David Meriwether v. Viacom, Inc.

Plaintiff: David Meriwether
Defendant: Quinn Hawking, Josiah Johnson, Bento Box Entertainment, LLC, Point Forward Productions, LLC, Viacom, Inc., Marques Johnson, Viacom International Media Networks, Inc. and DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv01998
Filed: March 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Dale S Fischer
1 Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 03:00 pm before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 10/22/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 7/29/2019. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
December 3, 2018 Filing 48 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Held and Completed) before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE MINUTE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS.) Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (jp)
December 3, 2018 Filing 46 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jack Frank Altura counsel for Defendants Marques Johnson, Point Forward Productions, LLC. Adding Jack F. Altura as counsel of record for Marques Johnson and Point Forward Productions, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants Marques Johnson and Point forward Production, LLC. (Attorney Jack Frank Altura added to party Marques Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Jack Frank Altura added to party Point Forward Productions, LLC(pty:dft))(Altura, Jack)
November 26, 2018 Filing 45 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 - 6 days, filed by Plaintiff David Meriwether.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service)(Gignac, J)
September 12, 2018 Filing 44 JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff David Meriwether. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gignac, J)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (dp)
August 24, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Marques Johnson, Point Forward Productions, LLC, (Ivie, Rickey)
August 24, 2018 Filing 41 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #17 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Marques Johnson, Point Forward Productions, LLC.(Ivie, Rickey)
August 10, 2018 Filing 40 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) The orders to show cause re lack of prosecution and subject matter jurisdiction are discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 9, 2018 Filing 39 DECLARATION of J. Paul Gignac in Response to Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff David Meriwether. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proof of Service)(Gignac, J)
August 9, 2018 Filing 38 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff David Meriwether to Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gignac, J)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ON STIPULATIN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT granting #36 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Defendants Marques Johnson and Point Forward Productions, LLC, are granted an extension to August 24, 2018, to respond to the First Amended Complaint, filed April 19, 2018. (bp)
August 6, 2018 Filing 36 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 8/24/18 re Amended Complaint/Petition #17 filed by Defendant Marques Johnson, Point Forward Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ivie, Rickey)
August 2, 2018 Filing 35 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT : Document No.33 filed on 8/2/18 is stricken for failure to comply with this Courts standing order and Local Rules 5-4.4.1which requires that parties submitting proposed orders or other proposed documents that require a judges signature must comply with L.R. 5-4.4.1 and L.R. 5-4.4.2 and be filed as an attachment to the electronically filed document. The dates on the stipulation for extension of time are passed. There is a pending OSC for dismissal THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 2, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Dismissal of First, Fifth and Seventh Claims for Relief Only as to Defendants Marques Johnson and Point Forward Productions, LLC filed by Plaintiff David Meriwether. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gignac, J)
August 2, 2018 Filing 33 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Amended Complaint/Petition #17 filed by Defendant Marques Johnson, Point Forward Productions, LLC.(Ivie, Rickey)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (lom)
July 31, 2018 Filing 31 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT: Document No.30 filed on 7/31/18 is stricken for failure to comply with L.R. 5-4.3.1 - which requires that the PDF image for a document filed with the Court must be created by using word processing software and published to PDF. PDF images created by scanning paper documents are prohibited. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 31, 2018 Filing 30 ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN ** STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Marques Johnson answer now due 6/4/2018; Point Forward Productions, LLC answer now due 6/4/2018, re Amended Complaint/Petition #17 filed by Defendants Marques Johnson; Point Forward Productions, LLC.(Attorney Rickey Ivie added to party Marques Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Rickey Ivie added to party Point Forward Productions, LLC(pty:dft))(Ivie, Rickey) Modified on 7/31/2018 (dp).
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 8/13/2018. (dp)
July 23, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff David Meriwether pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Bento Box Entertainment, LLC, Quinn Hawking, Josiah Johnson, Viacom International Media Networks, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Gignac, J)
July 23, 2018 Filing 27 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Bento Box Entertainment, LLC, Quinn Hawking, Josiah Johnson, Viacom International Media Networks, Inc., Viacom, Inc. filed by Plaintiff David Meriwether.(Gignac, J)
July 18, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Decision: Ruling in de Havilland v. FX Networks, LLC filed by Defendants Bento Box Entertainment, LLC, Quinn Hawking, Josiah Johnson, Viacom International Media Networks, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sager, Kelli)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS by Judge Dale S. Fischer, re Stipulation to Stay Case, #24 (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
May 14, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending RULING BY CALIFORNIA SUPREME COURT IN DE HAVILLAND V. FX NETWORKS, LLC, 21 CAL. APP. 5TH 845 (2018) (CAL. SC PET. FOR REVIEW PENDING, Case No. S248614) filed by Defendants Bento Box Entertainment, LLC, Quinn Hawking, Josiah Johnson, Viacom International Media Networks, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sager, Kelli)
April 25, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #22 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incomplete docket text: missing name of event In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 24, 2018 Filing 22 (Attorney Cydney Swofford Freeman added to party Bento Box Entertainment, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Cydney Swofford Freeman added to party Quinn Hawking(pty:dft), Attorney Cydney Swofford Freeman added to party Josiah Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Cydney Swofford Freeman added to party Viacom International Media Networks, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Cydney Swofford Freeman added to party Viacom, Inc.(pty:dft))(Freeman, Cydney)
April 24, 2018 Filing 21 (Attorney Daniel Aaron Laidman added to party Bento Box Entertainment, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Aaron Laidman added to party Quinn Hawking(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Aaron Laidman added to party Josiah Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Aaron Laidman added to party Viacom International Media Networks, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Aaron Laidman added to party Viacom, Inc.(pty:dft))(Laidman, Daniel)
April 23, 2018 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff David Meriwether, upon Defendant Point Forward Productions, LLC served on 4/14/2018, answer due 5/7/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Point Forward Productions, LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Gignac, J)
April 23, 2018 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff David Meriwether, upon Defendant Marques Johnson served on 4/14/2018, answer due 5/7/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marques Johnson in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Gignac, J)
April 19, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing of First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff David Meriwether. (Gignac, J)
April 19, 2018 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff David Meriwether(Gignac, J)
April 11, 2018 Filing 16 Proof of Service of Summons NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff David Meriwether, upon Defendant Bento Box Entertainment, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/22/2018, answer due 5/18/2018. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Kelli L. Sager, Attorney for Bento Box Entertainment, LLC. (Gignac, J)
April 11, 2018 Filing 15 Proof of Service of Summons NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff David Meriwether, upon Defendant Josiah Johnson acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/22/2018, answer due 5/18/2018. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Kelli L. Sager, Josiah Johnson. (Gignac, J)
April 11, 2018 Filing 14 Proof of Service of Summons NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff David Meriwether, upon Defendant Quinn Hawking acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/22/2018, answer due 5/18/2018. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Kelli L. Sager, Attorney for Quinn Hawking. (Gignac, J)
April 11, 2018 Filing 13 Proof of Service of Summons NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff David Meriwether, upon Defendant Viacom International Media Networks, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/22/2018, answer due 5/18/2018. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Kelli L. Sager, Attorney for Viacom International, Inc.. (Gignac, J)
April 11, 2018 Filing 12 Proof of Service of Summons NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff David Meriwether, upon Defendant Viacom, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/22/2018, answer due 5/18/2018. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Kelli L. Sager, Attorney for Viacom, Inc.. (Gignac, J)
April 10, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint filed by Plaintiff David Meriwether. Viacom, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgment of Receipt for Viacom International, Inc., #2 Acknowledgment of Receipt for Quinn Hawking, #3 Acknowledgment of Receipt for Josiah Johnson, #4 Acknowledgment of Receipt for Bento Box Entertainment, LLC)(Gignac, J)
April 3, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Viacom International Media Networks, Inc. answer now due 5/18/2018; Bento Box Entertainment, LLC answer now due 5/18/2018; Viacom, Inc. answer now due 5/18/2018; Quinn Hawking answer now due 5/18/2018; Josiah Johnson answer now due 5/18/2018, filed by defendants Viacom International Media Networks, Inc.; Bento Box Entertainment, LLC; Viacom, Inc.; Quinn Hawking; Josiah Johnson.(Attorney Kelli L Sager added to party Bento Box Entertainment, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kelli L Sager added to party Quinn Hawking(pty:dft), Attorney Kelli L Sager added to party Josiah Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Kelli L Sager added to party Viacom International Media Networks, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kelli L Sager added to party Viacom, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sager, Kelli)
March 16, 2018 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Viacom, Inc.. (bp)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDERSTANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (smo)
March 14, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff David Meriwether. (Gignac, J)
March 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
March 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil)
March 9, 2018 Filing 3 Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff David Meriwether, identifying Viacom, Inc.; Bento Box Entertainment, LLC; Point Forward Productions, LLC; Viacom International Media Networks, Inc.; Marques Johnson, Josiah Johnson, Quinn Hawking. (Gignac, J)
March 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff David Meriwether. (Gignac, J)
March 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21390114 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff David Meriwether. (Attorney J Paul Gignac added to party David Meriwether(pty:pla))(Gignac, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Meriwether v. Viacom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinn Hawking
Represented By: Kelli L Sager
Represented By: Cydney Swofford Freeman
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Laidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josiah Johnson
Represented By: Kelli L Sager
Represented By: Cydney Swofford Freeman
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Laidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bento Box Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Kelli L Sager
Represented By: Cydney Swofford Freeman
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Laidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Point Forward Productions, LLC
Represented By: Jack Frank Altura
Represented By: Rickey Ivie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Represented By: Kelli L Sager
Represented By: Cydney Swofford Freeman
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Laidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marques Johnson
Represented By: Jack Frank Altura
Represented By: Rickey Ivie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom International Media Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Kelli L Sager
Represented By: Cydney Swofford Freeman
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Laidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Meriwether
Represented By: J Paul Gignac
Represented By: J A Ted Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?