Securities and Exchange Commission v. Ralph T. Iannelli et al
Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission and Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Ralph T Iannelli and Essex Capital Corporation
Intervenor: TERRIE MERSHON, BILL LAWARRE, KELLEY PELLEGRI, BARRETT HILZER, RONALD P TOMSIC, GEOFF GRANT, LINDA CASTLE-HILL, PAUL WOLANSKY, KEVIN SCHULTZ, LOWELL FAMILY TRUST, DWIGHT LOWELL, JUDY FOREMAN, SCOTT GREER, KEMP FOUNDATION, IRA MAURICE SULLIVAN, BRAD WHEATLEY, CASTLE MANAGEMENT, LLC, JEFF HENLEY, JOHN PERRY, MAUREEN HARMON, Ciara Murray-Young and 915 Elm Avenue CVL, LLC
Receiver: Geoff Winkler
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Jessica Kurzban
Case Number: 2:2018cv05008
Filed: June 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 APPLICATION for Order for Approving Ninth Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver, for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses [April 1, 2021 thru June 30, 2021] filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Application set for hearing on 9/23/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Ninth Interim Application of Receiver and Counsel (with Exhibits A thru C), #2 Declaration Receiver, Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit 1), #3 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #4 Proposed Order) (Aspis, Norman)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Notice of Filing filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler re: PETITION for Order for on Eighth Interim Report and Petition for Instructions of Receiver, Geoff Winkler #210 (del Castillo, Joshua)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 PETITION for Order for on Eighth Interim Report and Petition for Instructions of Receiver, Geoff Winkler filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (del Castillo, Joshua)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER ON SEVENTH INTERIM REPORT AND PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKLER #206 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER GRANTING EIGHTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKER, AND ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER, FOR PAYMENT OF FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Application Re: Fees #205 and Petition for Order #206 are taken off the 6/17/2021 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 6/17/2021. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 PETITION for Order for on Seventh Interim Report and Petition for Further Instructions of Receiver, Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit 1) filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Aspis, Norman)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 APPLICATION for Order for Approving Eighth Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver, for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses [January 1, 2021 - March 31, 2021] filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Application set for hearing on 6/17/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Eighth Fee Application of Receiver and Counsel (with Exhibits A-C), #2 Declaration of Receiver, Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit 1), #3 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #4 Proposed Order) (Aspis, Norman)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER GRANTING SEVENTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKER, AND ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER FOR PAYMENT OF FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES #202 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Application for Reimbursement #202 is taken off calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 3/4/2021. An order with the court's ruling will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 APPLICATION for Order for Approving Seventh Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver, for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses [July 1, 2020 - December 31, 2020] filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Application set for hearing on 3/4/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Seventh Fee Application of Receiver and Counsel (with Exhibits A-C), #2 Declaration of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, (with Exhibit 1), #3 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #4 Proposed Order) (Aspis, Norman)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER ON SIXTH INTERIM REPORT AND PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKLER #197 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER GRANTING SIXTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKER, AND ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER, FOR PAYMENT OF FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES #196 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the Court's own motion, the SIXTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKLER, AND ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER, FOR PAYMENT OF FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES #196 and the SIXTH INTERIM REPORT AND PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKLER #197 , currently set for January 7, 2021, are taken off calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on that date. The court may order further briefing or other proceedings, at any time, as appropriate. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Notice of Filing re: PETITION for Order for on Sixth Interim Report and Petition for Instructions of Receiver, Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit 1) #197 (del Castillo, Joshua)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 PETITION for Order for on Sixth Interim Report and Petition for Instructions of Receiver, Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit 1) filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (del Castillo, Joshua)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 APPLICATION for Order for Approving Sixth Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis, LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver, for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses [April 1, 2020 - June 30, 2020] filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Application set for hearing on 1/7/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Sixth Interim Application of Receiver and Counsel (with Exhibits A, B and C), #2 Declaration of Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit 1), #3 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #4 Proposed Order) (Aspis, Norman)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKLER, FOR AUTHORITY TO ESTABLISH DISGORGEMENT PROCEDURES AND UNDERTAKE DISGORGEMENT EFFORTS #190 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin (lc)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion for Order #190 is taken off the 11/12/2020 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 11/12/2020. An order with the court's ruling will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Authority to Establish Disgorgement Procedures and Undertake Disgorgement Efforts #190 filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (del Castillo, Joshua)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER GRANTING FIFTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKER, AND ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER, FOR PAYMENT OF FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES #187 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Application for Order #187 is taken off the 10/22/2020 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 10/22/2020. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Authority to Establish Disgorgement Procedures and Undertake Disgorgement Efforts filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Motion set for hearing on 11/12/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, #2 Proposed Order) (del Castillo, Joshua)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION #188 TO AUTHORIZE RECEIVER'S SALE OF LEASED ASSETS, FREE AND CLEAR OF LIENS AND ENCUMBRANCES by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 STIPULATION for Order Authorizing Receiver's Sale of Leased Assets, Free and Clear of Liens and Encumbrances filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit 1), #2 Proposed Order)(del Castillo, Joshua)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 APPLICATION for Order for Approving Fifth Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver, for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses [January 1, 2020 - March 31, 2020] filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Application set for hearing on 10/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Fifth Fee Application of Receiver and Counsel (with Exhibits A-C), #2 Declaration of Receiver Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit 1), #3 Memorandum, #4 Proposed Order) (Aspis, Norman)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKLER, FOR AUTHORITY TO PROSECUTE CLAIMS AGAINST SEED MACKALL LLP #184 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 185 SUPPLEMENT to PETITION for Order for on Fifth Interim Report and Petition for Instructions of Receiver, Geoff Winkler #174 filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (del Castillo, Joshua)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Authority to Prosecute Claims Against Seed Mackall LLP (with Exhibit 1) filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Motion set for hearing on 9/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoff Winkler, #2 Proposed Order) (del Castillo, Joshua)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER ON FIFTH INTERIM REPORT AND PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKLER #174 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, IT IS ORDERED THAT the status conference set for August 13, 2020, is vacated. (iv)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PENDING MOTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Proposed Intervenor 915 Elm Avenue CVL, LLC's Motion to Intervene and to Remove CVLs Assets from the Court-Ordered Freeze #115 is denied. (iv)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER ON PETITION #149 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER ON STIPULATION #168 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKLER, FOR ORDER APPROVING AND AUTHORIziNG PERFORMANCE OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT #172 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. See Order for details. (et)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Re: Motion [Dkt. 125] by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Motion (Document No. #125 ) is granted. (et)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers) Order Re: Status Conference by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. The status conference set for July 30, 2020, is continued to August 13, 2020, at 11:30 a.m. See minute order for details. (lom)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Notice of Filing re: PETITION for Order for on Fifth Interim Report and Petition for Instructions of Receiver, Geoff Winkler #174 (del Castillo, Joshua)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 PETITION for Order for on Fifth Interim Report and Petition for Instructions of Receiver, Geoff Winkler filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (del Castillo, Joshua)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the MOTION for Order #172 is taken off the 7/16/2020 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 7/16/2020. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Performance of Settlement Agreement filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Receiver, Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit A), #2 Proposed Order) (Zaro, David)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE of Filing and Forensic and Investigative Accounting Report of Receiver, Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit A and Proof of Service) filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (Zaro, David)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the 5/28/2020 Status Conference is hereby continued to 7/30/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. At this time, the hearing will be scheduled as an in-person hearing.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 REPLY filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler to Stipulation for Order #157 to Authorize Receiver's Disgorgement Efforts and Establish Disgorgement Procedures (del Castillo, Joshua)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 STIPULATION for Order (1) Establishing Claims Procedures; and (2) Setting Claims Bar Date filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(del Castillo, Joshua)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ellen S Robbins counsel for Intervenor Parties GEOFF GRANT, JOHN PERRY, PAUL WOLANSKY. Michael O. Mena is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Intervenors Geoff Grant, John Perry, and Paul Wolansky. (Robbins, Ellen)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Counsel for the parties shall appear at a telephonic status conference on May 28, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. (iv)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Ralph T Iannellito Stipulation for Order #157 (Holmes, Andrew)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Petition #149 is taken off the 4/9/2020 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 4/9/2020. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Re: Motion to Lift Stay Order by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Motion (Document No. #130 ) is granted. [See Order for further details.] (et)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER GRANTING FOURTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKER, AND HIS PROFESSIONALS FOR PAYMENT OF FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES [October 1, 2019 - December 31, 2019] #152 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (et)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKLER, FOR ORDER APPROVING RECOMMENDED PROCEDURES FOR SALE OF PERSONAL PROPERTY OUT OF RECEIVERSHIP [151 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (et)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER GRANTING THIRD INTERIM APPLICATION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKER, AND HIS PROFESSIONALS FOR PAYMENT OF FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES [July 1, 2019 - September 30, 2019] #137 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (et)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKLER, FOR ORDER APPROVING AND AUTHORIZING PERFORMANCE OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE #136 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (et)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re the December 21, 2018 Stay Order with Respect to the Penny Lane and Central Park Properties #130 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Leung, Gary)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 STIPULATION for Order Granting Stipulation to Authorize Receiver's Disgorgement Efforts and Establish Disgorgement Procedures filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(del Castillo, Joshua)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving Recommended Procedures for Sale of Personal Property Out of Receivership #151 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Leung, Gary)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #154 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The request of Ralph Iannelli to substitute Andrew B. Holmes as attorney of record instead of Kevin Yopp is GRANTED. (iv)
March 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Andrew B. Holmes in place of attorney Kevin M. Yopp filed by Defendant Ralph T Iannelli. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Yopp, Kevin)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 SUPPLEMENT to PETITION for Order for on Fourth Interim Report and Petition for Instructions of Receiver, Geoff Winkler #149 (with Exhibit A) filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (del Castillo, Joshua)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 APPLICATION for Order for Approving Fourth Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and His Professionals for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses [October 1, 2019 - December 31, 2019] filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Application set for hearing on 4/9/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Fourth Interim Application of Receiver and His Professionals (with Exhibits A thru D), #2 Declaration of Receiver, Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit 1), #3 Memorandum, #4 Proposed Order) (Zaro, David)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving Recommended Procedures for Sale of Personal Property Out of Receivership filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Motion set for hearing on 4/9/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoff Winkler, #2 Proposed Order) (Zaro, David)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Notice of Filing re: PETITION for Order for on Fourth Interim Report and Petition for Instructions of Receiver, Geoff Winkler #149 (Zaro, David)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 PETITION for Order for on Fourth Interim Report and Petition for Instructions of Receiver, Geoff Winkler filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zaro, David)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT issued in favor of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission and against Ralph T Iannelli RE: Judgment #93 . (iv)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT issued in favor of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission and against Ralph T Iannelli RE: Judgment #93 . (iv)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION AND ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT. The document is being returned to you for correction of: Entered date listed on the writ/abstract does not match the entered date of the judgment/order. (iv)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION AND ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT. The document is being returned to you for correction of: Entered date listed on the writ/abstract does not match the entered date of the judgment/order. (iv)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion for Order #136 and Application for Fees #137 are taken off the 2/6/2020 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 2/6/2020. An order with the court's rulings will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 SUPPLEMENT TO RECEIVER'S RESPONSE TO re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re the December 21, 2018 Stay Order with Respect to the Penny Lane and Central Park Properties #130 filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (del Castillo, Joshua)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Lift Stay #130 is taken off the 1/23/2020 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 1/23/2020. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to APPLICATION for Order for Approving Third Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and His Professionals for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses [July 1, 2019 - September 30, 2019] #137 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Leung, Gary)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authoritizing Performance of Settlement Agreement and Release #136 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Leung, Gary)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 SUPPLEMENT to APPLICATION for Order for Approving Third Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and His Professionals for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses [July 1, 2019 - September 30, 2019] #137 (with Exhibits D and E) filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (Aspis, Norman)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re the December 21, 2018 Stay Order with Respect to the Penny Lane and Central Park Properties #130 filed by Intervenor Parties JOHN PERRY, PAUL WOLANSKY. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Michael. D. Napoli)(Robbins, Ellen)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 APPLICATION for Order for Approving Third Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and His Professionals for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses [July 1, 2019 - September 30, 2019] filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Application set for hearing on 2/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Third Fee Application (with Exhibits A, B and C), #2 Memorandum, #3 Declaration of Receiver, Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit 1), #4 Proposed Order) (del Castillo, Joshua)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authoritizing Performance of Settlement Agreement and Release filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Motion set for hearing on 2/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Receiver, Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit A), #2 Proposed Order) (del Castillo, Joshua)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Performance of Settlement Agreement and Release #134 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Judge Olguin hears civil motions on Thursday's. (vdr)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 *DOCUMENT STRICKEN* NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving and Authorizing Performance of Settlement Agreement and Release; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (with Proof of Service) filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Motion set for hearing on 2/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, In Support Thereof, #2 Proposed Order) (del Castillo, Joshua) Modified on 1/7/2020 (vdr).
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion for Order for Authority to Pursue Litigation Against 915 Elm Avenue CVL, LLC #125 , currently set for hearing on January 9, 2020, is taken off calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on that date. The court may order further briefing or other proceedings, at any time, as appropriate. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 PLAINTIFF SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSIONS RESPONSE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re the December 21, 2018 Stay Order with Respect to the Penny Lane and Central Park Properties #130 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Leung, Gary)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 RESPONSE OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKLER, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re the December 21, 2018 Stay Order with Respect to the Penny Lane and Central Park Properties #130 filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (del Castillo, Joshua)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re the December 21, 2018 Stay Order with Respect to the Penny Lane and Central Park Properties filed by intervenors JOHN PERRY, PAUL WOLANSKY. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michael P. Napoli, #2 Declaration Paul Wolansky, #3 Declaration John Perry, #4 Proposed Order) (Robbins, Ellen)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER ON THIRD INTERIM REPORT AND PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKLER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Proposed Order re PETITION for Review of Third Interim Report and Petition for Further Instructions of Receiver, Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit 1 and Proof of Service) #123 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(del Castillo, Joshua)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Authority to Pursue Litigation Against 915 Elm Avenue CVL, LLC (with Exhibit A) #125 filed by Intervenor 915 Elm Avenue CVL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of William Reyner)(Cousineau, David)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Petition for Review of Third Interim Report #123 , currently set for hearing on December 19, 2019, is taken off calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on that date. The court may order further briefing or other proceedings, at any time, as appropriate. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Authority to Pursue Litigation Against 915 Elm Avenue CVL, LLC (with Exhibit A) filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Motion set for hearing on 1/9/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoff Winkler (with Exhibits 1 thru 13), #2 Proposed Order) (del Castillo, Joshua)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE OF MOTION re PETITION for Review of Third Interim Report and Petition for Further Instructions of Receiver, Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit 1 and Proof of Service) #123 filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Motion set for hearing on 12/19/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (del Castillo, Joshua)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 PETITION for Review of Third Interim Report and Petition for Further Instructions of Receiver, Geoff Winkler (with Exhibit 1 and Proof of Service) filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (del Castillo, Joshua)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to to Intervene and to Remove CVL's Assets from the Court-Ordered Freeze #115 , currently set for hearing on October 24, 2019, is taken off calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on that date. The court may order further briefing or other proceedings, at any time, as appropriate.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene and to Remove CVL's Assets from the Court-Ordered Freeze #115 filed by Intervenor 915 Elm Avenue CVL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Cousineau, David)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene and to Remove CVL's Assets from the Court-Ordered Freeze #115 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Leung, Gary)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 OPPOSITION of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene and to Remove CVL's Assets from the Court-Ordered Freeze #115 filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoff Winkler (with Exhibits 1 to 13))(del Castillo, Joshua)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #114 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The request of Ralph T. Iannelli to substitute Kevin Yopp as attorney of record instead of Steven Olson and Jorge deNeve is GRANTED. (iv)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Notice of Electronic Filing re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #116 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene and to Remove CVL's Assets from the Court-Ordered Freeze #115 e-mailed to Michael Mena bounced due to No longer with firm. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Intervenor 915 Elm Avenue CVL, LLC, identifying William S. Reyner, Jr., The William S. Reyner, Jr. Trust, Reyner Family Partners, L.P., William S. Reyner III, Ralph T. Iannelli, Jr., and Ralph T. Iannelli, III. (Cousineau, David)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene and to Remove CVL's Assets from the Court-Ordered Freeze filed by Intervenor 915 Elm Avenue CVL, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) (Attorney David L Cousineau added to party 915 Elm Avenue CVL, LLC(pty:intv)) (Cousineau, David)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Kevin M. Yopp in place of attorney Jorge deNeve filed by Defendant Ralph T Iannelli. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DeNeve, J)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER REGARDING PERMANENT INJUNCTION filed by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that, except as otherwise ordered by this Court, until such time as this Court terminates the receivership established in this action and discharges the Receiver, Defendants Iamnelli and Essex, and their officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, subsidiaries and affiliate, and those persons in active concert with them, who receive actual notice of this Order, by personal service or otherwise, and each of them, shall remain permanently restrained and enjoined. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING SECOND INTERIM APPLICATION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKER, AND ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER, FOR PAYMENT OF FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES #104 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKER, FOR PAYMENT OF FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED DURING HIS SERVICE AS COURT-APPOINTED MONITOR #102 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Fee Application is granted, in its entirety. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ESSEX CAPITAL CORPORATION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant is permanently restrained and enjoined from violating, directly or indirectly, Section 10(b) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 and Rule 10b-5 promulgated thereunder, by using any means or instrumentality of interstate commerce, or of the mails, or of any facility of any national securities exchange. *See Order for Details.* (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iv)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 REPLY In Support of APPLICATION for Order for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During Service as Court-Appointed Monitor [October 1, 2018 - December 20, 2018] #102 , APPLICATION for Order for for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses of Second Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver [April 1, 2019 - June 30, 2019] 104 filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (del Castillo, Joshua)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Joint STIPULATION for Permanent Injunction filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leung, Gary)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to APPLICATION for Order for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During Service as Court-Appointed Monitor [October 1, 2018 - December 20, 2018] #102 , APPLICATION for Order for for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses of Second Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver [April 1, 2019 - June 30, 2019] 104 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Leung, Gary)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The parties shall file a stipulation and/or other appropriate papers regarding the injunction no later than September 3, 2019. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (iv)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Notice of Filing of Second Interim Report and Petition for Instructions of Receiver, Geoff Winkler re: Status Report #103 (del Castillo, Joshua)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 APPLICATION for Order for for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses of Second Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, General Counsel to the Receiver [April 1, 2019 - June 30, 2019] (with Exhibits A, B, and C) filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Application set for hearing on 9/19/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Second Interim Application, #2 Memorandum, #3 Declaration of Geoff Winkler, #4 Proposed Order) (del Castillo, Joshua)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STATUS REPORT - Second Interim Report and Petition for Further Instructions of Receiver, Geoff Winkler (with Exhibits A -D) filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (del Castillo, Joshua)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 APPLICATION for Order for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During Service as Court-Appointed Monitor [October 1, 2018 - December 20, 2018] filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Application set for hearing on 9/19/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Application, #2 Memorandum, #3 Declaration of Geoff Winkler, #4 Proposed Order) (del Castillo, Joshua)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION for Judgment as to DEFENDANT ESSEX CAPITAL CORPORATION filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment)(Leung, Gary)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The parties are ordered to appear for a status conference on August 22, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. (iv)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #96 Non-Resident Attorney Shuman Sohrn APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs SEC, designating Gary Y. Leung as local counsel. (lt)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING FIRST INTERIM APPLICATION OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKER, AND ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP, GENERAL COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER, FOR PAYMENT OF FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES #80 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ON FIRST INTERIM REPORT AND PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKLER #78 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shuman Sohrn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Leung, Gary)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission and against Ralph T Iannelli in the amount of $640,000.00 for Civil Penalty. (lwag)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission and against Ralph T Iannelli in the amount of $9,960,000.00 for Disgorgement and $54,828.21 for Post Judgment. (lwag)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT RALPH T. IANNELLI by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant is liable for disgorgement of $9,960,000, representing profits gained as a result of the conduct alleged in the Complaint, together with prejudgment interest thereon in the amount of $454,828.21, and a civil penalty in the amount of $640,000 pursuant to Section 20(d) of the Securities Act and Section 21(d)(3) of the Exchange Act, for a total of $11,054,828.21. Defendant shall satisfy this obligation by paying $11,054,828.21 to the Securities and Exchange Commission within 14 days after entry of this Final Judgment. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Petition #78 and Application #80 , currently set for hearing on 6/6/2019, are taken off calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 6/6/2019. An order with the court's rulings will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STATUS REPORT REGARDING SETTLEMENT filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Leung, Gary)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION for Judgment as to DEFENDANT RALPH T. IANNELLI filed by PLAINTIFF Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Judgment)(Leung, Gary)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, ORDERING Letter from Kenneth M. Van Deventer submitted by Kenneth M. Van Deventer received on 5/24/2019 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: The court has no authority to address any of the issues raised in your letter unless the issues are brought before the court by an attorney of record pursuant to the Local Rules of the CD/CA. (iv)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting #86 Non-Resident Attorney Michael D Napoli APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of GEOFF GRANT, JOHN PERRY and for PAUL WOLANSKY, designating Ellen S Robbins as local counsel. (lom)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REPLY In Support of APPLICATION for Order for on First Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, Counsel for Receiver, for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses #80 filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (Zaro, David)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Intervenors to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Parties GEOFF GRANT, JOHN PERRY, PAUL WOLANSKY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 5/21/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23780058) filed by Intervenors GEOFF GRANT, JOHN PERRY, PAUL WOLANSKY. (Attachments: #1 State Bar of Texas Certification of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Robbins, Ellen)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to APPLICATION for Order for on First Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, Counsel for Receiver, for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses #80 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Leung, Gary)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 OBJECTION TO re: APPLICATION for Order for on First Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, Counsel for Receiver, for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses #80 filed by Intervenor Parties GEOFF GRANT, JOHN PERRY, PAUL WOLANSKY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Robbins, Ellen)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ellen S Robbins counsel for Intervenor Parties GEOFF GRANT, JOHN PERRY, PAUL WOLANSKY. Adding ELLEN S. ROBBINS as counsel of record for Intervenors GEOFF GRANT, JOHN PERRY AND PAUL WOLANSKY for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by INTERVENORS GEOFF GRANT, JOHN PERRY AND PAUL WOLANSKY. (Attorney Ellen S Robbins added to party GEOFF GRANT(pty:intv), Attorney Ellen S Robbins added to party JOHN PERRY(pty:intv), Attorney Ellen S Robbins added to party PAUL WOLANSKY(pty:intv))(Robbins, Ellen)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE OF MOTION re for Order #78 on First Interim Report and Petition for Further Instructions of Receiver filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Motion set for hearing on 6/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (del Castillo, Joshua)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE OF MOTION re APPLICATION for Order for on First Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, Counsel for Receiver, for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses #80 filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Motion set for hearing on 6/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (del Castillo, Joshua)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 APPLICATION for Order for on First Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP, Counsel for Receiver, for Payment of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Application set for hearing on 5/30/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 First Interim Application of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, and Counsel, Allen Matkins, #2 Memorandum, #3 Declaration of Receiver, Geoff Winkler, #4 Proposed Order) (del Castillo, Joshua)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Notice of Filing of First Interim Report of Receiver re: Report #78 (del Castillo, Joshua)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 FIRST INTERIM REPORT AND PETITION FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS OF RECEIVER, GEOFF WINKLER filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Hearing set for 5/30/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(del Castillo, Joshua) Modified on 5/1/2019 (vdr).
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION #76 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. All remaining case dates and deadlines are hereby vacated. The SEC and defendant Iannelli are ordered to file a status report by 5/31/2019. (vdr)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Joint STIPULATION to Vacate PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leung, Gary)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Notice of Electronic Filing re Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled,, #74 e-mailed to Mark Riera, mark.riera@akerman.com bounced due to No longer with firm. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Jessica Kurzban: Mediation held on April 4, 2019 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link: #MediationParticipantSurvey(mb)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Jessica Kurzban has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that JESSICA KURZBAN may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 4/4/2019 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission(Miller, Douglas)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #70 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The request of Essex Capital Corporation to substitute Joshua A. del Castillo as attorney of record instead of Steven J. Olson and Jorge deNeve is GRANTED. (iv)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Joshua A. del Castillo in place of attorney Jorge deNeve and Steven J. Olson filed by Defendant Essex Capital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DeNeve, J)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER IN AID OF RECEIVERSHIP #67 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Receiver's Motion is GRANTED, in its entirety. (iv)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITIONS TO RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR ORDER IN AID OF RECEIVERSHIP re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for In Aid of Receivership #67 filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. (del Castillo, Joshua)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for In Aid of Receivership filed by Receiver Geoff Winkler. Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Joshua Andrew del Castillo added to party Geoff Winkler(pty:rc)) (del Castillo, Joshua)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND APPOINTMENT OF A PERMANENT RECEIVER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for deadlines and requirements.* (vdr)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commissionto Objection, #63 SEC's Response to Defendants' Objection and Response to the Monitor's December 6, 2018 Report (Leung, Gary)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commissionto Objection, #63 Monitor's Response to Defendants' Objection and Response to the Monitor's December 6, 2018 Report and Recommendations (Leung, Gary)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 OBJECTIONS / Objection and Response to Monitor's Report and Recommendations #60 filed by Defendants Essex Capital Corporation, Ralph T Iannelli. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jorge deNeve in Support, #2 Declaration of Ralph T. Iannelli in Support, #3 Declaration of Greg Van Wyk)(DeNeve, J)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Intent to Object and Respond to Monitor's Report and Recommendations filed by Defendants Essex Capital Corporation, Ralph T Iannelli. (DeNeve, J)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STATEMENT Nonopposition to Court-Appointed Monitor's Report and Request for Appointment as a Receiver filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission re: Report, #60 . (Miller, Douglas)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPORT of Preliminary Accounting of Defendant Essex Capital Corporation and Recommendations of Court-Appointed Monitor Geoff Winkler filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Report, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Miller, Douglas)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION #56 TRANSACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for details.* (iv)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: BENCH TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Bench Trial set for 8/20/2019 at 9:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for dates, deadlines and requirements imposed.* (vdr)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding Transaction filed by Defendants Essex Capital Corporation, Ralph T Iannelli. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeNeve, J)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan and Order Setting Scheduling Conference (Dkt. No. 54) ; estimated length of trial 3 to 5, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission.. (Leung, Gary)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Joint STIPULATION for Preliminary Injunction as to Proposed Order filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Miller, Douglas)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting #50 Non-Resident Attorney Brian P Miller APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of CASTLE MANAGEMENT, LLC, LINDA CASTLE-HILL, JUDY FOREMAN, GEOFF GRANT, SCOTT GREER, MAUREEN HARMON, JEFF HENLEY, BARRETT HILZER, KEMP FOUNDATION, BILL LAWARRE, DWIGHT LOWELL, LOWELL FAMILY TRUST, TERRIE MERSHON, Ciara Murray-Young, KELLEY PELLEGRI, JOHN PERRY, KEVIN SCHULTZ, IRA MAURICE SULLIVAN, RONALD P TOMSIC, BRAD WHEATLEY, PAUL WOLANSKY designating Mark Riera as local counsel. (lom)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian P. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Parties CASTLE MANAGEMENT, LLC, LINDA CASTLE-HILL, JUDY FOREMAN, GEOFF GRANT, SCOTT GREER, MAUREEN HARMON, JEFF HENLEY, BARRETT HILZER, KEMP FOUNDATION, BILL LAWARRE, DWIGHT LOWELL, LOWELL FAMILY TRUST, TERRIE MERSHON, Ciara Murray-Young, KELLEY PELLEGRI, JOHN PERRY, KEVIN SCHULTZ, IRA MAURICE SULLIVAN, RONALD P TOMSIC, BRAD WHEATLEY, PAUL WOLANSKY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 8/8/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22224015) filed by Intervenors CASTLE MANAGEMENT, LLC, LINDA CASTLE-HILL, JUDY FOREMAN, GEOFF GRANT, SCOTT GREER, MAUREEN HARMON, JEFF HENLEY, BARRETT HILZER, KEMP FOUNDATION, BILL LAWARRE, DWIGHT LOWELL, LOWELL FAMILY TRUST, TERRIE MERSHON, Ciara Murray-Young, KELLEY PELLEGRI, JOHN PERRY, KEVIN SCHULTZ, IRA MAURICE SULLIVAN, RONALD P TOMSIC, BRAD WHEATLEY, PAUL WOLANSKY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Riera, Mark)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE OF CORRECTION filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Douglas)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #44 Non-Resident Attorney Michael O. Mena APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenors, designating Mark Riera as local counsel. (lt)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: DENYING #43 Non-Resident Attorney Brian P. Miller APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenors. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the pro hac vice application fee, if paid, be refunded. Terming Attorney Brian P Miller. (lt)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian P. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Parties CASTLE MANAGEMENT, LLC, LINDA CASTLE-HILL, JUDY FOREMAN, GEOFF GRANT, SCOTT GREER, MAUREEN HARMON, JEFF HENLEY, BARRETT HILZER, KEMP FOU #43 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Intervene and Appoint Monitor [32 ], currently set for 08/23/2018, is taken off calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 08/23/2018. The court may order further briefing or other proceedings, at any time, as appropriate.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael O. Mena to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Parties CASTLE MANAGEMENT, LLC, LINDA CASTLE-HILL, JUDY FOREMAN, GEOFF GRANT, SCOTT GREER, MAUREEN HARMON, JEFF HENLEY, BARRETT HILZER, KEMP FOUNDATION, BILL LAWARRE, DWIGHT LOWELL, LOWELL FAMILY TRUST, TERRIE MERSHON, Ciara Murray-Young, KELLEY PELLEGRI, JOHN PERRY, KEVIN SCHULTZ, IRA MAURICE SULLIVAN, RONALD P TOMSIC, BRAD WHEATLEY, PAUL WOLANSKY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22284046) filed by Intervenors CASTLE MANAGEMENT, LLC, LINDA CASTLE-HILL, JUDY FOREMAN, GEOFF GRANT, SCOTT GREER, MAUREEN HARMON, JEFF HENLEY, BARRETT HILZER, KEMP FOUNDATION, BILL LAWARRE, DWIGHT LOWELL, LOWELL FAMILY TRUST, TERRIE MERSHON, Ciara Murray-Young, KELLEY PELLEGRI, JOHN PERRY, KEVIN SCHULTZ, IRA MAURICE SULLIVAN, RONALD P TOMSIC, BRAD WHEATLEY, PAUL WOLANSKY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Riera, Mark)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian P. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Parties CASTLE MANAGEMENT, LLC, LINDA CASTLE-HILL, JUDY FOREMAN, GEOFF GRANT, SCOTT GREER, MAUREEN HARMON, JEFF HENLEY, BARRETT HILZER, KEMP FOUNDATION, BILL LAWARRE, DWIGHT LOWELL, LOWELL FAMILY TRUST, TERRIE MERSHON, Ciara Murray-Young, KELLEY PELLEGRI, JOHN PERRY, KEVIN SCHULTZ, IRA MAURICE SULLIVAN, RONALD P TOMSIC, BRAD WHEATLEY, PAUL WOLANSKY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 8/8/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22224015) filed by Intervenors CASTLE MANAGEMENT, LLC, LINDA CASTLE-HILL, JUDY FOREMAN, GEOFF GRANT, SCOTT GREER, MAUREEN HARMON, JEFF HENLEY, BARRETT HILZER, KEMP FOUNDATION, BILL LAWARRE, DWIGHT LOWELL, LOWELL FAMILY TRUST, TERRIE MERSHON, Ciara Murray-Young, KELLEY PELLEGRI, JOHN PERRY, KEVIN SCHULTZ, IRA MAURICE SULLIVAN, RONALD P TOMSIC, BRAD WHEATLEY, PAUL WOLANSKY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Riera, Mark)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. No later than 8/16/2018, counsel shall file a Supplement to the Application Pro Hac Vice #39 , correcting the deficiencies in the court's Notice #40 . If the application is not supplemented, the request will be denied. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene and Appoint Monitor #32 ; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL O. MENA filed by Intervenor Parties CASTLE MANAGEMENT, LLC, LINDA CASTLE-HILL, JUDY FOREMAN, GEOFF GRANT, SCOTT GREER, MAUREEN HARMON, JEFF HENLEY, BARRETT HILZER, KEMP FOUNDATION, BILL LAWARRE, DWIGHT LOWELL, LOWELL FAMILY TRUST, TERRIE MERSHON, Ciara Murray-Young, KELLEY PELLEGRI, JOHN PERRY, KEVIN SCHULTZ, IRA MAURICE SULLIVAN, RONALD P TOMSIC, BRAD WHEATLEY, PAUL WOLANSKY. (Riera, Mark)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian P. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Parties CASTLE MANAGEMENT, LLC, LINDA CASTLE-HILL, JUDY FOREMAN, GEOFF GRANT, SCOTT GREER, MAUREEN HARMON, JEFF HENLEY, BARRETT HILZER, KEMP FOUNDATION #39 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lt)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian P. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Parties CASTLE MANAGEMENT, LLC, LINDA CASTLE-HILL, JUDY FOREMAN, GEOFF GRANT, SCOTT GREER, MAUREEN HARMON, JEFF HENLEY, BARRETT HILZER, KEMP FOUNDATION, BILL LAWARRE, DWIGHT LOWELL, LOWELL FAMILY TRUST, TERRIE MERSHON, Ciara Murray-Young, KELLEY PELLEGRI, JOHN PERRY, KEVIN SCHULTZ, IRA MAURICE SULLIVAN, RONALD P TOMSIC, BRAD WHEATLEY, PAUL WOLANSKY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22224015) filed by Intervenors CASTLE MANAGEMENT, LLC, LINDA CASTLE-HILL, JUDY FOREMAN, GEOFF GRANT, SCOTT GREER, MAUREEN HARMON, JEFF HENLEY, BARRETT HILZER, KEMP FOUNDATION, BILL LAWARRE, DWIGHT LOWELL, LOWELL FAMILY TRUST, TERRIE MERSHON, Ciara Murray-Young, KELLEY PELLEGRI, JOHN PERRY, KEVIN SCHULTZ, IRA MAURICE SULLIVAN, RONALD P TOMSIC, BRAD WHEATLEY, PAUL WOLANSKY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Riera, Mark)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene and Appoint Monitor #32 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Miller, Douglas)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Essex Capital Corporation, Ralph T Iannelli.(DeNeve, J)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #4 / Surreply in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Essex Capital Corporation, Ralph T Iannelli. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Jorge deNeve in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Second Declaration of Ralph Iannelli in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(DeNeve, J)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION #30 FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SURREPLY TO PLAINTIFF SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (iv)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 is taken off calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 8/2/2018. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 OPPOSITION in opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file a Surreply to Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Reply in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction #30 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Miller, Douglas)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene and Appoint Monitor filed by Intervenors CASTLE MANAGEMENT, LLC, LINDA CASTLE-HILL, JUDY FOREMAN, GEOFF GRANT, SCOTT GREER, MAUREEN HARMON, JEFF HENLEY, BARRETT HILZER, KEMP FOUNDATION, BILL LAWARRE, DWIGHT LOWELL, LOWELL FAMILY TRUST, TERRIE MERSHON, KELLEY PELLEGRI, JOHN PERRY, KEVIN SCHULTZ, IRA MAURICE SULLIVAN, RONALD P TOMSIC, BRAD WHEATLEY, PAUL WOLANSKY, Ciara Murray-Young. Motion set for hearing on 8/23/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Mark Riera added to party Ciara Murray-Young(pty:intv)) (Riera, Mark)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OBJECTIONS to Reply (Motion related),,,,,,,, #23 / Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to New Evidence Submitted with Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Essex Capital Corporation, Ralph T Iannelli. (DeNeve, J)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file a Surreply to Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Reply in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Essex Capital Corporation, Ralph T Iannelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C to the Ex Parte Application, #2 Declaration of Jorge DeNeve, #3 Proposed Order) (DeNeve, J)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION #28 TO BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON INTERVENORS' MOTION TO INTERVENE AND APPOINT MONITOR by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (iv)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION for Order to Approve Briefing on Shortened Time filed by Intervenors CASTLE MANAGEMENT, LLC, LINDA CASTLE-HILL, JUDY FOREMAN, GEOFF GRANT, SCOTT GREER, MAUREEN HARMON, JEFF HENLEY, BARRETT HILZER, KEMP FOUNDATION, BILL LAWARRE, DWIGHT LOWELL, LOWELL FAMILY TRUST, TERRIE MERSHON, KELLEY PELLEGRI, JOHN PERRY, KEVIN SCHULTZ, IRA MAURICE SULLIVAN, RONALD P TOMSIC, BRAD WHEATLEY, PAUL WOLANSKY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Motion to Intervene and Appoint Monitor, #3 Exhibit A to Motion to Intervene and Appoint Monitor)(Riera, Mark)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Pursuant to the striking of the related terminated/stricken motion #24 , the Stipulation #25 is also stricken and deemed moot. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin Re: MOTION to Intervene #24 and Stipulation for Order #25 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. See Local Rule 6-1; and (2) Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. See Local Rules 7-20, 5-4.4.1 and 5-4.4.2. (vdr)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 **DOCUMENT STRICKEN** STIPULATION for Order to Set Briefing Schedule on Motion to Intervene filed by Intervenors .(Riera, Mark) Modified on 7/20/2018 (vdr).
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 **DOCUMENT STRICKEN** NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene and Appoint Monitor; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Intervenors LINDA CASTLE-HILL, CASTLE MANAGEMENT, LLC, JUDY FOREMAN, GEOFF GRANT, SCOTT GREER, MAUREEN HARMON, JEFF HENLEY, BARRETT HILZER, KEMP FOUNDATION, BILL LAWARRE, LOWELL FAMILY TRUST, DWIGHT LOWELL, TERRIE MERSHON, KELLEY PELLEGRI, JOHN PERRY, KEVIN SCHULTZ, IRA MAURICE SULLIVAN, RONALD P TOMSIC, BRAD WHEATLEY, PAUL WOLANSKY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Mark Riera added to party LINDA CASTLE-HILL(pty:intv), Attorney Mark Riera added to party CASTLE MANAGEMENT, LLC(pty:intv), Attorney Mark Riera added. (Riera, Mark) Modified on 7/20/2018 (vdr).
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #4 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yolanda Ochoa in Support of SEC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of Rhoda Chang in Support of SEC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit 1 to Chang Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Chang Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Chang Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Chang Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Chang Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to Chang Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to Chang Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 to Chang Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 to Chang Declaration, #12 Exhibit 10 to Chang Declaration, #13 Exhibit 11 to Chang Declaration, #14 Exhibit 12 to Chang Declaration, #15 Exhibit 13 to Chang Declaration, #16 Exhibit 14 to Chang Declaration, #17 Exhibit 15 to Chang Declaration, #18 Exhibit 16 to Chang Declaration, #19 Exhibit 17 to Chang Declaration, #20 Exhibit 18 Pt 1 to Chang Declaration, #21 Exhibit 18 Pt 2 to Chang Declaration, #22 Exhibit 18 Pt 3 to Chang Declaration, #23 Exhibit 19 to Chang Declaration, #24 Exhibit 20 to Chang Declaration, #25 Exhibit 21 to Chang Declaration, #26 Exhibit 22 to Chang Declaration, #27 Exhibit 23 to Chang Declaration, #28 Exhibit 24 to Chang Declaration, #29 Exhibit 25 to Chang Declaration, #30 Exhibit 26 to Chang Declaration, #31 Exhibit 27 to Chang Declaration, #32 Exhibit 28 to Chang Declaration, #33 Exhibit 29 to Chang Declaration, #34 Exhibit 30 to Chang Declaration, #35 Exhibit 31 to Chang Declaration, #36 Exhibit 32 to Chang Declaration, #37 Exhibit 33 to Chang Declaration, #38 Exhibit 34 to Chang Declaration, #39 Exhibit 35 to Chang Declaration, #40 Exhibit 36 to Chang Declaration, #41 Exhibit 37 to Chang Declaration, #42 Exhibit 38 Pt 1 to Chang Declaration, #43 Exhibit 38 Pt 2 to Chang Declaration, #44 Exhibit 39 to Chang Declaration, #45 Exhibit 40 to Chang Declaration, #46 Exhibit 41 to Chang Declaration, #47 Exhibit 42 to Chang Declaration, #48 Declaration of Michael Present)(Leung, Gary)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Essex Capital Corporation, (DeNeve, J)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Essex Capital Corporation (DeNeve, J)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #4 filed by Defendants Essex Capital Corporation, Ralph T Iannelli. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jorge deNeve, #2 Declaration of Ralph T. Iannelli, #3 Declaration of Geoffrey Grant, #4 Declaration of John Perry, #5 Declaration of Greg Van Wyk)(DeNeve, J)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON STIPULATION #17 RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The hearing on Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction is continued for hearing to August 2, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. *See Order for deadlines and requirements.* (iv)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Essex Capital Corporation answer now due 8/1/2018; Ralph T Iannelli answer now due 8/1/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Essex Capital Corporation; Ralph T Iannelli.(DeNeve, J)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Essex Capital Corporation, Ralph T Iannelli. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney J Jorge DeNeve added to party Essex Capital Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney J Jorge DeNeve added to party Ralph T Iannelli(pty:dft))(DeNeve, J)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Essex Capital Corporation served on 6/11/2018, answer due 7/2/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ralph T. Iannelli Managing Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Leung, Gary)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Ralph T Iannelli served on 6/11/2018, answer due 7/2/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ralph T. Iannelli in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Leung, Gary)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION #11 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #4 is reset to be heard on 7/19/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Sealing Exhibits Attached to Declarations Filed in Support Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Appointment of a Receiver, Asset Freeze, and other Relief filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Miller, Douglas)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The motion in the docket entry number referenced above was filed before judges were assigned to this case, and is missing the hearing date, hearing time, and/or name of the judicial officer. See Local Rule 7-4. You must file and serve an Amended Notice of Motion with accurate hearing information. (esa)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Essex Capital Corporation, Ralph T Iannelli. (esa)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLARATION of Rhoda Chang in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #4 filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8 Part 1, #9 Exhibit 8 Part 2, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Leung, Gary)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION of Yolanda Ochoa in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #4 filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 Part 1, #5 Exhibit 4 Part 2, #6 Exhibit 4 Part 3, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9 Part 1, #12 Exhibit 9 Part 2, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16 Part 1, #20 Exhibit 16 Part 2, #21 Exhibit 16 Part 3, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Exhibit 20, #26 Exhibit 21, #27 Exhibit 22, #28 Exhibit 23)(Leung, Gary)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Supplement) (Attorney Gary Y Leung added to party Securities & Exchange Commission(pty:pla)) (Leung, Gary)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Miller, Douglas)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Miller, Douglas)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attorney Douglas M Miller added to party Securities & Exchange Commission(pty:pla))(Miller, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Ralph T. Iannelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Represented By: Douglas M Miller
Represented By: Gary Y Leung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Douglas M Miller
Represented By: Gary Y Leung
Represented By: Yolanda Ochoa
Represented By: Shuman Sohrn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph T Iannelli
Represented By: J Jorge DeNeve
Represented By: Steven J Olson
Represented By: Kevin M Yopp
Represented By: Andrew B Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essex Capital Corporation
Represented By: J Jorge DeNeve
Represented By: Steven J Olson
Represented By: Joshua Andrew del Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: TERRIE MERSHON
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: BILL LAWARRE
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: KELLEY PELLEGRI
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: BARRETT HILZER
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: RONALD P TOMSIC
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: GEOFF GRANT
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Represented By: Ellen S Robbins
Represented By: Michael D Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: LINDA CASTLE-HILL
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: PAUL WOLANSKY
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Represented By: Ellen S Robbins
Represented By: Michael D Napoli
Represented By: Evelina Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: KEVIN SCHULTZ
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: LOWELL FAMILY TRUST
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: DWIGHT LOWELL
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: JUDY FOREMAN
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SCOTT GREER
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: KEMP FOUNDATION
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: IRA MAURICE SULLIVAN
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: BRAD WHEATLEY
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: CASTLE MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: JEFF HENLEY
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: JOHN PERRY
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Represented By: Ellen S Robbins
Represented By: Michael D Napoli
Represented By: Evelina Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: MAUREEN HARMON
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Ciara Murray-Young
Represented By: Mark Riera
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Brian P Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: 915 Elm Avenue CVL, LLC
Represented By: David L Cousineau
Represented By: A Barry Cappello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Geoff Winkler
Represented By: Joshua Andrew del Castillo
Represented By: David R Zaro
Represented By: Norman M Aspis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Jessica Kurzban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?