)
January 19, 2019 Filing 207 SEALED DOCUMENT Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Partial Summary Judgment Motion and Injunctive Relief as to Counterclaims re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaims #178 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #193 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Defendants' Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts, #2 Sealed Declaration of Ariel Murphy, #3 Sealed Exhibit B, #4 Sealed Exhibit C)(O'Connell, Victor)
January 19, 2019 Filing 206 SEALED OPPOSITION RE APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 under seal #183 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #200 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Opposition to Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1)(O'Connell, Victor)
January 19, 2019 Filing 205 SEALED OPPOSITION RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #184 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #201 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Defendants' Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts In Support Of Summary Judgment)(O'Connell, Victor)
January 19, 2019 Filing 204 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits AX, AZ, BA, CX, DQ, and DS re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #184 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #202 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AZ, #2 Exhibit BA, #3 Exhibit CX, #4 Exhibit DQ, #5 Exhibit DS)(O'Connell, Victor)
January 19, 2019 Filing 203 SEALED OPPOSITION RE APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 6 (Other Lawsuits) under seal #180 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #192 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu.(O'Connell, Victor)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO SEAL #190 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #190 APPLICATION to Seal Document. The Court hereby GRANTS the application and ORDERS that Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs are GRANTED leave to file under seal the following documents previously filed in redacted form at ECF No. 190: Unredacted Versions of Exhibits AX, AZ, BA, CX, DQ, and DS filed in support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment #184 . (lom)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #186 APPLICATION to Seal Document. The Court ORDERS that Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs are GRANTED leave to file under seal the following documents previously filed in redacted form at ECF No. 186: Unredacted Version of Defendants' Memorandum of Law In Support ofDefendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Unredacted Version of Defendants' Uncontroverted Statement of Material Facts in Support. (lom)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO SEAL by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #183 APPLICATION to Seal Document. Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs are GRANTED leave to file under seal the following documents previously filed in redacted form at ECF No. 183: Unredacted Version of Defendants' and Crossclaim Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Their Partial Summary Judgment Motion and Injunctive Relief on their Counterclaims. Unredacted Version of Defendants' and Crossclaim Plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support. (mrgo)
January 17, 2019 Filing 199 IN CHAMBERS ONLY TEXT-ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Plaintiffs' request for an entry of default #147 is DENIED. The Court previously struck all counter-counterclaims regarding illegal referral payments 136 , and the Court's Order applied both to the counter-counterclaim brought by Grasshopper House LLC and to the counter-counterclaim brought by Silver Strand, LLC. Defendants' motion to dismiss the counter-counterclaims #182 is DENIED as moot. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 17, 2019 Filing 198 SCHEDULING NOTICE IN CHAMBERS ONLY TEXT-ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Plaintiffs' ex parte application #194 is granted in part as follows: The deadline for both parties to file oppositions to the pending motions for summary judgment #173 #178 #184 is continued to January 25, 2019. Replies to the oppositions shall be due by February 1, 2019. Hearing on the motions for summary judgment is set for February 11, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. The Pretrial Conference #66 and the hearing on the currently pending motions in limine #153 #155 #156 #157 #158 #159 #160 #165 are continued to February 11, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. to align with the hearing on the motions for summary judgment. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 17, 2019 Filing 197 REPLY in support EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Briefing Schedule for Summary Judgment Motions re APPLICATION to file document Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment under seal #186 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment a #194 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Cooper, Bennett)
January 17, 2019 Filing 196 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION to file document Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment under seal #186 , APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 under seal #183 , APPLICATION to file document Exhibits AX, AZ, BA, CX, DQ, and DS filed in support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment under seal #190 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re: ECF No. 183, #2 Proposed Order re: ECF No. 186, #3 Proposed Order re: ECF No. 190)(O'Connell, Victor)
January 17, 2019 Filing 195 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Briefing Schedule for Summary Judgment Motions re APPLICATION to file document Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment under seal #186 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment a #194 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victor O'Connell in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(O'Connell, Victor)
January 16, 2019 Filing 194 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Briefing Schedule for Summary Judgment Motions re APPLICATION to file document Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment under seal #186 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaims #178 , APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, and Declaration of Ariel Muprhy with Exhibits B and C in support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Injunctive Relief as to Countercl #179 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #184 filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bennett Cooper, #2 Exhibit A to Cooper Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Cooper Decl., #4 Declaration of Melanie Ayerh, #5 Exhibit 1 to Ayerh Decl., #6 Proposed Order) (Cooper, Bennett)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' AND COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE FOLLOWING FROM ECF NO. 179: #1 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AS TO COUNTERCLAIMS; #2 STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT; AND #3 DECLARATION OF ARIEL MURPHY AND EXHIBITS B AND C THERETO by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #188 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL: #1 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 REGARDING OTHER LAWSUITS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #180 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' AND COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL: #1 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AS TO COUNTERCLAIMS; CLIFFSIDE MALIBU, #2 STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTEDMATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT;AND #3 DECLARATION OF ARIEL MURPHY AND EXHIBITS B AND C THERETO by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #179 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
January 15, 2019 Filing 190 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits AX, AZ, BA, CX, DQ, and DS filed in support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment under seal filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AX, #2 Exhibit AZ, #3 Exhibit BA, #4 Exhibit CX, #5 Exhibit DQ, #6 Exhibit DS)(O'Connell, Victor)
January 15, 2019 Filing 189 EXHIBIT AA-AY to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #184 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AY, #2 Exhibits BB-BZ, #3 Exhibits CA-CD, #4 Exhibit CE, #5 Exhibit CF-CW, #6 Exhibits CY-DP, #7 Exhibit DR, #8 Exhibit DT, #9 Exhibit DU (part 1), #10 Exhibit DU (part 2), #11 Exhibit DU (part 3), #12 Exhibit DU (part 4), #13 Exhibits DV-DW)(O'Connell, Victor)
January 15, 2019 Filing 188 APPLICATION to file document ECF No. 179 Attachment #1, #2, #3, #4, and #5 under seal filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maher, Brendan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 187 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss, re SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION in Limine #1 re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #163 #165 served on 1/14/19. (Andrichik, William)
January 15, 2019 Filing 186 APPLICATION to file document Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment under seal filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Does, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Defendants' Redacted Memorandum of Law in Support of Summary Judgment, #2 Redacted Document Defendants' Redacted Statement of Uncontroverted Facts in Support of Summary Judgment, #3 Declaration Declaration of Ariel Murphy in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Berkowitz, Dana)
January 15, 2019 Filing 185 JOINT Exhibit List filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 53 filed 8/1/2018)), Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite.. (O'Connell, Victor)
January 14, 2019 Filing 184 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 53 filed 8/1/2018)), Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Does, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Motion set for hearing on 2/11/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Defendants' Memorandum of Law In Support Of Summary Judgment) (Attorney Dana Erin Berkowitz added to party Cliffside Malibu(pty:cc), Attorney Dana Erin Berkowitz added to party Cliffside Malibu(pty:cc), Attorney Dana Erin Berkowitz added to party Cliffside Malibu 3(pty:cc), Attorney Dana Erin Berkowitz added to party Cliffside Malibu II(pty:cc), Attorney Dana Erin Berkowitz added to party Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services(pty:cc), Attorney Dana Erin Berkowitz added to party Does(pty:dft), Attorney Dana Erin Berkowitz added to party Recovery Malibu, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Dana Erin Berkowitz added to party Sunset Malibu(pty:cc)) (Berkowitz, Dana)
January 14, 2019 Filing 183 APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 under seal filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 1, #2 Declaration of Victor O'Connell, #3 Exhibit A)(Attorney Victor A O'Connell added to party Cliffside Malibu(pty:cc))(O'Connell, Victor)
January 14, 2019 Filing 182 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counter-Counterclaim filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Motion set for hearing on 2/11/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Stiglitz, Steven)
January 14, 2019 Filing 181 Witness List filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite.. (Stiglitz, Steven)
January 14, 2019 Filing 180 APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 6 (Other Lawsuits) under seal filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 6 (Other Lawsuits))(Stiglitz, Steven)
January 14, 2019 Filing 179 APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, and Declaration of Ariel Muprhy with Exhibits B and C in support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Injunctive Relief as to Counterclaims under seal filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Unredacted Document Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Unredacted Document Declaration of Ariel Murphy, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit B, #5 Unredacted Document Exhibit C, #6 Proposed Order)(Maher, Brendan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 178 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaims filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Motion set for hearing on 2/11/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Redacted Document Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Declaration of David Smith, M.D., #4 Exhibit A (Smith Expert Report), #5 Redacted Document Declaration of Ariel Murphy, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Redacted Document Exhibit B, #8 Redacted Document Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit J, #16 Exhibit K, #17 Exhibit L, #18 Exhibit M, #19 Exhibit N, #20 Exhibit O, #21 Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit R, #23 Exhibit S, #24 Exhibit T, #25 Exhibit U, #26 Proposed Order) (Maher, Brendan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 177 Witness List filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss.. (Levin, Jason)
January 14, 2019 Filing 176 EXHIBIT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaim #173 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Cooper, Bennett)
January 14, 2019 Filing 175 DECLARATION of Bennett Evan Cooper In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaim #173 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 3, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 4 - 5, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 6 - 7)(Cooper, Bennett)
January 14, 2019 Filing 174 STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counterclaim NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaim #173 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Cooper, Bennett)
January 14, 2019 Filing 173 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Motion set for hearing on 2/11/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Cooper, Bennett)
January 14, 2019 Filing 172 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Maher, Brendan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 171 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Cooper, Bennett)
January 14, 2019 Filing 170 OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Call Center Evidence #160 , MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Helpline Referral Evidence #159 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 -- Taite Email)(Levin, Jason)
January 14, 2019 Filing 169 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Preclude Quality of Care Evidence from Non-surveyed Witnesses #156 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victor O'Connell, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Maher, Brendan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 168 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Preclude Lay Witness Specualtion Regarding Drug Use #155 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victor O'Connell, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Maher, Brendan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 167 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Preclude Evidence Not Contained in Pleadings #158 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victor O'Connell, #2 Exhibit A)(Maher, Brendan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 166 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude David E. Smith, M.D. MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Limit David E. Smith, M.D. #153 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victor O'Connell, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Maher, Brendan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 165 SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION in Limine #1 re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, #163 filed by Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Libretta Stennes, #2 Exhibit 1 to Stennes Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Levin, Jason)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #54 filed by Clean and Sober Media LLC, Richard L. Taite, Cliffside Malibu. CCA # 18-56111. Appellants' unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief is due April 15, 2019. The answering brief is due May 15, 2019. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. (mrgo)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER GRANTING PASSAGES' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #161 APPLICATION to Seal Document. The Court, having considered the Application of Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant Grasshopper House, LLC, and Counterclaim Defendants Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, and Pax Prentiss (collectively, "Passages") to seal their Motion In Limine #1 to Exclude Russell W. Mangum III, Ph.D, which was filed on January 7, 2019 and finding GOOD CAUSE therefor, hereby GRANTS the Application. (mrgo)
January 7, 2019 Filing 162 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion in Limine #1 and Exhibit in Support under seal #161 filed by Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Stennes Decl., #2 Exhibit 2 ot Stennes Decl.)(Levin, Jason)
January 7, 2019 Filing 161 APPLICATION to file document Motion in Limine #1 and Exhibit in Support under seal filed by Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Motion in Limine #1 (Redacted), #3 Declaration of Libretta Stennes in Support of Motion in Limine #1, #4 Redacted Document Exhibit 1 to Stennes Decl. (Redacted))(Levin, Jason)
January 7, 2019 Filing 160 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Call Center Evidence filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 53 filed 8/1/2018)), Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Victor O'Connell, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Proposed Order)(O'Connell, Victor)
January 7, 2019 Filing 159 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Helpline Referral Evidence filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu((as to Counterclaim Doc No. 53 filed 8/1/2018)), Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Victor O'Connell, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Proposed Order)(O'Connell, Victor)
January 7, 2019 Filing 158 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Preclude Evidence Not Contained in Pleadings filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Libretta Stennes, #2 Exhibit A to Stennes Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Stennes Decl., #4 Proposed Order)(Levin, Jason)
January 7, 2019 Filing 157 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Preclude Evidence of other unrelated lawsuits filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ayerh, Melanie)
January 7, 2019 Filing 156 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Preclude Quality of Care Evidence from Non-surveyed Witnesses filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Levin, Jason)
January 7, 2019 Filing 155 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Preclude Lay Witness Specualtion Regarding Drug Use filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Levin, Jason)
January 7, 2019 Filing 154 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude David E. Smith, M.D. MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Limit David E. Smith, M.D. #153 filed by Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Levin, Jason)
January 7, 2019 Filing 153 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude David E. Smith, M.D. , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Limit David E. Smith, M.D. ( Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson.) filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Libretta Stennes, #2 Exhibit 1 to Stennes Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Stennes Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Stennes Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 to Stennes Decl., #6 Proposed Order)(Levin, Jason)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) RE: DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Pending before the Court are the remaining discovery disputes raised at the December 28, 2018 telephonic discovery hearing. Consistent with Defendants' arguments related to "the same corporate family" of corporate affiliates, Defendants are ORDERED to produce all non-privileged responsive documents from Service Industries that are in the possession, custody, or control of Defendants. This production shall be completed by January 11, 2019. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (dml)
January 3, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against counter-counterclaim defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite #147 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Request for Entry of Default has been forwarded to the assigned Judge. Based on the various rulings on motions and Response/Objection to Request to Enter Default, the Clerk cannot determine if default should be entered. (mrgo)
January 2, 2019 Filing 150 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentissto Brief (non-motion non-appeal), #148 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cooper, Bennett)
January 1, 2019 Filing 149 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibuto REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against counter-counterclaim defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite #147 (Maher, Brendan)
December 31, 2018 Filing 148 Supplemental BRIEF filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Regarding Claim of Privilege as to Communications Between Clean & Sober Media, LLC and Loren Beck regarding Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, Telephone Conference, #146 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Loren Beck, #2 Declaration of Richard Taite, #3 Declaration of Allison McCabe, #4 Declaration of Kris Harrison)(Stiglitz, Steven)
December 31, 2018 Filing 147 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against counter-counterclaim defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite filed by counter-counterclaim plaintiff Passages Silver Strand, LLC. (Levin, Jason)
December 28, 2018 Filing 146 MINUTES AND ORDER RE: TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING held before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The Court and counsel discussed the pending discovery disputes. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DEADLINES AND DETAILS. Plaintiff's application to file under seal, Dkt. No. 145, is DENIED as the Court was unable to access the unredacted versions of the sealed documents and did not consider them in making its rulings. Tape #: XTR 12/28/2018. Court Recorder: XTR System. (dml)
December 27, 2018 Filing 145 APPLICATION to file document Discovery Brief (Dkt. NO 144) under seal filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In support of Application to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order on Application to File Under Seal)(Cooper, Bennett)
December 27, 2018 Filing 144 BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Discovery Brief (Attachments: #1 Declaration Exhibit A - Levin Declaration, #2 Declaration Exhibit B - Stennes Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - McCabe Deposition Transcripts, #4 Exhibit D - Stephenson Deposition Transcript, #5 Exhibit E - Letter from counsel, #6 Exhibit F - November 30 Email, #7 Exhibit G - Taite Deposition Transcript, #8 Exhibit H - Responses to Document Requests, #9 Exhibit I - Meet and confer email re analytics, #10 Exhibit J - Priv Log 1, #11 Exhibit K - Priv Log 2)(Cooper, Bennett)
December 27, 2018 Filing 143 BRIEF filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Brief Regarding Informal Discovery Conference regarding Text Only Scheduling Notice, 142 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Stiglitz, Steven)
December 26, 2018 Filing 142 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, re: Scheduling Notice, 141 . The previously scheduled hearing for 12/27/2018 10:00 AM has been rescheduled. Telephone Conference is now set for 12/28/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Call-in information remains the same.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dml) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 21, 2018 Filing 141 SCHEDULING NOTICE TEXT ONLY - by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver re: Telephone Conference #140 : Telephone Conference set for 12/27/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Call-in information to be provided via email.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 19, 2018 Filing 140 MINUTES AND ORDER RE: TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING held before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The Court directed the parties to meet and confer immediately after the hearing to identify all pending discovery issues, including those raised in Plaintiff's brief. The parties shall contact the Court with proposed dates and times for a further hearing on all remaining discovery issues. Once the Court sets a hearing, the parties are ordered to file letter briefs by no later than 24 hours before the hearing. Tape #: XTR 12/19/2018. Court Recorder: XTR System. (dml)
December 19, 2018 Filing 139 BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Brief Regarding Informal Discovery Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 12/18/18 Letter to Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - DEF0138599)(Andrichik, William)
December 19, 2018 Filing 138 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. At the request of the parties, a telephonic discovery conference is set for December 19, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Call-in information remains the same.(dml)
December 13, 2018 Filing 137 MINUTES OF Telephone Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Counsel for Defendants shall provide an updated privilege log to Plaintiff's counsel no later than 12/20/2018. See minutes for further information. Court Recorder: XTR 12/13/18. (csi)
December 13, 2018 Filing 136 IN CHAMBERS ONLY TEXT-ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint #115 is DENIED. Similarly, the Court GRANTS Defendant's motion to strike #107 Plaintiff's non-compulsory counterclaims regarding referral payments raised in response to Defendant's counter-claims. The Court declines to accept supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claims regarding referral payments, because such claims are not sufficiently related to the Lanham Act claims at issue in the case. The parties are again reminded of the firm trial date of February 19, 2019. Plaintiff's ex parte application #119 is DENIED as moot. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 13, 2018 Filing 135 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. At the request of the parties, a telephonic discovery conference is set for December 13, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Call-in information remains the same. (dml)
December 11, 2018 Filing 134 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint #115 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Cooper, Bennett)
December 11, 2018 Filing 133 MINUTES AND ORDER RE: TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING held before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: settling #130 Motion re: Informal Discovery Dispute. The Court and counsel discussed the current discovery disputes. The parties are directed to meet and confer to attempt to resolve the remaining issues that were raised during the hearing. If they are unable to do so, they shall contact the Court via email by no later than 4:00 p.m. on Wednesday, December 12, 2018 to request an informal telephonic conference. If needed, the Court will schedule a further telephonic conference for the morning of Thursday, December 13, 2018. (see order for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 12/11/2018. (hr)
December 11, 2018 Filing 132 REPLY MOTION for Order #130 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Stiglitz, Steven)
December 10, 2018 Filing 131 BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Re: Discovery Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - December 8, 2018 Email, #2 Exhibit B - December 9, 2018 Email, #3 Exhibit C - December 9, 2018 Email, #4 Exhibit D - November 28, 2018 Email, #5 Exhibit E - December 4, 2018 Email, #6 Exhibit F - December 6, 2018 Email, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition on Damages, #8 Exhibit H - Amended Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition on Damages, #9 Exhibit I - PLaintiff's Objections to RUle 30(b)(6) Amended Notice, #10 Exhibit J - December 5 Email)(Andrichik, William)
December 10, 2018 Filing 130 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. At the request of the parties, a telephonic discovery conference is set for December 11, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Call-in information provided via email. (hr)
December 7, 2018 Filing 129 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint #115 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven B.F. Stiglitz in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit 1)(Stiglitz, Steven)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) RE: DEPOSITION by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The Court is in receipt of emails from Plaintiff's counsel and Defendants' counsel, copying all other counsel, regarding a dispute about Plaintiff's Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) representative's deposition. In the interest of time, the Court STAYS the deposition of Plaintiff's 30(b)(6) representative, currently scheduled for December 7, 2018. The parties are to meet and confer regarding their availability early next week. By no later than Monday, December 10, 2018 at 10:00 a.m., they shall contact the Court with proposed dates for a hearing to discuss the issue. (dml)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Court amends the briefing schedule for Plaintiffs motion for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint, Dkt. 115, as follows: Defendants are directed to file an opposition to Plaintiffs motion no later than Friday, December 7, 2018. If Defendants file an opposition, Plaintiffs reply shall be due no later than Tuesday, December 11, 2018. (kr)
December 3, 2018 Filing 126 MINUTES AND ORDER RE: TELEPHONIC HEARING held before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, re: MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) RE DEPOSITION #122 . As discussed on the record, the deposition of Ms. McCabe shall begin on December 13, 2018, and if needed, be continued on December 17, 2018. The parties also discussed dates for the depositions of Mr. Taite and Cliffside's Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) representative. The parties are directed to meet and confer regarding the scheduling of those depositions. Plaintiff's counsel raised an issue regarding Defendants' privilege log. The parties are directed to meet and confer to attempt to resolve the issue. If they are unable to do so, they may contact the Court to schedule an informal telephonic conference. (see order for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 12/03/2018. (hr)
December 3, 2018 Filing 125 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver re: MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) RE DEPOSITION #122 . Telephone Conference is set for 12/3/2018 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Call-in information provided via email.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dml) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 3, 2018 Filing 124 BRIEF filed by Plaintiff/Counterclaim-Defs Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Re Discovery Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 -- CSM PMK Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-- Cliffside PMK Noice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 -- Counsel Email, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 -- Defs' Initial Disclosure, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 -- Defs' Letter Disclosures, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 -- Email, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 8 -- Hewitt Depo Notice)(Levin, Jason)
December 2, 2018 Filing 123 REPLY in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Shortening Time on Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint #119 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Cooper, Bennett)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) RE DEPOSITION by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The Court is in receipt of an email from Defendants' counsel, copying all other counsel, regarding a dispute about the scheduling of a deposition. Defendants' counsel requests a hearing on the matter this afternoon. In the interest of time, the Court STAYS the deposition of Defendant Clean & Sober Media's 30(b)(6) representative, currently scheduled for December 3, 2018. The parties are to meet and confer regarding their availability early next week. By no later than Monday, December 3, 2018 at 10:00 a.m., they shall contact the Court with proposed dates for a hearing to discuss the issue. (dml)
November 30, 2018 Filing 121 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Shortening Time on Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint #119 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Stiglitz, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Stiglitz, Steven)
November 30, 2018 Filing 120 BRIEF filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. in response to Plaintiff's post-hearing brief re discovery regarding Brief (non-motion non-appeal) #117 . (Stiglitz, Steven)
November 29, 2018 Filing 119 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Shortening Time on Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jason Levin in Support of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Cooper, Bennett)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #113 Non-Resident Attorney Libretta P. Stennes APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs Grasshopper House, LLC; Passages Silver Strand, LLC; Chris Prentiss; and Pax Prentiss, designating Jason Levin as local counsel. (mrgo)
November 28, 2018 Filing 117 BRIEF filed by Counterclaim-Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Brief on discovery issues regarding Telephone Conference, #109 . (Levin, Jason)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: granting #112 APPLICATION to Seal Document (dml)
November 28, 2018 Filing 115 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Motion set for hearing on 1/7/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jason Levin in Support of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #2 Supplement Second Amended Complaint, #3 Supplement Second Amended Complaint - Red Line, #4 Proposed Order) (Cooper, Bennett)
November 28, 2018 Filing 113 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Libretta P. Stennes to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22804274) filed by Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ayerh, Melanie)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #108 Non-Resident Attorney William R. Andrichik APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs and counterclaim defendants Grasshopper House, LLC; Passages Silver Strand, LLC; Chris Prentiss; and Pax Prentiss, designating Jason Levin as local counsel. (mrgo)
November 27, 2018 Filing 112 APPLICATION to file document letter brief re: discovery (ECF No. 105) under seal filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document redacted version of ECF No. 105, #2 Declaration of Kenneth Halpern, #3 Proposed Order)(Stiglitz, Steven)
November 27, 2018 Filing 111 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint #106 by Clerk of Court. The document is stricken. (mrgo)
November 27, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint #106 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): Hearing date is closed. Please refer to this court's website, Judges' Requirements for list of closed dates. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
November 27, 2018 Filing 109 MINUTES AND ORDER RE: TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING held before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The Court and counsel discussed the current discovery disputes. The Court set the following schedule: (See Order for deadlines and further information.) Tape #: XTR 11/27/2018. Court Recorder: XTR System. (dml)
November 27, 2018 Filing 108 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William R. Andrichik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22798275) filed by Grasshopper House, LLC Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ayerh, Melanie)
November 26, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Counterclaim Answer to Counterclaim,,, #93 filed by Counterclaim Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Motion set for hearing on 1/14/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Steven B.F. Stiglitz, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration) (Stiglitz, Steven)
November 26, 2018 Filing 106 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER DOC. NO. 111] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Motion set for hearing on 12/24/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jason Levin in Support of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #2 Supplement Second Amended Complaint, #3 Supplement Second Amended Complaint - Red Line, #4 Proposed Order) (Cooper, Bennett) Modified on 11/27/2018 (mrgo).
November 21, 2018 Filing 105 BRIEF filed by defendants and counterclaim-plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite. regarding MOTION for Order #104 . (Stiglitz, Steven)
November 19, 2018 Filing 104 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. At the request of the parties, a telephonic discovery conference is set for November 27, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Call-in information provided via email. (hr)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DENYING Ex Parte Application to Continue Expert Witness Disclosure and Trial Dates #100 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (jp)
November 13, 2018 Filing 102 REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue trial from February 19, 2019 to July 10, 2019 #100 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Levin, Jason)
November 13, 2018 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue trial from February 19, 2019 to July 10, 2019 #100 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Stiglitz, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Stiglitz, Steven)
November 12, 2018 Filing 100 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue trial from February 19, 2019 to July 10, 2019 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Levin, Jason)
November 8, 2018 Filing 99 MINUTES AND ORDER RE: TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING settling #87 Motion re: Informal Discovery Dispute held before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The Court and counsel discussed the current discovery disputes, which were previously raised at the October 30, 2018 hearing and have since been briefed. See Dkt. Nos. 91, 95-98. (see order for details) Court Recorder: XTR 11/08/2018. (hr)
November 6, 2018 Filing 98 BRIEF filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Brief in opposition pursuant to Magistrate Judge Oliver's order regarding Telephone Conference, #91 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stiglitz, Steven)
November 6, 2018 Filing 97 BRIEF filed by Counterclaim Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. regarding Telephone Conference, #91 . (Levin, Jason)
November 2, 2018 Filing 96 BRIEF filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Opening brief pursuant to Magistrate Judge Oliver's order regarding Telephone Conference, #91 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Stiglitz, Steven)
November 2, 2018 Filing 95 BRIEF filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' and Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents, #2 Exhibit Defendants' and Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff and Counterlcaim Defendants, Set One)(Ayerh, Melanie)
November 2, 2018 Filing 94 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer L Morrow counsel for Counter Claimants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss, Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendants Jennifer Morrow. (Attorney Jennifer L Morrow added to party Grasshopper House, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Jennifer L Morrow added to party Grasshopper House, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer L Morrow added to party Grasshopper House, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Jennifer L Morrow added to party Passages Silver Strand, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Jennifer L Morrow added to party Passages Silver Strand, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Jennifer L Morrow added to party Chris Prentiss(pty:cc), Attorney Jennifer L Morrow added to party Chris Prentiss(pty:cd), Attorney Jennifer L Morrow added to party Pax Prentiss(pty:cc), Attorney Jennifer L Morrow added to party Pax Prentiss(pty:cd))(Morrow, Jennifer)
November 1, 2018 Filing 93 Counterclaim Defendants' ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, Counterclaim,,, #53 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendants Chris Prentiss, Grasshopper House, LLC, Pax Prentiss, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC.(Cooper, Bennett)
November 1, 2018 Filing 92 (Attorney Melanie Atswei Ayerh added to party Grasshopper House, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Melanie Atswei Ayerh added to party Grasshopper House, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Melanie Atswei Ayerh added to party Passages Silver Strand, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Melanie Atswei Ayerh added to party Chris Prentiss(pty:cd), Attorney Melanie Atswei Ayerh added to party Pax Prentiss(pty:cd))(Ayerh, Melanie)
October 30, 2018 Filing 91 MINUTES AND ORDER RE: TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING held before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The parties shall meet and confer within 24 hours to attempt to resolve any issues. Opening letter briefs shall be filed by Friday, November 2, 2018. Responses shall be filed by Tuesday, November 6, 2018. A telephonic hearing is set for Thursday, November 8, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. Tape #: XTR 10/30/2018. Court Recorder: XTR System. (dml)
October 30, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kenneth J Halpern on behalf of Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Does, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu (Attorney Kenneth J Halpern added to party Clean and Sober Media LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth J Halpern added to party Cliffside Malibu(pty:cc), Attorney Kenneth J Halpern added to party Cliffside Malibu(pty:cc), Attorney Kenneth J Halpern added to party Cliffside Malibu(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth J Halpern added to party Cliffside Malibu 3(pty:cc), Attorney Kenneth J Halpern added to party Cliffside Malibu II(pty:cc), Attorney Kenneth J Halpern added to party Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services(pty:cc), Attorney Kenneth J Halpern added to party Does(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth J Halpern added to party Recovery Malibu, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Kenneth J Halpern added to party Sunset Malibu(pty:cc), Attorney Kenneth J Halpern added to party Richard L. Taite(pty:dft))(Halpern, Kenneth)
October 30, 2018 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steven Barnett Stiglitz on behalf of Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Does, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu (Attorney Steven Barnett Stiglitz added to party Clean and Sober Media LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Barnett Stiglitz added to party Cliffside Malibu(pty:cc), Attorney Steven Barnett Stiglitz added to party Cliffside Malibu(pty:cc), Attorney Steven Barnett Stiglitz added to party Cliffside Malibu(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Barnett Stiglitz added to party Cliffside Malibu 3(pty:cc), Attorney Steven Barnett Stiglitz added to party Cliffside Malibu II(pty:cc), Attorney Steven Barnett Stiglitz added to party Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services(pty:cc), Attorney Steven Barnett Stiglitz added to party Does(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Barnett Stiglitz added to party Recovery Malibu, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Steven Barnett Stiglitz added to party Sunset Malibu(pty:cc), Attorney Steven Barnett Stiglitz added to party Richard L. Taite(pty:dft))(Stiglitz, Steven)
October 26, 2018 Filing 88 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. At the request of the parties, a Telephone Conference is set for 10/30/2018 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Call-in number: 888-363-4734. Access codes provided via email.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dml) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 26, 2018 Filing 87 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE (hr)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) DENYING COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS, SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COUNTERCLAIM, AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER #60 #62 #65 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Passages motion to dismiss Cliffside's Counterclaims under Rule 12(b)(6) is DENIED. Passages' anti-SLAPP motion to strike the Counterclaims is DENIED. Passages' motion for a protective order to stay discovery on the Counterclaims pending resolution of Passages' substantive motions is DENIED as moot. In light of the extensive but largely unproductive motion practice to date in this case, the Court reminds the parties of the firm trial date set for February 19, 2019. (See document for further details) (mrgo)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE #59 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (See document for details) (mrgo)
October 12, 2018 Filing 84 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #59 MOTION to Strike Defendants' "Unclean Hands" Affirmative Defense filed by Plaintiff'; #60 MOTION to Strike (anti-SLAPP) filed by Counterclaim Defendants; #62 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Counterclaim Defendants; and #65 MOTION for Protective Order for Stay of Discovery Pending Ruling on Dispositive Motions filed by Counterclaim-Defendants - The motions are submitted. Order to issue. The hearing scheduled for 10/15/2018 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver re Stipulation for Protective Order, #82 (dml)
September 27, 2018 Filing 82 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendants and counterclaim plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite.(O'Connell, Victor)
September 19, 2018 Filing 81 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION to Strike (anti-SLAPP) #60 , MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims #62 , MOTION for Protective Order for Stay of Discovery Pending Ruling on Dispositive Motions #65 , and the MOTION to Strike Defendants' "Unclean Hands" Affirmative Defense #59 - The hearing on the motions is set for 10/15/2018 at 1:30 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 17, 2018 Filing 80 REPLY Support MOTION for Protective Order for Stay of Discovery Pending Ruling on Dispositive Motions #65 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cooper, Bennett)
September 17, 2018 Filing 79 REPLY Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Defendants' "Unclean Hands" Affirmative Defense #59 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Cooper, Bennett)
September 17, 2018 Filing 78 REPLY Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims #62 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Cooper, Bennett)
September 17, 2018 Filing 77 Objections to Declaration of Victor O'Connell and Attached Exhibits Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike (anti-SLAPP) #60 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Cooper, Bennett)
September 17, 2018 Filing 76 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike (anti-SLAPP) #60 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Cooper, Bennett)
September 17, 2018 Filing 75 REPLY Special Motion to Strike NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike (anti-SLAPP) #60 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attorney Bennett Evan Cooper added to party Grasshopper House, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Bennett Evan Cooper added to party Passages Silver Strand, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Bennett Evan Cooper added to party Chris Prentiss(pty:cd), Attorney Bennett Evan Cooper added to party Pax Prentiss(pty:cd))(Cooper, Bennett)
September 11, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE of Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Corrected Opposition to Special Motion to Strike filed by Counterclaim Plaintiffs Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 [Corrected] Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Opposition to Special Motion to Strike)(Stris, Peter)
September 10, 2018 Filing 73 DECLARATION of Dr. David E. Smith in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike (anti-SLAPP) #60 filed by Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victor O'Connell, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit U)(Stris, Peter)
September 10, 2018 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike (anti-SLAPP) #60 filed by Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Stris, Peter)
September 10, 2018 Filing 71 OPPOSITION to Request for Judicial Notice [ECF No. 63], and Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Oppositions to the Pending Motions filed by Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (O'Connell, Victor)
September 10, 2018 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims #62 filed by Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Stris, Peter)
September 10, 2018 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Protective Order for Stay of Discovery Pending Ruling on Dispositive Motions #65 filed by Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victor O'Connell)(Stris, Peter)
September 10, 2018 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Defendants' "Unclean Hands" Affirmative Defense #59 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Stris, Peter)
August 31, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike (anti-SLAPP) #60 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims #62 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Defendants' "Unclean Hands" Affirmative Defense #59 Amended Notice of Hearing of Motions filed by Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Motion set for hearing on 10/1/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Levin, Jason)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING ORDER AND CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATES by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #64 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order. Pretrial Conference is set for February 4, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial is set for February 19, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (mrgo)
August 30, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Stay of Discovery Pending Ruling on Dispositive Motions filed by Counterclaim-Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Motion set for hearing on 10/1/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jason Levin, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Levin Declaration, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Levin, Jason)
August 28, 2018 Filing 64 Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order and Continuance of Trial and Pretrial Conference Dates filed by Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victor O'Connell, #2 Declaration of Jason Levin, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Victor A O'Connell added to party Cliffside Malibu(pty:cc), Attorney Victor A O'Connell added to party Cliffside Malibu 3(pty:cc), Attorney Victor A O'Connell added to party Cliffside Malibu II(pty:cc), Attorney Victor A O'Connell added to party Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services(pty:cc), Attorney Victor A O'Connell added to party Recovery Malibu, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Victor A O'Connell added to party Sunset Malibu(pty:cc)) (O'Connell, Victor)
August 22, 2018 Filing 63 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims #62 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Levin, Jason)
August 22, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Counterclaim Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Motion set for hearing on 9/24/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Levin, Jason)
August 22, 2018 Filing 61 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike (anti-SLAPP) #60 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Levin, Jason)
August 22, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike (anti-SLAPP) filed by Counterclaim Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss. Motion set for hearing on 9/24/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sally Satel, M.D., #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Attorney Jason Levin added to party Grasshopper House, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Jason Levin added to party Passages Silver Strand, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Jason Levin added to party Chris Prentiss(pty:cd), Attorney Jason Levin added to party Pax Prentiss(pty:cd)) (Levin, Jason)
August 22, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Defendants' "Unclean Hands" Affirmative Defense filed by Plaintiff's Grasshopper House, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/24/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Levin, Jason)
August 22, 2018 Filing 58 DISCLOSURE Certification of Interested Parties and Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, Counter Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss (Levin, Jason)
August 21, 2018 Filing 57 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, Counter Claimants Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu 3, Cliffside Malibu II, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Recovery Malibu, Inc., Sunset Malibu.. (O'Connell, Victor)
August 20, 2018 Filing 56 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 18-56111 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #54 as to defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (mrgo)
August 17, 2018 Filing 55 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #54 . (O'Connell, Victor)
August 17, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,, Order on Motion to Strike, #51 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22277255.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'Connell, Victor)
August 1, 2018 Filing 53 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #30 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Grasshopper House, LLC, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, Pax Prentiss filed by Counterclaim Plaintiffs Cliffside Malibu, Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services, Cliffside Malibu 3, Sunset Malibu, Cliffside Malibu II, Recovery Malibu, Inc..(Attorney Peter K Stris added to party Cliffside Malibu(pty:cc), Attorney Peter K Stris added to party Sunset Malibu(pty:cc), Attorney Peter K Stris added to party Cliffside Malibu II(pty:cc), Attorney Peter K Stris added to party Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services(pty:cc), Attorney Peter K Stris added to party Cliffside Malibu 3(pty:cc), Attorney Peter K Stris added to party Recovery Malibu, Inc.(pty:cc))(Stris, Peter)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #33 MOTION to Dismiss Case ; and #34 MOTION. The Court sets jury trial for November 13, 2018 at 9 A.M. and pre-trial for November 5, 2018 at 3 P.M. (See document for details) (mrgo)
June 27, 2018 Filing 50 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #33 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants ; and #34 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief filed by Defendants - The motions are submitted. Order to issue. The hearing set for 7/2/2018 is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 18, 2018 Filing 49 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #33 Responding to Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections [ECF No. 43] filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (O'Connell, Victor)
June 18, 2018 Filing 48 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief as Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation #34 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Stris, Peter)
June 18, 2018 Filing 47 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #33 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Stris, Peter)
June 13, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Objection #43 , Notice (Other), #44 , Declaration #45 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Objection/Opposition (Motion related), For Judicial Notice, Declaration (Motion related). Other error(s) with document(s): To find the correct efiling event, please use the search feature and search for a specific word, etc. To find motion related events, see - Motions and Related Filings - Responses, Replies and Other Motion Related Documents - Objection/Opposition (Motion related), For Judicial Notice, Declaration (Motion related). Please link to the Motion(s) you are referring to. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
June 11, 2018 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Michael McCauley re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #42 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #41 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Cooper, Bennett)
June 11, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss All Causes of Action in First Amended Complaint and Opposition to Defendants' Renewed Special Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Cooper, Bennett)
June 11, 2018 Filing 43 OBJECTIONS to Defendants' Introduction of Evidence Outside the Pleadings in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Cooper, Bennett)
June 11, 2018 Filing 42 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief as Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation #34 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Cooper, Bennett)
June 11, 2018 Filing 41 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #33 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Cooper, Bennett)
May 30, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief as Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation #34 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Connell, Victor)
May 30, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #33 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Connell, Victor)
May 30, 2018 Filing 38 DECLARATION of John Stokes in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief as Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation #34 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #33 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(O'Connell, Victor)
May 30, 2018 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Benjamin Seymour in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief as Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation #34 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #33 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(O'Connell, Victor)
May 30, 2018 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Allison McCabe in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief as Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation #34 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #33 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (O'Connell, Victor)
May 30, 2018 Filing 35 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief as Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation #34 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #33 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(O'Connell, Victor)
May 30, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief as Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Motion set for hearing on 7/2/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Special Motion to Strike) (Stris, Peter)
May 30, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Motion set for hearing on 7/2/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Case) (Stris, Peter)
May 21, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/23/18 PM Hrg re Transcript #31 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gackle, Deborah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 21, 2018 Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/23/18 PM Hrg. Court Reporter: Deborah K. Gackle, phone number (213) 894-8913 deborahgackle.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2018. (Gackle, Deborah)
May 16, 2018 Filing 30 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Does, Richard L. Taite amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cooper, Bennett)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE [11, 12] by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (See document for details) (mrgo)
April 23, 2018 Filing 28 MINUTES OF #11 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants #12 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's State Law Claims (Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief) Complaint filed by Defendants Hearing held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend. Order to issue. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (mrgo)
April 17, 2018 Filing 27 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants #11 ; and MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's State Law Claims (Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief) Complaint filed by Defendants #12 - Hearing on the motions is set for 4/23/2018 at 1:30 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 12, 2018 Filing 26 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants #11 ; and the MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's State Law Claims (Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief) Complaint filed by Defendants #12 are submitted. Order to issue. The 4/16/2018 hearing is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 11, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE TO PARTIES: Effective April 17, 2018, Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, COURTROOM 590 on the 5th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 590 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil and criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services is located at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180 (Terrace Level), Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 2, 2018 Filing 24 REPLY in Support of Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's State Law Claims (Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief) Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #12 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Seymour, #2 Exhibit G)(O'Connell, Victor)
April 2, 2018 Filing 23 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's State Law Claims (Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief) Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #12 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Stris, Peter)
April 2, 2018 Filing 22 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Stris, Peter)
March 26, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Special Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Cooper, Bennett)
March 26, 2018 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Michael McCauley In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's State Law Claims (Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief) Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #12 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Cooper, Bennett)
March 26, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cooper, Bennett)
March 26, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE Plaintiff's Notice of Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cooper, Bennett)
March 26, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE Plaintiff's Notice of Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss All Causes of Action in Complaint filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Cooper, Bennett)
March 5, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite, (Stris, Peter)
March 5, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Shaun P Martin on behalf of Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite (Attorney Shaun P Martin added to party Clean and Sober Media LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Shaun P Martin added to party Cliffside Malibu(pty:dft), Attorney Shaun P Martin added to party Richard L. Taite(pty:dft))(Martin, Shaun)
March 2, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's State Law Claims (Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief) Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
February 28, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's State Law Claims (Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief) Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #12 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Declaration of Victor O'Connell, #7 Declaration of Allison McCabe, #8 Declaration of Benjamin Seymour, #9 Exhibit F)(Attorney Victor A O'Connell added to party Clean and Sober Media LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Victor A O'Connell added to party Cliffside Malibu(pty:dft), Attorney Victor A O'Connell added to party Richard L. Taite(pty:dft))(O'Connell, Victor)
February 28, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's State Law Claims (Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief) Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Motion set for hearing on 4/16/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Stris, Peter)
February 28, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. Motion set for hearing on 4/16/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Peter K Stris added to party Clean and Sober Media LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Peter K Stris added to party Cliffside Malibu(pty:dft), Attorney Peter K Stris added to party Richard L. Taite(pty:dft)) (Stris, Peter)
February 7, 2018 Filing 10 Amended Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, identifying Grasshopper House, LLC. (Cooper, Bennett)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (jlo)
February 6, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Clean and Sober Media LLC, Cliffside Malibu, Richard L. Taite. (ghap)
February 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
February 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Western Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Rozella A. Oliver. New Case Number 2:18-cv-923 SVW(RAOx). (ghap)
February 2, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Levin, Jason)
February 2, 2018 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC, (Levin, Jason)
February 2, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Levin, Jason)
February 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21202780 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Grasshopper House, LLC. (Attorney Jason Levin added to party Grasshopper House, LLC(pty:pla))(Levin, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grasshopper House, LLC v. Clean and Sober Media LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Represented By: Dana Erin Berkowitz
Represented By: Kenneth J Halpern
Represented By: Steven Barnett Stiglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean and Sober Media LLC
Represented By: Dana Erin Berkowitz
Represented By: Brendan Stephen Maher
Represented By: Victor A O'Connell
Represented By: Kenneth J Halpern
Represented By: Shaun P Martin
Represented By: Peter K Stris
Represented By: Elizabeth Rogers Brannen
Represented By: Steven Barnett Stiglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Taite
Represented By: Dana Erin Berkowitz
Represented By: Brendan Stephen Maher
Represented By: Victor A O'Connell
Represented By: Kenneth J Halpern
Represented By: Shaun P Martin
Represented By: Peter K Stris
Represented By: Elizabeth Rogers Brannen
Represented By: Steven Barnett Stiglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliffside Malibu
Represented By: Dana Erin Berkowitz
Represented By: Brendan Stephen Maher
Represented By: Victor A O'Connell
Represented By: Kenneth J Halpern
Represented By: Shaun P Martin
Represented By: Peter K Stris
Represented By: Elizabeth Rogers Brannen
Represented By: Steven Barnett Stiglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grasshopper House, LLC
Represented By: Jason Levin
Represented By: Bennett Evan Cooper
Represented By: William R Andrichik
Represented By: Melanie Atswei Ayerh
Represented By: Laura J Edelstein
Represented By: Jennifer L Morrow
Represented By: Libretta P Stennes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Pax Prentiss
Represented By: Bennett Evan Cooper
Represented By: William R Andrichik
Represented By: Jason Levin
Represented By: Melanie Atswei Ayerh
Represented By: Laura J Edelstein
Represented By: Jennifer L Morrow
Represented By: Libretta P Stennes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Chris Prentiss
Represented By: Bennett Evan Cooper
Represented By: William R Andrichik
Represented By: Jason Levin
Represented By: Melanie Atswei Ayerh
Represented By: Laura J Edelstein
Represented By: Jennifer L Morrow
Represented By: Libretta P Stennes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Passages Silver Strand, LLC
Represented By: Bennett Evan Cooper
Represented By: William R Andrichik
Represented By: Jason Levin
Represented By: Melanie Atswei Ayerh
Represented By: Laura J Edelstein
Represented By: Jennifer L Morrow
Represented By: Libretta P Stennes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Cliffside Malibu II
Represented By: Dana Erin Berkowitz
Represented By: Peter K Stris
Represented By: Victor A O'Connell
Represented By: Kenneth J Halpern
Represented By: Steven Barnett Stiglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Cliffside Malibu 3
Represented By: Dana Erin Berkowitz
Represented By: Peter K Stris
Represented By: Victor A O'Connell
Represented By: Kenneth J Halpern
Represented By: Steven Barnett Stiglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Recovery Malibu, Inc.
Represented By: Dana Erin Berkowitz
Represented By: Peter K Stris
Represented By: Victor A O'Connell
Represented By: Kenneth J Halpern
Represented By: Steven Barnett Stiglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Cliffside Malibu Outpatient Services
Represented By: Dana Erin Berkowitz
Represented By: Peter K Stris
Represented By: Victor A O'Connell
Represented By: Kenneth J Halpern
Represented By: Steven Barnett Stiglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Sunset Malibu
Represented By: Dana Erin Berkowitz
Represented By: Peter K Stris
Represented By: Victor A O'Connell
Represented By: Kenneth J Halpern
Represented By: Steven Barnett Stiglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?