Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Patrick Joseph Soria et al
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC and U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for The Holders of the First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-FF10 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-FF10
Defendant: George Wesley Pierce, Jr., Rebekah Brown, Westwood Legal, Bernard Germani, Camden Legal Group, PC, Westward Legal, Patrick Joseph Soria, Mr F. Martinez, Elba Chavez, Roger Franklin, West H&A, LLC, Jenny De Leon, Tamyra White, Deutsche Mellon National Asset, LLC, HSBC US in its Capacity as Legal Title Holder Incorporated, Gricela Mendoza, Brighton Legal Group, PC, BLG PC National by Brighton Legal Group, Inc., Michael C. Jackson, Cynthia Lara, Warranted Effectuation of Substitute Transferee Inc, AKA W.E.S.T. Inc., Ryan Alexander Urquizu, Christiana Wilmington Global Asset Corp., DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, Warranted Effectuation of Substitute Transferee Inc, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and W.E.S.T. Inc.
Petitioner: Garson Silvers, DNE Associates, a CA general partnership, The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificateholders CWMBS, Inc CHL Mortgage Pass-Through Trust 2005-HYB4, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-HYB4, U.S. Bank National Association, Successor To Bank Of America, N.A., Successor By Merger To LaSalle Bank National Association, As Indenture Trustee, On Behalf Of The Holders Of The Thornburg Mortgage S and HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for the BCAP Trust LLC 2008-IND1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2008-IND1
Receiver: Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver and Robb Evans and Associates LLC
Interested Party: Robert West, Morgan Picks Two LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee Formerly Known as Bankers Trust Company of California, N.A., Not in its Individual Capacity but Solely as Trustee, or its Permitted Successors and Assig, US Bank National Association as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank, Hassan Real Estate Partnership, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon, Bankers Trust Company of California, N.A., Not in its Individual Capacity but Solely as Trustee, or its Permitted Successors and Assig, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Azusa Rowland, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of CWALT, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2007-OH2, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-OH2, Stephen Charles Rudicel, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE, FOR THE J.P. MORGAN MORTGAGE TRUST 2006-S4, Hassen Real Estate Partnership, US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Adjustable Rate Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-4, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB,D/B/A Christiana Trust, Not Individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., National Asssociation, U.S. Bank NA, Successor Trustee to Bank of America, NA, Successor in Interest to Lasalle Bank National Association, as Trustee, on behalf of the holders of the WAMU Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates,, Pennymac Loan Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon FKA the Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2006-OA14, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-OA14, Gadi Gowhari, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee, In Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-1, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-1, U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust, Federal National Mortgage Association, Bank of America, N.A., Successor by Merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP FKA Countrywide Homeloans Servicing LP, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee, in trust for the registered holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2007-19, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-1 and US Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Intervenor Plaintiff: Marina Ivanoff
Intervenor: Selene Finance, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Select Portfolio Services, LLC, New American Funding, Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC and Fay Servicing, LLC
Intervenor Defendant: All Persons Unknown Claiming any Legal or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien or Interest in The Subject Property Located at 390 South Sepulveda Boulevard Unit 208, Los Angeles, California 90049, APN, Kimberly L Yamada-Tung, Christina Gifford and Christian Soria
3Rd Party Defendant: Century 21 Citrus Realty and Albert Rodriguez
Case Number: 2:2018cv03041
Filed: April 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 629 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert F Conte counsel for Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Jeremy Burkhardt is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States of America. (Conte, Robert)
January 25, 2021 Filing 628 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert F Conte counsel for Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Adding Robert F. Conte as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attorney Robert F Conte added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:dft))(Conte, Robert)
January 21, 2021 Filing 627 SEALED DOCUMENT - DOCUMENT (bm)
January 15, 2021 Filing 626 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving Final Report and Accounting; Final Request for Approval and Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from February 1, 2020 through Closing; for Approval of Proposed Distribut #620 -- (Proposed) Order Approving Final Report and Accounting; Final Request for Approval and Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from February 1, 2020 through Closing; for Approval of Proposed Distributions; and for Discharge and Exoneration of Bond and Related Relief filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
January 15, 2021 Filing 625 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Notice (Other), #621 served on January 15, 2021. (Caris, Gary)
January 15, 2021 Filing 624 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Declaration (Motion related), #622 , Notice (Other), #621 , Declaration (Motion related),,, #623 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving Final Report and Accounting; Final Request for Approval and Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from February 1, 2020 through Closing; for Approval of Proposed Distribut #620 served on January 15, 2021. (Caris, Gary)
January 15, 2021 Filing 623 DECLARATION of Gary Owen Caris Filing Under Seal Unredacted Billing Records Pursuant to "Order Re Motion for Order Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Profesional's Fees and Costs (DKT. 151)" (DOC. 190) In Support of Motion for Order Approving Final Report and Accounting; Final Request for Approval and Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from February 1, 2020 through Closing; for Approval of Proposed Distributions; and for Discharge and Exoneration of Bond and Related Relief NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving Final Report and Accounting; Final Request for Approval and Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from February 1, 2020 through Closing; for Approval of Proposed Distribut #620 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
January 15, 2021 Filing 622 DECLARATION of Brick Kane in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving Final Report and Accounting; Final Request for Approval and Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from February 1, 2020 through Closing; for Approval of Proposed Distribut #620 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
January 15, 2021 Filing 621 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion for Order Approving Final Report and Accounting; Final Request for Approval and Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from February 1, 2020 through Closing; for Approval of Proposed Distributions; and for Discharge and Exoneration of Bond and Related Relief filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
January 15, 2021 Filing 620 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving Final Report and Accounting; Final Request for Approval and Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from February 1, 2020 through Closing; for Approval of Proposed Distributions; and for Discharge and Exoneration of Bond and Related Relief; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Gary Owen Caris in Support Thereof filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. Motion set for hearing on 2/22/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Caris, Gary)
December 16, 2020 Filing 619 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a) or (c) filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Burnett, Timothy)
November 24, 2020 Filing 618 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kenneth Sur Miller counsel for Movant HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for the BCAP Trust LLC 2008-IND1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2008-IND1. Kenneth S. Miller will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Interested/Affected Party HSBC BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee for the BCAP Trust LLC 2008-IND1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2008-IND1. (Miller, Kenneth)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer APPROVING Stipulation for Relief from Stay in State Court Action re lawsuit Related to 19856 Trotter Lane, Yorba Linda, California 92886 #616 . The stay is lifted with regard to the litigation entitled DNE Associates v. Brett Wolcott, et al., Case No. 30-2018-01016076-CU-FR-CJC, pending in the Superior Court of California for the County of Orange. See Order for specifics. (jp)
November 9, 2020 Filing 616 STIPULATION for Relief from Stay in State Court Action re Lawsuit Related to 19856 Trotter Lane, Yorba Linda, California, 92886, STIPULATION to Lift Stay is to permit DNE to proceed to litigate the State Court Fraud Action filed by Intervenor DNE Associates, a CA general partnership. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation for Relief from Stay in State Court Action Re Lawsuit Related to 19856 Trotter Lane, Yorba Linda, California 92886)(Singer, Rachelle)
October 21, 2020 Filing 615 REVISED STIPULATED JUDGMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer in favor of Plaintiff and against the Receivership Defendants, jointly and severally, on Plaintiff's Complaint in the amount of $931,908.01. Receivership Defendants and their successors, assigns, officers, servants, agents, employees and/or attorneys, and those persons in active concert or participation with any of the Receivership Defendants, including any other unnamed parties wholly or partially owned, contracted with, successors of, and/or assigns of the Receivership Defendants, are permanently enjoined. See Judgment for specifics). (jp)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation for Order to Void Fraudulent Instrument Recorded Against 4212 Don Luis Drive, Los Angeles, California 90008 #613 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
October 16, 2020 Filing 613 STIPULATION for Order To Void Fraudulent Instrument Recorded Against 4212 Don Luis Drive, Los Angeles, California 90008 filed by Interested/Affected Party HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for the BCAP Trust LLC 2008-IND1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2008-IND1. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Kenneth Sur Miller added to party HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for the BCAP Trust LLC 2008-IND1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2008-IND1(pty:bkmov))(Miller, Kenneth)
October 13, 2020 Filing 612 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Revised Proposed Stipulated Judgment re Order #608 (Attachments: #1 Revised Proposed Stipulated Judgment)(Burnett, Timothy)
October 13, 2020 Filing 611 JOINDER filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC joining in Response #609 . (Burnett, Timothy)
October 13, 2020 Filing 610 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Response #609 served on October 13, 2020. (Caris, Gary)
October 13, 2020 Filing 609 RESPONSE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLCto Order #608 -- Permanent Receiver's Response to Order re Stipulated Proposed Judgment (Doc. 608) (Caris, Gary)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Stipulated Proposed Judgment. The Parties should file a response addressing the Court's concerns and lodge a revised proposed stipulated judgment no later than 10/13/2020. See Order for specifics. (jp)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Amended Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instrument Recorded Against 40123 Cantara Drive, Palmdale, CA 93550 #606 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
September 24, 2020 Filing 606 Amended STIPULATION for Order Order Granting Amended Stipulation to Void Fraudulant Instrument Recorded Against 40123 Cantara Drive, Palmdale, CA 93550 U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for The Holders of the First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-FF10 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-FF10. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blackman, Mark)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation TO Void Fraudulent Instrument Recorded Against 396 E. Mariposa St., Altadena, CA 91001 #602 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer APPROVING Stipulation for Relief from Stay of Lawsuits Against Defendants #603 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
September 21, 2020 Filing 603 STIPULATION for Relief from Stay of Lawsuits Against Defendants filed by Interested/Affected Party Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee, In Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-1, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-1. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Brian Andrew Paino added to party Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee, In Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-1, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-1(pty:ip))(Paino, Brian)
September 18, 2020 Filing 602 STIPULATION for Order Void Fraudulent Instrument Recorded Against 396 E. Mariposa St., Altadena, CA 91001 filed by interested party Stephen Charles Rudicel.(Attorney Daniela P Romero added to party Stephen Charles Rudicel(pty:ip))(Romero, Daniela)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instrument Recorded against 40123 Cantara Drive, Palmdale, CA 93550 #600 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
September 4, 2020 Filing 600 STIPULATION for Order Order Granting Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instrument Recorded Against 40123 Cantara Drive, Palmdale, CA 93550 filed by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for The Holders of the First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-FF10 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-FF10. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instrument Recorded Against 40123 Cantara Drive, Palmdale, CA 93550)(Attorney Mark S Blackman added to party U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for The Holders of the First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-FF10 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-FF10(pty:pla))(Blackman, Mark)
August 30, 2020 Filing 599 Notice of Electronic Filing re Stipulation for Order, #593 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,,, #595 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #594 , Order #597 , Notice of Lodging #598 , Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form, #596 e-mailed to Mark Blackman and Taylor Hubbard bounced due to 5.1.1 RESOLVER.ADR.RecipNotFound. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 28, 2020 Filing 598 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Judgment)(Burnett, Timothy)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 22922 Squirrel Tree St., Spring, Texas 77389 #593 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
August 24, 2020 Filing 596 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form, #595 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #594 by Deputy Clerk of Court. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 8/31/20. (rfi)
August 24, 2020 Filing 595 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #594 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. (2) Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Order - under Category - Stipulation. (3) Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): (4) Proposed Order should be filed as an attachment to the e-filed Notice of Lodging and e-mailed to Judge Fischer generic email addresses a WordPerfect or Microsoft Word version of the document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
August 24, 2020 Filing 594 **STRICKEN** ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Re: Stipulation for Order to Void Fraudulent Instrument Recorded Against 40123 Cantara Drive, Palmdale, CA 93550; APN 3006-025-069 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Attorney Mark S Blackman added to party Nationstar Mortgage LLC(pty:pla))(Blackman, Mark) Modified on 8/24/2020 (rfi).
August 21, 2020 Filing 593 STIPULATION for Order to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 22922 Squirrel Tree Street, Spring, Texas 77389 filed by Interested Party Pennymac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Nicolas Matayron added to party Pennymac Loan Services, LLC(pty:ip))(Matayron, Nicolas)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded against 1350 South Towne Avenue, Pomona, California 91766 #591 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
July 7, 2020 Filing 591 STIPULATION for Order Granting Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 1350 South Towne Avenue, Pomona, CA 91766 Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 1350 South Towne Avenue, Pomona, CA 91766)(Attorney Megan Elizabeth Lees added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:ip))(Lees, Megan)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded against 183 Greenbush Road, West Warwick, Rhode Island 02893 #589 . See Order for Specifics. (jp)
June 29, 2020 Filing 589 STIPULATION for Order Granting Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 183 Greenbush Road, West Warwick, Rhode Island 02893 filed by Interested Part/Affected Party Ocwen Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Ryan Curtis Thomason added to party Ocwen Financial Corporation(pty:intv))(Thomason, Ryan)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER GRANTING by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Stipulation for Order to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against Six Properties #587 . (See Order for Specifics). (et)
June 9, 2020 Filing 587 STIPULATION for Order to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against Six Properties filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burnett, Timothy)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation for Order to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 5832 Versailles Avenue, Frisco, Texas 75034 #583 . (See Order for Specifics). (jp)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instrument Recorded Against 2224 Navy Street, Santa Monica, CA 90405, APN: 4272-014-022 #584 . (See Order for Specifics). (jp)
May 27, 2020 Filing 584 STIPULATION for Order to Void Fraudulent Instrument filed by Interest/Affected Party The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of CWALT, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2007-OH2, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-OH2. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 2224 Navy Street, Santa Monica, CA 90405)(Attorney Bradford E Klein added to party The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of CWALT, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2007-OH2, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-OH2(pty:ip))(Klein, Bradford)
May 26, 2020 Filing 583 STIPULATION for Order to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 5832 Versailles Avenue, Frisco, Texas 75034 filed by Interested Party The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee, in trust for the registered holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2007-19, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-1. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balser, Justin)
May 26, 2020 Filing 582 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin D Balser on behalf of Interested Party The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee, in trust for the registered holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2007-19, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-19 (Attorney Justin D Balser added to party The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee, in trust for the registered holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2007-19, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-19(pty:ip))(Balser, Justin)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Motion for Order Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional Fees and Costs From May 1, 2029 Through January 31, 2020 #568 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
May 13, 2020 Filing 580 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion for Order Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from 5/1/2019 through 1/31/20 #568 set for 5/18/2020 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
May 1, 2020 Filing 579 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #457 , CCA # 19-55477. The judgment of this Court, entered April 09, 2020, takes effect this date.This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Order, #567 DISMISSED.] (mat)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instrument Recorded against 12742 Brookside Lane, San Diego, CA 92131. APN: 320-250-30-00 #575 . See order for specifics. (jp)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instrument Recorded against 55200 Daryll Road, Idyllwild, CA 92549; APN: 564-091-006-9 #576 . See order for specifics. (jp)
April 27, 2020 Filing 576 STIPULATION for Order to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 55200 Daryll Road filed by Interest/Affected Party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Stipulation for Ordre to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 55200 Daryll Road)(Klein, Bradford)
April 27, 2020 Filing 575 STIPULATION for Order to Void Fraudulent Instrument, STIPULATION for Settlement filed by Interest/Affected Party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Bradford E Klein added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:ip))(Klein, Bradford)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Stipulation for Order Granting Amended Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Assignment of Deed of Trust Recorded Against 8701 Wonderland Park Ave, Los Angeles, CA fka 8671 Wonderland Ave, Los Angeles California 90046 #573 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (et)
April 17, 2020 Filing 573 Amended STIPULATION to Enforce Judgment against Defendant BLG PC National by Brighton Legal; Deutsche Mellon National Asset, LLC, Gricela Mendoza; Tamyra White filed by Interested Party U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE, FOR THE J.P. MORGAN MORTGAGE TRUST 2006-S4. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Kayo Manson-Tompkins added to party U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE, FOR THE J.P. MORGAN MORTGAGE TRUST 2006-S4(pty:ip))(Manson-Tompkins, Kayo)
April 17, 2020 Filing 572 Notice of Electronic Filing re Declaration (Motion related), #570 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents), #571 , USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order, #567 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from May 1, 2019 through January 31, 2020; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Gary Owen Caris in #568 , Miscellaneous Document, #566 e-mailed to Conrad V Sison at csison@lockelord.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'#5.1.0 Address rejected. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 13, 2020 Filing 571 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Declaration (Motion related), #570 , Declaration (Motion related), #569 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from May 1, 2019 through January 31, 2020; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Gary Owen Caris in #568 served on April 13, 2020. (Caris, Gary)
April 13, 2020 Filing 570 DECLARATION of Gary Owen Caris in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from May 1, 2019 through January 31, 2020; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Gary Owen Caris in #568 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
April 13, 2020 Filing 569 DECLARATION of Brick Kane in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from May 1, 2019 through January 31, 2020; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Gary Owen Caris in #568 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
April 13, 2020 Filing 568 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from May 1, 2019 through January 31, 2020; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Gary Owen Caris in Support Thereof filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/18/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Caris, Gary)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #457 filed by Patrick Joseph Soria. CCA # 19-55477. We dismiss for lack of appellate jurisdiction. We lack jurisdiction over this appeal because the district court's order denying Soria's request for an order purging contempt is an interlocutory order that is not immediately appealable. Dismissed. (mat)
April 8, 2020 Filing 566 Amended Proof of Service of Stipulation for Order to Void Fraudulent Assignment of Deed of Trust Recorded Against 8701 Wonderland Park Ave, Los Angeles, CA FKA 8671 Wonderland Ave, Los Angeles, California 90046 and Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Assignment of Deed of Trust Recorded Against 8701 Wonderland Park Ave, Los Angeles, CA FKA 8671 Wonderland Ave, Los Angeles, California 90046 re: Stipulation to Enforce Judgment,, #565 (Manson-Tompkins, Kayo)
April 8, 2020 Filing 565 STIPULATION to Enforce Judgment against Defendant BLG PC National by Brighton Legal; Deutsche Mellon National Asset, LLC, Gricela Mendoza; Tamyra White filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Assignment of Deed of Trust Recorded Against 8701 Wonderland Park Ave, Los Angeles, CA FKA 8671 Wonderland Ave, Los Angeles, California 90046)(Attorney Kayo Manson-Tompkins added to party Nationstar Mortgage LLC(pty:pla))(Manson-Tompkins, Kayo)
March 13, 2020 Filing 564 NOTICE of Errata filed by plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Kane, Patrick)
March 13, 2020 Filing 563 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Patrick J. Kane in place of attorney Jered T. Ede filed by plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Patrick Jeffrey Kane added to party Nationstar Mortgage LLC(pty:pla)) (Kane, Patrick)
March 3, 2020 Filing 562 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Michael W Stoltzman, Jr counsel for Interested Party Federal National Mortgage Association. Changing Address to 2603 Main Street, Ste 1225, Irvine, CA 92614. Filed by Interested Party Federal National Mortgage Association. (Stoltzman, Michael)
February 27, 2020 Filing 561 NOTICE of Entry of Order Voiding Fraudulent Transfer, re: Order #560 , filed by Interested Party HSBC US in its Capacity as Legal Title Holder Incorporated. (Schuler-Hintz, Kristin)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Stipulation for Order to Voiding Fraudulent Instrument Recorded Against Real Property Commonly Known as 2515 Citrus Garden Circle, Henderson, NV 89052 #559 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
February 3, 2020 Filing 559 STIPULATION for Order Strike Fraudulent Transfer filed by Interested Party HSBC US in its Capacity as Legal Title Holder Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Kristin A Schuler-Hintz added to party HSBC US in its Capacity as Legal Title Holder Incorporated(pty:dft))(Schuler-Hintz, Kristin)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Motion for Approval of Settlement (Dkt. No. #550 ). (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
January 31, 2020 Filing 557 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #550 set for Monday, February 3, 2020 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pbl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 27, 2020 Filing 556 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Good Faith Settlement #550 JOINT EXPLANATION & REQUEST filed by Movant DNE Associates, a CA general partnership. (Singer, Rachelle)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 555 Order re Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement #550 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom)
January 14, 2020 Filing 554 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Good Faith Settlement #550 filed by Movant DNE Associates, a CA general partnership. (Singer, Rachelle)
January 13, 2020 Filing 553 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Reply (Motion related), #552 served on January 13, 2020. (Caris, Gary)
January 13, 2020 Filing 552 REPLY Conditional Non Opposition to the NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Good Faith Settlement #550 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Alternate Proposed Order, #2 Redline Alternate Proposed Order)(Caris, Gary)
January 13, 2020 Filing 551 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Specially Appearing Third Party Citrus Realty, Inc. dba Century 21 Citrus Realty and Albert Rodriguez's Motion Requesting the Federal Court to Approve Settlement in State Court Action to be in Good Faith Pursuant to Section 877.6 of the Code of Civil Procedure filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
December 30, 2019 Filing 550 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Good Faith Settlement filed by Specially Appearing Third Party Century 21 Citrus Realty, Albert Rodriguez. Motion set for hearing on 2/3/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Evidence in Support of Motion for Good Faith Settlement, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney David Davidson added to party Century 21 Citrus Realty(pty:3pd), Attorney David Davidson added to party Albert Rodriguez(pty:3pd)) (Davidson, David)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 549 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 201 Ocean Avenue, Unit 1409-B, Santa Monica, California 90402 #547 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 548 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded against 301 N Azusa Avenue, West Convina, California 91791 #546 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
November 27, 2019 Filing 547 STIPULATION for Order To Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 201 Ocean Avenue, Unit 1409-B, Santa Monica, California 90402 filed by Interested/Affected Party U.S. Bank National Association, Successor To Bank Of America, N.A., Successor By Merger To LaSalle Bank National Association, As Indenture Trustee, On Behalf Of The Holders Of The Thornburg Mortgage Securities Trust 2007-1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Attorney Daniel A Solitro added to party U.S. Bank National Association, Successor To Bank Of America, N.A., Successor By Merger To LaSalle Bank National Association, As Indenture Trustee, On Behalf Of The Holders Of The Thornburg Mortgage Securities Trust 2007-1(pty:bkmov))(Solitro, Daniel)
November 26, 2019 Filing 546 STIPULATION for Order Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded filed by Interested/Affected Parties Azusa Rowland, LLC, Hassen Real Estate Partnership, Hassan Real Estate Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 301 N Azusa Avenue, West Covina, California 91791)(Attorney Taylor E Hubbard added to party Azusa Rowland, LLC(pty:ip), Attorney Taylor E Hubbard added to party Hassen Real Estate Partnership(pty:ip), Attorney Taylor E Hubbard added to party Hassan Real Estate Partnership(pty:ip))(Hubbard, Taylor)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instrument Recorded against 124 N Stanley Drive, Beverly Hills, CA 90211 #544 . APN: 4334-017-043. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
October 31, 2019 Filing 544 STIPULATION for Order [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instrument filed by plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Bradford E Klein added to party Nationstar Mortgage LLC(pty:pla))(Klein, Bradford)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING MOTION for Order Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from October 1, 2018 through April 30, 2019 #515 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 6917 Pacific View Drive, Los Angeles, California 90068 #541 . APN: 2428-023-005. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
September 11, 2019 Filing 541 STIPULATION for Order to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 6917 Pacific View Drive, Los Angeles, California 90068 filed by Interested Party U.S. Bank NA, Successor Trustee to Bank of America, NA, Successor in Interest to Lasalle Bank National Association, as Trustee, on behalf of the holders of the WAMU Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-HY7. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Taylor E Hubbard added to party U.S. Bank NA, Successor Trustee to Bank of America, NA, Successor in Interest to Lasalle Bank National Association, as Trustee, on behalf of the holders of the WAMU Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-HY7(pty:ip))(Hubbard, Taylor)
September 6, 2019 Filing 540 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #515 set for Monday, September 9, 2019 off calendar and under submission. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 4, 2019 Filing 539 Proof of Claim filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re: Order on Motion to Intervene #538 (Burkhardt, Jeremy)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING MOTION by United States to Intervene #521 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
September 3, 2019 Filing 537 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, served on 08/26/2019. (Burkhardt, Jeremy)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 365 Taylor Avenue NW, Renton, Washington 98057 #529 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
August 26, 2019 Filing 535 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #521 filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Burkhardt, Jeremy)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation for Order to void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 5081 College View Ave., #7, LA CA 90041 (APN 5682-025-033) #528 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
August 23, 2019 Filing 533 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Reply (Motion related), #531 -- Certificate of Service re Reply to Patrick Soria's Opposition to Motion for Order Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs served on August 23, 2019. (Caris, Gary)
August 23, 2019 Filing 532 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Reply (Motion related), #531 -- Certificate of Service re Reply to Patrick Soria's Opposition to Motion for Order Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs served on 8/23/19. (Caris, Gary)
August 23, 2019 Filing 531 REPLY Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from October 1, 2018 through April 30, 2019 #515 -- Reply to Patrick Soria's Opposition to Motion for Order Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO VOID FRAUDULENT INSTRUMENTS RECORDED AGAINST 1656 WEST 146TH STREET #1, GARDENA, CALIFORNIA 90247 #529 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom)
August 22, 2019 Filing 529 STIPULATION for Order Proposed Order to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 365 Taylor Avenue NW, Renton, Washington 98057 filed by Attorney Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 365 Taylor Avenue NW, Renton, Washington 98057)(Attorney Nicolas Matayron added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:ip))(Matayron, Nicolas)
August 21, 2019 Filing 528 STIPULATION for Order Granting Stipulation to void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 5081 College View Ave., #7, LA CA 90041 (APN 5682-025-033 filed by Interested/Affected Party Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation)(Attorney Matthew Clark Bures added to party Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:ip))(Bures, Matthew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 527 DECLARATION of Patrick Joseph Soria in Support of: (1) Opposition to The United States of America's to Intervene; OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE: Request to Strike the Motion to Intervene for Failure to Abide by Local Rule 7-3 (Meet and Confer) (2) Request for Exemption from Appearing at the 9/9/2019 Motion Hearing Due to Unrepresented Status (Pro se) #521 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (jp)
August 19, 2019 Filing 526 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of: (1) Opposition to The United States of America's Motion to Intervene for being Untimely and Prejudicial OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE Request to Strike the Motion to Intervene for Failure to Abide Local Rule 7-3 (Meet and Confer) AND (2) Request for Exemption from Appearing at the 9/9/2019 Motion Hearing Due to Unrepresentated Status (Pro se) #521 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (jp)
August 19, 2019 Filing 525 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of: (1) Opposition to Receiver's MOTION for Order Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs; or in the alternative, Request to Strike the Motion for Failure to Abide by Local Rule 7-3 (Meet and Confer) and (2) Request for Exemption from Appearing at the 9/9/2019 Motion Hearing Due to Unrepresentated Status #515 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (jp)
August 19, 2019 Filing 524 DECLARATION of Patrict Joseph Soria in support of (1) Opposition to Receiver's MOTION for Order Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs; or in the alternative, Request to Strike the Motion for Failure to Abide by Local Rule 7-3 (Meet and Confer) and (2) Request for Exemption from Appearing at the 9/9/2019 Motion Hearing Due to Unrepresentated Status #515 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (jp)
August 16, 2019 Filing 523 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation for Order, #522 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Murphy, Michael)
August 16, 2019 Filing 522 STIPULATION for Order to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 1656 West 146th St. # 1, Gardena, CA 90247 (APN: 6103-031-056) filed by Interested/Affected Party Gadi Gowhari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Attorney Michael Donnelly Murphy added to party Gadi Gowhari(pty:ip))(Murphy, Michael)
August 5, 2019 Filing 521 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jeremy L Burkhardt added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:dft)) (Burkhardt, Jeremy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 520 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from October 1, 2018 through April 30, 2019 #515 , Motion Related Document, #519 (Caris, Gary)
August 1, 2019 Filing 519 NOTICE OF ERRATA RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING AND AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF RECEIVER'S AND PROFESSIONAL'S FEES AND COSTS FROM OCTOBER 1, 2018 THROUGH APRIL 30, 2019 (DOC. 515) re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from October 1, 2018 through April 30, 2019 #515 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
August 1, 2019 Filing 518 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Declaration (Motion related), #516 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from October 1, 2018 through April 30, 2019 #515 , Declaration (Motion related), #517 served on August 1, 2019. (Caris, Gary)
August 1, 2019 Filing 517 DECLARATION of Gary Owen Caris In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from October 1, 2018 through April 30, 2019 #515 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
August 1, 2019 Filing 516 DECLARATION of Brick Kane In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from October 1, 2018 through April 30, 2019 #515 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Caris, Gary)
August 1, 2019 Filing 515 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from October 1, 2018 through April 30, 2019 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Caris Declaration) (Caris, Gary)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 16316 High Canal Court, Broomfield, Colorado 80020 #513 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
July 23, 2019 Filing 513 STIPULATION for Order to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 16316 High Canal Court, Broomfield, Colorado 80020 filed by Interested Party Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB,D/B/A Christiana Trust, Not Individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Taylor)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER Imposing Attorneys Fees and Costs against Brett Wolcott #504 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded against 1797 Amargosa Drive, Palmdale, California 93551 #508 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded against 820 Chancellorsville Parkway, Grand Prairie, Texas 75052 #507 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded against 1418 Armacost Road, Parkton, Maryland, 21120 #506 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
July 11, 2019 Filing 508 STIPULATION for Order to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 1797 Amargosa Drive, Palmdale, California 93551 filed by Interested Party Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB,D/B/A Christiana Trust, Not Individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Taylor E Hubbard added to party Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB,D/B/A Christiana Trust, Not Individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust (pty:ip))(Hubbard, Taylor)
July 11, 2019 Filing 507 STIPULATION for Order to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 820 Chancellorsville Parkway,Grand Prairie, Texas 75052 filed by Interested Party Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee Formerly Known as Bankers Trust Company of California, N.A., Not in its Individual Capacity but Solely as Trustee, or its Permitted Successors and Assigns on behalf of Vendee Mortgage Trust 2002-01. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Taylor E Hubbard added to party Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee Formerly Known as Bankers Trust Company of California, N.A., Not in its Individual Capacity but Solely as Trustee, or its Permitted Successors and Assigns on behalf of Vendee Mortgage Trust 2002-01(pty:ip))(Hubbard, Taylor)
July 11, 2019 Filing 506 STIPULATION for Order to Void Fraudulent Instruments recorded Against 1418 Armacost Road, Parkton, Maryland, 21120 filed by Interested Party Bank of America, N.A., Successor by Merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP FKA Countrywide Homeloans Servicing LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Taylor E Hubbard added to party Bank of America, N.A., Successor by Merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP FKA Countrywide Homeloans Servicing LP(pty:ip))(Hubbard, Taylor)
June 21, 2019 Filing 505 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Declaration #504 --Declaration of Gary Owen Caris in Response to Order Imposing Sanctions and Attorneys' Fees (Doc. 480) served on June 21, 2019. (Caris, Gary)
June 21, 2019 Filing 504 DECLARATION of Gary Owen Caris re Order #480 in Response to Order Imposing Sanctions and Attorneys' Fees filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caris, Gary)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 2018 Glendon Ave., Los Angeles, California 90025 #499 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER TO VOID Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 9005 Cynthia Avenue No. 209, West Hollywood, CA 90069 #498 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
June 19, 2019 Filing 501 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jered T Ede counsel for Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Cheyenne Sarah Schneider is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
June 19, 2019 Filing 500 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Interested Party The Bank of New York Mellon FKA the Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2006-OA14, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-OA14, re Stipulation for Order,, #499 (Amended Proof) served on 6/19/2019. (Hubbard, Taylor)
June 19, 2019 Filing 499 STIPULATION for Order to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 2018 Glendon Ave., Los Angeles, California 90025 filed by Interested Party The Bank of New York Mellon FKA the Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2006-OA14, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-OA14. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Taylor E Hubbard added to party The Bank of New York Mellon FKA the Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2006-OA14, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-OA14 (pty:ip))(Hubbard, Taylor)
June 13, 2019 Filing 498 First STIPULATION for Order To void Fraudulent Insturments Recorded Against 9005 Cynthia Avenue No. 209, West Hollywood, CA 90069 filed by Intrested/Affected Party US Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Nicolas Matayron added to party US Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust(pty:ip))(Matayron, Nicolas)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER VOIDING: (1) October 23, 2017 Assignment of Deed of Trust; Which was recorded against 24710 Seagrove Avenue, Los Angeles, CA 90744 #487 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER VOIDING: (1) June 20, 2017 Assignment of Deed of Trust; Which was recorded against 21016 Mendenhall CT, Topanga, CA 90290 #486 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER VOIDING: (1) June 27, 2017 Assignment of Deed of Trust; Which was recorded against 5620 Gayle Trail, Gainesville, GA 30506 #485 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER VOIDING: (1) October 13, 2017 Assignment of Mortgage; Which was recorded against 5601 SE 28th Street, Ocala, Florida, 34480 #484 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER VOIDING: (1) March 28, 2017 Wild Assignment; Which was recorded against 3970 Massachusetts Avenue, LA Mesa, California #483 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER VOIDING: September 12, 2017 Assignment of Mortgage; Which was recorded against 3369 Prescot Drive, Sumter, South Carolina 29150 #482 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
June 10, 2019 Filing 491 AMENDED WARRANT as to Brett Wolcott issued. (jp)
June 10, 2019 Filing 490 WARRANT as to Brent Wolcott issued. (jp)
June 7, 2019 Filing 489 Notice of Electronic Filing re Stipulation for Order #482 , Order #480 , Stipulation for Order #483 , Stipulation for Order, #481 , Stipulation for Order #484 , Stipulation for Order #486 , Show Cause Hearing - optional html form,, Terminate Hearings, #479 , Order #488 , Stipulation for Order #485 , Stipulation for Order #487 e-mailed to cschneider@hallgriffin.com bounced due to 550 5.1.10 RESOLVER.ADR.RecipientNotFound; Recipient not found by SMTP address lookup. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER VOIDING: (1) October 1, 2017, Wild Assignment of Deed of Trust; (2) October 27, 2017 Wild Deed of Trust Which was recorded against 506 3rd Ave SE, Ronan, MT 59864 #481 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
June 5, 2019 Filing 487 STIPULATION for Order ORDER VOIDING WILD INSTRUMENT RECORDED AGAINST 24710 SEAGROVE AVENUE filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amin, Anum)
June 5, 2019 Filing 486 STIPULATION for Order ORDER VOIDING WILD INSTRUMENT RECORDED AGAINST 21016 MENDENHALL CT filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amin, Anum)
June 5, 2019 Filing 485 STIPULATION for Order ORDER VOIDING WILD INSTRUMENT RECORDED AGAINST 5620 GAYLE TRAIL filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amin, Anum)
June 5, 2019 Filing 484 STIPULATION for Order ORDER VOIDING WILD INSTRUMENT RECORDED AGAINST 5601 SE 28TH STREET filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amin, Anum)
June 5, 2019 Filing 483 STIPULATION for Order ORDER VOIDING WILD INSTRUMENT RECORDED AGAINST 3970 MASSACHUSETTS AVENUE, LA MESA, CA 91941 filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amin, Anum)
June 5, 2019 Filing 482 STIPULATION for Order ORDER VOIDING WILD INSTRUMENT RECORDED AGAINST 3369 PRESCOT DRIVE filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amin, Anum)
June 5, 2019 Filing 481 STIPULATION for Order VOIDING WILD INSTRUMENTS RECORDED AGAINST 506 3RD AVENUE SE filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Anum Amin added to party Robb Evans and Associates LLC(pty:rc))(Amin, Anum)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 480 Order Imposing Sanctions and Attorneys' Fees by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT AS TO BRENT WOLCOTT (Held and Completed) before Judge Dale S. Fischer, the Court imposes sanctions in the amount of $1,000 a day until Brent Wolcott complies with the Court's prior order. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
May 22, 2019 Filing 478 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Defendant re #457 (ha)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER VOIDING: (1) June 26, 2017, Assignment of Deed of Trust; (2) July 6, 2017 Trustee's Deed Upon Sale; (3) March 7, 2018 Grant Deed Which was recorded against 20541 Northridge Rd., Chatsworth, California 91311 #476 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
May 17, 2019 Filing 476 STIPULATION for Order Voiding Wild Instruments Recorded Against 20541 Northridge RD. filed by Interested/Affected Party National Asssociation, US Bank National Association as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torres, Javier)
May 17, 2019 Filing 475 DECLARATION of Eric J. Wu Pursuant to Court's Order Conditionally Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Wu, Eric)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO VOID FRAUDULENT INSTRUMENTS RECORDED #462 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO VOID FRAUDULENT INSTRUMENTS RECORDED AGAINST 19856 TROTTER LANE, YORBA LINDA, CALIFORNIA, 92886 #466 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 472 Order Conditionally Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel #454 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 471 Order re Response of Brent Wolcott and Order re Contempt of Court by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom)
May 14, 2019 Filing 470 NOTICE of Change of address by Philip A Toomey attorney for Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. Changing attorneys address to 2041 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 300, El Segundo, CA 90245. Filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Toomey, Philip)
May 14, 2019 Filing 469 NOTICE of Change of address by Eric J Wu attorney for Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. Changing attorneys address to 2041 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 300, El Segundo, CA 90245. Filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Wu, Eric)
May 14, 2019 Filing 468 NOTICE of Change of address by Eric J Wu attorney for Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. Changing attorneys address to 2041 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 325, El Segundo, CA 90245. Filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Wu, Eric)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 467 Order to Show Cause Re Contempt as to Brent Wolcott (Held and Completed) before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
May 10, 2019 Filing 466 STIPULATION for Order to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 19856 Trotter Lane, Yorba Lane, California 92886 filed by Interested Party The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificateholders CWMBS, Inc CHL Mortgage Pass-Through Trust 2005-HYB4, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-HYB4. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Taylor E Hubbard added to party The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificateholders CWMBS, Inc CHL Mortgage Pass-Through Trust 2005-HYB4, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-HYB4(pty:bkmov))(Hubbard, Taylor)
May 8, 2019 Filing 465 SUPPLEMENT to Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #464 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
May 8, 2019 Filing 464 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Supplement #463 served on May 8, 2019. (Caris, Gary)
May 8, 2019 Filing 463 SUPPLEMENT to Status Report #448 , Response #460 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
May 6, 2019 Filing 462 STIPULATION for Order to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 27 Properties filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ede, Jered)
April 26, 2019 Filing 461 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 19-55477 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #457 as to Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (lom)
April 23, 2019 Filing 459 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shahrzad Guerami counsel for Intervenor Parties Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. Shahrzad Guerami is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by intervenors New Penn Financial, LLC dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, and Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. (Guerami, Shahrzad)
April 23, 2019 Filing 458 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Shahrzad Guerami counsel for Intervenor Parties Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. Changing Stroock & Stroock & LaVan to 2029 Century Park East, 18th Floor, L.A., CA 90067-3086. Changing email to sguerami@stroock.com. Filed by intervenors New Penn Financial, LLC dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, and Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. (Attorney Shahrzad Guerami added to party Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC(pty:intv))(Guerami, Shahrzad)
April 23, 2019 Filing 457 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. Appeal of Order on Motion for Order #452 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23600177.) (Wu, Eric)
April 22, 2019 Filing 460 RESPONSE of Brett Wolcott to Order to Show Cause re Contempt of Court #370 . (jp)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER VOIDING Wild Instrument Recorded against 23110 Bigler Street; [Property Address: 23110 Bigler Street, Woodland Hills, CA 91364] #453 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 455 Order Finding Brent Wolcott in Contempt of Court by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
April 17, 2019 Filing 454 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Philip A. Tomey, Eric J. Wu, Jessica K. Albert, Ryan O Hemminger, Sandford L. Frey to Withdraw as Attorney for Deft. Patrick Joseph Soria filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. Motion set for hearing on 5/20/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Wu, Eric)
April 16, 2019 Filing 453 STIPULATION for Order Order Voiding Wild Instrument Recorded Against 23110 Bigler Street filed by Interested Party Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Michael Washburn Carruth added to party Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon(pty:ip))(Carruth, Michael)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 452 Order DENYING Request for an Order Purging Contempt [Dkt. No. #365 ) by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation for Order to Void Wild Instruments Recorded against 10731 Fullbright Avenue, Chatsworth, CA 91311 #447 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
April 12, 2019 Filing 450 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Status Report #448 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #449 Supplemental Certificate of Service served on April 12, 2019. (Caris, Gary)
April 12, 2019 Filing 449 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Status Report #448 served on April 12, 2019. (Caris, Gary)
April 12, 2019 Filing 448 STATUS REPORT -- Regarding Brett Wolcott's Non-Compliance with Court's Orders filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
April 11, 2019 Filing 447 STIPULATION for Order to Void Wild Instruments Recorded Against 10731 Fullbright Avenue, Chatsworth, CA 91311 filed by Interested Party Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Stoltzman, Michael)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER Discharging Civil Contempt Sanction by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
April 8, 2019 Filing 445 Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO VOID FRAUDULENT INSTRUMENTS RECORDED AGAINST 1001 USENER ST., HOUSTON, TEXAS 77009 by Judge Dale S. Fischer #442 . See document for specifics. (twdb)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER VOIDING: (1) September 26, 2017, Assignment of Deed of Trust; Which was recorded against 24341 Bridle Trail Road, Hidden Hills, CA 91302 #441 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
April 3, 2019 Filing 442 STIPULATION for Order to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 1001 Usener St., Houston, Texas 77009 filed by Interested Party U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Taylor E Hubbard added to party U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust (pty:ip))(Hubbard, Taylor)
April 1, 2019 Filing 441 Joint STIPULATION for Order Order Voiding 9/26/17 Assignment of Deed of Trust Recorded Against 24341 Bridle Trail Road, Hidden Hills, CA 91302 filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fickel, Ashley)
March 29, 2019 Filing 440 Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
March 29, 2019 Filing 439 Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation for Order to Void Wild Instruments Recorded Against 10 Scenic Court, Effort, PA 18330 #430 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER VOIDING: (1) September 26, 2017, Assignment of Deed of Trust; Which was recorded against 19443 Hatteras St., Tarzana, California 91356 #429 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER VOIDING: (1) October 2, 2017, Assignment of Deed of Trust; Which was recorded against 106 Woodruff Ct., More, South Carolina 29369 #428 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER VOIDING: (1) August 14, 2017 Assignment of Deed of Trust; (2) September 7, 2017 Substitution of Trustee; (3) October 20, 2017 Trustee's Deed Upon Sale. Which was recorded against 5202 Onaknoll Ave., Los Angeles, California 90043 #427 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER VOIDING: (1) January 5, 2018, Assignment of Deed of Trust; Which was recorded against 22627 Ticonderoga Road, Calabasas, California 91302 #426 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER VOIDING: (1) September 21, 2017 Assignment of Deed of Trust; Which was recorded against 1804 Cave Street, Redlands, California 92374 #425 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER VOIDING: (1) December 12, 2017 Assignment of Deed of Trust; Which was recorded against 16630 Cumbre Verde Court, pacific palisades, California 90272 #424 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER VOIDING: (1) June 12, 2017 Assignment of Deed of Trust; Which was recorded against 2144 Hercules Dr., Los Angeles, California 90046 #423 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 26, 2019 Filing 430 STIPULATION for Order to Void Wild Instruments Recorded Against 10 Scenic Court, Effort, PA 18330 filed by Interested Party Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Attorney Michael W Stoltzman, Jr added to party Federal National Mortgage Association(pty:ip))(Stoltzman, Michael)
March 25, 2019 Filing 429 STIPULATION for Order Voiding Wild Assignment Recorded Against 19443 Hatteras St. filed by Interested/Affected Party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torres, Javier)
March 25, 2019 Filing 428 STIPULATION for Order Voiding Wild Instrument Recorded Against 106 Woodruff CT filed by Interested/Affected Party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torres, Javier)
March 25, 2019 Filing 427 STIPULATION for Order Voiding Wild Instruments Recorded Against 5202 Onaknoll Ave. filed by Interested/Affected Party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torres, Javier)
March 25, 2019 Filing 426 STIPULATION for Order Voiding Wild Instrument Recorded Against 22627 Ticonderoga Road filed by Interested/Affected Party US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Adjustable Rate Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-4. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Javier Torres added to party US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Adjustable Rate Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-4(pty:ip))(Torres, Javier)
March 25, 2019 Filing 425 STIPULATION for Order Voiding Wild Assignment Recorded Against 1804 Cave Street filed by Interested/Affected Party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torres, Javier)
March 25, 2019 Filing 424 STIPULATION for Order Voiding Wild Assignment Recorded Against 16630 Cumbre Verde Court filed by Interested/Affected Party US Bank National Association as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank, National Asssociation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Javier Torres added to party US Bank National Association as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank(pty:ip), Attorney Javier Torres added to party National Asssociation(pty:ip))(Torres, Javier)
March 25, 2019 Filing 423 STIPULATION for Order For Order Voiding Wild Assignment Recorded Against 2144 Hercules Dr. filed by Interested/Affected Party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Javier Torres added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:ip))(Torres, Javier)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER VOIDING: (1) June 26, 2017 Assignment of Deed of Trust; (2) July 3, 2017 Substitution of Trustee; (3) July 6, 2017 Trustee's Deed Upon Sale. Which was recorded against 950 North Kings Road No. 118, West Hollywood, CA 90069 #410 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER VOIDING: October 23, 2017 Assignment of Deed of Trust; Which was recorded against 30333 Morning View Drive, Malibu, California 90265 #405 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER VOIDING: (1) June 19, 2017 Assignment of Deed of Trust; (2) June 26, 2017 Substitution of Trustee; (3) June 28, 2017 Trustee's Deed Upon Sale. Which was recorded against 26060 Pacific Coast Highway, Malibu, CA 90265 #404 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER VOIDING: May 25, 2017 Assignment of Deed of Trust; Which was recorded against 16865 Calle Bellevista, Pacific Palisades, CA 90272 #403 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER VOIDING: (1) May 25, 2017 Assignment of Deed of Trust; (2) June 12, 2017 Substitution of Trustee; (3) June 13, 2017 Trustee's Deed Upon Sale. Which was recorded against 16700 Calle Arbolada, Los Angeles, CA 90272 #401 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER VOIDING: (1) June 26, 2017 Assignment of Deed of Trust; (2) June 26, 2017 Substitution of Trustee; (3) July 10, 2017 Trustee's Deed Upon Sale. Which was recorded against 12675 Mountain Crest Lane, Los Angeles, CA 90049 #400 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER VOIDING: December 12, 2017 Assignment of Deed of Trust; Which was recorded against 11553 Yarmouth Avenue, Granada Hills, CA 91344 #399 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER VOIDING: June 9, 2017 Assignment of Deed of Trust; Which was recorded against 5080 Fallbrook Avenue, Woodland Hills, CA 91364 #398 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (jp)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER VOIDING: (1) December 12, 2017 Assignment of Deed of Trust; (2) January 11, 2018 Substitution of Trustee; (3) January 16, 2018 Trustee's Deed Upon Sale. Which was recorded against 4511-4519 West 120th Street A, B, C, Hawthorne, CA 90250 #397 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER VOIDING: May 31, 2017 Assignment of Deed of Trust; Which was recorded against 1233 North Laurel Avenue No. 205, West Hollywood, CA 90046 #396 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (jp)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER VOIDING: (1) June 20, 2017 Assignment of Deed of Trust; (2) June 21, 2017 Substitution of Trustee; (3) July 10, 2017 Trustee's Deed Upon Sale. Which was recorded against 1117 Maybrook Drive, Beverly Hills, CA 90210 #395 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER VOIDING: (1) May 25, 2017 Assignment of Deed of Trust; (2) June 12, 2017 Substitution of Trustee Which was recorded against 602 Kingman Avenue, Santa Monica, CA 90402 #392 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 19, 2019 Filing 410 Joint STIPULATION for Order Order Voiding Wild Instruments Recorded Against 950 North Kings Road No. 118 filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fickel, Ashley)
March 19, 2019 Filing 409 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria, re Response in Support of Motion #408 served on March 19, 2019. (Wu, Eric)
March 18, 2019 Filing 408 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of REQUEST for Order for Purging Contempt (Supplemental Report) #365 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Patrick Joseph Soria)(Wu, Eric)
March 14, 2019 Filing 407 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings MONDAY, FEBRUARY 25, 2019 2:12 P.M. re Transcript #406 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Nirenberg, C) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 14, 2019 Filing 406 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on MONDAY, FEBRUARY 25, 2019 2:12 P.M. Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, OFFICIAL REPORTER, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, OFFICIAL REPORTER, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com, or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2019. (Nirenberg, C)
March 12, 2019 Filing 405 Joint STIPULATION for Order Order Voiding Wild Instruments Recorded Against 30333 Morning View Drive filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fickel, Ashley)
March 12, 2019 Filing 404 Joint STIPULATION for Order Order Voiding Wild Instruments Recorded Against 26060 Pacific Coast Highway filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fickel, Ashley)
March 12, 2019 Filing 403 Joint STIPULATION for Order Order Voiding Wild Instruments Recorded Against 16865 Calle Bellevista filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fickel, Ashley)
March 12, 2019 Filing 402 Joint STIPULATION for Order Order Voiding Wild Instruments Recorded Against 12675 Mountain Crest Lane filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fickel, Ashley)
March 12, 2019 Filing 401 Joint STIPULATION for Order Order Voiding Wild Instruments Recorded Against 16700 Calle Arbolada filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fickel, Ashley)
March 12, 2019 Filing 400 Joint STIPULATION for Order Order Voiding Wild Instruments Recorded Against 12675 Mountain Crest Lane filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fickel, Ashley)
March 12, 2019 Filing 399 Joint STIPULATION for Order Order Voiding Wild Instruments Recorded Against 11553 Yarmouth Avenue filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fickel, Ashley)
March 12, 2019 Filing 398 Joint STIPULATION for Order Order Voiding Wild Instruments Recorded Against 5080 Fallbrook Avenue filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fickel, Ashley)
March 12, 2019 Filing 397 Joint STIPULATION for Order Order Voiding Wild Instruments Recorded Against 4511-4519 West 120th Street filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fickel, Ashley)
March 12, 2019 Filing 396 Joint STIPULATION for Order Order Voiding Wild Instruments Recorded Against 1233 North Laurel Avenue #205 filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fickel, Ashley)
March 12, 2019 Filing 395 Joint STIPULATION for Order Order Voiding Wild Instruments Recorded Against 1117 Maybrook Drive filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant)(Fickel, Ashley)
March 12, 2019 Filing 393 Joint STIPULATION for Order Order Voiding Wild Instruments Recorded Against 950 North Kings Road No. 118 filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fickel, Ashley)
March 12, 2019 Filing 392 Joint STIPULATION for Order Order Voiding Wild Instruments Recorded Against 602 Kingman Avenue filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Ashley R Fickel added to party Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver(pty:rc))(Fickel, Ashley)
March 11, 2019 Filing 394 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #115 , CCA # 18-55728. The judgment of this Court, entered February 15, 2019, takes effect thisdate.This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure.Costs are taxed against the appellant in the amount of $1,907.40. [See USCA Memorandum #366 , AFFIRMED.] (mat)
March 8, 2019 Filing 391 DECLARATION of GARSON SILVERS in Response to Order to Show Cause re Contempt #370 filed by Movant Garson Silvers. (jp)
March 8, 2019 Filing 390 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soriato Status Report, #359 Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl's Response to Receiver's Status Report Filed On February 1, 2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Pete A. Fuscaldo, #2 Certificate of Service)(Wu, Eric)
March 8, 2019 Filing 389 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria for Court Reporter. Court will contact Camille Banks at cbanks@leechtishman.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Toomey, Philip)
March 6, 2019 Filing 387 OPPOSITION re: REQUEST for Order for Purging Contempt (Supplemental Report) #365 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
March 6, 2019 Filing 386 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #385 served on March 6, 2019. (Caris, Gary)
March 6, 2019 Filing 385 OPPOSITION Receiver's Opposition to Soria's Request for Order Purging Contempt re: REQUEST for Order for Purging Contempt (Supplemental Report) #365 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
March 4, 2019 Filing 388 DECLARATION of GARSON SILVERS IN RESPONSE TO ORDER SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT #370 filed by Movant Garson Silvers. (et)
March 4, 2019 Filing 384 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver, re Order #370 on Garson Silvers served on February 24, 2019. (Caris, Gary)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 383 Order GRANTING Ex Parte Application for Turnover of Cell Phone and Cell Phone Analysis (Dkt. No. #372 ) by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
February 27, 2019 Filing 382 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC, re Order #370 on Brett Wolcott served on February 26, 2019. (Ede, Jered)
February 26, 2019 Filing 380 REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Turnover of Cell Phone and Cell Phone Data/Analysis #372 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Ede, Jered)
February 26, 2019 Filing 379 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings December 10, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. re Transcript #378 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Cuneo, Patricia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 26, 2019 Filing 378 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on December 10, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. Court Reporter: PAT CUNEO CSR 1600, OFFICIAL REPORTER, www.patcuneo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2019. (Cuneo, Patricia)
February 26, 2019 Filing 377 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings MONDAY, JANUARY 7, 2019 11:34 A.M. re Transcript #376 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Nirenberg, C) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 26, 2019 Filing 376 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on MONDAY, JANUARY 7, 2019 11:34 A.M. Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, OFFICIAL REPORTER, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, OFFICIAL REPORTER, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com, or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2019. (Nirenberg, C)
February 26, 2019 Filing 375 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Turnover of Cell Phone and Cell Phone Data/Analysis #372 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wu, Eric)
February 25, 2019 Filing 381 SUPPEMENTAL MOTION HEARING/STATUS CONFERENCE (Evidentiary Hearing) before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (SEE CIVIL MINUTE FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION OF NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC FOR ADDITIONAL SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER #371 (See Order for Specifics) (rfi)
February 25, 2019 Filing 372 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Turnover of Cell Phone and Cell Phone Data/Analysis filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ede, Jered)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO VOID FRAUDULENT INSTRUMENTS RECORDED AGAINST 4032 RANDOM CIRCLE, GARLAND TEXAS 75043 #369 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
February 22, 2019 Filing 371 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Supplement Order[Dkt No. 329] re Order #329 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ede, Jered)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER to Show Cause re Contempt of Court by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (See Order for Specifics) (rfi)
February 21, 2019 Filing 369 STIPULATION for Order Granting Stipulation to Void Fraudulent Instruments Recorded Against 4032 Random Circle, Garland, Texas 75043 filed by Interested Party New American Funding. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Taylor E Hubbard added to party New American Funding(pty:intv))(Hubbard, Taylor)
February 19, 2019 Filing 368 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Notice (Other) #367 served on February 19, 2019. (Caris, Gary)
February 19, 2019 Filing 367 NOTICE of Request to Cross-Examine Declarant Patrick Soria at Contempt Status Conference filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
February 15, 2019 Filing 366 MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #115 filed by Patrick Joseph Soria. CCA # 18-55728.AFFIRMED (SEE MEMORANDUM FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
February 15, 2019 Filing 365 REQUEST for Order for Purging Contempt (Supplemental Report) filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Patrick Joseph Soria, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Wu, Eric)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO VOID WILD INSTRUMENTS RECORDED AGAINST 3615 HAYVENHURST AVENUE, ENCINO, CALIFORNIA 91436. #363 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
February 13, 2019 Filing 363 STIPULATION for Order To Void Wild Instruments Recorded Against 3615 Hayvenhurst Avenue, Encino, California 91436 filed by Intervenor Select Portfolio Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feng, Simon)
February 13, 2019 Filing 362 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Simon M Feng counsel for Intervenor Select Portfolio Services, LLC. Adding Simon M. Feng as counsel of record for Intervenor Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Intervenor Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attorney Simon M Feng added to party Select Portfolio Services, LLC (pty:intv))(Feng, Simon)
February 13, 2019 Filing 361 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Conrad V Sison counsel for Intervenor Select Portfolio Services, LLC. Adding Conrad V. Sison as counsel of record for Intervenor Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Intervenor Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attorney Conrad V Sison added to party Select Portfolio Services, LLC (pty:intv))(Sison, Conrad)
February 1, 2019 Filing 360 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Status Report, #359 served on February 1, 2019. (Caris, Gary)
February 1, 2019 Filing 359 STATUS REPORT --Receiver's Status Report Regarding Responses to Supplemental Order in Support of the Court's Preliminary Injunction Order and Order Appointing Permanent Receiver (Doc. 329) filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 358 STIPULATED PERMANENT RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer, re Stipulation for Order #355 . See order for details. (shb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2019: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (rfi).
January 28, 2019 Filing 357 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wu, Eric)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT PATRICK JOSEPH SORIA LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER #354 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
January 23, 2019 Filing 355 STIPULATION for Order FOR AMENDED PERMANENT RESTRAINING ORDER filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ede, Jered)
January 23, 2019 Filing 354 Joint STIPULATION for Order Granting Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria Leave to Amend Answer filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Wu, Eric)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING AND AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF RECEIVER'S AND PROFESSIONAL'S FEES AND COSTS FROM INCEPTION OF THE RECEIVERSHIP ESTATE FROM JUNE 1, 2018 THROUGH SEPTEMBER 30, 2018 #293 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 352 Order DENYING Motion for Turnover of Funds #319 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom)
January 15, 2019 Filing 351 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Declaration (Motion related), #350 served on January 15, 2019. (Caris, Gary)
January 15, 2019 Filing 350 DECLARATION of Gary Owen Caris In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from June 1, 2018 through September 30, 2018; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Gary Owen Caris #293 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Caris, Gary)
January 14, 2019 Filing 349 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Intervenor DNE Associates, a CA general partnership, re Reply (Motion related), #348 served on 1/14/19. (Singer, Rachelle)
January 14, 2019 Filing 348 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Ruling Motion to Turnover Funds from Trotter Transaction Held by Receiver #319 filed by Movant DNE Associates, a CA general partnership. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachelle Singer, #2 Declaration of David Zickefoose)(Singer, Rachelle)
January 7, 2019 Filing 347 STATUS CONFERENCE (Held and Completed before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (SEE CIVIL MINUTE FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
January 7, 2019 Filing 346 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Reply (Motion related), #345 served on January 7, 2019. (Caris, Gary)
January 7, 2019 Filing 345 REPLY In Response to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Ruling Motion to Turnover Funds from Trotter Transaction Held by Receiver #319 Response to Motion for Turnover of Funds from the Trotter Transaction Held by Receiver filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Caris, Gary)
January 7, 2019 Filing 344 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Ruling Motion to Turnover Funds from Trotter Transaction Held by Receiver #319 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 343 STIPULATED PERMANENT RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2019: #2 Exhibit A) (rfi).
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER GRANTING Application for Leave to File "Exhibit A" to Stipulation for Restraining Order (DKT 314) Under Seal and In Camera #340 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (jp)
January 2, 2019 Filing 341 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER: It appears premature to hold a Scheduling Conference in this matter. The Court will, instead, hold a status conference on January 7, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for the parties are ordered to appear. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 31, 2018 Filing 340 APPLICATION for Leave to file Exhibit "A" to Stipulation for Restraining Order (Dkt 314) Under Seal and In Camera filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Ede, Jered)
December 28, 2018 Filing 339 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1 to 2 weeks, filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC.. (Ede, Jered)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER re MOTIION FEES AND COSTS FROM JUNE 1, 2018 THROUGH SEPTEMBER 30, 2018 by Judge Dale S. Fischer re #293 MOTION (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bm)
December 17, 2018 Filing 337 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soriato Order #329 In Support Of The Court's Preliminary Injunction Order And Order Appointing Permanent Receiver (Attachments: #1 Declaration Pete A. Fuscaldo, #2 Certificate of Service)(Wu, Eric)
December 17, 2018 Filing 336 STATUS REPORT re SUPPLEMENTAL SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER (DKT. NO. 329) ON THIRD PARTIES filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER re Cost Sharing for Title Clearance Through the Receivership by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER VOIDING: (1) DEC 12, 2017 DEED OF TRUST (2) JAN 11, 2018 SUBSTITUTION OF TRUSTEE (3) JAN 16, 2018 TRUSTEE'S DEED UPON SALE WHICH WERE RECORDED AGAINST 10809 WELLWORTH AVE LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA 90024 by Judge Dale S. Fischer, re Stipulation for Order, #331 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
December 13, 2018 Filing 333 STATUS REPORT re SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER (DKT. NO. 329) ON THIRD PARTIES filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
December 13, 2018 Filing 332 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #293 set for Monday, December 17, 2018 off calendar and under submission. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 11, 2018 Filing 331 STIPULATION for Order Voiding Wild Instruments Recorded Against 10809 Wellworth Ave filed by Interested/Affected Party U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Aaron Robert Goldstein added to party U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.(pty:ip))(Goldstein, Aaron)
December 10, 2018 Filing 330 MOTION HEARING (Non-evidentiary) before Judge Dale S. Fischer: The matter is called. Motion for Release from Contempt Incarceration #290 . The Court denies the motion. A written order will follow. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (jp)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 329 Supplemental Order in Support of the Court's Preliminary Injunction Order and order Appointing Permanent Receiver by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 328 Order DENYING Motion for Release From Incarceration (Dkt. No. #290 ) by Judge Dale S. Fischer (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
December 10, 2018 Filing 327 STATUS REPORT re: Cost Sharing Motion filed by Intervenor Parties Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Ekmekchyan, Pavel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 326 STATUS REPORT RE: COST SHARING MOTION filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #324 APPLICATION. (See Order for Specifics) (rfi)
December 10, 2018 Filing 324 REQUEST for Order for Special Appearance Of Eric J. Wu Or, In The Alternative, Permission For Lead Counsel To Telephonically Appear filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. Request set for hearing on 12/10/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Philip A. Toomey, #2 Proposed Order) (Wu, Eric)
December 6, 2018 Filing 323 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings MONDAY, NOVEMBER 5, 2018 1:39 P.M. re Transcript #322 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Nirenberg, C) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 6, 2018 Filing 322 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on MONDAY, NOVEMBER 5, 2018 1:39 P.M. Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, OFFICIAL REPORTER, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, OFFICIAL REPORTER, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com, or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2019. (Nirenberg, C)
December 3, 2018 Filing 321 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Intervenor DNE Associates, a CA general partnership, re Request for Judicial Notice, #320 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Ruling Motion to Turnover Funds from Trotter Transaction Held by Receiver #319 served on 12/03/2018. (Singer, Rachelle)
December 3, 2018 Filing 320 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Ruling Motion to Turnover Funds from Trotter Transaction Held by Receiver #319 filed by Movant DNE Associates, a CA general partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Singer, Rachelle)
December 3, 2018 Filing 319 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Ruling Motion to Turnover Funds from Trotter Transaction Held by Receiver filed by Intervenor DNE Associates, a CA general partnership. Motion set for hearing on 1/28/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachelle Singer, #2 Declaration of David Zickefoose) (Singer, Rachelle)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Order GRANTING Motion to Intervene (Dkt. No. #298 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
November 30, 2018 Filing 317 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Motion Related Document,, #316 served on November 30, 2018. (Caris, Gary)
November 30, 2018 Filing 316 REPLY TO DNE ASSOCIATES' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING AND AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF RECEIVER'S AND PROFESSIONAL'S FEES AND COSTS FROM JUNE 1, 2018 THROUGH SEPTEMBER 30, 2018 re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from June 1, 2018 through September 30, 2018; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Gary Owen Caris #293 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
November 30, 2018 Filing 315 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER: The application to seal (dkt no. #312 ) is denied without prejudice. Counsel are to refile in the manner required by L.R. 79-5.2.2. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 29, 2018 Filing 314 STIPULATION for Order for Stipulated Permanent Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Ede, Jered)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER RE STIPULATED PERMANENT RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See Order for Specifics. #307 (rfi)
November 28, 2018 Filing 312 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Authorizing Filing of "Exhibit A" to Stipulation for Restraining Order Under Seal filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ede, Jered)
November 27, 2018 Filing 311 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Intervenor DNE Associates, a CA general partnership, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #310 served on 11/27/18. (Singer, Rachelle)
November 27, 2018 Filing 310 OPPOSITION Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from June 1, 2018 through September 30, 2018; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Gary Owen Caris #293 filed by Movant DNE Associates, a CA general partnership. (Singer, Rachelle)
November 27, 2018 Filing 309 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria, re Reply (Motion related) #308 served on November 27, 2018. (Wu, Eric)
November 26, 2018 Filing 308 REPLY In Support of Motion for Release from Contempt filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Wu, Eric)
November 26, 2018 Filing 307 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Ede, Jered)
November 26, 2018 Filing 306 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Release From Contempt Incarceration #290 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
November 26, 2018 Filing 305 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Non-Opposition to Motion, #304 served on November 26, 2018. (Caris, Gary)
November 26, 2018 Filing 304 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #298 Receiver's Response to DNE Associates' Motion for Order Granting Leave to Intervene filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
November 26, 2018 Filing 303 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Declaration (Motion related), #302 , Response in Opposition to Motion, #301 served on November 26, 2018. (Caris, Gary)
November 26, 2018 Filing 302 DECLARATION of Brick Kane In Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Release From Contempt Incarceration #290 Receiver's Opposition to Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria's Motion for Release from Contempt Incarceration filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
November 26, 2018 Filing 301 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Release From Contempt Incarceration #290 Receiver's Opposition to Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria's Motion for Release from Contempt Incarceration filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
November 19, 2018 Filing 300 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Intervenor DNE Associates, a CA general partnership, identifying DNE Associates, David Zickefoose & Eddie R. Fischer. (Singer, Rachelle)
November 19, 2018 Filing 299 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Intervenor DNE Associates, a CA general partnership, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #298 served on 11/19/18. (Singer, Rachelle)
November 19, 2018 Filing 298 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor DNE Associates, a CA general partnership. Motion set for hearing on 12/17/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of Rachelle Singer, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1-5 of Singer Decl. (incl. Prop. Mtn), #3 Declaration Decl. of David Zickefoose, #4 Exhibit Ex. 1-3 of Zickefoose Decl., #5 Proposed Order) (Attorney Rachelle Singer added to party DNE Associates, a CA general partnership(pty:mov)) (Singer, Rachelle)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Order re Motion for Cost Sharing (Dkt. No. #211 ) by Judge Dale S. Fischer (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
November 16, 2018 Filing 296 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from June 1, 2018 through September 30, 2018; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Gary Owen Caris #293 , Declaration (Motion related), #294 , Declaration (Motion related), #295 served on November 16, 2018. (Caris, Gary)
November 16, 2018 Filing 295 DECLARATION of Gary Owen Caris In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from June 1, 2018 through September 30, 2018; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Gary Owen Caris #293 Filing Under Seal Unredacted Billing Records filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
November 16, 2018 Filing 294 DECLARATION of Brick Kane In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from June 1, 2018 through September 30, 2018; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Gary Owen Caris #293 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Caris, Gary)
November 16, 2018 Filing 293 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from June 1, 2018 through September 30, 2018; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Gary Owen Caris in Support Thereof filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/17/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Caris Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Caris, Gary)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, RULE 26F CONFERENCE AND PLAINTIFF'S DEADLINE TO OPPOSE MOTION TO BE RELEASED (DOCKET #29) by Judge Dale S. Fischer, re Stipulation to Continue, #291 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
November 14, 2018 Filing 291 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Plaintiff's Deadline to Oppose Motion to Be Relased [Dkt#290] from November 26, 2018 to January 7, 2019 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ede, Jered)
November 8, 2018 Filing 290 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Release From Contempt Incarceration filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. Motion set for hearing on 12/10/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric J. Wu, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Wu, Eric)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Turnover of Funds (Dkt. No. 240) by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
November 5, 2018 Filing 288 MOTION HEARING (Non-evidentiary) MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING COSTS SHARING MODIFICATION #21 MOTION FOR ORDER FOR TURNOVER OF $185,000 #240 Motion Hearing held before Judge Dale S. Fischer: Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
October 31, 2018 Filing 287 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint,, #278 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wu, Eric)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 286 PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: PRIVILEGED INFORMATION AND MATERIAL ON SORIA CELL PHONE AND AT WELLWORTH PROPERTY by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver re Stipulation for Protective Order #285 . The Court, having reviewed and considered the Stipulation of the parties and finding good cause, hereby approves the parties' Stipulation and enters the Protective Order re: Privileged Information and Material on Soria Cell Phone and at Wellworth Property. (hr)
October 26, 2018 Filing 285 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Wu, Eric)
October 22, 2018 Filing 284 REPLY to Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for APPROVING COST-SHARING MODIFICATION TO THE COURT'S PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND RECEIVERSHIP ORDER #211 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary O. Caris, Esq.)(Ede, Jered)
October 19, 2018 Filing 283 REPLY BRIEF TO: PLAINTIFF NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC'S OPPOSITION TO REBEKAH BRONW'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S REPONSE TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Rebekah Brown to Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #270 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #252 (bp)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 282 TEXT ONLY ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dale S. Fischer: The Motion to Order for Turnover of $185,000.00, set for 10/29/2018, at 1:30 pm is further CONTINUED to 11/5/2018, at 1:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Counsel shall appear on this new date and time. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Order DENYING Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 238, 252 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR TURNOVER OF $185,000 FROM LEECH TISHMAN FSCALDO & LAMPL, LLC by Judge Dale S. Fischer, re Stipulation to Continue,, #276 . (bp)
October 10, 2018 Filing 277 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria, re Stipulation to Continue,, #276 Supplemental Certificate of Service served on October 10, 2018. (Wu, Eric)
October 10, 2018 Filing 276 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Permanent Receiver's Motion for Turnover of $185,000 from Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, LLC from October 22, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. to October 29, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Turnover of $185,000 from Leach Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, LLC #240 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip A Toomey, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Wu, Eric)
October 8, 2018 Filing 275 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for APPROVING COST-SHARING MODIFICATION TO THE COURT'S PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND RECEIVERSHIP ORDER #211 filed by Intervenor Parties Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Ekmekchyan, Pavel)
October 5, 2018 Filing 274 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Request for Judicial Notice, #273 , Objection #272 , Reply (Motion related) #271 served on October 5, 2018. (Caris, Gary)
October 5, 2018 Filing 273 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Turnover of $185,000 from Leach Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, LLC #240 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Caris, Gary)
October 5, 2018 Filing 272 OBJECTIONS to Declaration (Motion related), #268 , Declaration (Motion related), #266 , Reply (Motion related) #271 , Declaration (Motion related), #267 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
October 5, 2018 Filing 271 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Turnover of $185,000 from Leach Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, LLC #240 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
October 3, 2018 Filing 270 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #252 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
October 1, 2018 Filing 269 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria, re Response in Opposition to Motion, #265 , Declaration (Motion related), #268 , Declaration (Motion related), #266 , Declaration (Motion related), #267 served on October 1, 2018. (Toomey, Philip)
October 1, 2018 Filing 268 DECLARATION of Charles Shamash In Opposition To NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Turnover of $185,000 from Leach Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, LLC #240 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Toomey, Philip)
October 1, 2018 Filing 267 DECLARATION of Pete A. Fuscaldo In Opposition To NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Turnover of $185,000 from Leach Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, LLC #240 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Toomey, Philip)
October 1, 2018 Filing 266 DECLARATION of Sanford L. Frey In Opposition To NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Turnover of $185,000 from Leach Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, LLC #240 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Toomey, Philip)
October 1, 2018 Filing 265 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Turnover of $185,000 from Leach Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, LLC #240 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Motion For Turnover of $185,000 From Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, LLC)(Toomey, Philip)
September 28, 2018 Filing 264 OPPOSITION/OBJECTION to Natiostar's MOTION for Order for Sharing of Costs #211 ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Marina Ivanoff in support therefo filed by Interevenor Marina Ivanoff. (jp)
September 28, 2018 Filing 263 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings MONDAY, AUGUST 27, 2018 1:55 P.M. re Transcript #262 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Nirenberg, C) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 28, 2018 Filing 262 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on MONDAY, AUGUST 27, 2018 1:55 P.M. Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, OFFICIAL REPORTER, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, OFFICIAL REPORTER, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com, or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2018. (Nirenberg, C)
September 26, 2018 Filing 260 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Status Report, #259 served on September 26, 2018. (Caris, Gary)
September 26, 2018 Filing 259 STATUS REPORT Regarding Patrick Soria's Compliance with Order Finding Defendants Patrick J. Soria, West H&A LLC, Westwood Legal, and HBSC US in its Capacity as Legal Title Holder Incorporated in Contempt (DOC. 107) filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Caris, Gary)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Ex Parte Application to Continue the Briefing Schedule and Hearing On Plaintiff's Motion #247 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: The hearing on Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC's Motion for an Order Approving Cost-Sharing Modification to the Court's Preliminary Injunction and Receivership Order [Docket No. #211 ] is continued to 11/5/2018. Intervenors' opposition is due on 10/8/2018. Nationstar's reply is due on 10/22/2018. (jp)
September 24, 2018 Filing 254 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Sheri Guerami in place of attorney Jonathan D. Fink filed by Intervenors Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Shahrzad Guerami added to party Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC(pty:intv)) (Guerami, Shahrzad)
September 24, 2018 Filing 253 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Approving Cost-Sharing Modification from October 22, 2018 to December 17, 2018 #247 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
September 21, 2018 Filing 250 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Sheri Guerami in place of attorney Jonathan D. Fink filed by Intervenor Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ekmekchyan, Pavel)
September 21, 2018 Filing 249 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Sheri Guerami in place of attorney Jonathan D. Fink filed by Intervenor Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ekmekchyan, Pavel)
September 21, 2018 Filing 248 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Sheri Guerami in place of attorney Jonathan D. Fink filed by Intervenor Ocwen Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ekmekchyan, Pavel)
September 21, 2018 Filing 247 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Approving Cost-Sharing Modification from October 22, 2018 to December 17, 2018 filed by Intervenors Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pavel Ekmekchyan, #2 Proposed Order) (Ekmekchyan, Pavel)
September 21, 2018 Filing 246 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT : Document No. #242 filed on 9/21/2018 is stricken for failure to comply with Local Rule 5-4.3.4. which require signatures on electronically filed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
September 21, 2018 Filing 245 NOTICE of Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a) or (c) of Third Party Claim brought by Claimants Fay Servicing, LLC; New American Funding; Select Portfolio services, LLC and Selene Finance only filed by Intervenors Fay Servicing, LLC, New American Funding, Select Portfolio Services, LLC, Selene Finance. (Fink, Jonathan)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER GRANTING Marina Ivanoff's Motion to Intervene (Dkt. No. 219) by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
September 21, 2018 Filing 243 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Turnover of $185,000 from Leach Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, LLC #240 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents), #241 served on September 21, 2018. (Caris, Gary)
September 21, 2018 Filing 242 ***STRICKEN SEE DOCUMENT NO. 246*** EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Approving Cost-Sharing Modification from October 22, 2018 to December 17, 2018 filed by Intervenors Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pavel Ekmekchyan, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Pavel Ekmekchyan added to party Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC(pty:intv), Attorney Pavel Ekmekchyan added to party Ocwen Financial Corporation(pty:intv), Attorney Pavel Ekmekchyan added to party Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC(pty:intv), Attorney Pavel Ekmekchyan added to party Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing(pty:intv)) (Ekmekchyan, Pavel) Modified on 9/21/2018 (vv).
September 21, 2018 Filing 241 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Turnover of $185,000 from Leach Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, LLC #240 served on September 21, 2018. (Caris, Gary)
September 21, 2018 Filing 240 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Motion for Turnover of $185,000 from Leach Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, LLC filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/22/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary Owen Caris, #2 Exhibits 1 - 19 to Caris Declaration, #3 Declaration Declaration of Jered T. Ede, #4 Exhibits 1 - 3 to Ede Declaration, #5 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Turnover) (Caris, Gary)
September 21, 2018 Filing 237 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to movant Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Steve Zimmerman at steven.zimmerman@jacksonlewis.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Zimmerman, Steven)
September 20, 2018 Filing 239 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS filed by Defendant Rebekah Brown. (bp)
September 20, 2018 Filing 238 MOTION TO DISMISS: PLAINTIFF FAILED TO RESPOND TO NAMED DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE filed by Defendant Rebekah Brown. Motion set for hearing on 10/22/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (bp)
September 20, 2018 Filing 236 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #231 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The document is stricken. Incorrect event selected. Proposed Order was not submitted as separate attachment. (SEE NOTICE OF FILER OR DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS) Document No. 234.. (bp)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Order Finding Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc. in Civil Contempt of Court by Judge Dale S. Fischer (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
September 17, 2018 Filing 234 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #231 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Substitute Attorney (G-01). Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Please efile Request to Substitute Attorney (G-01). This event Substitute Attorney (G-01) will set the document on the Judge's calendar. See courts website for forms - Request and [Prop] Order. The [Prop] Order is attached as the second attachment to the Request. To find the correct event, search for: Civil Events - Motions and Related Filings - Requests - Substitute Attorney (G-01). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO INTERVENE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
September 14, 2018 Filing 232 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Ex Parte Application for Order Granting Leave to Intervene or, in the Alternative, Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion by Proposed Intervenors, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC; Fay Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation; Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC; and Select Portfolio Services, LLC filed by Intervenors Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Fay Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, Select Portfolio Services, LLC. (Fink, Jonathan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 231 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shahrzad Guerami counsel for Intervenor Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. Adding Sheri Guerami as counsel of record for New Penn Financial, LLC dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Intervenor New Penn Financial, LLC, dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attorney Shahrzad Guerami added to party Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing(pty:intv))(Guerami, Shahrzad)
September 14, 2018 Filing 230 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Carina Gallardo at cgallardo@hallgriffin.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Ede, Jered)
September 13, 2018 Filing 229 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Ex Parte Application for Order Granting Leave to Intervene or, in the Alternative, Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion by Proposed Intervenors, New American Funding and Selene Finance Only filed by Intervenor New American Funding, Selene Finance. (Fink, Jonathan)
September 11, 2018 Filing 228 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene , or in the Alternative, Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion; Declaration of Taylor E. Hubbard in Support Thereof #227 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
September 10, 2018 Filing 227 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Intervene , or in the Alternative, Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion; Declaration of Taylor E. Hubbard in Support Thereof filed by Intervenor Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Fay Servicing, LLC, New American Funding, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, Select Portfolio Services, LLC, Selene Finance, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jonathan Douglas Fink added to party Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC(pty:intv), Attorney Jonathan Douglas Fink added to party Fay Servicing, LLC(pty:intv), Attorney Jonathan Douglas Fink added to party New American Funding(pty:intv), Attorney Jonathan Douglas Fink added to party Ocwen Financial Corporation(pty:intv), Attorney Jonathan Douglas Fink added to party Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC(pty:intv), Attorney Jonathan Douglas Fink added to party Select Portfolio Services, LLC (pty:intv), Attorney Jonathan Douglas Fink added to party Selene Finance(pty:intv), Attorney Jonathan Douglas Fink added to party Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing(pty:intv)) (Fink, Jonathan)
September 10, 2018 Filing 226 OPPOSITION In Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order #219 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Albert, Jessica)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 11/26/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (dp)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER EXPLICITLY ALLOWING THE PERMANENT RECEIVER TO ISSUE CANCELLATIONS OF WILD DOCUMENTS 212 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER EXPLICITLY ALLOWING THE PERMANENT RECEIVER TO ISSUE CANCELLATIONS AND RESCISSIONS OF ASSIGNMENT OF DEED OF TRUST, SUBSTITUTION OF TRUSTEE, DEED OF TRUST, AND TRUSTEE'S DEED UPON SALE #214 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
September 5, 2018 Filing 222 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc.,successor in interest to Hilton Worldwide, Inc. re [Proposed] Order re: Order to Show Cause re: Contempt re: Waldorf Astoria, Beverly Hills re Status Report, #145 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mackey, Thomas)
September 4, 2018 Filing 221 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Attorney Eric J Wu added to party Patrick Joseph Soria(pty:dft))(Wu, Eric)
August 31, 2018 Filing 220 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for APPROVING COST-SHARING MODIFICATION TO THE COURT'S PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND RECEIVERSHIP ORDER #211 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ede, Jered)
August 30, 2018 Filing 219 PLAINTIFF INTERVENOR MARINA IVANOFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION OF MARINA IVANOFF IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Movant Marina Ivanoff. Motion set for hearing on 10/1/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (bp)
August 30, 2018 Filing 218 REPLY to Patrick Joseph Soria's Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for EXPLICITLY ALLOWING THE PERMANENT RECEIVER TO ISSUE CANCELLATIONS AND RESCISSIONS OF ASSIGNMENT OF DEED OF TRUST, SUBSTITUTION OF TRUSTEE, AND TRUSTEES DEED UPON SALE #214 filed by Interested Party Robert West. (Ede, Jered)
August 30, 2018 Filing 217 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for EXPLICITLY ALLOWING THE PERMANENT RECEIVER TO ISSUE CANCELLATIONS AND RESCISSIONS OF ASSIGNMENT OF DEED OF TRUST, SUBSTITUTION OF TRUSTEE, AND TRUSTEES DEED UPON SALE #214 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Albert, Jessica)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR TURNOVER OF FUNDS TO RECEIVER BY BENJAMIN N. STERNBERG AND THE LAW OFFICES OF BENJAMIN N. STERNBERG, APC by Judge Dale S. Fischer, re Stipulation for Order, #208 (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
August 29, 2018 Filing 215 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for EXPLICITLY ALLOWING THE PERMANENT RECEIVER TO ISSUE CANCELLATIONS AND RESCISSIONS OF ASSIGNMENT OF DEED OF TRUST, SUBSTITUTION OF TRUSTEE, AND TRUSTEES DEED UPON SALE #214 filed by Interested Party Robert West. (Ede, Jered)
August 29, 2018 Filing 214 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for EXPLICITLY ALLOWING THE PERMANENT RECEIVER TO ISSUE CANCELLATIONS AND RESCISSIONS OF ASSIGNMENT OF DEED OF TRUST, SUBSTITUTION OF TRUSTEE, AND TRUSTEES DEED UPON SALE Robert West. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jered T Ede added to party Robert West(pty:ip)) (Ede, Jered)
August 29, 2018 Filing 213 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for APPROVING COST-SHARING MODIFICATION TO THE COURT'S PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND RECEIVERSHIP ORDER #211 served on 8/28/18 and 8/29/18. (Ede, Jered)
August 29, 2018 Filing 212 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for EXPLICITLY ALLOWING THE PERMANENT RECEIVER TO ISSUE CANCELLATIONS AND RESCISSIONS OF ASSIGNMENT OF DEED OF TRUST, SUBSTITUTION OF TRUSTEE, DEED OF TRUST, AND TRUSTEES DEED UPON SALE filed by Interested/Affected Party Morgan Picks Two LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/1/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jered T Ede added to party Morgan Picks Two LLC(pty:ip)) (Ede, Jered)
August 28, 2018 Filing 211 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for APPROVING COST-SHARING MODIFICATION TO THE COURT'S PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND RECEIVERSHIP ORDER filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/1/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jered T. Ede, #2 Proposed Order) (Ede, Jered)
August 28, 2018 Filing 209 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Stipulation for Order, #208 served on August 28, 2018. (Caris, Gary)
August 28, 2018 Filing 208 STIPULATION for Order Approving Stipulation for Turnover of Funds to Receiver by Benjamin N. Sternberg and The Law Offices of Benjamin N. Sternberg, APC filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caris, Gary)
August 28, 2018 Filing 207 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria for Court Reporter. Court will contact Camille Banks at cbanks@leechtishman.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Toomey, Philip)
August 27, 2018 Filing 210 Status Conference held before Judge Dale S. Fischer: Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER re Patrick Soria's Claim of Fifth Amendment Privilege by Judge Dale S. Fischer (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING AND AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF RECEIVER'S AND PROFESSIONAL'S FEES AND COSTS FROM INCEPTION OF THE RECEIVERSHIP ESTATE THROUGH MAY 31, 2018 #151 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
August 24, 2018 Filing 204 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Reply #148 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ede, Jered)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #198 Non-Resident Attorney Ryan O. Hemming APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Patrick Joseph Soria, designating Philip A Toomey as local counsel. (lom)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #199 Non-Resident Attorney Jessica K. Albert APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Patrick Joseph Soria, designating Philip A Toomey as local counsel. (lom)
August 16, 2018 Filing 200 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria for Court Reporter. Court will contact Camille Banks at cbanks@leechtishman.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Toomey, Philip)
August 16, 2018 Filing 199 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jessica K. Albert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22269928) filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Toomey, Philip)
August 16, 2018 Filing 198 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan O. Hemminger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22269917) filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Toomey, Philip)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BILLING RECORDS UNDER SEAL AND IN CAMERA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING AND AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF RECEIVER'S AND PROFESSIONAL'S FEES AND COSTS SINCE INCEPTION OF THE RECEIVERSHIP THROUGH MAY 31, 2018 (DOC. 151) by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
August 14, 2018 Filing 197 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Declaration, #195 served on 8/14/2018. (Caris, Gary)
August 14, 2018 Filing 196 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Declaration, #194 served on 8/14/2018. (Caris, Gary)
August 14, 2018 Filing 195 DECLARATION of Gary Owen Caris re Order #190 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from Inception of the Receivership Through May 31, 2018 #151 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
August 14, 2018 Filing 194 DECLARATION of Brick Kane re Order #190 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from Inception of the Receivership Through May 31, 2018 #151 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Caris, Gary)
August 14, 2018 Filing 193 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT: Document No. 192 filed on 8/14/18 is stricken for failure to comply with L.R. 79-5.2.2. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 14, 2018 Filing 192 ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN ** APPLICATION for Leave to file Billing Records Under Seal and In Camera In Support of Motion for Order Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from Inception of the Receivership Through May 31, 2018 (Doc. 151) filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brick Kane, #2 Declaration of Gary Owen Caris, #3 Proposed Order) (Caris, Gary) Modified on 8/14/2018 (dp).
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Ex Parte Application re Receiver Instructions, Fees, and Costs #168 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Re Motion for Order Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs #151 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Re Joint Stipulation for Order Requiring Santa Ana Police Department to Permit Defendant's Counsel to Bring Laptop(s) and External Hard Drive(s) During Vistis #184 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #154 MOTION to Set Aside Default Patrick Joseph Soria Answer now due 9/4/2018. (See order for specifics.) (sbou)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: Re Ex Parte Application re Automatic Stay. See Order for specifics. (dp)
August 10, 2018 Filing 186 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion set for August 13, 2018 off calendar and under submission. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 10, 2018 Filing 185 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): Document No. 182 is stricken. It is not related to this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 9, 2018 Filing 184 Joint STIPULATION for Order Requiring Santa Ana Police Department to Permit Defendant's Counsel to Bring Laptop(s) and External Hard Drive(s) During Visits, filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toomey, Philip)
August 9, 2018 Filing 183 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. correcting Stipulation for Order, #182 (Toomey, Philip)
August 9, 2018 Filing 182 ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN ** Joint STIPULATION for Order Requiring Santa Ana Police Department to Permit Defendant's Counsel to Bring Laptop(s) and External Hard Drive(s) During Visits, filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toomey, Philip) Modified on 8/10/2018 (dp).
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR TURNOVER OF FUNDS TO RECEIVER BY FICSHBACH AND FISCHBACH, A LAW CORPORATION AND JOSEPH FISCHBACK by Judge Dale S. Fischer, re Stipulation for Disbursement of Funds, #176 (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: GRANTING #174 Request to Substitute Attorney Philip A Toomey in place and instead of Patrick Joseph Soria, Pro Se. (shb)
August 7, 2018 Filing 179 REPLY in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Clarification of Suspense of Bankruptcy Order (Dkt 26 in suspended case 2:18-cv-04749) #169 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
August 7, 2018 Filing 178 REPLY in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Modification of Preliminary Injunction and Receivership Order (Dkt 46) #168 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
August 7, 2018 Filing 177 Certificate of Service re: Stipulation for Disbursement of Funds, #176 (Caris, Gary)
August 7, 2018 Filing 176 STIPULATION for Disbursement of Funds to RECEIVER by Fischbach and Fischbach, a Law Corporation and Joseph Fischbach filed by Permanent Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Stipulation for Turnover of Funds)(Caris, Gary)
August 7, 2018 Filing 175 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Modification of Preliminary Injunction and Receivership Order (Dkt 46) #168 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ede, Jered)
August 7, 2018 Filing 174 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Philip A. Toomey in place of attorney Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria, In Pro Se filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Toomey, Philip)
August 7, 2018 Filing 173 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Clarification of Suspense of Bankruptcy Order (Dkt 26 in suspended case 2:18-cv-04749) #169 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Toomey, Philip)
August 7, 2018 Filing 172 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Modification of Preliminary Injunction and Receivership Order (Dkt 46) #168 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Toomey, Philip)
August 6, 2018 Filing 171 Status Conference held before Judge Dale S. Fischer: Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
August 6, 2018 Filing 170 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #144 . #154 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sandford L. Frey, #2 Declaration of Philip A. Toomey, #3 Declaration of Ryan O. Hemminger, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ryan Hemminger, #5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Ryan Hemminger)(Toomey, Philip)
August 6, 2018 Filing 169 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Clarification of Suspense of Bankruptcy Order (Dkt 26 in suspended case 2:18-cv-04749) filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Ede, Jered)
August 6, 2018 Filing 168 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Modification of Preliminary Injunction and Receivership Order (Dkt 46) filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jered T. Ede, #2 Declaration of Donna Williams, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Ede, Jered)
August 6, 2018 Filing 167 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT : Document Nos. 165 and 166 filed on 8/3/18 are stricken for failure to comply with this Courts standing order and Local Rules 5-4.4.1which requires that parties submitting proposed orders or other proposed documents that require a judges signature must comply with L.R. 5-4.4.1 and L.R. 5-4.4.2 and be filed as an attachment to the electronically filed document THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 3, 2018 Filing 166 ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN ** EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Clarification of Suspense of Bankruptcy Order (Dkt 26 in suspended case 2:18-cv-04749) filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Ede, Jered) Modified on 8/6/2018 (dp).
August 3, 2018 Filing 165 ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN ** EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Modification of Preliminary Injunction and Receivership Order (Dkt 46) filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jered T. Ede, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jered T. Ede, #3 Declaration of Donna Williams) (Ede, Jered) Modified on 8/6/2018 (dp).
August 3, 2018 Filing 164 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings WEDNESDAY, MAY 30, 2018 1:46 P.M.; and WEDNESDAY, JUNE 6, 2018 3:06 P.M. re Transcript #163 , #162 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Nirenberg, C) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 3, 2018 Filing 163 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on WEDNESDAY, JUNE 6, 2018 3:06 P.M. Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, OFFICIAL REPORTER, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, OFFICIAL REPORTER, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com, PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/24/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2018. (Nirenberg, C)
August 3, 2018 Filing 162 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on WEDNESDAY, MAY 30, 2018 1:46 P.M. Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, OFFICIAL REPORTER, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, OFFICIAL REPORTER, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com, or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/24/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2018. (Nirenberg, C)
August 3, 2018 Filing 161 STATUS REPORT to the court re: Contempt filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
August 2, 2018 Filing 160 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Toomey, Philip)
July 30, 2018 Filing 159 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #144 . #154 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
July 30, 2018 Filing 158 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #144 . #154 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
July 27, 2018 Filing 157 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria for Court Reporter. Court will contact Esther Choe at echoe@leechtishman.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Toomey, Philip)
July 27, 2018 Filing 156 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re Report #155 served on July 27, 2018. (Caris, Gary)
July 27, 2018 Filing 155 REPORT OF RECEIVER REPORT of ASSET TRACING DATED JULY 27, 2018 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Caris, Gary)
July 18, 2018 Filing 154 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #144 . filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. Motion set for hearing on 8/20/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip Toomey, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Philip A Toomey added to party Patrick Joseph Soria(pty:dft)) (Toomey, Philip)
July 17, 2018 Filing 153 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Carina Gallardo at cgallardo@hallgriffin.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Ede, Jered)
July 10, 2018 Filing 152 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from Inception of the Receivership Through May 31, 2018 #151 served on July 10, 2018. (Caris, Gary)
July 10, 2018 Filing 151 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from Inception of the Receivership Through May 31, 2018 filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/13/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Caris Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to Caris Declaration, #3 Declaration of Brick Kane in Support of Motion for Order Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs, #4 Exhibit 1 to Kane Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2 to Kane Declaration, #6 Exhibit 3 to Kane Declaration, #7 Proposed Order) (Caris, Gary)
July 10, 2018 Filing 150 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC, re Reply #148 , Declaration #149 served on July 10, 2018. (Ede, Jered)
July 9, 2018 Filing 149 DECLARATION of Jered T. Ede re Reply #148 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
July 9, 2018 Filing 148 REPLY filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC to Status Report, #145 (Ede, Jered)
July 9, 2018 Filing 147 RESPONSE filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLCto Status Report, #145 -- Permanent Receiver's Response to Status Report Regarding Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc.'s Investigation Regarding Order to Show Cause re Contempt; Declaration of Gary Owen Caris in Support Thereof (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Caris, Gary)
July 3, 2018 Filing 146 RESPONSE TO: COMPLAINT FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND ALL OTHER CLAIMS AGAISNT THE DEFENDANT REBEKAH BROWN omplaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Rebekah Brown.(bp)
June 29, 2018 Filing 145 STATUS REPORT Regarding Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc.'s Investigation and Responses Regarding Order to Show Cause Re Contempt filed by Unknown Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Darren Lopez)(Mackey, Thomas)
June 27, 2018 Filing 144 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Patrick Joseph Soria (bp)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATIO N FOR AN ORDER EXPLICITLY ALLOWING THE PERMANENT RECEIVER TO ISSUE CANCELLATION AND RESCISSION OF ASSIGNMENT OF DEED OF TRUST #141 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
June 26, 2018 Filing 142 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
June 26, 2018 Filing 141 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Explicitly Allowing the Permanent Receiver to Issue Cancellation and Recission of Assignment of Deed of Trust filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ede, Jered)
June 15, 2018 Filing 140 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Gricela Mendoza, Bernard Germani (bp)
June 13, 2018 Filing 139 Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
June 13, 2018 Filing 138 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC, upon Defendant Jenny De Leon served on 6/11/2018, answer due 7/2/2018. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ede, Jered)
June 13, 2018 Filing 137 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Bernard Germani filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
June 13, 2018 Filing 136 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Gricela Mendoza filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER DENYING Ex ParteApplication for Sanctions (Dkt.No. #72 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (et)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER DENYING PatrickSorias Request for Permissionto Electronically File by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (et)
June 11, 2018 Filing 131 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings MONDAY, MAY 7, 2018 1:31 P.M. re Transcript #130 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Nirenberg, C) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 11, 2018 Filing 130 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on MONDAY, MAY 7, 2018 1:31 P.M. Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, OFFICIAL REPORTER, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, OFFICIAL REPORTER, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com, or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/10/2018. (Nirenberg, C)
June 8, 2018 Filing 133 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Patrick Joseph Soria, re Request for Judicial Notice #119 , Request for Judicial Notice, #114 , Request for Judicial Notice #120 served Gary O Caris, served on 6/5/18. (bp)
June 8, 2018 Filing 132 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Patrick Joseph Soria, re Request for Judicial Notice #119 , Request for Judicial Notice, #114 , Request for Judicial Notice #118 , Request for Judicial Notice #120 served Gary O. Caris on behlf of Robb Evans & Associates served on 6/5/18. (bp)
June 8, 2018 Filing 129 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC, upon Defendant Bernard Germani served on 4/24/2018, answer due 5/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Edwin Acevedo ownder of Lotus Group Real Estate in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ede, Jered)
June 8, 2018 Filing 125 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 18-55728 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #115 as to Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (lom)
June 7, 2018 Filing 128 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Patrick Joseph Soria, re Request for Judicial Notice #119 , Request for Judicial Notice, #114 , Request for Judicial Notice #118 , Request for Judicial Notice #120 . Served Timothy A. Burnett served on 6/5/18. (bp)
June 7, 2018 Filing 127 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Patrick Joseph Soria, re Request for Judicial Notice #119 , Request for Judicial Notice, #114 , Request for Judicial Notice #118 , Request for Judicial Notice #120 . Served Cheyenne Sarah Schneider, served on 6/5/18. (bp)
June 7, 2018 Filing 126 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Patrick Joseph Soria, re Request for Judicial Notice #119 , Request for Judicial Notice, #114 , Request for Judicial Notice #118 , Request for Judicial Notice #120 . Served Howard Hall, served on 6/5/18. (bp)
June 7, 2018 Filing 124 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Patrick Joseph Soria, re Request for Judicial Notice #119 , Request for Judicial Notice, #114 , Request for Judicial Notice #118 , Request for Judicial Notice #120 . Served Sanford Frey on 6/5/18. (bp)
June 7, 2018 Filing 123 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Patrick Joseph Soria, re Request for Judicial Notice #119 , Request for Judicial Notice, #114 , Request for Judicial Notice #118 , Request for Judicial Notice #120 . Served Jane M. Kutepova, served on 6/5/18. (bp)
June 7, 2018 Filing 122 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Patrick Joseph Soria, re Request for Judicial Notice #119 , Request for Judicial Notice, #114 , Request for Judicial Notice #118 , Request for Judicial Notice #120 . Served Jered T. Ede on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage, LLC on 6/5/18. (bp)
June 7, 2018 Filing 121 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Patrick Joseph Soria, re Request for Judicial Notice #119 , Request for Judicial Notice, #114 , Request for Judicial Notice #118 , Request for Judicial Notice #120 served on 6/5/18. (bp)
June 7, 2018 Filing 120 REQUESTING JUDICIAL NOTICE BE TAKEN filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (bp)
June 7, 2018 Filing 119 REQUESTING JUDICIAL NOTICE BE TAKEN filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (bp)
June 6, 2018 Filing 118 NOTICE OF REQUEST AND REQUEST THAT JUDICIAL NOTICE BE TAKEN (FED.EIVID.R.201(C)(2) filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4)(bp)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 FURTHER ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT AS TO DEFENDANTS PATRICK J. SORIA, WEST H&A LLC, WESTWOOD LEGAL, and HBSC US IN ITS CAPACITY AS LEGAL TITLE HOLDER INCORPORATED AND ORDER DETAINING DEFENDANT SORIA UNTIL HE PURGES HIMSELF OF CONTEMPT by Judge Dale S. Fischer (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
June 6, 2018 Filing 116 Hearing on Orders to Show Cause re Contempt Hearing held before Judge Dale S. Fischer: Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
June 5, 2018 Filing 115 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. Appeal of Order #46 Filed On: 5/7/18; Entered On: 5/7/18; Filing fee $505 paid, receipt number LA172438. (mat)
June 5, 2018 Filing 114 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12, #12 Part 13)(bp)
June 5, 2018 Filing 113 REPORT filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jered T. Ede[Part 1], #2 Declaration of Jered T. Ede[Part 2], #3 Declaration of Neil Broom, #4 Declaration of Brick Kane, #5 Proof of Service)(Ede, Jered)
June 5, 2018 APPEAL FEE PAID: As to Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria; Receipt Number: LA172438 in the amount of $505. (rsm)
June 4, 2018 Filing 112 **SEALED**DECLARATION OF BRICK KANE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION for Order for APPLICATION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW #110 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (bp)
June 4, 2018 Filing 111 **SEALED**DECLARATION OF JARED T. EDE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION for Order for APPLICATION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW #110 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (bp)
June 4, 2018 Filing 110 **SEALED** APPLICATION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (bp)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 (IN CAMERA AND UNDER SEAL) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER DIRECTING WALDORF ASTORIA, BEVERLY HILLS, TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT'S ORDER (DKT. NO. 46) AND FOR AN OSC RE CONTEMPT RE: SAME #72 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (bp)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER FINDING DEFENDANTS PATRICK J. SORIA, WEST H&A LLC, WESTWOOD LEGAL, andHBSC US IN ITS CAPACITY AS LEGAL TITLE HOLDER INCORPORATED IN CONTEMPT by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FUR SPECIFIC DETAILS) Soria, West H&A, Westwood and HUCLTH were and are ordered to appear before this Court on Wednesday, June 6, 2018, at 3:00 p.m. for a further hearing on their compliance with the above conditions of purging this contempt and for further contempt proceedings. (yl)
May 31, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order Finding Defendants PATRICK J. SORIA, WEST H&A LLC, WESTWOOD LEGAL, and HBSC US IN ITS CAPACITY AS LEGAL TITLE HOLDER INCORPORATED in Contempt re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Contempt against Patrick Joseph Soria, Stephen Mehdian aka Steve Median, and Creativenote, Inc. #56 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ede, Jered)
May 30, 2018 Filing 100 DECLARATION of Sandford L. Frey filed solely in support of Patrick Soria's Request for Continuance of Contempt Proceedings in Order to Retain Counsel EX PARTE APPLICATION for Contempt against Patrick Joseph Soria, Stephen Mehdian aka Steve Median, and Creativenote, Inc. #56 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Frey, Sandford)
May 29, 2018 Filing 105 RESPONSE TO: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT REBEKAH BROWN,AN INDIVIDUAL; DECLARATION OF JERED T. EDE, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria (yl)
May 29, 2018 Filing 104 OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT AND MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE #50 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (yl)
May 29, 2018 Filing 103 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. The Opposition to Order to Show Cause re Contempt and Motion for Continuance was served on 5/29/2018. (yl)
May 29, 2018 Filing 102 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. The Motion Requesting Relief Sought was served on 5/29/2018. (yl)
May 29, 2018 Filing 101 REQUESTING JUDICIAL NOTICE BE TAKEN filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (yl)
May 29, 2018 Filing 99 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT: Document No. 98 filed on 5/29/18 is stricken for failure to comply with L.R. 5-4.3.1 - which requires that the PDF image for a document filed with the Court must be created by using word processing software and published to PDF. PDF images created by scanning paper documents are prohibited. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 29, 2018 Filing 98 ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN ** DECLARATION of Sandford L. Frey filed solely in support of Patrick Soria's Request for Continuance of Contempt Proceedings in Order to Retain Counsel EX PARTE APPLICATION for Contempt against Patrick Joseph Soria, Stephen Mehdian aka Steve Median, and Creativenote, Inc. #56 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Frey, Sandford) Modified on 5/29/2018 (dp).
May 29, 2018 Filing 97 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT: Document No. 92 filed on 5/25/18 is stricken for failure to comply with L.R. 5-4.3.1 - which requires that the PDF image for a document filed with the Court must be created by using word processing software and published to PDF. PDF images created by scanning paper documents are prohibited. In addition, counsel failed to comply Local Rules 5-4.4.1, 5-4.4.2 and 5-4.5 which require that parties submitting proposed orders or other proposed documents that require a judges signature must comply with L.R. 5-4.4.1 and L.R. 5-4.4.2 and be filed as an attachment to the electronically filed document THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 29, 2018 Filing 96 DECLARATION of Sandford L. Frey in support of First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Chapter 11 Case Opening Documents #92 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Frey, Sandford)
May 25, 2018 Filing 95 DECLARATION of Brick Kane re Reply (Motion related), #90 Supplemental filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
May 25, 2018 Filing 94 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT: Document No. 93 filed on 5/25/18 is stricken. It is not an ex parte application; it is a declaration in support of an ex parte application. Counsel to refile properly. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 25, 2018 Filing 93 ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN ** First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Chapter 11 Case Opening Documents filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Frey, Sandford) Modified on 5/25/2018 (dp).
May 25, 2018 Filing 92 First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Chapter 11 Case Opening Documents filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Frey, Sandford)
May 25, 2018 Filing 91 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE of Documents in Support of Order to Show Cause as to Why Defendant and Non-Parties Should not be Held in Contempt filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Opposition to Defendant Soria's Request for Judicial Notice)(Ede, Jered)
May 25, 2018 Filing 90 REPLY In Support of Orders to Show Cause [DKT NOS. 50&80] as to Why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jered T. Ede, #2 Exhibit 3-13, #3 Exhibit 14-28, #4 Exhibit 29-69, #5 Exhibit 70-76, #6 Declaration of Brick Kane)(Ede, Jered)
May 25, 2018 Filing 89 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Westwood Legal, a California Corporation (bp)
May 25, 2018 Filing 88 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Rebekah Brown, an individual, BLG PC National by Brighton Legal Group, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Brighton Legal Group, PC, a dissolved California Corporation, Camden Legal Group PC, Christina Wilmington Global Asset Corp., a Delaware Corporation (bp)
May 25, 2018 Filing 87 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to HSBC US in its capacity as Legal Title Holder Incorporated, a Delaware Corporation, Warranted Effectuation of Substitute Transferee Inc, aka W.E.S.T. Inc., a Delaware Corporation, West H&A, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, Tamyra White, an individual, Westward Legal, a California Corporation (bp)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Requiring Counsel to Refile the Ex Parte Application for Withdrawal of Reference as to Bankruptcy Action 18-112229 as a New Action in this Court by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
May 24, 2018 Filing 84 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael C. Jackson, an individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Ede, Jered)
May 24, 2018 Filing 83 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC, on PATRICK SORIA re Order Entering Preliminary Injunction and assigning Permanent Receiver; Civil Minutes served on 05/09/2018. (Ede, Jered)
May 23, 2018 Filing 85 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria, served request for permission for electronic case filing; and proposed order granting request for permission for electronic case filing on 5/23/18. (bp)
May 23, 2018 Filing 82 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Deutsche Mellon National Asset, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company (bp)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order GRANTING Ex Parte Application to Withdraw Reference; Order GRANTING Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause re Contempt by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
May 22, 2018 Filing 79 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (pso)
May 22, 2018 Filing 78 POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO OSC RE CONTEMPT JUNCTION; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE RE NATIONSTAR'S FRAUDULENT ACTIVITIES; REQUEST FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL IF INJUNCTION NOT MODIFIED #50 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (pso)
May 22, 2018 Filing 77 OPPOSITION to First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Sanctions Plaintiff's Counsel for Failure to Abide by LR 5.2-1 Filed by Attorney Joseph S. Fischbach on behalf of himself #72 Response to Joseph S. Fischbach's Ex Parte Application for Order Imposing Sanctions and Disqualifying Law Firm Representing Plaintiff for Violation of Redaction Rules on Confidentiality filed by Receiver Robb Evans and Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Brick Kane in Response to Ex Parte Application, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Brick Kane)(Attorney Gary O Caris added to party Robb Evans and Associates LLC(pty:rc))(Caris, Gary)
May 22, 2018 Filing 76 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants BLG PC National by Brighton Legal Group, Inc., Brighton Legal Group, PC, Rebekah Brown, Camden Legal Group, PC, Christiana Wilmington Global Asset Corp., Deutsche Mellon National Asset, LLC, HSBC US in its Capacity as Legal Title Holder Incorporated, Warranted Effectuation of Substitute Transferee Inc, West H&A, LLC, Westward Legal, Westwood Legal, Tamyra White filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 HBSC US in its Capacity as Legal Title Holder Incorporated, #2 Warranted Effectuation of Substitute Transferee Inc aka W.E.S.T Inc, #3 West H&A, LLC, #4 Tamyra White, an Individual, #5 Westward Legal, a California Corporation, #6 Rebekah Brown, #7 BLG PC National by Brighton Legal Group, Inc., #8 Brighton Legal Group, PC, a Dissolved California Corporation, #9 Camden Legal Group PC, a Dissolved California Corporation, #10 Christiana Wilmington Global Asset Corp., a Delaware Corporation, #11 Westwood Legal, a California Corporation) (Ede, Jered)
May 22, 2018 Filing 75 OPPOSITION re: First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Sanctions Plaintiff's Counsel for Failure to Abide by LR 5.2-1 Filed by Attorney Joseph S. Fischbach on behalf of himself #72 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Objections to Evidence Filed in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Imposing Sanctions and Disqualifying Plaintiff's Counsel)(Ede, Jered)
May 21, 2018 Filing 74 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Attorney Joseph S. Fischbach as courtesy for Defendant Soria in pro se filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21)(Fischbach, Joseph)
May 21, 2018 Filing 73 Opposition in opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Contempt against Patrick Joseph Soria, Stephen Mehdian aka Steve Median, and Creativenote, Inc. #56 filed by Attorney Joseph S. Fischbach as courtesy for Defendant Soria in pro se filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Fischbach, Joseph)
May 21, 2018 Filing 72 First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Sanctions Plaintiff's Counsel for Failure to Abide by LR 5.2-1 Filed by Attorney Joseph S. Fischbach on behalf of himself filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) (Attorney Joseph Steven Fischbach added to party Patrick Joseph Soria(pty:dft)) (Fischbach, Joseph)
May 21, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re First APPLICATION to Withdraw Incorrectly Filed Reply To Opposition to Application to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Action Reply (Motion related) #66 #70 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Kutepova, Jane)
May 21, 2018 Filing 70 First APPLICATION to Withdraw Incorrectly Filed Reply To Opposition to Application to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Action Reply (Motion related) #66 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Kutepova, Jane)
May 20, 2018 Filing 69 REPLY in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Withdraw Reference as to 18-bk-112229-mt #52 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kutepova, Jane)
May 20, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW THE REFERENCE TO THE BANKRUPTCY ACTION IN RE SORIA, 18-bk-11229-MT (DOCKET 66) filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Kutepova, Jane)
May 18, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Contempt against Patrick Joseph Soria, Stephen Mehdian aka Steve Median, and Creativenote, Inc. #56 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
May 18, 2018 Filing 66 REPLY in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Withdraw Reference as to 18-bk-112229-mt #52 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
May 18, 2018 Filing 65 Opposition Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Withdraw Reference as to 18-bk-112229-mt #52 (corrected) filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Frey, Sandford)
May 17, 2018 Filing 64 Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
May 17, 2018 Filing 63 DECLARATION of Sandford L. Frey Opposition EX PARTE APPLICATION to Withdraw Reference as to 18-bk-112229-mt #52 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Frey, Sandford)
May 17, 2018 Filing 62 Opposition Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Withdraw Reference as to 18-bk-112229-mt #52 filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (Frey, Sandford)
May 17, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. correcting Declaration (Motion related), #58 , Declaration (Motion related), #57 , Notice of Related Case(s) #55 , Declaration (Motion related) #53 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Withdraw Reference as to 18-bk-112229-mt #52 re: Misnomer Bankrutpcy Case Number (Ede, Jered)
May 17, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. Related Case(s): 1:18-bk-11229 MT (Frey, Sandford)
May 17, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria, (Attorney Sandford L Frey added to party Patrick Joseph Soria(pty:dft))(Frey, Sandford)
May 16, 2018 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Brick Kane in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Contempt against Patrick Joseph Soria, Stephen Mehdian aka Steve Median, and Creativenote, Inc. #56 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Withdraw Reference as to 18-bk-112229-mt #52 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
May 16, 2018 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Jered T. Ede in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Contempt against Patrick Joseph Soria, Stephen Mehdian aka Steve Median, and Creativenote, Inc. #56 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Withdraw Reference as to 18-bk-112229-mt #52 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
May 16, 2018 Filing 56 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Contempt against Patrick Joseph Soria, Stephen Mehdian aka Steve Median, and Creativenote, Inc. filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ede, Jered)
May 16, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC Nationstar Mortgage LLC. in Support of Ex Parte Application to Withdraw Reference Related Case(s): 18-bk-112229-mt (Ede, Jered)
May 16, 2018 Filing 54 Amended Certificate of Interested Parties filed in Support of Ex Parte Application for Withdrawal of Reference NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC Nationstar Mortgage LLC, identifying see form. (Ede, Jered)
May 16, 2018 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Jane Kutepova in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Withdraw Reference as to 18-bk-112229-mt #52 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
May 16, 2018 Filing 52 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Withdraw Reference as to 18-bk-112229-mt filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ede, Jered)
May 15, 2018 Filing 51 Notice of Bankruptcy Filing filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria (Frey, Sandford)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY DEFENDANTS PATRICK J. SORIA, WEST H&A LLC, WESTWOOD LEGAL, and HBSC US IN ITS CAPACITY AS LEGAL TITLE HOLDER INCORPORATED, SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Dale S. Fischer: This Order to Show Cause re: Preliminary Injunction #42 came on for hearing on 5/7/2018 at 1:30 PM. IT IS ORDERED THAT: (1) The Order to Show Cause hearing is scheduled for 6/11/2018 at 1:30 PM. (2) Defendants Patrick J. Soria, West H&A LLC, Westwood, and HUCLTH shall file any Opposition to the Order to Show Cause on and/or by 5/21/2018. (3) Nationstar shall file any reply to a Defendant's Opposition to the Order to Show Cause on and/or by 5/29/2018. (4) Defendants Patrick J. Soria, West H&A LLC, Westwood, and HUCLTH shall file any Supplemental Opposition to the Order to Show Cause on and/or by 6/4/2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the Los Angeles District Attorney's Office, as well as the Los Angeles Sheriff's Department, cooperate with the Appointed Receiver and no later than 6/12/2018, provide, at the Receivership's expense, copies of the computer hard drives and any documents seized from Defendants to the Appointed Receiver Brick Kane. See document for further details. (gk)
May 9, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Show Cause Hearing - optional html form, #48 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ede, Jered)
May 7, 2018 Filing 48 MINUTES OF Hearing on Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction held before Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court makes certain orders as set forth on the record, and sets a briefing scheduling for the order to Show Cause re Contempt. The matter is under submission and a written ruling will issue. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (lom)
May 7, 2018 Filing 47 Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ENTERING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS AND APPOINTING A PERMANENT RECEIVER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
May 7, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION AND NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER DISSOLVING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria. (lom)
May 7, 2018 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Timothy A. Burnett, Esq. re Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #20 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Burnett, Timothy)
May 7, 2018 Filing 43 DECLARATION of David Temple re Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #20 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Burnett, Timothy)
May 4, 2018 Filing 42 APPLICATION for Order for to Show Cause as to Why Defendants Should Not Be Held in Contempt filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Application set for hearing on 5/7/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Ede, Jered)
May 4, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re: Proposed Order Entering Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants and Appointing a Permanent Receiver re Response #39 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ede, Jered)
May 4, 2018 Filing 40 DECLARATION of David Brooks re Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #20 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
May 4, 2018 Filing 39 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLCto Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #20 Supplemental, to the OSC re: Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jered T. Ede in Support)(Ede, Jered)
May 4, 2018 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Miguel and Maria Aguilera re Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #20 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
May 4, 2018 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Marianna Narovlansky re Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #20 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
May 4, 2018 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Mark Narovlansky re Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #20 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
May 4, 2018 Filing 35 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLCto Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #20 and Notice of Non-Opposition by Defendants re: OSC Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue and Permanent Receiver Should Not Be Appointed (Ede, Jered)
May 4, 2018 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC, upon Defendant Michael C. Jackson served on 4/30/2018, answer due 5/21/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael C. Jackson, an individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ede, Jered)
May 4, 2018 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC, upon Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria served on 5/2/2018, answer due 5/23/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Patrick Joseph Soria, an individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ede, Jered)
May 4, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE Errata re Declaration of Gary Owen Caris in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Modifying Temporary Restraining Order and Appointing a Temporary Receiver filed by Temporary Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver. (Caris, Gary)
May 4, 2018 Filing 31 TEMPORARY RECEIVER'S INITIAL REPORT TO THE COURT REPORT of TEMPORARY RECEIVER filed by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver. (Caris, Gary)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #29 EX PARTE APPLICATION for TRO (dp)
May 1, 2018 Filing 29 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Modifying Existing Temporary Restraining Order and Order Appointing a Temporary Receiver filed by Temporary Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brick Kane in Support of Ex Parte Application, #2 Declaration of Gary Owen Caris in Support of Ex Parte Application, #3 Declaration of Jered Ede, #4 Proposed Order Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Order Modifying Temporary Restraining Order and Order Appointing a Temporary Receiver) (Caris, Gary)
May 1, 2018 Filing 28 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT: Document No. 27 filed on 5/1/18 is stricken for failure to comply with L.R. 5-4.3.1 - which requires that the PDF image for a document filed with the Court must be created by using word processing software and published to PDF. PDF images created by scanning paper documents are prohibited. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 1, 2018 Filing 27 ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN ** EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Modify Existing Temporary Restraining Order and Order Appointing a Temporary Receiver filed by Temporary Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Brick Kane in Support of Ex Parte Application, #2 Declaration Declaration of Gary Owen Caris in Support of Ex Parte Application, #3 Declaration Declaration of Jered Ede, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application) (Attorney Gary O Caris added to party Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver(pty:rc)) (Caris, Gary) Modified on 5/1/2018 (dp).
May 1, 2018 Filing 26 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed Nationstar Mortgage LLC, upon Plaintiff BLG PC National by Brighton Legal Group, Inc. served on 4/24/2018, answer due 5/15/2018; Brighton Legal Group, PC served on 4/24/2018, answer due 5/15/2018; Rebekah Brown served on 4/24/2018, answer due 5/15/2018; Camden Legal Group, PC served on 4/24/2018, answer due 5/15/2018; Christiana Wilmington Global Asset Corp. served on 4/24/2018, answer due 5/15/2018; Deutsche Mellon National Asset, LLC served on 4/24/2018, answer due 5/15/2018; HSBC US in its Capacity as Legal Title Holder Incorporated served on 4/25/2018, answer due 5/16/2018; Cynthia Lara served on 4/24/2018, answer due 5/15/2018; Gricela Mendoza served on 4/26/2018, answer due 5/17/2018; Warranted Effectuation of Substitute Transferee Inc served on 4/24/2018, answer due 5/15/2018; West H&A, LLC served on 4/24/2018, answer due 5/15/2018; Westward Legal served on 4/24/2018, answer due 5/15/2018; Westwood Legal served on 4/24/2018, answer due 5/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Brighton Legal Group PC, #2 Westwood Legal, #3 Camden Legal Group PC, #4 Christiana Wilmington Global Asset Corp., #5 Deutsche Mellon National Asset, LLC, #6 Warranted Effectuation of Substitution Transferee Inc. aka W.E.S.T. Inc., #7 West H&A, LLC, #8 Westward Legal, #9 HBSC US In Its Capacity as Legal Title Holder Incorporated, #10 Cynthia Lara, #11 Rebekah Brown, #12 Grisela Mendoza)(Ede, Jered)
April 27, 2018 Filing 25 Oath of Officer filed by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver re: Bond #24 (Caris, Gary)
April 27, 2018 Filing 24 Undertaking for Receiver BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Receiver Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver (Caris, Gary)
April 26, 2018 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC, upon Defendant Patrick Joseph Soria served on 4/24/2018, answer due 5/15/2018; Ryan Alexander Urquizu served on 4/24/2018, answer due 5/15/2018; Tamyra White served on 4/25/2018, answer due 5/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christian Soria; Ryan Alexander Urquizu; Tamyra White in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service as to Ryan Alexander Urquizu, #2 Proof of Service as to Tamyra White)(Ede, Jered)
April 25, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 re: Misnomer Company Name (Ede, Jered)
April 24, 2018 Filing 21 Undertaking BOND in the amount of $ $10,000 & $5,000 posted by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Attachments: #1 Undertaking of Bond) (Ede, Jered)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITH ASSET FREEZE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE; GRANTING NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY RECEIVER AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF; AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PERMANENT RECEIVER SHOULD NOT BE APPOINTED by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
April 20, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Timothy A Burnett counsel for Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Changing firm name to Hall Griffin LLP. Changing e-mail to tburnett@hallgriffin.com. Filed by plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Burnett, Timothy)
April 18, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Jane M. Kutepova counsel for Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Changing firm name to Hall Griffin LLP. Changing e-mail to jkutepova@hallgriffin.com. Filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Kutepova, Jane)
April 17, 2018 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preventing Defendants from Furthering Illegal Schemes #9 SUPPLEMENTAL filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Ede, Jered)
April 17, 2018 Filing 16 REPLY to Order Denying Nationstar's Ex Parte re TRO EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preventing Defendants from Furthering Illegal Schemes #9 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jered T. Ede, #2 Declaration of Nationstar Mortgage LLC, #3 Proposed Order)(Ede, Jered)
April 13, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Cheyenne Sarah Schneider counsel for Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Changing Firm Name to Hall Griffin LLP. Changing e-mail to cschneider@hallgriffin.com. Filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Schneider, Cheyenne)
April 13, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Jered T Ede counsel for Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Changing Firm Name to Hall Griffin LLP. Changing e-mail to jede@hallgriffin.com. Filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLP. (Ede, Jered)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Denying Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order #9 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dp)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Percy Anderson, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:12-cv-06147 PA (MRWx) (esa)
April 12, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preventing Defendants from Furthering Illegal Schemes #9 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
April 12, 2018 Filing 9 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Preventing Defendants from Furthering Illegal Schemes filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Ex Parte Application set for hearing on 4/16/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Index of Individuals, #3 Index of Private Exhibits, #4 Declaration of Jane M. Kutepova, #5 Declaration of Jered T. Ede, #6 Declaration of Nationstar, #7 Declaration of Georlen Spangler, #8 Declaration of Dwight Spence, #9 Ex Parte to Appoint Temporary Receiver, #10 Recommendation for Temporary Receiver, #11 Proposed Order) (Ede, Jered)
April 12, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants BLG PC National by Brighton Legal Group, Inc., Brighton Legal Group, PC, Rebekah Brown, Camden Legal Group, PC, Elba Chavez, Christiana Wilmington Global Asset Corp., Jenny De Leon, Deutsche Mellon National Asset, LLC, Roger Franklin, Bernard Germani, HSBC US in its Capacity as Legal Title Holder Incorporated, Michael C. Jackson, Cynthia Lara, F. Martinez, Gricela Mendoza, George Wesley Pierce, Jr., Patrick Joseph Soria, Ryan Alexander Urquizu, Warranted Effectuation of Substitute Transferee Inc, West H&A, LLC, Westward Legal, Westwood Legal and Tamyra White. (jtil)
April 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil)
April 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Related Case(s): 2:12-cv-06147 (Ede, Jered)
April 11, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
April 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC, (Ede, Jered)
April 11, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Ede, Jered)
April 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21571256 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attorney Jered T Ede added to party Nationstar Mortgage LLC(pty:pla))(Ede, Jered)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Patrick Joseph Soria et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Wesley Pierce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebekah Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westwood Legal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Germani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden Legal Group, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westward Legal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Joseph Soria
Represented By: Joseph Steven Fischbach
Represented By: Sandford L Frey
Represented By: Philip A Toomey
Represented By: Ryan O Hemminger
Represented By: Jessica K Albert
Represented By: Eric J Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr F. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elba Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West H&A, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny De Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamyra White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Mellon National Asset, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC US in its Capacity as Legal Title Holder Incorporated
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gricela Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brighton Legal Group, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLG PC National by Brighton Legal Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Lara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warranted Effectuation of Substitute Transferee Inc, AKA W.E.S.T. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Alexander Urquizu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christiana Wilmington Global Asset Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warranted Effectuation of Substitute Transferee Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jeremy L Burkhardt
Represented By: Jeremy L. Burkhardt
Represented By: Robert F Conte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.E.S.T. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Jered T Ede
Represented By: Jane M Kutepova
Represented By: Timothy A Burnett
Represented By: Howard D Hall
Represented By: Cheyenne Sarah Schneider
Represented By: Patrick Jeffrey Kane
Represented By: Kayo Manson-Tompkins
Represented By: Bradford E Klein
Represented By: Mark S Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for The Holders of the First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-FF10 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-FF10
Represented By: Mark S Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Temporary Receiver
Represented By: Gary O Caris
Represented By: Ashley R Fickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Robb Evans and Associates LLC
Represented By: Gary O Caris
Represented By: Anum Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Robert West
Represented By: Jered T Ede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Morgan Picks Two LLC
Represented By: Jered T Ede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee Formerly Known as Bankers Trust Company of California, N.A., Not in its Individual Capacity but Solely as Trustee, or its Permitted Successors and Assig
Represented By: Taylor E Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Bank National Association as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank
Represented By: Javier Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hassan Real Estate Partnership
Represented By: Taylor E Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Michael Washburn Carruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankers Trust Company of California, N.A., Not in its Individual Capacity but Solely as Trustee, or its Permitted Successors and Assig
Represented By: Taylor E Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Javier Torres
Represented By: Bradford E Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Lees
Represented By: Nicolas Matayron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Azusa Rowland, LLC
Represented By: Taylor E Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of CWALT, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2007-OH2, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-OH2
Represented By: Bradford E Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Stephen Charles Rudicel
Represented By: Daniela P Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE, FOR THE J.P. MORGAN MORTGAGE TRUST 2006-S4
Represented By: Kayo Manson-Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hassen Real Estate Partnership
Represented By: Taylor E Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Adjustable Rate Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-4
Represented By: Javier Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB,D/B/A Christiana Trust, Not Individually but as Trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust
Represented By: Taylor E Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Aaron Robert Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: National Asssociation
Represented By: Javier Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bank NA, Successor Trustee to Bank of America, NA, Successor in Interest to Lasalle Bank National Association, as Trustee, on behalf of the holders of the WAMU Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates,
Represented By: Taylor E Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: William G Malcolm
Represented By: Nicolas Matayron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The Bank of New York Mellon FKA the Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2006-OA14, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-OA14
Represented By: Taylor E Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Gadi Gowhari
Represented By: Michael Donnelly Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee, In Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-1, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-1
Represented By: Brian Andrew Paino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust
Represented By: Taylor E Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Michael W Stoltzman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bank of America, N.A., Successor by Merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP FKA Countrywide Homeloans Servicing LP
Represented By: Taylor E Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Clark Bures
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, as Trustee, in trust for the registered holders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2007-19, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-1
Represented By: Katalina Baumann
Represented By: Justin D Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Nicolas Matayron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Marina Ivanoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Selene Finance
Represented By: Jonathan Douglas Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Jonathan Douglas Fink
Represented By: Shahrzad Guerami
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Select Portfolio Services, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Douglas Fink
Represented By: Conrad V Sison
Represented By: Simon M Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: New American Funding
Represented By: Jonathan Douglas Fink
Represented By: Taylor E Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Douglas Fink
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Represented By: Shahrzad Guerami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Ocwen Financial Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Douglas Fink
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Represented By: Shahrzad Guerami
Represented By: Ryan Curtis Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Douglas Fink
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Represented By: Shahrzad Guerami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Fay Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Douglas Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: All Persons Unknown Claiming any Legal or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien or Interest in The Subject Property Located at 390 South Sepulveda Boulevard Unit 208, Los Angeles, California 90049, APN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Kimberly L Yamada-Tung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Christina Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Christian Soria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Garson Silvers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DNE Associates, a CA general partnership
Represented By: Rachelle Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificateholders CWMBS, Inc CHL Mortgage Pass-Through Trust 2005-HYB4, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-HYB4
Represented By: Taylor E Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: U.S. Bank National Association, Successor To Bank Of America, N.A., Successor By Merger To LaSalle Bank National Association, As Indenture Trustee, On Behalf Of The Holders Of The Thornburg Mortgage S
Represented By: Daniel A Solitro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HSBC Bank USA, National Association, as Trustee for the BCAP Trust LLC 2008-IND1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2008-IND1
Represented By: Kenneth Sur Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Century 21 Citrus Realty
Represented By: Eddie Bankuti Dennis
Represented By: David Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Albert Rodriguez
Represented By: Eddie Bankuti Dennis
Represented By: David Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?