Lisa Kim v. Tinder, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Kim
Defendant: Match Group, LLC, Tinder, Inc., Match Group, Inc. and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, and each of them
Other: Allan Candelore
Case Number: 2:2018cv03093
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge John F. Walter. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
March 8, 2019 Filing 61 DECLARATION of John P. Kristensen re Order on Motion for Settlement, #60 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)(Kristensen, John)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LISA KIM'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS [filed 1/20/19; Docket No. #52 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED. The parties shall file a revised proposed Notice that conforms to all the requirements of Rule 23(c)(2)(B) by March 8, 2019. (iv)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING UNDER SUBMISSION PLAINTIFF LISA KIM'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS [filed 1/20/19; Docket No. #52 ] by Judge John F. Walter. The Court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for February 25, 2019 is hereby vacated and the matter is taken off calendar. The matter will be deemed submitted on the vacated hearing date and the clerk will notify the parties when the Court has reached a decision. (iv)
February 13, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [PROPOSED] STATEMENT OF DECISION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action Settlement #52 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Proposed] Statement of Decision)(Kristensen, John)
February 11, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Errata to Objection and Reply to Opposition Filed by Non-Party Allan Candelore to Lisa Kim's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Objection and Reply)(Kristensen, John)
February 11, 2019 Filing 56 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action Settlement #52 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. (Kristensen, John)
February 11, 2019 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Joseph Ciesla in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action Settlement #52 in Support of Plaintiff's Objection and Reply to Opposition Filed by Non Party Allan Candelore filed by Defendants Match Group, Inc., Match Group, LLC, Tinder, Inc.. (Platt, Robert)
February 4, 2019 Filing 54 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action Settlement #52 filed by Real Party In Interest Plaintiff Allan Candelore. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allan Candelore, #2 Declaration of Kimberly A. Kralowec,)(Attorney Danielle Evelyn Leonard added to party Allan Candelore(pty:rpip))(Leonard, Danielle)
January 30, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action Settlement #52 filed by Defendants Match Group, Inc., Match Group, LLC, Tinder, Inc.. (Platt, Robert)
January 20, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. Motion set for hearing on 2/25/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd M. Friedman, #2 Declaration of John Kristensen, #3 Declaration of Lisa Kim, #4 Proposed Order) (Friedman, Todd)
January 17, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE RE: LOCAL RULE 7-3 CONFERENCE COMPLIANCE filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. (Bacon, Adrian)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST AND JOINT STIPULATION TO LIFT STAY RENDERED IN COURT'S STATEMENT OF DECISION #49 by Judge John F. Walter. The stay of this matter rendered in the Court's Statement of Decision (Dkt. No. #44 ) is lifted. (iv)
January 9, 2019 Filing 49 STIPULATION to Lift Stay In Order to Finalize the Settlement of Class Claims filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kristensen, John)
November 8, 2018 Filing 48 JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Match Group, Inc., Match Group, LLC, Tinder, Inc.. (Platt, Robert)
July 16, 2018 Filing 47 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 18-55960 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #46 as to Plaintiff Lisa Kim. (iv)
July 13, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. Appeal of Order on Motion to Compel Arbitration,,, #43 , Order,, Case Stayed, #44 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22086675.) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Representation)(Friedman, Todd)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION EXTENDING PLAINTIFFS' DEADLINE TO FILE A MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (L.R. 23-3) FOR 90DAYS #37 by Judge John F. Walter. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT As Moot. (iv)
July 12, 2018 Filing 44 STATEMENT OF DECISION by Judge John F. Walter. The Court GRANTS Tinder's Motion and orders the parties to arbitration. The Court also STAYS this action pending the outcome of the arbitration. The parties shall file a joint status report with the Court every 120 days regarding the status of the arbitration, with the first joint status report to be filed on November 8, 2018. The Scheduling Conference set for July 23, 2018, at 1:15 p.m. is VACATED. (iv)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION [filed 6/11/18; Docket No. #24 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for July 16, 2018 is hereby vacated and the matter taken off calendar. After considering the moving, opposing, and reply papers, and the arguments therein, the Court rules as follows: For the reasons stated in Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Reply and because Plaintiff failed to comply with paragraph 5(f) of the Court's April 18, 2018 Standing Order, Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration is GRANTED. The Court signs and adopts, as modified, Defendants' proposed Statement of Decision, lodged with the Court on July 5, 2018. (iv)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter, re Stipulation for Extension of Time #36 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, if the Court denies Defendants' currently pending Motion to Compel Arbitration, or in the Alternative, Stay Under Colorado River Abstention, Defendants may have one week from the entry of an order denying the Motion to respond to the FAC. (rfi)
July 9, 2018 Filing 41 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 Days, filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim.. (Friedman, Todd)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF LISA KIM'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING PERTAINING TO NEW AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF HER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OR STAY UNDER COLORADO RIVER ABSTENTION [filed 7/3/18;Docket No. #34 ] by Judge John F. Walter. For the reasons stated in Defendants' Opposition, Plaintiff's Application is DENIED. (iv)
July 5, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE OF LODGING filed for Proposed Statement of Decision re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Colorado River Abstention #24 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Statement of Decision)(Platt, Robert)
July 5, 2018 Filing 38 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Permitting Plaintiff To File Supplemental Briefing Pertaining To New Authority In Support of Her Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration or Stay Under Colorado River Abstention #34 filed by Defendants Match Group, Inc., Match Group, LLC, Tinder, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra N. Hill, #2 Exhibit 1 In Support of Hill Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Platt, Robert)
July 5, 2018 Filing 37 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Extending Time To File Motion For Class Certification)(Friedman, Todd)
July 5, 2018 Filing 36 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Match Group, Inc., Match Group, LLC, Tinder, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Platt, Robert)
July 3, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE Of Supplemental Authority in Support of Her Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration or Stay Under Colorado River Abstention filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. (Kristensen, John)
July 3, 2018 Filing 34 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Permitting Plaintiff To File Supplemental Briefing Pertaining To New Authority In Support of Her Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration or Stay Under Colorado River Abstention filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte) (Kristensen, John)
July 2, 2018 Filing 33 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Colorado River Abstention #24 filed by Defendants Match Group, Inc., Match Group, LLC, Tinder, Inc.. (Platt, Robert)
June 25, 2018 Filing 32 OPPOSITION Motion to Compel Arbitration or Stay Under Colorado River Abstention re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Colorado River Abstention #24 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. (Kristensen, John)
June 25, 2018 Filing 31 Text Entry Order: Plaintiffs Motion Requesting First Continuance of Deadline to File Motion for Class Certification filed on June 13, 2018 (Docket No. #29 ) is STRICKEN for violation of the Courts June 11, 2018 (Docket No. 23 ) Text Entry Order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 22, 2018 Filing 30 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim(Kristensen, John)
June 13, 2018 Filing 29 [stricken] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by plaintiff Lisa Kim. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Bacon, Adrian) Modified on 6/25/2018 (sr).
June 13, 2018 Filing 28 STATEMENT RE: LOCAL RULE 7-3 CONFERENCE filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim (Friedman, Todd)
June 13, 2018 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Robert H. Platt Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendants Match Group, Inc., Match Group, LLC, Tinder, Inc.. (Platt, Robert)
June 11, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Match Group, Inc., Match Group, LLC, Tinder, Inc., (Platt, Robert)
June 11, 2018 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Match Group, Inc., Match Group, LLC, Tinder, Inc. (Platt, Robert)
June 11, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Colorado River Abstention filed by Defendants Match Group, Inc., Match Group, LLC, Tinder, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Badeen, #2 Exhibit 1-3 to Badeen Declaration, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Declaration of Donald R. Brown in Support of RJN, #5 Exhibit 1-3 to Brown Declaration, #6 Proposed Order) (Platt, Robert)
June 11, 2018 Filing 23 Text Entry Order: Plaintiffs Motion Requesting First Continuance of Deadline to File Motion for Class Certification filed on June 8, 2018 (Docket No. #22 ) is STRICKEN for failure to comply with Local Rule 7-3 which requires the conference of counsel to take place at least seven days prior to the filing of the Motion and paragraph 5(b) of the Court's Standing Order which requires the Joint Statement to be filed 3 days after the Local Rule 7-3 conference. If Plaintiff wishes to re-file the Motion, counsel shall meet and confer in person by June 18, 2018. If the parties cannot resolve the issues raised in the Motion, within 3 days of the meet and confer, each party shall file a declaration setting forth the issues resolved at the conference and those issues that were not resolved with a detailed explanation of why those issues could not be resolved. If a Motion remains necessary, it shall not be filed until 2 days after each party files the declaration required by this Order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 8, 2018 Filing 22 [stricken] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification filed by plaintiff Lisa Kim. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Bacon, Adrian) Modified on 6/11/2018 (sr).
June 6, 2018 Filing 21 STATEMENT Local Rule 7-3 Conference filed by Defendants Match Group, Inc., Match Group, LLC, Tinder, Inc. (Platt, Robert)
May 22, 2018 Filing 20 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim, upon Defendant Match Group, LLC served on 4/30/2018, answer due 6/11/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Kristensen, John)
May 22, 2018 Filing 19 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim, upon Defendant Tinder, Inc. served on 4/30/2018, answer due 6/11/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Kristensen, John)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for July 23, 2018 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before July 9, 2018. (iv)
May 3, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Match Group, Inc. answer now due 6/11/2018; Match Group, LLC answer now due 6/11/2018; Tinder, Inc. answer now due 6/11/2018, filed by Defendant Match Group, Inc.; Match Group, LLC; Tinder, Inc..(Attorney Robert H Platt added to party Match Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert H Platt added to party Match Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert H Platt added to party Tinder, Inc.(pty:dft))(Platt, Robert)
April 30, 2018 Filing 16 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim, upon Defendant Match Group, Inc. served on 4/20/2018, answer due 5/11/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Kristensen, John)
April 23, 2018 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Todd M. Friedman re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. (Kristensen, John)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
April 16, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #10 , #11 and #12 . The following error(s) was found: The judge(s) initials are incorrect/missing. The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (iv)
April 13, 2018 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. (Kristensen, John)
April 13, 2018 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. (Kristensen, John)
April 13, 2018 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. (Kristensen, John)
April 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 , Summons Request #3 , Summons Request #5 . The following error(s) was found: Wrong name of court please put Central District of California. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
April 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
April 12, 2018 Filing 6 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim, identifying Tinder, Inc., a Delaware corporation; Match Group, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; Match Group, Inc., a Delaware corporation; and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, and each of them. (Kristensen, John)
April 12, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. (Kristensen, John)
April 12, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. (Kristensen, John)
April 12, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. (Kristensen, John)
April 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. (Kristensen, John)
April 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21581272 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lisa Kim. (Attorney John P Kristensen added to party Lisa Kim(pty:pla))(Kristensen, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisa Kim v. Tinder, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Match Group, LLC
Represented By: Donald R Brown
Represented By: Robert H Platt
Represented By: Alexandra Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tinder, Inc.
Represented By: Donald R Brown
Represented By: Robert H Platt
Represented By: Alexandra Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Match Group, Inc.
Represented By: Donald R Brown
Represented By: Robert H Platt
Represented By: Alexandra Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, and each of them
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Kim
Represented By: John P Kristensen
Represented By: David Levi Weisberg
Represented By: Christina M Le
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Adrian Robert Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Allan Candelore
Represented By: Danielle Evelyn Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?