Benjamin James Greenspon v. Rosemary Ndoh

Petitioner: Benjamin James Greenspon
Respondent: Rosemary Ndoh
Case Number: 2:2018cv01959
Filed: March 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Referring Judge: Paul L. Abrams
Presiding Judge: Cormac J. Carney
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGMENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Related to: Order Accepting Report and Recommendations, 25 . IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that the above-captioned case is dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (hr)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE issued by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) 1 , Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 10 : It is recommended that the District Court issue an Order, as follows: (1) approving and accepting this Report and Recommendation; (2) granting Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition; (3) directing that Judgment be entered dismissing this action with prejudice; and (4) denying a certificate of appealability. (kh)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, CASE TRANSFERRED to District of CA, Central,signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 03/07/2018. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/9/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin James Greenspon v. Rosemary Ndoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Benjamin James Greenspon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rosemary Ndoh
Represented By: Jonathan J Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?