Kathleen Williams et al v. City of Long Beach et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Michael Hill, Ms. Kathleen Williams, Michael Hill and Kathleen Williams
Defendant: Officer Norman A. Dumaplin, Officer Robert J Cruz, Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority, Officer Jonathan Steinhauser, City of Long Beach, Chief of Police Robert G. Luna, Does 1-10, Sergeant Jonathan Steinhauser and Long Beach Police Department
Case Number: 2:2018cv01069
Filed: February 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Filing 120 First REQUEST of Alana Yakovlev to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams. Request set for hearing on 4/3/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Buckman, Shirin)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED DATES AND/OR DEADLINES FOR TRIAL, DISCOVERY, AND MOTION DEADLINES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #118 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that calendar dates and cut-off dates will be extended as follows: Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 1/8/2021 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Non-expert Discovery cut-off 9/4/2020. Last Day to Hear Motions 10/23/2020. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference 10/23/2020. Trial Filings (First Round) due by 12/4/2020. Trial Filings (Second Round) due by 11/20/2020. Jury Trial set for 1/26/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (gk)
January 27, 2020 Filing 118 Third STIPULATION to Continue Trial and Corresponding Calendar Dates from August 10, 2020 to January 25, 2021 filed by PLAINTIFFS Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Buckman, Shirin)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF KATHLEEN WILLIAMS' RULE 35 MENTAL EXAMINATION by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (See document for details.) re #116 (sbou)
December 3, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order re Telephone Conference,,, #115 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peters, Matthew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 115 MINUTE ORDER of Further Telephonic Conference held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: Case called. Counsel made their appearances. The Court heard argument from counsel. As detailed and for the reasons explained on the record, the Court set the parameters of the previously ordered independent medical examination. The Court further directed defendants' counsel expeditiously to confer with plaintiffs' counsel regarding the specific date(s)/time(s) for the examination and to submit a Proposed Order for the Court's consideration which includes such date(s)/time(s) and otherwise contains the details required by/comports with Fed. R. Civ. P. 35 and the parameters set by the Court this date. Court Recorder: CS 11-26-19. (klg)
November 12, 2019 Filing 114 MINUTES OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL (DKT. NO. #108 ) held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Case called. Counsel made their appearances. The Court heard argument from counsel. For the reasons explained on the record, the Court granted defendants' motion to compel to the extent it sought an order, pursuant to Rule 35 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, for a mental examination of plaintiff by defendants' designated examiner, but deferred ruling regarding the location, length and other para meters of such examination pending defendants' counsel's specified furtherinquiries of the examiner, plaintiff's counsel's specified inquiries of and consultation with plaintiff, counsels' further meet and confer, and a further telephonic proceeding relating to the same. The Court set a further telephonic status conference for Tuesday, November 26, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. and directed the Clerk to provide call-in information to counsel prior to such proceeding. Court Recorder: CS 11/12/19. (sbou)
October 25, 2019 Filing 113 DECLARATION of Matthew M. Peters In Support of MOTION to Compel Plaintiff, Kathleen Williams' Rule 35 Mental Examination #108 filed by Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin, Jonathan Steinhauser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Peters, Matthew)
October 25, 2019 Filing 112 REPLY to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Defense Expert Examination filed by Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin, Jonathan Steinhauser. (Peters, Matthew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 111 OPPOSITION Opposition re: MOTION to Compel Plaintiff, Kathleen Williams' Rule 35 Mental Examination #108 filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Buckman, Shirin)
October 9, 2019 Filing 110 DECLARATION of Ari Kalechstein, Ph.D. In Support of MOTION to Compel Plaintiff, Kathleen Williams' Rule 35 Mental Examination #108 filed by Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin, Jonathan Steinhauser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Peters, Matthew)
October 9, 2019 Filing 109 DECLARATION of Matthew M. Peters In Support of MOTION to Compel Plaintiff, Kathleen Williams' Rule 35 Mental Examination #108 filed by Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin, Jonathan Steinhauser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Peters, Matthew)
October 9, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Plaintiff, Kathleen Williams' Rule 35 Mental Examination filed by Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin, Jonathan Steinhauser. Motion set for hearing on 11/12/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peters, Matthew)
August 30, 2019 Filing 107 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kyle Richard Bevan counsel for Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin, Jonathan Steinhauser. Adding Kyle R. Bevan as counsel of record for City of Long Beach, Robert J. Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin and Jonathan Steinhauser for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants City of Long Beach. (Attorney Kyle Richard Bevan added to party City of Long Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle Richard Bevan added to party Robert J Cruz(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle Richard Bevan added to party Norman A. Dumaplin(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle Richard Bevan added to party Jonathan Steinhauser(pty:dft))(Bevan, Kyle)
August 19, 2019 Filing 106 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William Keith Wyatt counsel for Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority. Filed by Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority. (Wyatt, William)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED DATES AND/OR DEADLINES FOR TRIAL, DISCOVERY, AND MOTION DEADLINES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #104 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that calendar dates and cut-off dates will be extended. Jury Trial is continued to 8/11/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine is continued to 7/17/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 3/25/2020. Last Day to Hear Motions 5/15/2020. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference 5/15/2020. Trial Filings (First Round) due by 6/26/2020. Trial Filings (Second Round) due by 7/3/2020. See document for further details. (gk)
August 7, 2019 Filing 104 Second STIPULATION to Continue CURRENTLY SCHEDULED DATES AND/OR DEADLINES FOR TRIAL, DISCOVERY, AND MOTION DEADLINES from March 10, 2020 to August 10, 2020 filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Buckman, Shirin)
July 17, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE of Change of address by Matthew Millette Peters attorney for Defendant City of Long Beach. Changing attorneys address to 411 W. Ocean Blvd., 9th Fl., Long Beach, CA 90802. Filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Peters, Matthew)
June 5, 2019 Filing 102 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #83 filed by Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority.(Jaafari, Armand)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) (1) APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION #100 ; (2) SUBMITTING AND VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL; AND (3) ADOPTING TENTATIVE RULING #99 AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL #88 AS DETAILED THEREIN by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian.IT IS SO FOUND AND ORDERED. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (Attachments: #1 Tentative Ruling) (klg)
June 3, 2019 Filing 100 JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBMIT TO NOTICE OF (TENTATIVE) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACHS INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE) (DOCKET NO. 88) re MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiffs, Kathleen Williams and Michael Hill #88 filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams. (Buckman, Shirin)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: NOTICE OF (TENTATIVE) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH'S INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SETONE) #88 . Based upon the Court's consideration of the parties' submissions in connection with Defendants' Motion, and for the reasons set forth below, the Court is tentatively inclined to grant in part and to deny in part Defendants' Motion. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (klg)
May 22, 2019 Filing 98 OBJECTION to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum re: MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiffs, Kathleen Williams and Michael Hill #88 filed by Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin, Jonathan Steinhauser. (Peters, Matthew)
May 21, 2019 Filing 97 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiffs, Kathleen Williams and Michael Hill #88 filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams. (Buckman, Shirin)
May 21, 2019 Filing 96 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiffs, Kathleen Williams and Michael Hill #88 filed by Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin, Jonathan Steinhauser. (Peters, Matthew)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court DENIES Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority's Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint #87 and notes that Plaintiffs have withdrawn the damages portions of their state law claims. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED DATES AND/OR DEADLINES FOR TRIAL, DISCOVERY, AND MOTION DEADLINES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #93 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that calendar dates and cut-off dates will be extended. Jury Trial set for 3/10/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 2/21/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 10/25/2019. Last Day to Hear Motions 1/10/2020. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference 12/13/2019. Trial Filings (First Round) due by 1/31/2020. Trial Filings (Second Round) due by 2/7/2020. See document for further details. (gk)
April 19, 2019 Filing 93 First STIPULATION to Continue CURRENTLY SCHEDULED DATES AND/OR DEADLINES FOR TRIAL, DISCOVERY, AND MOTION DEADLINES from November 5, 2019 to March 9, 2020 Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 86 , Stipulation to Continue, #85 filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Buckman, Shirin)
April 19, 2019 Filing 92 REPLY Reply Fourth NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #87 filed by Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority. (Attorney William Keith Wyatt added to party Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority(pty:dft))(Wyatt, William)
April 12, 2019 Filing 91 OPPOSITION Opposition re: Fourth NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #87 filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibits in Support, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Buckman, Shirin)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 (In Chambers) ORDER RESETTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DOCKET NO. #88 ) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The June 7, 2019 hearing on the Motion to Compel before the United States District Judge is vacated. The Motion to Compel is reset for hearing before the United States Magistrate Judge in Courtroom 750 of the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012.on June 4, 2019 at 9:30 a.m (See document for details.) (sbou)
April 12, 2019 Filing 89 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiffs, Kathleen Williams and Michael Hill #88 and Request for Identification and Production of Documents filed by Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin, Jonathan Steinhauser. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit)(Peters, Matthew)
April 12, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiffs, Kathleen Williams and Michael Hill filed by Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin, Jonathan Steinhauser. Motion set for hearing on 6/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Peters, Matthew)
April 1, 2019 Filing 87 Fourth NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority. Motion set for hearing on 5/3/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jaafari, Armand)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 TEXT ONLY ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: The Court has reviewed the parties' Stipulation (Dkt. No. #85 ) and is inclined to grant it. However, the parties MUST file a COMPLETE Proposed Order that sets forth all of the deadlines to be continued and all of the proposed new dates. The Court therefore STRIKES DKt. No. 85 so that the parties can file a new Stipulation and a satisfactory Proposed Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 26, 2019 Filing 85 **STRICKEN** First STIPULATION to Continue Trial and Corresponding Calendar Dates from November 5, 2019 to March 5, 2020 filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Buckman, Shirin) Modified on 3/28/2019 (jre).
March 19, 2019 Filing 84 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #83 filed by Defendants City of Long Beach.(Peters, Matthew)
March 10, 2019 Filing 83 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams amending Amended Complaint/Petition, #58 , filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams(Buckman, Shirin)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 PROTECTIVE ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (see document for further details) #80 (klg)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend and File the Third Amended Complaint #79 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs leave to file the Proposed Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs must file the Third Amended Complaint within 5 days of the issuance of this order. (lom)
March 8, 2019 Filing 80 Stipulated Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams (Buckman, Shirin)
February 12, 2019 Filing 79 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Third Amended Complaint , First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams. Motion set for hearing on 3/15/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Third Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Buckman, Shirin)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY ANNE K. RICHARDSON TO WITHDRAW by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court hereby GRANTS the Ex Parte Application of Attorney Anne K. Richardson to Withdraw from the case #77 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Attorney Anne K. Richardson and Public Counsel are hereby withdrawn from representing the plaintiffs; and (2) Anne K. Richardson shall be removed from the electronic filing service and all parties should thereafter cease to serve Anne K. Richardson or Public Counsel in this matter. (gk)
November 8, 2018 Filing 77 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Anne K. Richardson to Withdraw as Attorney filed by plaintiffs Kathleen Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Richardson, Anne)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: RE #75 Motion for Protective Order. (See document for further details.) (sbou)
October 29, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION for Protective Order for Stipulated Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams. (Buckman, Shirin)
October 24, 2018 Filing 74 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Howard Darryl Russell counsel for Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin, Jonathan Steinhauser. Adding Howard D. Russell as counsel of record for City of Long Beach, Robert J. Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin and Jonathan Steinhauser for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Attorney Howard Darryl Russell added to party City of Long Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Howard Darryl Russell added to party Robert J Cruz(pty:dft), Attorney Howard Darryl Russell added to party Norman A. Dumaplin(pty:dft), Attorney Howard Darryl Russell added to party Jonathan Steinhauser(pty:dft))(Russell, Howard)
October 16, 2018 Filing 73 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #58 filed by Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority.(Jaafari, Armand)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHORITY'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Pending before the Court is Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority's ("MTA") Motion to Dismiss #62 . The Court: (1) DENIES MTA's Motion to Dismiss the Monell Claims; (2) DENIES MTA's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Unruh Act Claim; (3) DENIES MTA's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Ralph Act Claim as to Williams; and (4) GRANTS with leave to amend MTA's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Ralph Act Claim as to Hill. Plaintiffs may attempt to cure the deficiencies in Hill's Ralph Act claim against the MTA by filing a Third Amended Complaint within 21 days of the issuance of this order. (gk)
September 28, 2018 Filing 71 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. RE: Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transmit Authority's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #62 . The Courtroom Deputy Clerk distributes the Court's tentative rulings prior to the case being called. The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby takes the motion under submission. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 8/9/2019. (cb)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER RE JURY/COURT TRIAL: I. SCHEDULE; II. TRIAL PREPARATION; III. CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Jury Trial set for 10/29/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2019 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties 11/30/2018. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 7/18/2019. Last Date to Hear Motions 8/30/2019. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference 8/9/2019. Trial Filings (first round): Motions In Limine, Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Witness Lists, Joint Exhibit List, Joint Status Report Regarding Settlement due by 9/20/2019. Trial Filings (second round): Oppositions to Motions In Limine, Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order due by 9/27/2019. The Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2018 is hereby VACATED. See document for further details. (gk)
September 18, 2018 Filing 68 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Theodore B Zinger counsel for Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin, Jonathan Steinhauser. Adding Theodore B. Zinger as counsel of record for City of Long Beach, Robert J. Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin and Jonathan Steinhauser for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants City of Long Beach. (Attorney Theodore B Zinger added to party City of Long Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Theodore B Zinger added to party Robert J Cruz(pty:dft), Attorney Theodore B Zinger added to party Norman A. Dumaplin(pty:dft), Attorney Theodore B Zinger added to party Jonathan Steinhauser(pty:dft))(Zinger, Theodore)
September 14, 2018 Filing 67 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #62 filed by Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D)(Ivie, Rickey)
September 14, 2018 Filing 66 REPLY Reply in Support Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #62 filed by Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority. (Ivie, Rickey)
September 7, 2018 Filing 65 OPPOSITION to LA MTA's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams. (Richardson, Anne)
September 6, 2018 Filing 64 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Millette Peters counsel for Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin, Jonathan Steinhauser. Adding Matthew M. Peters as counsel of record for City of Long Beach, Robert J. Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin and Jonathan Steinhauser for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants City of Long Beach. (Attorney Matthew Millette Peters added to party City of Long Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Millette Peters added to party Robert J Cruz(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Millette Peters added to party Norman A. Dumaplin(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Millette Peters added to party Jonathan Steinhauser(pty:dft))(Peters, Matthew)
September 4, 2018 Filing 63 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-9 days, filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Buckman, Shirin)
August 31, 2018 Filing 62 Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority. Motion set for hearing on 9/28/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jaafari, Armand)
August 31, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin, Long Beach Police Department, Jonathan Steinhauser, identifying CITY OF LONG BEACH (erroneously sued as LONG BEACH POLICE DEPARTMENT), ROBERT J. CRUZ, NORMAN A. DUMAPLIN, JONATHAN STEINHAUSER. (Machit, Monte)
August 31, 2018 Filing 60 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #58 filed by Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin, Long Beach Police Department, Jonathan Steinhauser.(Machit, Monte)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DEEMING DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHORITY'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS MOOT (Dkt. No. 55) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: In light of the Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 58), Defendants Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as MOOT, and the hearing scheduled for September 14, 2018, is hereby VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 16, 2018 Filing 58 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Does, Norman A. Dumaplin, Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority, Jonathan Steinhauser amending Amended Complaint/Petition,, #29 , Amended Complaint/Petition,, #27 , filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams(Buckman, Shirin)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to file their Second Amended Complaint #54 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiffs file a Second Amended Complaint by 8/17/2018; and (2) Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority files its responsive pleading by 8/31/2018. (3) The Scheduling Conference is continued to 9/21/2018, at 10:00 AM. (4) Plaintiffs, Motion for Leave to File the Second Amended Complaint #53 is DENIED as MOOT. (gk)
August 14, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #55 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. It appears that the filer made a typographical error, setting the motion for hearing on 9/25/2028 at 10:00 AM. For this one-time only, clerk shall reset the hearing for the noticed date of 9/14/2018 at 10:00 AM. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 13, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority. Motion set for hearing on 9/25/2028 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jaafari, Armand)
August 10, 2018 Filing 54 First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (Buckman, Shirin)
July 30, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A--Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B--Stipulation with MTA, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C--Meet & Confer Letter from MTA 6-24-18, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D--Meet & Confer Letter to MTA 7-2-18, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E--Meet & Confer Letter to MTA 7-8-18, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F--Stipulation with MTA, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G--Order Granting Stipulation, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H--Stipulation with MTA, #10 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint) (Buckman, Shirin)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHORITY'S TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT UNTIL PLAINTIFFS FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #51 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that time is extended to file Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, and Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority's responsive pleading by 8/13/2018. (gk)
July 12, 2018 Filing 51 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Responsive Pleading filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Buckman, Shirin)
July 12, 2018 Filing 50 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File #48 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Counsel shall immediately file a Proposed Order and email a Word version of the Proposed Order to the chambers email address. (et)
July 12, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File #48 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. All proposed signature items shall be e-mailed to the chambers' e-mail address at AB_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov in Word format. ONLY proposed order signature items should be emailed to the chambers' e-mail address. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
July 11, 2018 Filing 48 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Responsive Pleading filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams.(Buckman, Shirin)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorneys Rickey Ivie and Armand J. Jaafari for Defendant Los Angeles Metropolitan Transportation Authority in place of Attorneys Kurt A. Franklin and Samantha D. Wolff #43 , #45 . (gk)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE: SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME OF DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (L.R. 8-3) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #44 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority has until 7/11/2018 to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #27 . (gk)
June 28, 2018 Filing 45 First REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Rickey Ivie in place of attorney Kurt A. Franlin filed by Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ivie, Rickey)
June 27, 2018 Filing 44 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ivie, Rickey)
June 27, 2018 Filing 43 First REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Rickey Ivie in place of attorney Kurt A. Franklin filed by Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Rickey Ivie added to party Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority(pty:dft)) (Ivie, Rickey)
June 12, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel LISA HOLDER #40 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notices > Association of Counsel. The filer used the event, Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > Appointment of Counsel. Clerk has removed this docket entry from the judge's pending motion report. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 31, 2018 Filing 41 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority answer now due 6/27/2018; Michael Hill answer now due 6/27/2018; Kathleen Williams answer now due 6/27/2018, re Amended Complaint/Petition,, #29 filed by Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority.(Attorney Kurt A Franklin added to party Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority(pty:dft))(Franklin, Kurt)
May 29, 2018 Filing 40 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel LISA HOLDER filed by PLAINTIFFs Michael Hill. (Attorney Lisa Holder added to party Michael Hill(pty:pla)) (Holder, Lisa)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
May 25, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin, Jonathan Steinhauser, identifying City of Long Beach, Robert J. Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin and Jonathan Steinhauser. (Machit, Monte)
May 25, 2018 Filing 37 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,, #27 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin, Jonathan Steinhauser.(Attorney Monte H Machit added to party City of Long Beach(pty:dft), Attorney Monte H Machit added to party Robert J Cruz(pty:dft), Attorney Monte H Machit added to party Norman A. Dumaplin(pty:dft), Attorney Monte H Machit added to party Jonathan Steinhauser(pty:dft))(Machit, Monte)
May 22, 2018 Filing 36 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #27 as to Defendant Robert J. Cruz. (gk)
May 22, 2018 Filing 35 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #27 as to Defendant Norman A. Dumaplin. (gk)
May 22, 2018 Filing 34 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #27 as to Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority. (gk)
May 22, 2018 Filing 33 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #27 as to Defendant Long Beach Police Department. (gk)
May 22, 2018 Filing 32 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #27 as to Defendant Jonathan Steinhauser. (gk)
May 22, 2018 Filing 31 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #27 as to Defendant City of Long Beach. (gk)
May 22, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First Amended Complaint #29 . The following error(s) was/were found: The First Amended Complaint was previously filed 5/7/2018 as document number 27 In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 11, 2018 Filing 29 First Amended Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Does, Norman A. Dumaplin, Long Beach Police Department, Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority, Jonathan Steinhauser amending Amended Complaint/Petition,, #27 , filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams (Attachments: #1 Summons for City of Long Beach, #2 Summons for Jonathan Steinhauser, #3 Summons for Long Beach Police Department, #4 Summons for LA County Metropolitan Transit Authority, #5 Summons for Norman Dumpalin, #6 Summons for Robert Cruz, #7 Face Page)(Buckman, Shirin)
May 10, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: First Amended Complaint #27 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Please type below the words, "SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION," "ON THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT." The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk)
May 7, 2018 Filing 27 First Amended Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants City of Long Beach, Robert J Cruz, Norman A. Dumaplin, Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority, Jonathan Steinhauser, Long Beach Police Department amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Michael Hill, Kathleen Williams (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for City of Long Beach, #3 Summons for Jonathan Steinhauser, #4 Summons for Long Beach Police Department, #5 Summons for LA County Metropolitan Transit Authority, #6 Summons for Norman Dumaplin, #7 Summons for Robert Cruz)(Buckman, Shirin)
April 10, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE TO PARTIES by U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Effective, April 11, 2018, Judge Chooljian will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse ("Roybal Building"), located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 750 on the 7th floor of the Roybal Building. All mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside of the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Building. Paper civil and criminal documents exempted from electronic filing shall be filed in Room 180 on the Terrace Level of the Roybal Building. Magistrate Judge Chooljian's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Kerri Hays, may be reached at (213) 894-2921. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 9, 2018 Filing 25 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Chief of Police Robert G. Luna. (gk)
February 9, 2018 Filing 24 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Officer Robert J. Cruz. (gk)
February 9, 2018 Filing 23 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Officer Norman A. Dumaplin. (gk)
February 9, 2018 Filing 22 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority. (gk)
February 9, 2018 Filing 21 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Sergeant Jonathan Steinhauser. (gk)
February 9, 2018 Filing 20 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant City of Long Beach. (gk)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
February 8, 2018 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Williams. (Yakovlev, Alana)
February 8, 2018 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Williams. (Yakovlev, Alana)
February 8, 2018 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Williams. (Yakovlev, Alana)
February 8, 2018 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Williams. (Yakovlev, Alana)
February 8, 2018 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Williams. (Yakovlev, Alana)
February 8, 2018 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Williams. (Yakovlev, Alana)
February 8, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Williams, identifying None. (Yakovlev, Alana)
February 8, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #5 , Summons Request #4 , Summons Request #2 , Summons Request #3 , Summons Request #6 , Summons Request #7 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
February 8, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): The Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. It should have been filed and entered separately under its proper event. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (et)
February 8, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 8, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et)
February 7, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Williams. (Yakovlev, Alana)
February 7, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Williams. (Yakovlev, Alana)
February 7, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Williams. (Yakovlev, Alana)
February 7, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Williams. (Yakovlev, Alana)
February 7, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Williams. (Yakovlev, Alana)
February 7, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Williams. (Yakovlev, Alana)
February 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21228826 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Michael Hill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Alana Sabina Yakovlev added to party Michael Hill(pty:pla))(Yakovlev, Alana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kathleen Williams et al v. City of Long Beach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Norman A. Dumaplin
Represented By: Monte H Machit
Represented By: Kyle Richard Bevan
Represented By: Howard Darryl Russell
Represented By: Matthew Millette Peters
Represented By: Theodore B Zinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Robert J Cruz
Represented By: Monte H Machit
Represented By: Kyle Richard Bevan
Represented By: Howard Darryl Russell
Represented By: Matthew Millette Peters
Represented By: Theodore B Zinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transit Authority
Represented By: Kurt A Franklin
Represented By: Rickey Ivie
Represented By: Armand J Jaafari
Represented By: Samantha D Wolff
Represented By: William Keith Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jonathan Steinhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Long Beach
Represented By: Monte H Machit
Represented By: Kyle Richard Bevan
Represented By: Howard Darryl Russell
Represented By: Matthew Millette Peters
Represented By: Theodore B Zinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Police Robert G. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Jonathan Steinhauser
Represented By: Monte H Machit
Represented By: Kyle Richard Bevan
Represented By: Howard Darryl Russell
Represented By: Matthew Millette Peters
Represented By: Theodore B Zinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Beach Police Department
Represented By: Monte H Machit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Michael Hill
Represented By: Alana Sabina Yakovlev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Kathleen Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hill
Represented By: Anne K Richardson
Represented By: Lisa Holder
Represented By: Shirin Buckman
Represented By: Alana Sabina Yakovlev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Williams
Represented By: Anne K Richardson
Represented By: Lisa Holder
Represented By: Shirin Buckman
Represented By: Alana Sabina Yakovlev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?