BlackBerry Limited v. Facebook, Inc. et al Featured Case

BlackBerry has filed a lawsuit against Facebook, Instagram, and WhatsApp alleging that Facebook and its subsidiaries have infringed on BlackBerry’s patents with regard to four features: (1) Security improvements; (2) user interface improvements for mobile devices; (3) the combination of mobile gaming and mobile messaging; and (4) battery efficient status updates for mobile devices. BlackBerry used to be leader in the smartphone market; its BlackBerry Messenger feature was once revered as innovative and effective but has since fallen in popularity and use.

Plaintiff: BlackBerry Limited
Defendant: Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC and WhatsApp Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01844
Filed: March 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Stevenson
Presiding Judge: George H. Wu
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 454 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Michelle Garcia at michellegarcia@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Flood, Zachary)
September 18, 2019 Filing 453 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Phillip E. Morton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 8/30/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24363227) 442 by Clerk of Court. Docket No. 449 is stricken for the reasons stated in the Notice 442 filed on September 17, 2019. (mrgo)
September 17, 2019 Filing 452 MINUTES OF HEARING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RE: INADEQUACY OF FACEBOOK'S DOCUMENT PRODUCTION AND RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES 5 & 8 REGARDING ASSERTED U.S. PATENT NO. 7,372,961 (DKT. 387-1 [UNDER SEAL]) held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The Court hears oral argument. After further discussion with counsel, the Court takes the matter under submission. An Order will issue. Court Recorder: CS 09/17/2019. (hr)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR CERTAIN OF THE PARTIES FINAL INFRINGEMENT AND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT that (i) the deadline for Plaintiffs final infringement contentions for the 351, 929, 084, and 327 Patents is extended to September 20, 2019 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER GRANTING BLACKBERRY'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: 445 . (pj)
September 17, 2019 Filing 449 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Phillip E. Morton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 8/30/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24363227) 442 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt)
September 16, 2019 Filing 448 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc., served on Defendants. (Keefe, Heidi)
September 16, 2019 Filing 447 REPLY in Support of Facebook's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Infringement Contentions [ 376 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Heidi L. Keefe, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Keefe, Heidi)
September 16, 2019 Filing 446 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Defendant Facebook's Reply to BlackBerry's Limited's Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Second Infringment Contentions under seal 445 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Reply to BlackBerry's Limited's Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Infringement Contentions, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Brigham, Matthew)
September 16, 2019 Filing 445 APPLICATION to file document Defendant Facebook's Reply to BlackBerry's Limited's Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Second Infringment Contentions under seal filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Reply to BlackBerry Limited's Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Infringement Contentions, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi)
September 16, 2019 Filing 443 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for More Definite Statement,, 299 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Asperger, James)
September 16, 2019 Filing 442 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER DOC. NO. 453] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Phillip E. Morton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 8/30/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24363227) filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Morton, Phillip) Modified on 9/18/2019 (mrgo).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER GRANTING BLACKBERRY'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL 436 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (see document for details) (hr)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT FACEBOOK'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL 422 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (see document for details) (hr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 444 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Transcript Order Form (G-120), 432 . The following error(s) was found: INCORRECT HEARING DATE OF 9/13/2019. PLEASE REVIEW THE MINUTE ORDER(S) FOR THE CORRECT DATE. You must electronically refile the above referenced Request for Transcript in this case to correct this deficiency. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ls) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 13, 2019 Filing 441 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/27/19 re Transcript 440 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (clo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 13, 2019 Filing 440 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/27/19. Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2019. (clo)
September 13, 2019 Filing 437 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Reply in Support of Opening Brief Regarding Inadequacy of Facebooks Document Production and Responses to Interrogatories 5 & 8 Regarding Asserted U.S. Patent No. 7,372,961 and Exhibits thereto under seal 436 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Reply in Support of Opening Brief Regarding Inadequacy of Facebooks Document Production and Responses to Interrogatories 5 & 8 Regarding Asserted U.S. Patent No. 7,372,961, # 2 Unredacted Document Exhibit A)(Asperger, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 436 APPLICATION to file document Reply in Support of Opening Brief Regarding Inadequacy of Facebooks Document Production and Responses to Interrogatories 5 & 8 Regarding Asserted U.S. Patent No. 7,372,961 and Exhibits thereto under seal filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Reply in Support of Opening Brief Regarding Inadequacy of Facebooks Document Production and Responses to Interrogatories 5 & 8 Regarding Asserted U.S. Patent No. 7,372,961, # 2 Redacted Document Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 435 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Compel 386 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Zachary Flood, # 2 Exhibit A)(Asperger, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 434 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Deadlines for Certain Final Infringement and Invalidity Contentions filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 432 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Michelle Garcia at michellegarcia@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Flood, Zachary)
September 12, 2019 Filing 431 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES settling 428 Motion re: Informal Discovery Dispute held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The Court held a telephonic conference with counsel for Plaintiff and counsel for Defendant Snap Inc. The Court issues an Order to Show Cause as to why Plaintiff BlackBerry should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with the Magistrate Judge's Order of August 22, 2019. Show Cause Response due by 9/26/2019. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 09/12/2019. (hr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 430 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Snap Inc for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Nikole Faasisila at nikolefaasisila@paulhastings.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Chaikovsky, Yar)
September 11, 2019 Filing 429 SEALED DOCUMENT re APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Strike Second Supplemental Infringement Contentions and Exhibits Thereto under seal 413 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 427 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 8, # 5 Exhibit 9, # 6 Exhibit 11)(Asperger, James)
September 11, 2019 Filing 428 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. The telephonic discovery conference is scheduled for Thursday, September 12, 2019 at 3:15 p.m. The call-in information has been provided to the participating parties by email. (hr)
September 11, 2019 Filing 426 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc., re Exhibit (non-trial),, 425 , Brief (non-motion non-appeal) 424 , APPLICATION to file document related to Facebook's Response to Plf's Opening Brief Regarding Inadequacy of Facebook's Discovery Relating to U.S. Pat. No. 7,372,961 under seal 422 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, 423 OF RELATED UNREDACTED DOCUMENTS served on September 10, 2019. (Keefe, Heidi)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER GRANTING BLACKBERRYS APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL 413 by Judge George H. Wu (lc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 425 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc.. ISO Response to Opening Brief Re Inadequacy of Discovery as to Brief (non-motion non-appeal) 424 . (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Declaration of Kyle Nekritz, # 2 Redacted Document Ex 2, # 3 Redacted Document Ex 3, # 4 Redacted Document Ex 4, # 5 Redacted Document Ex 5, # 6 Redacted Document Ex 6, # 7 Redacted Document Ex 7, # 8 Redacted Document Ex 8, # 9 Redacted Document Ex 9, # 10 Redacted Document Ex 10, # 11 Redacted Document Ex 11, # 12 Redacted Document Ex 12, # 13 Redacted Document Ex 13, # 14 Redacted Document Ex 14)(Keefe, Heidi)
September 10, 2019 Filing 424 BRIEF filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc.. Response to Opening Brief Re Inadequacy of Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Declaration ISO Response, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Keefe, Heidi)
September 10, 2019 Filing 423 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document related to Facebook's Response to Plf's Opening Brief Regarding Inadequacy of Facebook's Discovery Relating to U.S. Pat. No. 7,372,961 under seal 422 filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Declaration of Kyle Nekritz, # 2 Unredacted Document Exhibit 2, # 3 Unredacted Document Exhibit 3, # 4 Unredacted Document Exhibit 4, # 5 Unredacted Document Exhibit 5, # 6 Unredacted Document Exhibit 6, # 7 Unredacted Document Exhibit 7, # 8 Unredacted Document Exhibit 8, # 9 Unredacted Document Exhibit 9, # 10 Unredacted Document Exhibit 10, # 11 Unredacted Document Exhibit 11, # 12 Unredacted Document Exhibit 12, # 13 Unredacted Document Exhibit 13, # 14 Unredacted Document Exhibit 14, # 15 Unredacted Document Response to Opening Brief Re Inadequacy of Discovery)(Keefe, Heidi)
September 10, 2019 Filing 422 APPLICATION to file document related to Facebook's Response to Plf's Opening Brief Regarding Inadequacy of Facebook's Discovery Relating to U.S. Pat. No. 7,372,961 under seal filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi)
September 10, 2019 Filing 421 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/5/19 re Transcript 420 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Kielwasser, Anne) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 10, 2019 Filing 420 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/5/19 10a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Anne Kielwasser, phone number 213-894-2969. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2019. (Kielwasser, Anne)
September 10, 2019 Filing 419 SEALED DOCUMENT re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration 391 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 410 filed by Counter Defendant BlackBerry Limited, Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited.(Asperger, James)
September 10, 2019 Filing 418 SEALED DOCUMENT re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, 388 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 408 filed by Counter Defendant BlackBerry Limited, Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 8, # 5 Exhibit 9, # 6 Exhibit 11, # 7 Exhibit 12, # 8 Exhibit 13, # 9 Exhibit 14, # 10 Exhibit 15)(Asperger, James)
September 10, 2019 Filing 417 SEALED DOCUMENT re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, 400 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, 381 filed by Counter Defendant BlackBerry Limited, Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited.(Asperger, James)
September 10, 2019 Filing 416 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES BLACKBERRY LIMITEDS MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANTS PRIOR ART ELECTIONS 299 previously scheduled for 09/12/2019 to 9/19/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 415 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)RULING ON BLACKBERRY'S OBJECTIONS AND MOTION FOR REVIEW OF NON-DISPOSITIVE ORDER FROM THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE 385 by Judge George H. Wu: Attached hereto is the Courts Ruling on Blackberrys Motion 385 . Hearing on this motion is vacated and taken off-calendar. 385 (yl)
September 9, 2019 Filing 414 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Strike Second Supplemental Infringement Contentions and Exhibits Thereto under seal 413 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Strike Second Supplemental Infringement Contentions, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibit 11)(Asperger, James)
September 9, 2019 Filing 413 APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Strike Second Supplemental Infringement Contentions and Exhibits Thereto under seal filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Strike Second Supplemental Infringement Contentions, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibit 11, # 8 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
September 9, 2019 Filing 412 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Strike Second Supplemental Infringement Contentions (Dkt. 376) filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Zachary Flood, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11)(Asperger, James)
September 9, 2019 Filing 411 SEALED DOCUMENT Defendant Snap Inc.'s SEALED Filing re APPLICATION to file document Snap's Proposed Supplemental Brief In Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims under seal 371 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, 398 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Exh. A, # 2 Unredacted Document Exh. B, # 3 Unredacted Document Exh. C, # 4 Unredacted Document Exh. D, # 5 Unredacted Document Exh. E, # 6 Unredacted Document Exh. F, # 7 Unredacted Document Exh. G, # 8 Unredacted Document Exh. H, # 9 Unredacted Document Exh. I, # 10 Unredacted Document Exh. J, # 11 Unredacted Document Exh. K, # 12 Unredacted Document Exh. L, # 13 Unredacted Document Exh. M, # 14 Unredacted Document Exh. N, # 15 Unredacted Document Exh. O, # 16 Unredacted Document Exh. P, # 17 Unredacted Document Exh. Q, # 18 Unredacted Document Exh. R, # 19 Unredacted Document Exh. S, # 20 Unredacted Document Exh. T)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
September 9, 2019 Filing 407 STATEMENT Regarding Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Counter Defendant BlackBerry Limited, Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement 299 . (Asperger, James)
September 6, 2019 Filing 406 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of Nondispositive Pretrial Ruling re Order on Motion for Referral 389 394 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. Peterman, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
September 6, 2019 Filing 405 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff BlackBerry Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Jeff Nardinelli at jeffnardinelli@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Asperger, James)
September 6, 2019 Filing 404 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Jocelyn McIntosh at jmcintosh@cooley.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Keefe, Heidi)
September 6, 2019 Filing 403 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Jocelyn McIntosh at jmcintosh@cooley.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Keefe, Heidi)
September 6, 2019 Filing 402 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Snap Inc for Court Reporter. Court will contact Nikole Faasisila at nikolefaasisila@paulhastings.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Chaikovsky, Yar)
September 5, 2019 Filing 433 SEALED DOCUMENT (mrgo)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER GRANTING BLACKBERRYS APPLICATION 390 TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SNAP INC.S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS RELATED TO DEFENDANT NOTICE OF LODGING OF MATERIALS RELEVANT TO THE (1) INSTITUTED IPRS AND (2) THE DEPOSITION OF SCOTT ANDREWS by Judge George H. Wu: (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS)granting 395 APPLICATION to Seal Document (yl)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER GRANTING BLACKBERRYS APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL 387 by Judge George H. Wu. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
September 5, 2019 Filing 401 MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' CONSOLIDATED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. § 101 (U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,296,351, 8,676,929, AND 9,349,120) 239 DEFENDANT SNAP, INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO BLACKBERRY LIMITED'S COMPLAINT 242 BLACKBERRY'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 8,825,084 244 BLACKBERRY'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,677,250, 8,279,173, AND 9,349,120 247 FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. § 101 (U.S. PATENT NO. 8,279,173) 267 DEFENDANT SNAP INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY UNDER SECTION 101 OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,825,084 AND 8,326,327 272 held before Judge George H. Wu: The Courts Tentative Ruling is circulated. Court hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, the Motions are TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue ruling. (See minutes for further details) Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (yl)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu. the following document is hereby SEALED: Highlighted portions of Exhibit A to BlackBerrys Opposition to Snaps Ex Parte Application to File Supplemental Briefing in Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims. IT IS SO ORDERED (See order for further details) (yl)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT FACEBOOKS APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu. (See order for further dtails)granting 374 APPLICATION to Seal Document (yl)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SNAP INC.S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS RELATED TO SNAP INC.S [PROPOSED] SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO BLACKBERRY LIMITEDS COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, having considered the Application for Leave to File Under Seal Documents Related to Snap Inc.s [Proposed] Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims to Blackberry Limited's Complaint, hereby ORDERS: 1. Defendant Snap Inc.s Application for Leave to File Documents Under Seal is GRANTED. (See order for further details) (yl)
September 4, 2019 Filing 397 NOTICE filed by Defendant Snap Inc. Snap's Notice of Lodging of Materials (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C (Redacted))(Chaikovsky, Yar)
September 4, 2019 Filing 396 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Snap's Application for Leave to File Under Seal Documents Related to Notice of Lodging of Materials Relevant to IPRs and Deposition of S. Andrews under seal 395 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Exhibit C)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
September 4, 2019 Filing 395 APPLICATION to file document Snap's Application for Leave to File Under Seal Documents Related to Notice of Lodging of Materials Relevant to IPRs and Deposition of S. Andrews under seal filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Exh. C)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
September 4, 2019 Filing 394 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of Nondispositive Pretrial Ruling re Order on Motion for Referral 389 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I) (Asperger, James)
September 4, 2019 Filing 392 NOTICE of Lodging filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Asperger, James)
September 4, 2019 Filing 391 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibit A to Notice of Lodging under seal 390 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document)(Asperger, James)
September 4, 2019 Filing 390 APPLICATION to file document Exhibit A to Notice of Lodging under seal filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document)(Asperger, James)
September 4, 2019 Filing 389 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H. Wu: denying 380 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Referral. **SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS** (jag)
September 3, 2019 Filing 393 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Phillip E. Morton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24363227) 373 by Clerk of Court. Docket No. 373 is stricken for the reasons stated in the Notice 384 filed on September 3, 2019. (shb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 388 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Opening Brief Regarding Inadequacy of Facebooks Document Production and Responses to Interrogatories 5 & 8 Regarding Asserted U.S. Patent No. 7,372,961 and Exhibits thereto under seal 387 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Unredacted Document Opening Brief Regarding Inadequacy of Facebooks Document Production and Responses to Interrogatories 5 & 8 Regarding Asserted U.S. Patent No. 7,372,961, # 3 Unredacted Document Exhibit 2, # 4 Unredacted Document Exhibit 3, # 5 Unredacted Document Exhibit 4, # 6 Unredacted Document Exhibit 8, # 7 Unredacted Document Exhibit 9, # 8 Unredacted Document Exhibit 11, # 9 Unredacted Document Exhibit 12, # 10 Unredacted Document Exhibit 13, # 11 Unredacted Document Exhibit 14, # 12 Unredacted Document Exhibit 15)(Asperger, James)
September 3, 2019 Filing 387 APPLICATION to file document Opening Brief Regarding Inadequacy of Facebooks Document Production and Responses to Interrogatories 5 & 8 Regarding Asserted U.S. Patent No. 7,372,961 and Exhibits thereto under seal filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Opening Brief Regarding Inadequacy of Facebooks Document Production and Responses to Interrogatories 5 & 8 Regarding Asserted U.S. Patent No. 7,372,961, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibit 11, # 8 Exhibit 12, # 9 Exhibit 13, # 10 Exhibit 14, # 11 Exhibit 15)(Asperger, James)
September 3, 2019 Filing 386 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Motion set for hearing on 9/17/2019 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Zachary Flood, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
September 3, 2019 Filing 385 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of Nondispositive Pretrial Ruling re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, 336 , Amended Minutes,, 341 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Motion set for hearing on 10/3/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H) (Asperger, James)
September 3, 2019 Filing 384 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Phillip E. Morton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24363227) 373 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Other error(s) with document(s): Designation of local counsel Randall Lee on the application is not the same as on the [prop] order. Attorney Heidi Keefe on the [prop] order does not maintain an office within the District. (lom)
September 2, 2019 Filing 383 REPLY In Support Of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Referral of Discovery-Related Motion to Magistrate Judge Stevenson 380 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Chaikovsky, Yar)
September 1, 2019 Filing 382 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Referral of Discovery-Related Motion to Magistrate Judge Stevenson 380 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Zachary Flood, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order denying ex parte application)(Asperger, James)
August 31, 2019 Filing 381 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Proposed Response to Proposed Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims under seal 379 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Ex. A (Proposed Response to Proposed Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims))(Asperger, James)
August 31, 2019 Filing 380 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Referral of Discovery-Related Motion to Magistrate Judge Stevenson filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 31, 2019 Filing 379 APPLICATION to file document Proposed Response to Proposed Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims under seal filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Ex. A (Proposed Response to Proposed Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims))(Asperger, James)
August 31, 2019 Filing 378 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Supplemental Brief Snap's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Supplemental Brief In Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims 369 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Ex. A (Proposed Response to Proposed Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims))(Asperger, James)
August 30, 2019 Filing 377 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc., re Memorandum in Support of Motion,, 376 , APPLICATION to file document Motion to Strike, Exhibits 3 through 8 under seal 374 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, 375 Unredacted Motion to Strike and Exhibits 3 through 8 served on August 30, 2019. (Keefe, Heidi)
August 30, 2019 Filing 376 MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant Facebook's Motion to Strike Portions of Plf's Second Supplemental Infringement Contentions filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Heidi L. Keefe ISO Motion to Strike, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Redacted Document Ex. 3, # 5 Redacted Document Ex. 4, # 6 Redacted Document Ex. 5, # 7 Redacted Document Ex. 6, # 8 Redacted Document Ex. 7, # 9 Redacted Document Ex. 8, # 10 Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi)
August 30, 2019 Filing 375 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion to Strike, Exhibits 3 through 8 under seal 374 filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Motion to Strike, # 2 Unredacted Document Exhibit 3, # 3 Unredacted Document Exhibit 4, # 4 Unredacted Document Exhibit 5, # 5 Unredacted Document Exhibit 6, # 6 Unredacted Document Exhibit 7, # 7 Unredacted Document Exhibit 8)(Keefe, Heidi)
August 30, 2019 Filing 374 APPLICATION to file document Motion to Strike, Exhibits 3 through 8 under seal filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Motion to Strike, # 2 Redacted Document Exhibit 3, # 3 Redacted Document Exhibit 4, # 4 Redacted Document Exhibit 5, # 5 Redacted Document Exhibit 6, # 6 Redacted Document Exhibit 7, # 7 Redacted Document Exhibit 8, # 8 Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi)
August 30, 2019 Filing 373 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN SEE RESPONSE G-112-B DKT 393 ]. APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Phillip E. Morton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24363227) filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Phillip E Morton added to party Facebook, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip E Morton added to party Instagram, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip E Morton added to party WhatsApp Inc.(pty:dft)) (Morton, Phillip) Modified on 9/4/2019 (shb).
August 30, 2019 Filing 372 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Snap's Proposed Supplemental Brief In Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims under seal 371 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Snap's Proposed Supplemental Brief In Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims, # 2 Unredacted Document Exh. A, # 3 Unredacted Document Exh. B, # 4 Unredacted Document Exh. C, # 5 Unredacted Document Exh. D, # 6 Unredacted Document Exh. E, # 7 Unredacted Document Exh. F, # 8 Unredacted Document Exh. G, # 9 Unredacted Document Exh. H, # 10 Unredacted Document Exh. I, # 11 Unredacted Document Exh. J, # 12 Unredacted Document Exh. K, # 13 Unredacted Document Exh. L, # 14 Unredacted Document Exh. M, # 15 Unredacted Document Exh. N, # 16 Unredacted Document Exh. O, # 17 Unredacted Document Exh. P, # 18 Unredacted Document Exh. Q, # 19 Unredacted Document Exh. R, # 20 Unredacted Document Exh. S, # 21 Unredacted Document Exh. T)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 30, 2019 Filing 371 APPLICATION to file document Snap's Proposed Supplemental Brief In Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims under seal filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Snap's Proposed Supplemental Brief In Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims, # 3 Redacted Document Exh. A, # 4 Redacted Document Exh. B, # 5 Redacted Document Exh. C, # 6 Redacted Document Exh. D, # 7 Redacted Document Exh. E, # 8 Redacted Document Exh. F, # 9 Redacted Document Exh. G, # 10 Redacted Document Exh. H, # 11 Redacted Document Exh. I, # 12 Redacted Document Exh. J, # 13 Redacted Document Exh. K, # 14 Redacted Document Exh. L, # 15 Redacted Document Exh. M, # 16 Redacted Document Exh. N, # 17 Redacted Document Exh. O, # 18 Redacted Document Exh. P, # 19 Redacted Document Exh. Q, # 20 Redacted Document Exh. R, # 21 Redacted Document Exh. S, # 22 Redacted Document Exh. T)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 30, 2019 Filing 370 DECLARATION of Andy Legolvan In Support Of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Supplemental Brief Snap's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Supplemental Brief In Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims 369 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Exhibit A, # 2 Redacted Document Exhibit B, # 3 Redacted Document Exhibit C, # 4 Redacted Document Exhibit D, # 5 Redacted Document Exhibit E, # 6 Redacted Document Exhibit F, # 7 Redacted Document Exhibit G, # 8 Redacted Document Exhibit H, # 9 Redacted Document Exhibit I, # 10 Redacted Document Exhibit J, # 11 Redacted Document Exhibit K, # 12 Redacted Document Exhibit L, # 13 Redacted Document Exhibit M, # 14 Redacted Document Exhibit N, # 15 Redacted Document Exhibit O, # 16 Redacted Document Exhibit P, # 17 Redacted Document Exhibit Q, # 18 Redacted Document Exhibit R, # 19 Redacted Document Exhibit S, # 20 Redacted Document Exhibit T)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 30, 2019 Filing 369 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Supplemental Brief Snap's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Supplemental Brief In Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Snap's Proposed Supplemental Brief in Support Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaim to Blackberry's Complaint) (Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: 351 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER GRANTING BLACKBERRY'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: 357 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
August 29, 2019 Filing 366 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES settling 361 Motion re: Informal Discovery Dispute held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The Court held a telephonic conference with counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant Snap Inc. regarding two discovery disputes. With respect to both these issues, the Court noted that in light of the current August 30, 2019 discovery cut-off, there is insufficient time for the Magistrate Judge to address these disputes. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 08/29/2019. (hr)
August 29, 2019 Filing 365 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement 299 filed by Counter Defendant BlackBerry Limited, Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Asperger, James)
August 28, 2019 Filing 364 SEALED DOCUMENT Reply In Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 101 of US Patent '084 and '327 re APPLICATION for Leave to File Under Seal Snap Inc.'s Reply ISO Memo of Points & Authorities ISO MSJ of Invalidity 346 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, 350 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit SEALED Exh. J to Decl. of D. Okano)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 28, 2019 Filing 363 (AMENDED) MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Facebook), amending Motion 362 . The telephonic discovery conference is scheduled for August 30, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. The call-in information has been provided to the participating parties by email. (hr)
August 28, 2019 Filing 362 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Facebook). The telephonic discovery conference is scheduled for August 30, 2019 at 13:00 a.m. The call-in information has been provided to the participating parties by email. (hr)
August 28, 2019 Filing 361 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Snap). The telephonic discovery conference is scheduled for August 29, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. The call-in information has been provided to the participating parties by email. (hr)
August 27, 2019 Filing 360 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE AND ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUT-OFF & SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE 355 held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the following expedited briefing schedule will govern the motion: BlackBerry will file an opening brief no later than September 3, 2019; an opposition brief will be filed on or before September 10, 2019; and any reply brief will be filed on or before September 13, 2019. A hearing on the motion is scheduled for Tuesday, September 17, 2019 at 1 p.m. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 08/27/2019. (hr)
August 27, 2019 Filing 359 OBJECTION Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Short Sur-Reply Based on Recent Testimony By the Sole Named Inventor of the '120 Patent 353 Snap's Objections to Factual Mischaracterizations in BlackBerry's Opposition to Facebook's Ex Parte Application to File Sur-Reply filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of D. Okano, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 26, 2019 Filing 358 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal 357 filed by Counter Defendant BlackBerry Limited, Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Opposition to Ex Parte Application, # 2 Unredacted Document Exhibit A)(Asperger, James)
August 26, 2019 Filing 357 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Counter Defendant BlackBerry Limited, Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Opposition to Ex Parte Application, # 2 Redacted Document Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
August 26, 2019 Filing 356 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Short Sur-Reply Based on Recent Testimony By the Sole Named Inventor of the '120 Patent 353 filed by Counter Defendant BlackBerry Limited, Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Miles D. Freeman, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
August 26, 2019 Filing 355 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. The telephonic discovery conference is scheduled for August 27, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. The call-in information has been provided to the participating parties by email. (hr)
August 26, 2019 Filing 354 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc., re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, 352 served on August 26, 2019. (Brigham, Matthew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 353 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Short Sur-Reply Based on Recent Testimony By the Sole Named Inventor of the '120 Patent filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Dena Chen, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order) (Brigham, Matthew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 352 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Related to Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Short Sur-Reply Based on Recent Testimony by the Sole Named Inventor of the '120 Patent under seal 351 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Brigham, Matthew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 351 APPLICATION to file document Related to Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Short Sur-Reply Based on Recent Testimony by the Sole Named Inventor of the '120 Patent under seal filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brigham, Matthew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 349 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Snap Inc for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Nikole Faasisila at nikolefaasisila@paulhastings.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SNAP INC.'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS RELATED TO REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY UNDER SECTION 101 OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,825,084 AND 8,326,327 by Judge George H. Wu re: 346 APPLICATION for Leave to File. (mrgo)
August 23, 2019 Filing 348 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: AMENDED DISCOVERY ORDER 341 held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The Court held a brief telephonic conference with counsel for Plaintiff and Defendants to confirm the changes made in the Court's Amended Order re: Telephonic Discovery Conferences ("Amended Order") regarding Snap's Court's obligations to response to BlackBerry's Interrogatory No. 12. (Docket No. 341.) (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR-08/23/2019. (hr)
August 23, 2019 Filing 347 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal 311 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Reply In Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 101 of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,825,084 and 8,326,327, # 2 Unredacted Document Exhibit J)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 23, 2019 Filing 346 APPLICATION for Leave to File Under Seal Snap Inc.'s Reply ISO Memo of Points & Authorities ISO MSJ of Invalidity filed by Defendant Snap Inc. Application set for hearing on 9/5/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Reply ISO MSJ of Invalidity, # 2 Proposed Order) (Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 22, 2019 Filing 345 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to INVALIDITY UNDER SECTION 101 OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,825,084 AND 8,326,327 272 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Reply to Statement of Uncontroverted Facts & Conclusions of Law ISO MSJ of Invalidity, # 2 Declaration of David Okano, # 3 Exhibit J REDACTED, # 4 Exhibit K, # 5 Snaps Request for Evidentiary Ruling on Specified Objections, # 6 Declaration of Andy LeGolvan ISO Snaps Request for Evidentiary Ruling on Specified Objections, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 3, # 10 Exhibit 4, # 11 Exhibit 5, # 12 Exhibit 6, # 13 Exhibit 7)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 22, 2019 Filing 344 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement 299 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Matthew J. Brigham, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Declaration Chad J. Peterman, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17)(Brigham, Matthew)
August 22, 2019 Filing 343 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 (U.S. Patent No. 8,279,173) 267 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Reply to Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, # 2 Declaration Sandeep Chatterjee, Ph.D., # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Keefe, Heidi)
August 22, 2019 Filing 342 SEALED DOCUMENT Consolidated Reply In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 101 of US Patent Nos. '351, '929 and '120 re APPLICATION to file document under seal 311 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, 334 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 22, 2019 Filing 341 (IN CHAMBERS) AMENDED ORDER RE: TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES ON DISCOVERY DISPUTES [Case No. CV 18-1844-GW (KSx), Dkt. Nos. 291 , 292 ] held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, amending Minutes of In Chambers Order 336 . BlackBerry must within seven (7) days of the date of this Order: (1) produce responsive Board of Director Minutes discussing BlackBerry's financial condition, including plans for restructuring, for the period January 1, 2012 through December 21, 2017 (see document for further details). (hr)
August 21, 2019 Filing 340 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/2/19, 8/14/19 & 8/15/19 re Transcript 338 , 339 , 337 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (clo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 21, 2019 Filing 339 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/15/19. Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2019. (clo)
August 21, 2019 Filing 338 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/14/19. Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2019. (clo)
August 21, 2019 Filing 337 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/2/19. Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2019. (clo)
August 20, 2019 Filing 336 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES ONDISCOVERY DISPUTES [Case No. CV 18-1844-GW (KSx), Dkt. Nos. 291 , 292 ]. BlackBerry must within seven (7) days of the date of this Order: (1) produce responsive Board of Director Minutes discussing BlackBerry's financial condition, including plans for restructuring, for the period January 1, 2012 through December 21, 2017 (see document for further details). (hr)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: Granting 315 Blackberry's APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SNAP INC.S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS RELATED TO CONSOLIDATED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY UNDER SECTION 101 OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,296,351, 8,676,929 AND 9,349,120 by Judge George H. Wu 311 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: Granting 322 Blackberry's APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: Granting 325 Blackberry's APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 331 DECLARATION of Heidi L. Keefe In Support of APPLICATION to file document under seal 315 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi)
August 19, 2019 Filing 330 SEALED DOCUMENT re APPLICATION to file document Snap's Opposition to BlackBerry's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement re US Patent No. 8,825,084 under seal 283 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, 295 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Snap's Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Facts, # 2 Unredacted Document Decl. of C. Peterman, # 3 Unredacted Document Exh. B, # 4 Unredacted Document Exh. C, # 5 Unredacted Document Exh. D, # 6 Unredacted Document Exh. E, # 7 Unredacted Document Decl. of S. Andrews)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF MATERIAL IN RESPONSE TO BLACKBERRY'S REQUESTS FOR ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION 236 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The Motion is DENIED in its entirety. (see document for further details) (hr)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER GRANTING BLACKBERRYS APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL the Court GRANTS Plaintiff BlackBerryLimiteds Application to File Documents Under Seal and the following documents are hereby SEALED by Judge George H. Wu. (See order for further details) (yl)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: Granting 307 Blackberry's APPLICATION to File Documents Under Seal. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 326 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal 325 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Reply Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,677,250, 8,279,173, and 9,349,120)(Asperger, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 325 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Reply Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,677,250, 8,279,173, and 9,349,120, # 2 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 324 STATEMENT Reply Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,677,250, 8,279,173, and 9,349,120 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited re: Reply (Motion related), 317 . (Asperger, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 323 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal 322 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Reply Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,825,084)(Asperger, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 322 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Reply Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,825,084, # 2 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 321 STATEMENT Reply Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,825,084 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited re: Reply (Motion related), 306 . (Asperger, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 320 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal 319 filed by Counter Defendant BlackBerry Limited, Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Unredacted Document Exhibit A, # 3 Unredacted Document Exhibit B, # 4 Unredacted Document Exhibit C, # 5 Unredacted Document Exhibit D, # 6 Unredacted Document Exhibit E, # 7 Unredacted Document Exhibit G, # 8 Unredacted Document Exhibit L)(Asperger, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 319 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Counter Defendant BlackBerry Limited, Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Exhibit A, # 2 Redacted Document Exhibit B, # 3 Redacted Document Exhibit C, # 4 Redacted Document Exhibit D, # 5 Redacted Document Exhibit E, # 6 Redacted Document Exhibit G, # 7 Redacted Document Exhibit L, # 8 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 318 DECLARATION of DAWN DAVID IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Infringement of U.S. Patents 8,677,250; 8,279,173; and 9,349,120 247 filed by Counter Defendant BlackBerry Limited, Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Asperger, James)
August 15, 2019 Filing 317 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Infringement of U.S. Patents 8,677,250; 8,279,173; and 9,349,120 247 filed by Counter Defendant BlackBerry Limited, Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Asperger, James)
August 15, 2019 Filing 316 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal 315 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Opposition to Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit A (unredacted), # 3 Exhibit B (unredacted), # 4 Exhibit E (unredacted))(Asperger, James)
August 15, 2019 Filing 315 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
August 15, 2019 Filing 314 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 (U.S. Patent No. 8,279,173) 267 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Zachary C. Flood, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Declaration of Dan Schonfeld, Ph.D., # 11 Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact, # 12 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
August 15, 2019 Filing 313 DECLARATION of Andrew Mace In Support Of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Motion for Summary Judgement of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 101 of US Patent Nos. 8,296,351, 8,676,929 and 9,349,120 239 Decl. of A. Mace In Support of Reply to Combined Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 15, 2019 Filing 312 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal 311 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document, # 2 Unredacted Document, # 3 Unredacted Document, # 4 Unredacted Document)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 15, 2019 Filing 311 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Consolidated Reply ISO Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 15, 2019 Filing 310 REPLY In Support Of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Motion for Summary Judgement of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 101 of US Patent Nos. 8,296,351, 8,676,929 and 9,349,120 239 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Reply to Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law ISO MSJ of Invalidity, # 2 Declaration of David Okano, # 3 Redacted Document Exh. K, # 4 Exhibit L, # 5 Redacted Document Exh. M, # 6 Redacted Document Exh. N)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 15, 2019 Filing 309 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to INVALIDITY UNDER SECTION 101 OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,825,084 AND 8,326,327 272 filed by Counter Defendant BlackBerry Limited, Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Miles D. Freeman, # 2 Exhibit A to Freeman Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Freeman Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Freeman Declaration, # 5 Declaration of James Hymel, # 6 Declaration of Patrick McDaniel, Ph.D, # 7 Exhibit A to McDaniel Declaration, # 8 Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact, # 9 Appendix A, # 10 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
August 15, 2019 Filing 308 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal 307 filed by Counter Defendant BlackBerry Limited, Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Unredacted Document Exhibit C)(Asperger, James)
August 15, 2019 Filing 307 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Counter Defendant BlackBerry Limited, Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Redacted Document Exhibit C, # 3 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
August 15, 2019 Filing 306 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Infringement of U.S. Patent 8,825,084 244 filed by Counter Defendant BlackBerry Limited, Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Asperger, James)
August 15, 2019 Filing 305 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Snap Inc for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Nikole Faasisila at nikolefaasisila@paulhastings.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 15, 2019 Filing 304 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Zachary Christian Flood counsel for Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Adding Kristen Bird as counsel of record for BlackBerry Limited for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Flood, Zachary)
August 15, 2019 Filing 303 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Michelle Garcia at michellegarcia@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Flood, Zachary)
August 15, 2019 Filing 302 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES settling 300 Motion re Informal Discovery Dispute held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The Court directed the parties to each submit letter briefs of no more than three (3) pages no later than Monday, August 19, 2019. BlackBerry may separately submit via chambers emailwith a copy to Snap's counsel a.pdf of the confidential document that is the basis of the request for the test results. Snap's letter brief must attach BlackBerry's RFP No. 5 and Snap's response/objections thereto. The Court takes the matters under submission. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION) Court Recorder: XTR-08/15/2019. (gr)
August 14, 2019 Filing 301 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE [See Dkt. Nos. 291, 292] held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. After substantial discussion with the parties, due to a number remaining issues to be addressed regarding BlackBerry's concerns that certain of Snap's discovery responses and production of documents are insufficient, the Court scheduled a continuation of the telephonic conference for Thursday, August 15, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 08/14/2019. (hr)
August 14, 2019 Filing 300 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. A Supplemental follow-up telephonic discovery conference is scheduled for August 15, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. The call-in information has been provided to the participating parties by email. (hr)
August 14, 2019 Filing 299 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of P. Schmidt ISO BlackBerry's Motion for a More Definite Statement of Defendants' Prior Art Elections, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9) (Asperger, James)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS)ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF MATERIAL IN RESPONSE TO BLACKBERRY'S by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Counsel are notified that on the Court's own motion, the hearing Motion to Compel presently scheduled for Wednesday, August 14, 2019, at 10 a.m., is hereby vacated. The matter is taken under submission for decision without oral argument. 236 (gr)
August 13, 2019 Filing 297 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement 290 by Clerk of Court. Docket No. 290 is stricken for the reason stated in the Notice 296 filed on August 12, 2019. (mrgo)
August 12, 2019 Filing 296 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement 290 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SNAP INC.'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS RELATED TO OPPOSITION TO BLACKBERRY'S PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 8,825,084 by Judge George H. Wu re: 283 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: granting 278 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER GRANTING BLACKBERRY'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: granting 282 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
August 9, 2019 Filing 292 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limitedto Order on Motion for Order re Discovery Matter,,, Telephone Conference,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, 274 Response to Minute Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter Brief, # 2 Exhibit B - BlackBerry's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures, # 3 Exhibit C - BlackBerry's 1st Supp. Rule 26 Disclosures, # 4 Exhibit D - BlackBerry's 2nd Supp. Rule 26 Disclosures)(Asperger, James)
August 9, 2019 Filing 291 BRIEF filed by Defendant Snap Inc. Letter Brief regarding Order on Motion for Order re Discovery Matter,,, Telephone Conference,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, 274 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 9, 2019 Filing 290 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER DOC. NO. 297] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Motion set for hearing on 9/5/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of P. Schmidt ISO BlackBerry's Motion for a More Definite Statement of Defendants' Prior Art Elections, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9) (Asperger, James) Modified on 8/13/2019 (mrgo).
August 9, 2019 Filing 289 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Infringement of U.S. Patent 8,825,084 244 (Redacted) filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Facts, # 2 Redacted Document Andrews Declaration, # 3 Redacted Document Peterman Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Redacted Document Exhibit B, # 6 Redacted Document Exhibit C, # 7 Redacted Document Exhibit D, # 8 Redacted Document Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 MINUTE ORDER - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu. **SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS** (jag)
August 8, 2019 Filing 287 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff BlackBerry Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, 284 served on 8/8/2019. (Asperger, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 286 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Snap's Opposition to BlackBerry's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement re US Patent No. 8,825,084 under seal 283 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document, # 2 Unredacted Document, # 3 Unredacted Document Sealed C. Peterman Decl., # 4 Unredacted Document Sealed Ex. B, # 5 Unredacted Document Sealed Ex. C, # 6 Unredacted Document Sealed Ex. D, # 7 Unredacted Document Sealed Ex. E, # 8 Unredacted Document Sealed Decl. of S. Andrews, # 9 Unredacted Document Sealed Ex. 1 to S. Andrews Decl, # 10 Unredacted Document Sealed Ex. 2 to S. Andrews Decl)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 8, 2019 Filing 285 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc., re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, 279 served on August 8, 2019. (Keefe, Heidi)
August 8, 2019 Filing 284 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment under seal 282 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Memorandum, # 2 Unredacted Document, # 3 Unredacted Document, # 4 Unredacted Document, # 5 Unredacted Document)(Asperger, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 283 APPLICATION to file document Snap's Opposition to BlackBerry's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement re US Patent No. 8,825,084 under seal filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document, # 3 Redacted Document, # 4 Redacted Document, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Redacted Document Exh. B, # 7 Redacted Document Exh. C, # 8 Redacted Document Exh. D, # 9 Redacted Document Exh. E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Redacted Document, # 12 Proposed Order Denying BlackBerry's Partial MSJ)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 8, 2019 Filing 282 APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment under seal filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Redacted Memorandum)(Asperger, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 281 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Motion for Summary Judgement of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 101 of US Patent Nos. 8,296,351, 8,676,929 and 9,349,120 239 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix 1, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Appendix Statement of Facts, # 4 Declaration Nardinelli Decl, # 5 Redacted Document, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Redacted Document, # 18 Redacted Document, # 19 Redacted Document, # 20 Declaration Almeroth Decl, # 21 Exhibit Almeroth Appx 1, # 22 Declaration Flood Decl, # 23 Declaration Rosenberg Decl, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit)(Asperger, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 280 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Infringement of U.S. Patents 8,677,250; 8,279,173; and 9,349,120 247 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Defendants' Statement of Genuine Disputes, # 2 Declaration Heidi L. Keefe, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Declaration Andrew Biczo, # 6 Declaration George Nachman, # 7 Declaration June Wang, # 8 Declaration Kun Chen, # 9 Declaration Robert Douglas)(Keefe, Heidi)
August 8, 2019 Filing 279 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Documents Related to Defendants' Opposition to BlackBerry's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal 278 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Opposition, # 2 Unredacted Document Defendants' Statement of Genuine Disputes, # 3 Unredacted Document Ex. 1, # 4 Unredacted Document Ex. 2, # 5 Unredacted Document Biczo Declaration, # 6 Unredacted Document Nachman Declaration, # 7 Unredacted Document Wang Declaration, # 8 Unredacted Document Chen Declaration, # 9 Unredacted Document Douglas Declaration)(Brigham, Matthew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 278 APPLICATION to file document Documents Related to Defendants' Opposition to BlackBerry's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Redacted Opposition, # 3 Redacted Document Redacted Defendants' Statement of Genuine Disputes)(Brigham, Matthew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 277 SEALED DOCUMENT Defendant Snap Inc.'s Reply In Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims re APPLICATION to file document Snap's Application for Leave to File Under Seal Documents Related to Snap's Reply In Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims under seal 269 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, 275 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit SEALED Exh. VV, # 2 Exhibit SEALED Exh. WW, # 3 Exhibit SEALED Exh. YY, # 4 Exhibit SEALED Exh. ZZ, # 5 Exhibit SEALED Exh. AAA, # 6 Exhibit SEALED Exh. BBB, # 7 Exhibit SEALED Exh. CCC, # 8 Exhibit SEALED Exh. DDD, # 9 Exhibit SEALED Exh. EEE, # 10 Exhibit SEALED Exh. FFF, # 11 Exhibit SEALED Exh. GGG, # 12 Exhibit SEALED Exh. HHH, # 13 Exhibit SEALED Exh. III, # 14 Exhibit SEALED Exh. JJJ)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 7, 2019 Filing 276 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Miles D Freeman counsel for Counter Defendant BlackBerry Limited, Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Adding Miles D. Freeman as counsel of record for BlackBerry Limited for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attorney Miles D Freeman added to party BlackBerry Limited(pty:cd), Attorney Miles D Freeman added to party BlackBerry Limited(pty:pla))(Freeman, Miles)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SNAP INC.'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS RELATED TO SNAP INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO BLACKBERRY LIMITED'S COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu re: 269 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
August 2, 2019 Filing 274 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE settling 263 Motion re Informal Discovery Dispute held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The Court scheduled a follow-up telephonic conference for Wednesday, August 14, 2019 at 4:00p.m., to discuss the status of Plaintiff's document productions and whether a motion to compel would be necessary. The parties are directed to submit a joint email to the Court no later than Friday, August 9, 2019. The Court directed each party to submit a (5) page letter brief, on or before Friday, August 9, 2019. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 08/02/2019. (hr)
August 2, 2019 Filing 273 DECLARATION of David Okano In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to INVALIDITY UNDER SECTION 101 OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,825,084 AND 8,326,327 272 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 2, 2019 Filing 272 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to INVALIDITY UNDER SECTION 101 OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,825,084 AND 8,326,327 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. Motion set for hearing on 9/5/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Snap's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of '084 and '327 Patents, # 3 Appendix Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law) (Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 2, 2019 Filing 271 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Scott L Watson counsel for Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Adding Scott L. Watson as counsel of record for BlackBerry Limited for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attorney Scott L Watson added to party BlackBerry Limited(pty:pla))(Watson, Scott)
August 1, 2019 Filing 270 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Snap's Application for Leave to File Under Seal Documents Related to Snap's Reply In Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims under seal 269 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Reply In Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Answer, # 2 Unredacted Document Exh. VV, # 3 Unredacted Document Exh. WW, # 4 Unredacted Document Exh. YY, # 5 Unredacted Document Exh. ZZ, # 6 Unredacted Document Exh. AAA, # 7 Unredacted Document Exh. BBB, # 8 Unredacted Document Exh. CCC, # 9 Unredacted Document Exh. DDD, # 10 Unredacted Document Exh. EEE, # 11 Unredacted Document Exh. FFF, # 12 Unredacted Document Exh. GGG, # 13 Unredacted Document Exh. HHH, # 14 Unredacted Document Exh. III, # 15 Unredacted Document Exh. JJJ)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 1, 2019 Filing 269 APPLICATION to file document Snap's Application for Leave to File Under Seal Documents Related to Snap's Reply In Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims under seal filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Redacted Reply Memo of P&A ISO Motion for Leave to Amend Answer, # 3 Declaration Decl. of A. Legolvan ISO Snap's Reply ISO Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer, # 4 Exhibit Exh. TT, # 5 Exhibit Exh. UU, # 6 Redacted Document Exh. VV, # 7 Redacted Document Exh. WW, # 8 Exhibit Exh. XX, # 9 Redacted Document Exh. YY, # 10 Redacted Document Exh. ZZ, # 11 Redacted Document Exh. AAA, # 12 Redacted Document Exh. BBB, # 13 Redacted Document Exh. CCC, # 14 Redacted Document Exh. DDD, # 15 Redacted Document Exh. EEE, # 16 Redacted Document Exh. FFF, # 17 Redacted Document Exh. GGG, # 18 Redacted Document Exh. HHH, # 19 Redacted Document Exh. III, # 20 Redacted Document Exh. JJJ, # 21 Exhibit Exh. KKK, # 22 Exhibit Exh. LLL, # 23 Exhibit Exh. MMM, # 24 Exhibit Exh. NNN, # 25 Exhibit Exh. OOO, # 26 Exhibit Exh. PPP)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 1, 2019 Filing 268 DECLARATION of Heidi L. Keefe In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 (U.S. Patent No. 8,279,173) 267 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Keefe, Heidi)
August 1, 2019 Filing 267 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 (U.S. Patent No. 8,279,173) filed by Facebook Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/5/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, # 3 Proposed Order) (Keefe, Heidi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 266 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel THE PRODUCTION OF MATERIAL IN RESPONSE TO BLACKBERRYS REQUESTS FOR ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION 236 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration ISO Suppl. Brief, # 2 Exhibit AA ISO Suppl. Brief, # 3 Exhibit BB ISO Suppl. Brief)(Asperger, James)
July 31, 2019 Filing 265 Facebook Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum re MOTION to Compel THE PRODUCTION OF MATERIAL IN RESPONSE TO BLACKBERRYS REQUESTS FOR ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION 236 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Heidi L. Keefe, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Keefe, Heidi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 264 SEALED DOCUMENT Defendant Snap's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer re APPLICATION to file document Documents Relating to Snap's Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims under seal 242 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, 260 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum SEALED Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Exhibit SEALED Exh. H, # 3 Exhibit SEALED Exh. I, # 4 Exhibit SEALED Exh. J, # 5 Exhibit SEALED Exh. K, # 6 Exhibit SEALED Exh. L, # 7 Exhibit SEALED Exh. M, # 8 Exhibit SEALED Exh. O, # 9 Exhibit SEALED Exh. P, # 10 Exhibit SEALED Exh. Q, # 11 Exhibit SEALED Exh. R, # 12 Exhibit SEALED Exh. S, # 13 Exhibit SEALED Exh. U, # 14 Exhibit SEALED Exh. V, # 15 Exhibit SEALED Exh. W, # 16 Exhibit SEALED Exh. X, # 17 Exhibit SEALED Exh. Y, # 18 Exhibit SEALED Exh. Z, # 19 Exhibit SEALED Exh. AA, # 20 Exhibit SEALED Exh. BB, # 21 Exhibit SEALED Exh. CC, # 22 Exhibit SEALED Exh. DD, # 23 Exhibit SEALED Exh. EE, # 24 Exhibit SEALED Exh. FF, # 25 Exhibit SEALED Exh. GG, # 26 Exhibit SEALED Exh. HH, # 27 Exhibit SEALED Exh. II, # 28 Exhibit SEALED Exh. JJ, # 29 Exhibit SEALED Exh. KK, # 30 Exhibit SEALED Exh. LL, # 31 Exhibit SEALED Exh. MM, # 32 Exhibit SEALED Exh. NN, # 33 Exhibit SEALED Exh. QQ)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
July 31, 2019 Filing 263 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. The telephonic discovery conference is scheduled for Friday, August 2, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. The call-in information has been provided to the participating parties by email. (hr)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER GRANTING BLACKBERRYS APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff BlackBerry Limiteds (Plaintiff or Blackberry) Application to File Documents Under Seal, and the following documents are hereby SEALED: Highlighted portions of BlackBerrys Motion; Highlighted portions of BlackBerrys Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement. See order for details. (shb)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER GRANTING BLACKBERRYS APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff BlackBerry Limiteds (Plaintiff or Blackberry) Application to File Documents Under Seal, and the following documents are hereby SEALED: Highlighted portions of BlackBerrys Motion; Highlighted portions of BlackBerrys Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement. See order for further details. (shb)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SNAP INC.S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEALDOCUMENTS RELATED TO DEFENDANT SNAP INC.S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO BLACKBERRY LIMITEDS COMPLAINT, 242 by Judge George H. Wu: 1. Defendant Snap Inc.s Application for Leave to File Documents Under Seal is GRANTED. See order for further details. (shb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 259 LETTER ROGATORY ISSUED [LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE] re Canada. Letter Rogatory signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (hr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 258 DECLARATION of Matthew J. Brigham In Support of APPLICATION to file document related to Motion of Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement under seal 248 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Brigham, Matthew)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SNAP'S SECOND APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FOR THE ISSUANCE OF LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE 253 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The Court shall execute the submitted Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance with an original signature, to which the clerk shall affix an original seal, which shall then be transmitted to counsel for Defendant Snap. (hr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 256 DECLARATION of Chad Peterman In Support Of APPLICATION to file document related to Motion of Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement under seal 245 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attorney Chad J Peterman added to party Snap Inc (pty:dft))(Peterman, Chad)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER REGARDING HEARINGS ON PENDING MOTIONS by Judge George H. Wu. Motions reset for hearing on 9/5/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) The reply to the Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint remains due on August 1, 2019. All oppositions to the summary judgment motions shall be due on August 8, 2019 and all replies to the summary judgment motions shall be due on August 15, 2019. The reply to Twitter's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint also remains due on August 15, 2019. (mrgo)
July 25, 2019 Filing 254 OPPOSITION to Snap's Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims [Dkt. 242-2] filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of P. Schmidt ISO BlackBerry's Opposition to Snap's Motion for Leave to Amend the Answer and Counterclaims, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37, # 39 Exhibit 38, # 40 Exhibit 39, # 41 Exhibit 40)(Asperger, James)
July 25, 2019 Filing 253 Second REQUEST for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for Request for International Judicial Assistance Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order) (Chaikovsky, Yar)
July 24, 2019 Filing 252 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Documents Relating to Snap's Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims under seal 242 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited.(Flood, Zachary)
July 19, 2019 Filing 251 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, 249 served on July 19, 2019. (Mishra, Pushkal)
July 19, 2019 Filing 250 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, 246 served on July 19, 2019. (Mishra, Pushkal)
July 19, 2019 Filing 249 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document related to Motion of Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement under seal 248 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Motion, # 2 Unredacted Document Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 22, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 23, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 24, # 17 Unredacted Document Schonfeld Declaration, # 18 Unredacted Document Rosenberg Declaration)(Asperger, James)
July 19, 2019 Filing 248 APPLICATION to file document related to Motion of Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement under seal filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Redacted Motion, # 3 Redacted Document Statement of Facts)(Asperger, James)
July 19, 2019 Filing 247 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Infringement of U.S. Patents 8,677,250; 8,279,173; and 9,349,120 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Motion set for hearing on 9/5/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Statement of Fact, # 3 Declaration David Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 22, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 23, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 24, # 28 Redacted Document Schonfeld Declaration, # 29 Redacted Document Rosenberg Declaration) (Asperger, James)
July 18, 2019 Filing 246 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document related to Motion of Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement under seal 245 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Motion, # 2 Unredacted Document Statement of Facts, # 3 Unredacted Document McDaniel Declaration, # 4 Unredacted Document Ex B, # 5 Unredacted Document Ex C, # 6 Unredacted Document Ex F, # 7 Unredacted Document Ex G, # 8 Unredacted Document Ex H, # 9 Unredacted Document Ex I, # 10 Unredacted Document Ex J)(Asperger, James)
July 18, 2019 Filing 245 APPLICATION to file document related to Motion of Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement under seal filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Redacted Motion, # 3 Redacted Document Statement of Facts)(Asperger, James)
July 18, 2019 Filing 244 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Infringement of U.S. Patent 8,825,084 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Motion set for hearing on 9/5/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration Nardinelli Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Ex A, # 5 Exhibit Ex B, # 6 Exhibit Ex C, # 7 Exhibit Ex D, # 8 Exhibit Ex E, # 9 Exhibit Ex F, # 10 Exhibit Ex G, # 11 Exhibit Ex H, # 12 Exhibit Ex I, # 13 Exhibit Ex J, # 14 Exhibit Ex K, # 15 Exhibit Ex L, # 16 Exhibit Ex M, # 17 Redacted Document Redacted Declaration) (Asperger, James)
July 18, 2019 Filing 243 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Documents Relating to Snap's Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims under seal 242 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Snap's Proposed First Amended Answer and Counterclaims, # 2 Unredacted Document Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Snap's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, # 3 Unredacted Document Exh. H, # 4 Unredacted Document Exh. I, # 5 Unredacted Document Exh. J, # 6 Unredacted Document Exh. K, # 7 Unredacted Document Exh. L, # 8 Unredacted Document Exh. M, # 9 Unredacted Document Exh. O, # 10 Unredacted Document Exh. P, # 11 Unredacted Document Exh. Q, # 12 Unredacted Document Exh. R, # 13 Unredacted Document Exh. S, # 14 Unredacted Document Exh. U, # 15 Unredacted Document Exh. V, # 16 Unredacted Document Exh. W, # 17 Unredacted Document Exh. X, # 18 Unredacted Document Exh. Y, # 19 Unredacted Document Exh. Z, # 20 Unredacted Document Exh. AA, # 21 Unredacted Document Exh. BB, # 22 Unredacted Document Exh. CC, # 23 Unredacted Document Exh. DD, # 24 Unredacted Document Exh. EE, # 25 Unredacted Document Exh. FF, # 26 Unredacted Document Exh. GG, # 27 Unredacted Document Exh. HH, # 28 Unredacted Document Exh. II, # 29 Unredacted Document Exh. JJ, # 30 Unredacted Document Exh. KK, # 31 Unredacted Document Exh. LL, # 32 Unredacted Document Exh. MM, # 33 Unredacted Document Exh. NN, # 34 Unredacted Document Exh. QQ)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
July 18, 2019 Filing 242 APPLICATION to file document Documents Relating to Snap's Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims under seal filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Snap's Application for Leave to File Under Seal, # 2 Unredacted Document Snap's Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer and Counterclaims to Blackberry Limited's Complaint, # 3 Unredacted Document Snap's Proposed Amended Answer, # 4 Redacted Document Snap's Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Amend Answer to Complaint, # 5 Unredacted Document Decl. of C. Peterman ISO Snap's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaims, # 6 Redacted Document Exh. A, # 7 Redacted Document Exh. B, # 8 Redacted Document Exh. C, # 9 Redacted Document Exh. D, # 10 Redacted Document Exh. E, # 11 Redacted Document Exh. F, # 12 Redacted Document Exh. G, # 13 Redacted Document Exh. H, # 14 Redacted Document Exh. I, # 15 Redacted Document Exh. J, # 16 Redacted Document Exh. K, # 17 Redacted Document Exh. L, # 18 Redacted Document Exh. M, # 19 Redacted Document Exh. N, # 20 Redacted Document Exh. O, # 21 Redacted Document Exh. P, # 22 Redacted Document Exh. Q, # 23 Redacted Document Exh. R, # 24 Redacted Document Exh. S, # 25 Redacted Document Exh. T, # 26 Redacted Document Exh. U, # 27 Redacted Document Exh. V, # 28 Redacted Document Exh. W, # 29 Redacted Document Exh. X, # 30 Redacted Document Exh. Y, # 31 Redacted Document Exh. Z, # 32 Redacted Document Exh. AA, # 33 Redacted Document Exh. BB, # 34 Redacted Document Exh. CC, # 35 Redacted Document Exh. DD, # 36 Redacted Document Exh. EE, # 37 Redacted Document Exh. FF, # 38 Redacted Document Exh. GG, # 39 Redacted Document Exh. HH, # 40 Redacted Document Exh. II, # 41 Redacted Document Exh. JJ, # 42 Redacted Document Exh. KK, # 43 Redacted Document Exh. LL, # 44 Redacted Document Exh. MM, # 45 Redacted Document Exh. NN, # 46 Redacted Document Exh. OO, # 47 Redacted Document Exh. PP, # 48 Redacted Document Exh. QQ, # 49 Redacted Document Exh. RR, # 50 Redacted Document Exh. SS, # 51 Proposed Order Granting Snap's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
July 17, 2019 Filing 241 DECLARATION of Heidi L. Keefe In Support Of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Motion for Summary Judgement of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 101 of US Patent Nos. 8,296,351, 8,676,929 and 9,349,120 239 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
July 17, 2019 Filing 240 DECLARATION of David T. Okano In Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Motion for Summary Judgement of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 101 of US Patent Nos. 8,296,351, 8,676,929 and 9,349,120 239 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
July 17, 2019 Filing 239 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Motion for Summary Judgement of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 101 of US Patent Nos. 8,296,351, 8,676,929 and 9,349,120 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, Snap Inc, WhatsApp Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Consolidated Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 101 of US Patent Nos. 8,296,351, 8,676,929 and 9,349,120, # 2 Affidavit Defendants' Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Proposed Order) (Chaikovsky, Yar)
July 16, 2019 Filing 238 DECLARATION of Elizabeth L. Stameshkin In Opposition To MOTION to Compel THE PRODUCTION OF MATERIAL IN RESPONSE TO BLACKBERRYS REQUESTS FOR ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION 236 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Q ISO Opp to MTC, # 2 Exhibit R ISO Opp to MTC, # 3 Exhibit S ISO Opp to MTC, # 4 Exhibit T ISO Opp to MTC, # 5 Exhibit U ISO Opp to MTC, # 6 Exhibit V ISO Opp to MTC, # 7 Exhibit W ISO Opp to MTC, # 8 Exhibit)(Asperger, James)
July 16, 2019 Filing 237 DECLARATION of Jeff Nardinelli In Support Of MOTION to Compel THE PRODUCTION OF MATERIAL IN RESPONSE TO BLACKBERRYS REQUESTS FOR ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION 236 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A ISO MTC, # 2 Exhibit B ISO MTC, # 3 Exhibit C ISO MTC, # 4 Exhibit D ISO MTC, # 5 Exhibit E ISO MTC, # 6 Exhibit F ISO MTC, # 7 Exhibit G ISO MTC, # 8 Exhibit H ISO MTC, # 9 Exhibit I ISO MTC, # 10 Exhibit J ISO MTC, # 11 Exhibit K ISO MTC, # 12 Exhibit L ISO MTC, # 13 Exhibit M ISO MTC, # 14 Exhibit N ISO MTC, # 15 Exhibit O ISO MTC, # 16 Exhibit P ISO MTC)(Asperger, James)
July 16, 2019 Filing 236 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel THE PRODUCTION OF MATERIAL IN RESPONSE TO BLACKBERRYS REQUESTS FOR ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION filed by plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Motion set for hearing on 8/14/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (Asperger, James)
July 16, 2019 Filing 235 NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF MATERIAL IN RESPONSE TO BLACKBERRYS REQUESTS FOR ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION filed by plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Asperger, James)
July 15, 2019 Filing 234 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Iman Lordgooei counsel for Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Adding Iman Lordgooei as counsel of record for BlackBerry Limited for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attorney Iman Lordgooei added to party BlackBerry Limited(pty:pla))(Lordgooei, Iman)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date 232 . (Fact Discovery cut-off 8/30/2019.)(Summary Judgment and Daubert Opposition due by 12/13/2019. Summary Judgment and Daubert due by 12/20/2019.) (See document for additional deadlines) (mrgo)
July 11, 2019 Filing 232 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to August 30, 2019 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Modifying Scheduling Order)(Asperger, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 231 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H. Wu: striking MOTIONS 226 227 229 . See document for details. (jag)
July 9, 2019 Filing 230 DECLARATION of Heidi L. Keefe In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 (U.S. Patent No. 9,349,120) 229 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Keefe, Heidi)
July 9, 2019 Filing 229 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 (U.S. Patent No. 9,349,120) filed by Facebook Defendants' Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, # 3 Proposed Order) (Keefe, Heidi)
July 9, 2019 Filing 228 DECLARATION of Heidi L. Keefe In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 (U.S. Patent Nos. 8,296,351 and 8,676,929) 226 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A, # 2 Exhibit 1B, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, Part 1, # 8 Exhibit 6, Part 2, # 9 Exhibit 7, Part 1, # 10 Exhibit 7, Part 2, # 11 Exhibit 7, Part 3, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14, # 19 Exhibit 15)(Keefe, Heidi)
July 9, 2019 Filing 227 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 101 of US Patent Nos. 8,296,351 and 8,676,929 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorites, # 2 Appendix Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions, # 3 Affidavit Decl. of David Okano, # 4 Exhibit Exh. A, # 5 Exhibit Exh. B, # 6 Exhibit Exh. C, # 7 Exhibit Exh. D, # 8 Exhibit Exh. E, # 9 Exhibit Exh. F, # 10 Exhibit Exh. G, # 11 Exhibit Exh. H, # 12 Exhibit Exh. I, # 13 Exhibit Exh. J, # 14 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Chaikovsky, Yar)
July 9, 2019 Filing 226 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 (U.S. Patent Nos. 8,296,351 and 8,676,929) filed by Facebook Defendants' Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, # 3 Proposed Order) (Keefe, Heidi)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 224 Non-Resident Attorney Dawn M David APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of BlackBerry Limited, designating Patrick Schmidt as local counsel. (lom)
July 1, 2019 Filing 224 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dawn M. David to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 7/1/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24016170) filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Schmidt, Patrick)
June 26, 2019 Filing 223 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) 222 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incomplete docket text; missing name of event and text content. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 26, 2019 Filing 222 (Attorney Andrew M. Legolvan added to party Snap Inc (pty:dft))(Legolvan, Andrew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 221 COMPACT DISC Order Court will contact Micheal Gordon at michael.gordon@fraresearch.com with any questions regarding this order. Hearing Date: 6/10/19. FEE PAID. (ha)
June 19, 2019 Filing 220 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/10/19 re Transcript 219 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 19, 2019 Filing 219 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on (626) 963-0566. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/10/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2019. (ha)
June 12, 2019 Filing 218 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Michelle Garcia at michellegarcia@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Flood, Zachary)
June 11, 2019 Filing 217 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Facebook, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Liz Stameshkin at lstameshkin@cooley.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Stameshkin, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2019 Filing 216 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE RE: FACEBOOK'S PRODUCTION OF CERTAIN ESI held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, re Joint Report Regarding Facebook's Production of Certain ESI 213 . (1) Within two weeks, Plaintiff will complete its review of the remaining Zuckerberg documents identified in the de-duped set of approximately 950 documents collected as potentially responsive to discovery requests concerning Mr. Zuckerberg's Wall Street Journal op-ed article. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 06/10//2019. (hr)
May 24, 2019 Filing 214 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer re the tentative schedule issued on May 15, 2019 209 . The Court adopts the dates as final. Court Reporter: Terri A Hourigan. (jp)
May 23, 2019 Filing 215 **AMENDED MINUTES** held before Judge George H. Wu re: Status Conference - optional html form, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Link Non-Motion Documents to Minutes 214 . (Amended as to hearing date) (mrgo)
May 23, 2019 Filing 213 STATEMENT (Joint) re: Order on Motion for Order re Discovery Matter,,,,, Discovery Hearing,,,, 201 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brigham, Matthew)
May 23, 2019 Filing 212 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The following call-in information may be used for hearing set for this morning at 9:30 a.m. Tel No. 888-278-0296; Access Code: 9637949. Please contact clerk via email to confirm appearances. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 22, 2019 Filing 211 SNAP INC. TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFLICTS filed by Defendant Snap Inc re: Text Only Scheduling Notice, 210 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Putnam Re Trial Scheduling Conflicts)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
May 17, 2019 Filing 210 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Pursuant to the request of defense counsel, the STATUS CONFERENCE previously scheduled for 05/20/2019 is CONTINUED to 5/23/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu. After review of the parties' Joint Report regarding the setting of future dates, the Court adopts the following tentative schedule. The parties are ordered to appear telephonically on May 20, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. to discuss the schedule. (mrgo)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PARTIES' CASE NARROWING ELECTIONS by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Reschedule 207 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT that the deadline for Plaintiff's final election of claims is extended to May 31, 2019. The deadline for Defendants' final election of prior art is extended to June 14, 2019. (mrgo)
May 13, 2019 Filing 207 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Deadlines for Final Election of Asserted Claims and Asserted Prior Art filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
May 13, 2019 Filing 206 STATEMENT Joint Report Regarding Case Schedule filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited (Asperger, James)
May 13, 2019 Filing 205 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 5/9/19 3:00 P.M. re Transcript 204 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 13, 2019 Filing 204 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/9/19 3:00 p.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS CERTIFIED TRANCRIPTON, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2019. (ha)
May 10, 2019 Filing 203 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Michelle Garcia at michellegarcia@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Flood, Zachary)
May 9, 2019 Filing 202 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Jocelyn McIntosh at jmcintosh@cooley.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Keefe, Heidi)
May 9, 2019 Filing 201 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE RE:DEFENDANT'S PRODUCTION OF CERTAIN ESI1 held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The Court ORDERS that within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, Facebook will make available the on-site computer for Plaintiff to review the results of the searches identified above. This ORDER is without prejudice to Plaintiff's ability to seek further production of documents or Defendant's right to object to any additional demands for production. Within (14) days of the date of this Order, the Parties shall file a joint discovery status report of no more than ten (10) pages regarding their positions as to: (1) the results of the initial searches and review; (2) an appropriate format for production of responsive Zuckerberg materials; and (3) any proposed modifications to the existing Protective Order. In the joint discovery report, the Parties must provide to three (3) proposed dates for a further telephonic conference with the Court. 180 (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION) Court Recorder: XTR- 05/09/2019. (gr)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR CASE SCHEDULING REPORT AND PARTIES' CASE NARROWING ELECTIONS 178 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT that the deadline for the parties Joint Scheduling Report is extended to May 13, 2019. The deadline for Plaintiff's final election of claims is extended to May 13, 2019. The deadline for Defendants' final election of prior art is extended to May 28, 2019. (lom)
May 7, 2019 Filing 199 LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE Issued: signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re: Canada, Ontario. (hr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 198 LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE Issued: signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re: Canada, Ontario. (hr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 197 LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE Issued: signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re: Canada, Ontario. (hr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 196 LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE Issued: signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re: Canada, Ontario. (hr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 195 LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE Issued: signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re: Canada, Ontario. (hr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 194 LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE Issued: signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re: Canada, Ontario. (hr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 193 LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE Issued: signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re: Canada, Ontario. (hr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 192 LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE Issued: signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re: Canada, Ontario. (hr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 191 LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE Issued: signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re: Canada, Ontario. (hr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 190 LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE Issued: signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re: Canada, Ontario. (hr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 189 LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE Issued: signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re: Canada, Ontario. (hr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 188 LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE Issued: signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re: Canada, Ontario. (hr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 187 LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE Issued: signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re: Canada, Ontario. (hr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 186 LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE Issued: signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re: Canada, Ontario. (hr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 185 LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE Issued: signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re: The People's Republic of China. (hr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 184 LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE Issued: signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re: Finland. (hr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 183 LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE Issued: signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re: Canada, Ontario. (hr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 182 LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE Issued: signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re: Canada, Quebec. (hr)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' AMENDED APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FOR THE ISSUANCE OF LETTERS OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE 177 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The Court shall execute each submitted Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance with an original signature, to which the clerk shall affix an original seal, which shall then be transmitted to counsel for Defendants. (see document for further details); APPLICATION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory 164 terminated. (hr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 180 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE (hr)
May 3, 2019 Filing 179 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION Amended APPLICATION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for International Judicial Assistance 177 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. STATEMENT OF NONOPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF LETTERS OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE (Asperger, James)
May 3, 2019 Filing 178 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Case Scheduling Report filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
May 3, 2019 Filing 177 Amended APPLICATION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for International Judicial Assistance Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, Snap Inc, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Proposed Order) (Attorney Yar R Chaikovsky added to party Facebook, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Yar R Chaikovsky added to party Instagram, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Yar R Chaikovsky added to party WhatsApp Inc.(pty:dft)) (Chaikovsky, Yar)
May 3, 2019 Filing 176 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daryl Stuart Bartow counsel for Defendant Snap Inc. Adding D. Stuart Bartow as counsel of record for Snap Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Snap Inc.. (Attorney Daryl Stuart Bartow added to party Snap Inc (pty:dft))(Bartow, Daryl)
May 2, 2019 Filing 175 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kenneth M Fitzgerald counsel for Defendant Snap Inc. Adding Kenneth M. Fitzgerald as counsel of record for Snap Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Snap Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Fitzgerald, Kenneth)
May 2, 2019 Filing 174 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Keith M Cochran counsel for Defendant Snap Inc. Adding Keith M. Cochran as counsel of record for Snap Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Snap Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Cochran, Keith)
May 1, 2019 Filing 173 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance 172 , Notice of Appearance 171 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 1, 2019 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kenneth M Fitzgerald on behalf of Defendant Snap Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Kenneth M Fitzgerald added to party Snap Inc (pty:dft))(Fitzgerald, Kenneth)
May 1, 2019 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Keith M Cochran on behalf of Defendant Snap Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Keith M Cochran added to party Snap Inc (pty:dft))(Cochran, Keith)
April 26, 2019 Filing 170 NOTICE Withdrawing Pre-Institution Motion to Stay in View of Court's Guidance filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, Snap Inc, WhatsApp Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi)
April 24, 2019 Filing 169 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Michelle Garcia at michellegarcia@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Flood, Zachary)
April 24, 2019 Filing 168 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Snap Inc for Court Reporter. Court will contact Nikole Faasisila at nikolefaasisila@paulhastings.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Chaikovsky, Yar)
April 23, 2019 Filing 167 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Jocelyn McIntosh at jmcintosh@cooley.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Keefe, Heidi)
April 22, 2019 Filing 166 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court's Initial Thoughts regarding Joint Report is circulated and attached hereto. Counsel are to file a joint report by May 6, 2019. Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review 161 , set for hearing on May 16, 2019, is continued to May 20, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
April 18, 2019 Filing 165 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David M Beckwith counsel for Defendant Snap Inc. Adding David M. Beckwith as counsel of record for Snap Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Snap Inc.. (Attorney David M Beckwith added to party Snap Inc (pty:dft))(Beckwith, David)
April 17, 2019 Filing 164 APPLICATION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for International Judicial Assistance filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, Snap Inc, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Proposed Order) (Chaikovsky, Yar)
April 16, 2019 Filing 163 DECLARATION of Chad J. Peterman in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Inter Partes Review 161 filed by Defendant Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 26, # 2 Exhibit 27, # 3 Exhibit 28, # 4 Exhibit 29, # 5 Exhibit 30, # 6 Exhibit 31, # 7 Exhibit 32, # 8 Exhibit 33, # 9 Exhibit 34, # 10 Exhibit 35, # 11 Exhibit 36, # 12 Exhibit 37, # 13 Exhibit 38)(Brigham, Matthew)
April 16, 2019 Filing 162 DECLARATION of Matthew J. Brigham Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Inter Partes Review 161 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, Snap Inc, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25)(Brigham, Matthew)
April 16, 2019 Filing 161 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Inter Partes Review filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, Snap Inc, WhatsApp Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/16/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Proposed Order) (Keefe, Heidi)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER REGARDING JOINT STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party 159 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT all claims asserted against Instagram, Inc. shall be dismissed, without prejudice, from this action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(l)(A)(ii). Instagram, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) and Instagram, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) terminated. (mrgo)
April 12, 2019 Filing 159 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Instagram, Inc. filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
April 11, 2019 Filing 158 STATEMENT Joint Statement Regarding Scheduling filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited (Asperger, James)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - CORRECTED FINAL RULING ON CLAIMCONSTRUCTION/MARKMAN HEARING by Judge George H. Wu. Attached hereto is the Court's Corrected Final Ruling on Claim Construction/Markman Hearing. (lom)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - FINAL RULING ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION/MARKMAN HEARING by Judge George H. Wu. Attached hereto is the Courts Final Ruling on Claim Construction/Markman Hearing. (mrgo)
April 5, 2019 Filing 155 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - Final Ruling on Claim Construction/Markman Hearing by Judge George H. Wu. Court would DENY BlackBerry's Motion to Strike (Docket No. 134). (See document for details) (mrgo)
April 3, 2019 Filing 154 NOTICE of Lodging filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Markman Rebuttal Slides)(Asperger, James)
April 2, 2019 Filing 153 NOTICE filed by Defendant Snap Inc. Snap Inc.'s Notice of Lodging (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F - Part 1, # 7 Exhibit F - Part 2, # 8 Exhibit F - Part 3, # 9 Exhibit F - Part 4, # 10 Exhibit F - Part 5, # 11 Exhibit F - Part 6)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
April 2, 2019 Filing 151 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Michelle Garcia at michellegarcia@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Flood, Zachary)
April 2, 2019 Filing 150 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Jocelyn McIntosh at jmcintosh@cooley.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Keefe, Heidi)
April 2, 2019 Filing 149 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Snap Inc for Court Reporter. Court will contact Nikole Faasisila at nikolefaasisila@paulhastings.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Chaikovsky, Yar)
April 1, 2019 Filing 152 MINUTES OF MARKMAN HEARING held before Judge George H. Wu: The Courts Tentative Ruling on Claim Construction/Markman Hearing is circulated and attachedhereto. Oral argument is held. The Court takes the matter under submission. Court to issue ruling. A status conference is set for April 22, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are to file a joint scheduling report by April 11, 2019. Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (shb)
April 1, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Notice of Lodging of Provisional Patent Application (Attachments: # 1 Provisional Application No. 60/525,958)(Asperger, James)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO STRIKE BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Expedite 139 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall comply with the following briefing schedule regarding BlackBerry's Motion to Strike (Dkt. 134): Facebook will file a six-page responsive brief by close of business on March 28, 2019. BlackBerry will not submit a reply brief. (mrgo)
March 28, 2019 Filing 146 STATUS REPORT In Response To Court's Minute Order filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Asperger, James)
March 28, 2019 Filing 145 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Pushkal Mishra counsel for Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Adding Pushkal Mishra as counsel of record for Blackberry Limited for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Blackberry Limited. (Attorney Pushkal Mishra added to party BlackBerry Limited(pty:pla))(Mishra, Pushkal)
March 28, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance 141 , Notice of Appearance 142 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
March 28, 2019 Filing 143 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: In the parties' March 26, 2019 Joint Statement, Snap stated that it would "provide BlackBerry with a further proposal regarding the... 'meta tag for one or more advertisements to be displayed with the content information' term of '929 Patent and anticipates providing the Court with an additional status update regarding the term by March 27, 2019." Docket No. 135 at 5. No status update for the term was filed on March 27, 2019. To the extent Snap and BlackBerry were not already planning to do so, the Court requests that the parties also provide their update for this term in the joint report due at 3:00pm today. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 28, 2019 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David T Okano on behalf of Defendant Snap Inc (Attorney David T Okano added to party Snap Inc (pty:dft))(Okano, David)
March 28, 2019 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Yar R Chaikovsky on behalf of Defendant Snap Inc (Attorney Yar R Chaikovsky added to party Snap Inc (pty:dft))(Chaikovsky, Yar)
March 28, 2019 Filing 140 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Declaration of Jonathan Katz 134 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi)
March 27, 2019 Filing 139 Joint STIPULATION to Expedite Briefing re BlackBerry's Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H. Wu: Attached hereto is the Court's Order Regarding Parties March 26, 2019 Joint Statement Regarding Disputed Claim Terms. (jag)
March 26, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/21/19 1:40 pm re Transcript 136 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 26, 2019 Filing 136 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/21/19 1:40 pm. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
March 26, 2019 Filing 135 STATEMENT Joint Statement Regarding Disputed Claim Terms filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited (Asperger, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 134 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Declaration of Jonathan Katz filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Motion set for hearing on 4/1/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E) (Asperger, James)
March 22, 2019 Filing 132 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Jocelyn McIntosh at jmcintosh@cooley.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Keefe, Heidi)
March 22, 2019 Filing 131 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Michelle Garcia at michellegarcia@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Flood, Zachary)
March 21, 2019 Filing 133 MINUTES OF TUTORIAL HEARING: Tutorial hearing is held before Judge George H. Wu: Parties are set to return on April 1, 2019 for Markman Hearing. Defendant Snap, Inc. is to be added as a Defendant in this action. Counsel for Snap, Inc. will enter their appearance once this is done by the Clerks Office. Court Reporter: Katie E Thibodeaux. (shb)
March 20, 2019 Filing 130 **AMENDED** TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The time to appear at the TUTORIAL HEARING presently set for March 21, 2019, is changed from 8:30 a.m. to 1:45 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 19, 2019 Filing 129 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The time to appear at the TUTORIAL HEARING presently set for March 21, 2019, is changed from 8:30 a.m. to 10:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 18, 2019 Filing 128 BlackBerry's Technology Tutorial and Claim Construction Presentation filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited (Attachments: # 1 Technology Tutorial, # 2 Claim Construction Presentation, Part 1, # 3 Claim Construction Presentation, Part 2)(Asperger, James)
March 18, 2019 Filing 127 Defendants' Tutorial and Claim Construction Presentation (Common Patents) filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc. and Snap Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A, Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A, Part 4)(Keefe, Heidi)
March 18, 2019 Filing 126 Defendants' Tutorial and Claim Construction Presentation (Facebook-Only Patents) filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Keefe, Heidi)
March 18, 2019 Filing 125 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limitedto Brief (non-motion non-appeal) 117 , Brief (non-motion non-appeal) 119 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Almeroth (Rebuttal), # 2 Declaration of Joseph LaViola (Rebuttal), # 3 Declaration of Patrick McDaniel (Rebuttal), # 4 Declaration of Craig Rosenberg (Rebuttal), # 5 Declaration of Aviel Rubin (Rebuttal), # 6 Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli, # 7 Exhibit 120.1, # 8 Exhibit 327.1, # 9 Exhibit 351.1, # 10 Exhibit 351.2, # 11 Exhibit 351.3, # 12 Exhibit 634.3, # 13 Exhibit 634.4, # 14 Exhibit 635.5, # 15 Exhibit 929.1)(Asperger, James)
March 18, 2019 Filing 124 DECLARATION of Matthew J. Brigham re Response, 123 in Support of Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Common Patents) filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Brigham, Matthew)
March 18, 2019 Filing 123 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.to Brief (non-motion non-appeal),, 116 Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc. and Snap Inc. Responsive Claim Construction Brief {Common Patents{ (Keefe, Heidi)
March 18, 2019 Filing 122 DECLARATION of Matthew J. Brigham re Response 121 in Support of Facebook Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Facebook-Only Patents) filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Brigham, Matthew)
March 18, 2019 Filing 121 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.to Brief (non-motion non-appeal),, 116 Facebook Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Facebook-Only Patents) (Keefe, Heidi)
February 28, 2019 Filing 120 DECLARATION of Matthew J. Brigham re Brief (non-motion non-appeal) 119 in Support of Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief for Common Patents filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25)(Brigham, Matthew)
February 28, 2019 Filing 119 BRIEF filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., WhatsApp Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC and Snap Inc. Facebook, Inc.. Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief for Common Patents (Keefe, Heidi)
February 28, 2019 Filing 118 DECLARATION of Matthew J. Brigham re Brief (non-motion non-appeal) 117 Facebook Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief (Facebook-Only Patents) filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Brigham, Matthew)
February 28, 2019 Filing 117 BRIEF filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC and WhatsApp Inc. Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. Opening Claim Construction Brief (Facebook-Only Patents) (Keefe, Heidi)
February 28, 2019 Filing 116 BRIEF filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Opening Brief on Claim Construction (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli, # 2 Exhibit 634.1, # 3 Exhibit 634.2, # 4 Exhibit 713.1, # 5 Exhibit 961.1, # 6 Exhibit 961.2, # 7 Exhibit 961.3, # 8 Exhibit 961.4, # 9 Exhibit 961.5, # 10 Exhibit 961.6, # 11 Exhibit 961.7, # 12 Exhibit 961.8, # 13 Exhibit 961.9, # 14 Exhibit 961.10, # 15 Exhibit 961.11, # 16 Exhibit 961.12, # 17 Exhibit 961.13, # 18 Exhibit 961.14, # 19 Exhibit A)(Asperger, James)
February 25, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/10/18 8:59 am; 11/8/18 9:45 am; 1/10/19 9:18 am re Transcript 114 , 113 , 112 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 25, 2019 Filing 114 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 01/10/19 9:18 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
February 25, 2019 Filing 113 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/8/18 9:45 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
February 25, 2019 Filing 112 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/10/18 8:59 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2019. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS- ORDER REGARDING JOINT CLAIMCONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT by Judge George H. Wu:Attached hereto is the Courts Order Regarding Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement. (yl)
February 14, 2019 Filing 110 STATEMENT Joint Claim Construction Prehearing Statement filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Asperger, James)
February 5, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrew Mace on behalf of Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc. (Attorney Andrew Mace added to party Facebook, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Mace added to party Instagram, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Mace added to party Instagram, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Mace added to party WhatsApp Inc.(pty:dft))(Mace, Andrew)
January 23, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Patrick Schmidt on behalf of Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited (Attorney Patrick Schmidt added to party BlackBerry Limited(pty:pla))(Schmidt, Patrick)
January 11, 2019 Filing 105 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Brian Day at brianday@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Flood, Zachary)
January 10, 2019 Filing 107 AMENDED MINUTES held before Judge George H. Wu re: Status Conference - optional html form, 106 . Court and counsel discuss terms for construction. Counsel are to file a joint document re terms by February 14, 2019. Court to issue its ruling by February 21, 2019. (mrgo)
January 10, 2019 Filing 106 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Counsel are to file a joint document re terms by February 21, 2019. Court to issue its ruling by February 21, 2019. The Court extends the claim construction opening brief to February 28, 2019. Responsive brief to be filed by March 18, 2019. Claim Construction Hearing remains set for April 1, 2019. Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
January 10, 2019 Filing 104 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Brian Day at brianday@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Flood, Zachary)
January 10, 2019 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., WhatsApp Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Jocelyn McIntosh at jmcintosh@cooley.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Keefe, Heidi)
January 7, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Dena Chen on behalf of Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc. (Attorney Dena Chen added to party Facebook, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Dena Chen added to party Instagram, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Dena Chen added to party Instagram, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Dena Chen added to party WhatsApp Inc.(pty:dft))(Chen, Dena)
January 7, 2019 Filing 101 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Jaffe, Jordan)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATED ORDER GOVERNING THE PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Protective Order 98 . (See document for details) (mrgo)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 (AMENDED) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Protective Order 98 . (See document for details) (mrgo)
December 12, 2018 Filing 98 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Protective Order, # 2 Proposed Order ESI, # 3 Proof of Service)(Asperger, James)
November 26, 2018 Filing 97 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Zachary Christian Flood counsel for Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Adding Zachary Flood as counsel of record for BlackBerry Limited for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Blackberry Limited. (Attorney Zachary Christian Flood added to party BlackBerry Limited(pty:pla))(Flood, Zachary)
November 13, 2018 Filing 95 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey William Nardinelli counsel for Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Adding Jeff W. Nardinelli as counsel of record for Blackberry Limited for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Blackberry Limited. (Attorney Jeffrey William Nardinelli added to party BlackBerry Limited(pty:pla))(Nardinelli, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2018 Filing 96 **AMENDED MINUTES** held before Judge George H. Wu re: Status Conference - optional html form, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, 94 . The Court adopts the remainder of parties proposed schedule as reflected in Docket 93. (mrgo)
November 8, 2018 Filing 94 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets the following: Tutorial Hearing March 21, 2019 at 8:30 a.m., Claim Construction Hearing April 1, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Defendants' request for a further status conference is granted. The status conference is continued to January 10, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are to file a joint status report by noon on January 7, 2019. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
November 1, 2018 Filing 93 STATUS REPORT (Joint) filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Asperger, James)
September 27, 2018 Filing 92 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court consolidates this action with BlackBerry Limited v. Snap Inc., CV 18-2693-GW(KSx) for pretrial purposes only. Court and counsel discuss scheduling. The Court adopts the Updated Joint Case Scheduling Report 88 . Pursuant to the request of Defendants, the Court sets a status conference for November 8, 2018 at 8:30 a.m., with a joint status report to be filed by November 1, 2018. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
September 26, 2018 Filing 90 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear at the scheduling conference on 09/26/2018 by telephone. If counsel would like to appear by telephone, contact the clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge George H. Wu re Stipulation for Order 87 . (See document for details) (mrgo)
September 25, 2018 Filing 89 ANSWER to Counterclaim (Dkt. 80) filed by Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant BlackBerry Limited.(Asperger, James)
September 21, 2018 Filing 88 STATEMENT Updated Joint Case Scheduling Report filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited (Asperger, James)
September 21, 2018 Filing 87 Joint STIPULATION for Order [Proposed] Protective Order filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
September 12, 2018 Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Jonathan Reyes at jonathanreyes@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Jaffe, Jordan)
September 11, 2018 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., WhatsApp Inc. for Court Reporter. (Keefe, Heidi)
September 10, 2018 Filing 84 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court's Tentative Re Parties' Scheduling Disputes is circulated and attached hereto. Court and counsel discuss scheduling. The Court continues the scheduling conference to September 27, 2018 at 8:30 a.m., with each side filing their position by September 21, 2018. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lom)
September 9, 2018 Filing 83 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth Lee Stameshkin counsel for Counter Claimants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc., Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. Adding Elizabeth L. Stameshkin as counsel of record for Facebook, Inc., WhatsApp Inc., Instagram, LLC, Instagram, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc.. (Attorney Elizabeth Lee Stameshkin added to party Facebook, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Stameshkin added to party Facebook, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Stameshkin added to party Instagram, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Stameshkin added to party Instagram, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Stameshkin added to party Instagram, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Stameshkin added to party Instagram, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Stameshkin added to party WhatsApp Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Lee Stameshkin added to party WhatsApp Inc.(pty:cc))(Stameshkin, Elizabeth)
September 8, 2018 Filing 82 STATEMENT JOINT CASE SCHEDULING REPORT filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Asperger, James)
September 6, 2018 Filing 81 NOTICE Joint Notice of Updated Position on Protective Order Dispute filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Brigham, Matthew)
September 4, 2018 COUNTERCLAIM against counter defendant BlackBerry Limited; Jury Demand, filed by defendants and counter-claimants Instagram, Inc., WhatsApp Inc., Instagram, LLC, Facebook, Inc. [Filed with Answer re doc. no. 80] (mrgo)
September 4, 2018 Filing 80 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, 15 JURY DEMAND. and Counterclaims filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc..(Keefe, Heidi)
September 4, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE Joint Statement Re: Case Narrowing Proposals filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Asperger, James)
August 31, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE Joint Notice of Submission of Parties Positions Re: Protective Order Disputes filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 - Parties Joint Submission of Dispute Positions, # 2 BlackBerry Ex. 1, # 3 BlackBerry Ex. 2, # 4 BlackBerry Ex. 3, # 5 BlackBerry Ex. 4, # 6 BlackBerry Ex. 5, # 7 BlackBerry Ex. 6, # 8 BlackBerry Ex. 7, # 9 BlackBerry Ex. 8, # 10 Facebook Ex. A, # 11 Facebook Ex. B, # 12 Facebook Ex. C, # 13 Facebook Ex. D)(Asperger, James)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER REGARDING PATENT LOCAL RULES by Judge George H. Wu. Attached hereto is the Court's Order Regarding Patent Local Rules. The Court sets the Claim Construction Hearing for February 21, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. (mrgo)
August 31, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE Joint Notice re: Submission of Proposed Stipulated Protective Order filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Asperger, James)
August 27, 2018 Filing 75 STATEMENT Joint Notice re Adoption of Patent Rules filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Asperger, James)
August 24, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/2/18 9:09 am; 8/23/18 9:03 am re Transcript 72 , 71 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Thibodeaux, Katie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 24, 2018 Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/23/18 9:03 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2018. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
August 24, 2018 Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/2/18 9:09 am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2018. (Thibodeaux, Katie)
August 23, 2018 Filing 74 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Counsel are to file a protective order by August 30, 2018, and will advise the Court by August 27, 2018 which set of Local Rules they choose. The Markman Hearing will tentatively be set for the end of January 2019. The Scheduling Conference is continued to September 10, 2018 at 9:00 a.m., with a joint statement on how parties propose to limit asserted claims and proposed scheduling dates by noon on September 4, 2018. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
August 23, 2018 Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Jocelyn McIntosh at jmcintosh@cooley.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Keefe, Heidi)
August 23, 2018 Filing 69 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff BlackBerry Limited for Court Reporter. Court will contact Jonathan Reyes at jonathanreyes@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Jaffe, Jordan)
August 21, 2018 Filing 68 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - FINAL RULING ON FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 31 by Judge George H. Wu. Attached hereto is the Court's Final Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Court would GRANT Snap's Motion with prejudice as to Claims 1, 5, and 9 of the '713 Patent. The Court would GRANT both Defendants' Motions as to BlackBerry's willful infringement and indirect infringement allegations, with leave for BlackBerry to amend its allegations regarding indirect infringement. The Court would otherwise DENY Defendants' Motions without prejudice. (mrgo)
August 15, 2018 Filing 67 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 31 [Second Supplement] filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Keefe, Heidi)
August 2, 2018 Filing 66 MINUTES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 31 ; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court's Tentative Ruling is circulated and attached hereto. Court hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, Defendant's Motion is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION, and continued to August 23, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. Court to issue ruling. The Scheduling Conference is continued to August 23, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lom)
August 2, 2018 Filing 65 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin P B Johnson counsel for Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Adding Ray R. Zado as counsel of record for BlackBerry Limited for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Johnson, Kevin)
July 26, 2018 Filing 64 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 8-10 days, filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Asperger, James)
July 23, 2018 Filing 63 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 31 Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Keefe, Heidi)
July 16, 2018 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc., served on 07/16/2018. (Keefe, Heidi)
July 16, 2018 Filing 61 SEALED REPLY RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 31 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 60 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc..(Keefe, Heidi)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge George H. Wu re: 57 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
July 12, 2018 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc., served on 07/12/2018. (Brigham, Matthew)
July 12, 2018 Filing 58 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Reply to Motion to Dismiss under seal 57 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Unredacted Reply)(Brigham, Matthew)
July 12, 2018 Filing 57 APPLICATION to file document Reply to Motion to Dismiss under seal filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document)(Brigham, Matthew)
July 2, 2018 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff BlackBerry Limited, re Sealed Document, 55 served on July 2, 2018. (Asperger, James)
July 2, 2018 Filing 55 SEALED DOCUMENT Unredacted Version of BlackBerry Limited's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 31 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 54 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited.(Asperger, James)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER RE BLACKBERRY LIMITED'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS RELATED TO ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge George H. Wu re: 49 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RE BLACKBERRY LIMITED'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS RELATED TO ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge George H. Wu re: 48 APPLICATION for Leave to File. (mrgo)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RE REQUEST TO CONSOLIDATE BRIEFING ON BLACKBERRY'S OPPOSITIONS TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge George H. Wu re: 45 REQUEST for Leave to File Excess Pages. Having considered the stipulation and for good cause, the Court hereby ORDERS that BlackBerry may file a consolidated brief on issues common to Defendants' motions to dismiss not to exceed 21 pages; and separate opposition briefs on other issues, not to exceed 9 pages for Snap and 6 pages for the Facebook Defendants. (mrgo)
June 28, 2018 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff BlackBerry Limited, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, 50 served on June 28, 2018. (Asperger, James)
June 28, 2018 Filing 50 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document BlackBerry Limited's Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss under seal 49 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document)(Asperger, James)
June 28, 2018 Filing 49 APPLICATION to file document BlackBerry Limited's Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss under seal filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document, # 2 Proposed Order)(Asperger, James)
June 28, 2018 Filing 48 APPLICATION for Leave to file document BlackBerry Limited's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss under seal filed by plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document, # 2 Proposed Order) (Asperger, James)
June 28, 2018 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 31 (Consolidated Opposition) filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Asperger, James)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - RE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY FRCP 26(a) PRELIMINARY DISCLOSURES, FRCP 26(f) REPORT, DISCOVERY, AND SCHEDULING ORDER (CV 18-01844, DKT. 43-1; CV 18-02693, DKT. 31) by Judge George H. Wu: The Court finds good cause exists to set the Scheduling Conference in this matter for the same day as the hearing on the motion to dismiss, 8/2/2018 at 08:30 AM. This means that the parties discovery obligations will begin 21 days earlier. The Court expects the parties to work together and continue to make best efforts to resolve their disputes regarding discovery with minimal Court involvement. (jp)
June 27, 2018 Filing 45 Joint REQUEST to Exceed Page Limitation through Consolidated Briefing on BlackBerry's Oppositions to Motions to Dismiss filed by plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Jaffe, Jordan)
June 26, 2018 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending FRCP 26(a) Preliminary Disclosures, FRCP 26(f) Report, Discovery and Scheduling Order 43 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit)(Asperger, James)
June 26, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending FRCP 26(a) Preliminary Disclosures, FRCP 26(f) Report, Discovery and Scheduling Order filed by Defendants' Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Proposed Order) (Brigham, Matthew)
June 26, 2018 Filing 42 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Stay Order (other), 39 filed by Defendants' Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Brigham, Matthew)
June 25, 2018 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jordan R Jaffe counsel for Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Adding Jordan R. Jaffe as counsel of record for BlackBerry Limited for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Jordan R. Jaffe. (Attorney Jordan R Jaffe added to party BlackBerry Limited(pty:pla))(Jaffe, Jordan)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE JOINT REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall comply with the following briefing schedule: Defendants Facebook, Inc., WhatsApp, Inc., Instagrain Inc., and Instagram LLC, (collectively "Defendants") will file a Motion to Stay not to exceed five pages; Plaintiff Blackberry will respond to the motion within 5 days, not to exceed five pages. (mrgo)
June 21, 2018 Filing 39 [DOCUMENT WITHDRAW PER DOC. NO. 42] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending FRCP 26(a) Preliminary Disclosures, FRCP 26(f) Report, Discovery and Scheduling Order filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration Matthew J. Brigham, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Proposed Order) (Brigham, Matthew) Modified on 6/27/2018 (mrgo).
June 21, 2018 Filing 38 Joint REQUEST to Expedite Briefing re Defendants' Motion to Stay filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Brigham, Matthew)
June 11, 2018 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants' Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc., re Sealed Document, 36 served on June 11, 2018. (Keefe, Heidi)
June 11, 2018 Filing 36 SEALED DOCUMENT Unredacted Version of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Unredacted Exhibit A to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 31 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, 35 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document)(Keefe, Heidi)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 32 by Judge George H. Wu. The following documents shall be filed under seal or in redacted form: Unredacted version of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss - Identified portions of pages 23 and 24; Exhibit A to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice - Entire document. (lom)
June 7, 2018 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants' Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc., re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, 33 served on June 7, 2018. (Brigham, Matthew)
June 7, 2018 Filing 33 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice under seal 32 filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Unredacted Document Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice)(Brigham, Matthew)
June 7, 2018 Filing 32 APPLICATION to file document Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice under seal filed by Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Redacted Document Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Proposed Order)(Brigham, Matthew)
June 7, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants' Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/2/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Redacted Document Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, # 4 Proposed Order) (Keefe, Heidi)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, 29 . Having considered the stipulation and for good cause, the Court hereby EXTENDS the time for Defendants to respond to the first amended complaint and APPROVES the following briefing schedule with respect to Defendants planned motion to dismiss: 1. Motion shall be filed by: June 7, 2018; 2. Opposition due: June 28, 2018; 3. Reply due: July 12, 2018; 4. Hearing: August 2, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. (mrgo)
May 24, 2018 Filing 29 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response and Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss as to Amended Complaint/Petition, 15 filed by defendant Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brigham, Matthew)
April 23, 2018 Filing 28 Local Rule 7.1-1 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc., identifying Facebook, Inc.. (Brigham, Matthew)
April 23, 2018 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Instagram, LLC identifying Facebook, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Brigham, Matthew)
April 23, 2018 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant WhatsApp Inc. identifying Facebook, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Brigham, Matthew)
April 23, 2018 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc. (Brigham, Matthew)
April 23, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Amended Complaint/Petition, 15 filed by defendants Instagram, Inc., WhatsApp Inc., Instagram, LLC, Facebook, Inc..(Attorney Matthew J Brigham added to party Facebook, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J Brigham added to party Instagram, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J Brigham added to party Instagram, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J Brigham added to party WhatsApp Inc.(pty:dft))(Brigham, Matthew)
April 13, 2018 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited, upon Defendant Instagram, LLC served on 4/6/2018, answer due 4/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Asperger, James)
April 13, 2018 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited, upon Defendant Instagram, Inc. served on 4/6/2018, answer due 4/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Asperger, James)
April 13, 2018 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited, upon Defendant WhatsApp Inc. served on 4/6/2018, answer due 4/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Asperger, James)
April 13, 2018 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited, upon Defendant Facebook, Inc. served on 4/6/2018, answer due 4/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Asperger, James)
April 5, 2018 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, 15 as to defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC, WhatsApp Inc.. (mrgo)
April 4, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-02693 (Asperger, James)
April 4, 2018 Filing 17 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by BlackBerry Limited. (Asperger, James)
April 4, 2018 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, 15 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Asperger, James)
April 4, 2018 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., WhatsApp Inc., Instagram, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Asperger, James)
March 15, 2018 Filing 14 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
March 7, 2018 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to defendants Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., WhatsApp Inc. (mrgo)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE PATENT PILOT PROGRAM by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:18-cv-01844 GW(KSx). (rn)
March 6, 2018 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Asperger, James)
March 6, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request 3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
March 6, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
March 6, 2018 Filing 7 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by BlackBerry Limited. (Asperger, James)
March 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings) (Asperger, James)
March 6, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited (Asperger, James)
March 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited, (Asperger, James)
March 6, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Asperger, James)
March 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Asperger, James)
March 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21360760 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J) (Attorney James R Asperger added to party BlackBerry Limited(pty:pla))(Asperger, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BlackBerry Limited v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BlackBerry Limited
Represented By: James R Asperger
Represented By: Kevin P B Johnson
Represented By: Edward R McGah, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instagram, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instagram, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WhatsApp Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?