R. Alexander Acosta v. RK Apparel, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Defendant: HDK Avenue, Inc. and RK Apparel, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02025
Filed: March 12, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: S. James Otero
Referring Judge: Michael R. Wilner
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT HDK AVENUE, INC. by Judge S. James Otero: Defendants, its officers,agents, etc are permanently enjoined and restrained from violating the provisions of FLSA Section 15(a)(1), 29 U.S.C. 215(a)(1). The amount hereby fou nd due to Defendants employees for the periodfrom November 13, 2017, through February 26, 2018, is $234,168.88 to 41 employees of which amount Defendant shall pay $66,168.88 as set forth in the attached Exhibit A. The Secretary shall distribute the funds to Defendants employees. ( SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFICS REQUIREMENTS, DEADLINES AND COMPLIANCE THERETO) Related to: Notice of Settlement 27 . ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lc)
May 3, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CONSENT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANTS RK APPAREL, INC. AND JESSIE LEE 25 by Judge S. James Otero : Defendants, its officers,agents, etc are permanently enjoined and restrained from violating the provisions of FLSA Section 15(a)(1), 29 U.S.C. 215(a)(1).The amount hereby found due to these employees is $234,168.88, of which amount Defendants have agreed to pay $168,000.00. Defendants have already deposited $40,000.00 with the DOL. The remaining amount due will be paid in equal monthly installments. ( SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFICS REQUIREMENTS, DEADLINES AND COMPLIANCE THERETO) (lc)
April 2, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT by Judge S. James Otero in favor of Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta, Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor and against defendant RK Apparel, Inc. The amount hereby found due to these employees is $ 168,000, of w hich amount Defendants have already deposited $40,000 with the DOL. The remaining amount due will be paid in equal monthly installments, as set forth in the attached Exhibit A, beginning on May 1, 2018. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFICS AND REQUIREMENTS AND COMPLIANCE THERETO) (lc) Modified on 4/4/2018 (lc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. Alexander Acosta v. RK Apparel, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Cheryl L Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDK Avenue, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RK Apparel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?