Miriam Hamideh Phd Clinical Psychologist Inc. v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Miriam Hamideh Phd Clinical Psychologist Inc, dba PCI Westlake Centers and Miriam Hamideh Phd Clinical Psychologist Inc.
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company and Does 1 to 25
Case Number: 2:2018cv03044
Filed: April 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 27 Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. BC684424, acknowledged on 1/2/2019. (gk)
December 27, 2018 Filing 26 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. (gk)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court DENIES Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #12 and Motion to Strike #14 without prejudice, and sua sponte REMANDS this matter to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case No. BC684424. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney John W. Tower for Plaintiff Miriam Hamideh PhD LCP dba PCI in place of Attorney Edwards P. Kerns #23 . (gk)
November 8, 2018 Filing 23 First REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY John W. Tower in place of attorney Edward P. Kerns filed by Plaintiff Miriam Hamideh Phd Clinical Psychologist Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of Service) (Attorney John W Tower added to party Miriam Hamideh Phd Clinical Psychologist Inc.(pty:pla)) (Tower, John)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #12 and Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) #14 presently scheduled for hearing on September 28, 2018, are appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motions are taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti)
September 14, 2018 Filing 21 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #12 filed by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Shlesinger, Amir)
September 14, 2018 Filing 20 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Amended Complaint/Petition #11 #14 filed by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Shlesinger, Amir)
September 7, 2018 Filing 19 OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Amended Complaint/Petition #11 #14 filed by Plaintiff Miriam Hamideh Phd Clinical Psychologist Inc.. (Kerns, Edward)
September 7, 2018 Filing 18 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #12 filed by Plaintiff Miriam Hamideh Phd Clinical Psychologist Inc.. (Kerns, Edward)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee, STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING FOR DEFENDANTANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE #16 . The Second Amended Complaint [Doc. # 12] and Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint [Doc. # 14] is continued from August 24, 2018 September 28, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. The opposing papers shall be due on September 7, 2018 and the reply shall be due on September 14, 2018. (shb)
August 1, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Continue Motion to Dismiss from August 24, 2018 to September 28, 2018 filed by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zadourian, Sevana)
July 10, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Raffi Kassabian counsel for Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. Raffi Kassabian is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Defendant. (Kassabian, Raffi)
June 28, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Amended Complaint/Petition #11 filed by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 8/24/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shlesinger, Amir)
June 28, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #12 filed by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shlesinger, Amir)
June 28, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 8/24/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shlesinger, Amir)
June 7, 2018 Filing 11 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint, Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Miriam Hamideh Phd Clinical Psychologist Inc.(Kerns, Edward)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE STIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #9 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint (SAC) within one week from the date of this Order. The deadline for defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company (ABCLH) to file a response to the First Amended Complaint (FAC) shall be continued from May 18, 2018 to June 17, 2018. This deadline to respond to the FAC will be mooted by the filing of a SAC, in which case ABCLH will have 21 days from the filing of any SAC to file responsive pleadings to the SAC. (lom)
May 17, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Amended Complaint,, STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 17, 2018 re Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Attorney Raffi Kassabian added to party Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Kassabian, Raffi)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #7 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company to file a response to the First Amended Complaint shall be continued to May 18, 2018. (yl)
April 17, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company answer now due 5/18/2018, filed by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Shlesinger, Amir)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
April 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
April 11, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Does 1 to 25 amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Miriam Hamideh Phd Clinical Psychologist Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/28/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A)(ghap)
April 11, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Miriam Hamideh Phd Clinical Psychologist Inc., upon Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company served on 11/22/2017, answer due 12/13/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez CT, Authorized Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/27/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
April 11, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Does 1 to 25., filed by plaintiff Miriam Hamideh Phd Clinical Psychologist Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/21/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
April 11, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Shlesinger, Amir)
April 11, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, identifying Anthem, Inc.. (Shlesinger, Amir)
April 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC684424 with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 04/11/2018, receipt number 0973-21571928), filed by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Scott Hicks, #3 Summons and Complaint) (Attorney Amir Shlesinger added to party Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Shlesinger, Amir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miriam Hamideh Phd Clinical Psychologist Inc. v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Amir Shlesinger
Represented By: Sevana Zadourian
Represented By: Kenneth N Smersfelt
Represented By: Raffi Kassabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Hamideh Phd Clinical Psychologist Inc, dba PCI Westlake Centers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Hamideh Phd Clinical Psychologist Inc.
Represented By: John W Tower
Represented By: Edward P Kerns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?