Paul Rodriguez et al v. Jerry Brown et al Featured Case

Several prominent law firms and professors have filed lawsuits in four federal district courts alleging that the Electoral College voting system used in the nation's presidential elections is unconstitutional. The complaints allege that the system denies citizens the right to an equal vote, in violation of the First Amendment rights to political expression and association and the principle of one-person-one-vote under the Fourteenth Amendment. The complaint filed in California names California Governor Jerry Brown and Secretary of State Alex Padilla as defendants.

Plaintiff: California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens and Paul Rodriguez
Defendant: Jerry Brown and Alex Padilla
Case Number: 2:2018cv01422
Filed: February 21, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B. Marshall
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2018 76 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael B. DeSanctis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Moti 75 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
June 22, 2018 75 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael B. DeSanctis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21973829) filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Fry, David)
June 19, 2018 74 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Granting 72 Non-Resident Attorney Samuel G. Hall APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Paul Rodriguez, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens and California League of United Latin American Citizens, designating Robyn C. Crowther as local counsel. (et)
June 19, 2018 73 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Granting 71 Non-Resident Attorney David Boies APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Paul Rodriguez, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens and California League of United Latin American Citizens, designating Robyn C. Crowther as local counsel. (et)
June 15, 2018 72 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Samuel G. Hall to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21936838) filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Crowther, Robyn)
June 15, 2018 71 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David Boies to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21936344) filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order) (Crowther, Robyn)
June 6, 2018 70 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), 67 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Application for Pro Hac Vice. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 5, 2018 69 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 57 filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rosen, Jacob)
June 5, 2018 68 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MODIFICATION OF PAGE LIMITS 63 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the page limit for Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint is extended to thirty pages, and Defendants reply thereto, shall not exceed fifteen pages. (bm)
June 5, 2018 67 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jacob Max Rosen counsel for Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. Adding Michael B. DeSanctis as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Jacob Max Rosen. (Rosen, Jacob)
June 5, 2018 66 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jacob Max Rosen counsel for Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. Adding Benjamin Woodside Schrier as counsel of record for All Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs. (Rosen, Jacob)
June 4, 2018 65 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jacob Max Rosen counsel for Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. Adding Jacob Max Rosen as counsel of record for All Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Jacob Max Rosen. (Attorney Jacob Max Rosen added to party California League of United Latin American Citizens(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob Max Rosen added to party Rocky Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob Max Rosen added to party League of United Latin American Citizens(pty:pla), Attorney Jacob Max Rosen added to party Paul Rodriguez(pty:pla))(Rosen, Jacob)
June 4, 2018 64 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David H Fry counsel for Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. Adding David H. Fry as counsel of record for All Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs David H. Fry. (Attorney David H Fry added to party California League of United Latin American Citizens(pty:pla), Attorney David H Fry added to party Rocky Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney David H Fry added to party League of United Latin American Citizens(pty:pla), Attorney David H Fry added to party Paul Rodriguez(pty:pla))(Fry, David)
June 4, 2018 63 STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Defendants Reply filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration Decl. of Trevor Stutz)(Crowther, Robyn)
April 23, 2018 62 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE 61 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Granting Non-Resident Attorney Jack A. Simms APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, Paul Rodriguez, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, and California League of United Latin American Citizens, designating Robyn C. Crowther as local counsel. (ab)
April 20, 2018 61 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jack A. Simms to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - F ee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21625908) filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Crowther, Robyn)
April 20, 2018 60 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS 58 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall, re Stipulation 58 : Having considered the stipulation, the Court sets the following briefing schedule: Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss on or before June 5, 2018. Defendants shall file any reply to the opposition on or before June 26, 2018. (bm)
April 20, 2018 59 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Randall L Allen on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Allen, Randall)
April 19, 2018 58 STIPULATION for Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Jerry Brown, Alex Padilla. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Li, Peiyin)
April 19, 2018 57 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Jerry Brown, Alex Padilla. Motion set for hearing on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Proposed Order) (Li, Peiyin)
April 18, 2018 56 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE 55 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Granting Non-Resident Attorney Ryan A. Botkin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, LULAC, CALIFORNIA LULAC; PAUL RODRIGUEZ, AND ROCKY CHAVEZ, designating Robyn C. Crowther as local counsel. (ab)
April 18, 2018 55 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan A. Botkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21608079) filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Crowther, Robyn)
April 2, 2018 54 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Cassandra Kerkhoff Johnson on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Attorney Cassandra Kerkhoff Johnson added to party California League of United Latin American Citizens(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Kerkhoff Johnson added to party Rocky Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Kerkhoff Johnson added to party League of United Latin American Citizens(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Kerkhoff Johnson added to party Paul Rodriguez(pty:pla))(Johnson, Cassandra)
March 26, 2018 53 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE 52 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Granting Non-Resident Attorney Maria A. Calaf APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, LULAC, California LULAC, Paul Rodriguez, and Rocky Chavez, designating Robyn C. Crowther as local counsel. (ab)
March 26, 2018 52 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Maria A. Calaf to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21474211) filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Crowther, Robyn)
March 16, 2018 51 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE 50 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Granting Non-Resident Attorney Amy L. Neuhardt APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, LULAC, California LULAC, Paul Rodriguez, and Rocky Chavez, designating Robyn C. Crowther as local counsel. (ab)
March 15, 2018 50 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amy L. Neuhardt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21420467) filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Crowther, Robyn)
March 14, 2018 49 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Alex Padilla answer now due 4/19/2018; Jerry Brown answer now due 4/19/2018, filed by Defendants Alex Padilla; Jerry Brown.(Attorney Peiyin Patty Li added to party Jerry Brown(pty:dft), Attorney Peiyin Patty Li added to party Alex Padilla(pty:dft))(Li, Peiyin)
March 13, 2018 48 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE 40 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Granting Non-Resident Attorney Hamish P.M. Hume APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, Paul Rodriguez, Rocky Chavez, Lulac, California LULAC, designating Robyn C. Crowther as local counsel. (ab)
March 13, 2018 40 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hamish P.M. Hume to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - 5 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21400273) filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Crowther, Robyn)
March 12, 2018 47 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Granting 31 Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer D Hackett APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Paul Rodriguez, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, and California League of United Latin American Citizens, designating Robyn C Crowther as local counsel. (bm)
March 12, 2018 46 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Granting 20 Non-Resident Attorney Samuel Issacharoff APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Paul Rodriguez, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, and California League of United Latin American Citizens, designating Robyn C Crowther as local counsel. (bm)
March 12, 2018 45 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE 24 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Granting Non-Resident Attorney Lisa L. Barclay APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, Paul Rodriguez, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, and California League of United Latin American Citizens, designating Robyn C. Crowther as local counsel. (ab)
March 12, 2018 44 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE 38 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Granting Non-Resident Attorney Karen S. Vladeck APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, Paul Rodriguez, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, and California League of United Latin American Citizens, designating Robyn C. Crowther as local counsel. (ab)
March 12, 2018 43 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE 23 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Granting Non-Resident Attorney James P. Denvir APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, Paul Rodriguez, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, and California League of United Latin American Citizens, designating Robyn C. Crowther as local counsel. (ab)
March 12, 2018 42 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE 22 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Granting Non-Resident Attorney Amy J. Mauser APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, Paul Rodriguez, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, and California League of United Latin American Citizens, designating Robyn C. Crowther as local counsel. (ab)
March 12, 2018 41 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE 21 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Granting Non-Resident Attorney Karen L. Dunn APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, Paul Rodriguez, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, and California League of United Latin American Citizens, designating Robyn C. Crowther as local counsel. (ab)
March 12, 2018 39 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HACE VICE 32 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Granting Non-Resident Attorney Allison M. Vissichelli APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, Paul Rodriguez, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, and California League of United Latin American Citizens, designating Robyn C. Crowther as local counsel. (ab) Modified on 3/13/2018 (ab).
March 8, 2018 38 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen S. Vladeck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - 5 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21375931) filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Crowther, Robyn)
March 7, 2018 37 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Samuel Issacharoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 2/28/2018, Receipt No. 0973-21333580) filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Payment Confirmation, # 3 Proposed Order) (Crowther, Robyn)
March 6, 2018 36 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Hamish P.M. Hume on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Currently waiting for the Certificate of Good Standing. Will file Pro Hac Vice application once I receive the certificate. (lt)
March 6, 2018 35 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Currently waiting for the Certificate of Good Standing. Will file Pro Hac Vice Application once I receive the certificate. (lt)
March 6, 2018 34 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney David Boies on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Currently waiting for Certificate of Good Standing. Will file Pro Hac Vice application once I receive the certificate. (lt)
March 5, 2018 33 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Samuel Issacharoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - 20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt)
March 5, 2018 32 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allison M. Vissichelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21354398) filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 P roposed Order) (Crowther, Robyn)
March 5, 2018 31 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer Duncan Hackett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21354237) filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Crowther, Robyn)
March 2, 2018 30 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Paul Rodriguez, California League of United Latin American Citizens, League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Crowther, Robyn)
March 2, 2018 29 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Paul Rodriguez, California League of United Latin American Citizens, League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Crowther, Robyn)
March 2, 2018 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service 18 , 19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Other error(s) with document(s): no case number or judge's initials indicated in caption of attached document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
March 1, 2018 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lisa L. Barclay to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21338563) filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Crowther, Robyn)
March 1, 2018 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James P. Denvir to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21338527) filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Crowther, Robyn)
March 1, 2018 22 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amy J. Mauser to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - F ee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21338492) filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Crowther, Robyn)
March 1, 2018 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen L. Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - F ee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21338453) filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Crowther, Robyn)
February 28, 2018 27 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: granting 17 Non-Resident Attorney Marco K. Guerrero APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez,, designating Robyn C Crowther as local counsel. (lom)
February 28, 2018 26 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: granting 16 Non-Resident Attorney Mary Whittle APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez, designating Robyn C Crowther as local counsel. (lom)
February 28, 2018 25 Featured Case ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: granting 15 Non-Resident Attorney Luis R. Vera, Jr. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez, designating Robyn C Crowther as local counsel. (lom)
February 28, 2018 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Samuel Issacharoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 2/28/2018, Receipt No. 0973-21333580) filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Payment Confirmation, # 3 Proposed Order) (Crowther, Robyn)
February 28, 2018 19 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Paul Rodriguez, California League of United Latin American Citizens, League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, upon Defendant Alex Padilla served on 2/27/2018, answer due 3/20/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Crowther, Robyn)
February 28, 2018 18 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Paul Rodriguez, California League of United Latin American Citizens, League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, upon Defendant Jerry Brown served on 2/27/2018, answer due 3/20/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Crowther, Robyn)
February 27, 2018 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marco K. Guerrero to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - DktEntr25 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21326813) filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Crowther, Robyn)
February 27, 2018 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mary M. Whittle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21326785) filed by Plaintiff California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Crowther, Robyn)
February 27, 2018 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Luis R. Vera, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - DktEntr25 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21326752) filed by Plaintiff California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Crowther, Robyn)
February 23, 2018 14 Featured Case STANDING ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND MAY DIFFER IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (see document for further details) (bm)
February 23, 2018 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Hamish P.M. Hume. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
February 23, 2018 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Amy L. Neuhardt. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
February 23, 2018 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lisa Barclay. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
February 23, 2018 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Karen L. Dunn. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
February 23, 2018 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Amy J. Mauser. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
February 23, 2018 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Luis Roberto Vera, Jr.. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
February 23, 2018 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David Boies. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
February 23, 2018 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendants Jerry Brown and Alex Padilla. (jtil)
February 22, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil)
February 21, 2018 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Crowther, Robyn)
February 21, 2018 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Crowther, Robyn)
February 21, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs California League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez, League of United Latin American Citizens, Paul Rodriguez. (Crowther, Robyn)
February 21, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21288828 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Paul Rodriguez, California League of United Latin American Citizens, League of United Latin American Citizens, Rocky Chavez. (Attorney Robyn C Crowther added to party California League of United Latin American Citizens(pty:pla), Attorney Robyn C Crowther added to party Rocky Chavez(pty:pla), Attorney Robyn C Crowther added to party League of United Latin American Citizens(pty:pla), Attorney Robyn C Crowther added to party Paul Rodriguez(pty:pla))(Crowther, Robyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul Rodriguez et al v. Jerry Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Brown
Represented By: Peiyin Patty Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Padilla
Represented By: Peiyin Patty Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California League of United Latin American Citizens
Represented By: Randall L Allen
Represented By: Lisa L Barclay
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Represented By: James P Denvir
Represented By: Karen L Dunn
Represented By: Marco K Guerrero
Represented By: Jennifer Duncan Hackett
Represented By: Hamish P M Hume
Represented By: Samuel Issacharoff
Represented By: Scott Allan Martin
Represented By: Amy J Mauser
Represented By: Amy L Neuhardt
Represented By: Trevor P Stutz
Represented By: Luis R Vera, Jr
Represented By: Allison M Vissichelli
Represented By: Karen S Vladeck
Represented By: Mary M Whittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Chavez
Represented By: Randall L Allen
Represented By: Lisa L Barclay
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Represented By: James P Denvir
Represented By: Karen L Dunn
Represented By: Marco K Guerrero
Represented By: Jennifer Duncan Hackett
Represented By: Hamish P M Hume
Represented By: Samuel Issacharoff
Represented By: Scott Allan Martin
Represented By: Amy J Mauser
Represented By: Amy L Neuhardt
Represented By: Trevor P Stutz
Represented By: Luis R Vera, Jr
Represented By: Allison M Vissichelli
Represented By: Karen S Vladeck
Represented By: Mary M Whittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of United Latin American Citizens
Represented By: Randall L Allen
Represented By: Lisa L Barclay
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Represented By: James P Denvir
Represented By: Karen L Dunn
Represented By: Marco K Guerrero
Represented By: Jennifer Duncan Hackett
Represented By: Hamish P M Hume
Represented By: Samuel Issacharoff
Represented By: Scott Allan Martin
Represented By: Amy J Mauser
Represented By: Amy L Neuhardt
Represented By: Trevor P Stutz
Represented By: Luis R Vera, Jr
Represented By: Allison M Vissichelli
Represented By: Karen S Vladeck
Represented By: Mary M Whittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Rodriguez
Represented By: Randall L Allen
Represented By: Lisa L Barclay
Represented By: Robyn C Crowther
Represented By: James P Denvir
Represented By: Karen L Dunn
Represented By: Marco K Guerrero
Represented By: Jennifer Duncan Hackett
Represented By: Hamish P M Hume
Represented By: Samuel Issacharoff
Represented By: Scott Allan Martin
Represented By: Amy J Mauser
Represented By: Amy L Neuhardt
Represented By: Trevor P Stutz
Represented By: Luis R Vera, Jr
Represented By: Allison M Vissichelli
Represented By: Karen S Vladeck
Represented By: Mary M Whittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?