Cara C. Jones v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Cara C. Jones and Curtis M. Jones
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp., Does 1 through 10 inclusive and Bank of America N.A.
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: James DeRoche
Case Number: 2:2018cv05631
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
2 Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 100 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney E Christine Hehir counsel for Defendant Bank of America N.A.. Filed by defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Hehir, E)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. BANA's Application #97 is granted in part and denied in part. The trial date and pretrial deadlines are vacated pending the court's ruling on the pending motions to dismiss and any upcoming motion for summary judgment. (iv)
May 13, 2020 Filing 98 OPPOSITION Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINE, TRIAL DATE, AND ATTENDANT DATES AND DEADLINES #97 Opposition and Declaration of Michele E. IronCastle filed by Plaintiffs Cara C. Jones, Curtis M. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michele E. IronCastle in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to B of A's Ex Parte Application)(IronCastle, Michele)
May 12, 2020 Filing 97 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINE, TRIAL DATE, AND ATTENDANT DATES AND DEADLINES filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Summerfield, #2 Declaration of Winters, #3 Proposed Order) (Summerfield, Adam)
May 8, 2020 Filing 96 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motions #83 , #87 and #88 are taken off the 5/14/2020 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 5/14/2020. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 30, 2020 Filing 95 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Amended Complaint/Petition, #82 #88 filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A.. (Summerfield, Adam)
April 30, 2020 Filing 94 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Second Amended Complaint #87 filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A.. (Summerfield, Adam)
April 30, 2020 Filing 93 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Clear Recon Corp., re Response in Opposition to Motion #92 served on 4/30/2020. (Winters, Fred)
April 30, 2020 Filing 92 OPPOSITION Reply to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Clear Recon Corp.. (Winters, Fred)
April 23, 2020 Filing 91 OPPOSITION Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Amended Complaint/Petition, #82 #88 Opposition to B of A's Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiffs Cara C. Jones, Curtis M. Jones. (IronCastle, Michele)
April 23, 2020 Filing 90 OPPOSITION re: to Dismiss Case #83 filed by Plaintiffs Cara C. Jones, Curtis M. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michele E. IronCastle in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Clear Recon's Motion to Dismiss the SAC)(IronCastle, Michele)
April 23, 2020 Filing 89 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Second Amended Complaint #87 filed by Plaintiffs Cara C. Jones, Curtis M. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michele E. IronCastle in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to B of A's Motion to Dismiss the SAC)(IronCastle, Michele)
April 9, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Amended Complaint/Petition, #82 filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 5/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Summerfield, Adam)
April 9, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 5/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Summerfield, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order) (Summerfield, Adam)
April 9, 2020 Filing 86 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Clear Recon Corp., re Declaration (Motion related), #84 , Memorandum in Support of Motion #85 , Motion Related Document #83 served on 04/09/2020. (Winters, Fred)
April 9, 2020 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM in Support OF MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Clear Recon Corp.. (Winters, Fred)
April 9, 2020 Filing 84 DECLARATION of Fred T. Winters RE MEET AND CONFER EFFORTS IN RELATION TO MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #63 filed by Defendant Clear Recon Corp.. (Winters, Fred)
April 9, 2020 Filing 83 CLEAR RECON CORPS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT [FRCP 12(b)(6)] re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #63 filed by Defendant Clear Recon Corp.. (Winters, Fred) Modified on 4/10/2020 (vdr).
March 26, 2020 Filing 82 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS Cara C. Jones, Curtis M. Jones amending Amended Complaint/Petition #61 , filed by Plaintiffs Cara C. Jones, Curtis M. Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to SAC Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to SAC Part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibits to SAC Part 3)(IronCastle, Michele)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER RE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The final pretrial conference and hearing on motions in limine is scheduled for Friday,August 7, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. The trial is scheduled to begin on Tuesday, August 25, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. *See Order for dates and deadlines.* (iv)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. BANA's Motion to Dismiss #66 is granted in part and denied in part. The First Amended Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiffs' Dodd-Frank Act is dismissed without leave to amend. All other claims are dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiffs may not add any new claims to the second amended complaint. CRC's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #63 is denied. BANA's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #68 is granted. *See order for complete ruling and court ordered deadline. (vdr)
March 13, 2020 Filing 79 STIPULATION to Continue Trial Date filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Summerfield, Adam)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION AND FURTHER PROCEEDINGS #77 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The final pretrial conference and hearing on motions in limine is scheduled for May 1, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. The trial is scheduled to begin on Tuesday, May 19, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
December 9, 2019 Filing 77 STIPULATION to Continue Trial Date and Attendant Dates and Deadlines from 02-04-2020 Current Trial Date to To Be Determined filed by defendant Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Summerfield, Adam)
September 13, 2019 Filing 76 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, Motions #63 #66 and #68 , currently set for hearing on September 19, 2019, are taken off calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on that date. The court may order further briefing or other proceedings, at any time, as appropriate. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 5, 2019 Filing 75 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss ;Memorandum of Points and Authorities #66 filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A.. (Summerfield, Adam)
September 5, 2019 Filing 74 REPLY in opposition to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Clear Recon Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certificate of Service)(Winters, Fred)
September 3, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Non Receipt of Opposition To Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A.. (Summerfield, Adam)
August 29, 2019 Filing 72 OPPOSITION In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Clear Recon's Motion to Dismiss re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #63 filed by Plaintiffs Cara C. Jones, Curtis M. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec. IronCastle, #2 Exhibit One, #3 Exhibit Two, #4 Exhibit Three)(IronCastle, Michele)
August 29, 2019 Filing 71 OPPOSITION In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to B of A's Motion to Dismiss re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss ;Memorandum of Points and Authorities #66 filed by Plaintiffs Cara C. Jones, Curtis M. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec.of Michele E. IronCastle, #2 Exhibit Ex. One, #3 Exhibit Ex. Two, #4 Exhibit Ex Three)(IronCastle, Michele)
August 25, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Change of address by Michele Eileen IronCastle attorney for Plaintiffs Cara C. Jones, Curtis M. Jones. Changing attorneys address to 33022 Sunharbor, Dana Point, CA 92629. Filed by Plaintiffs Cara C. Jones, Curtis M. Jones. (IronCastle, Michele)
August 22, 2019 Filing 69 DECLARATION of Adam F. Summerfield in Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss ;Memorandum of Points and Authorities #66 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of Amended Complaint/Petition #61 #68 filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Summerfield, Adam)
August 22, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of Amended Complaint/Petition #61 filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 9/19/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Summerfield, Adam)
August 22, 2019 Filing 67 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss ;Memorandum of Points and Authorities #66 filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit B to the Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit C to the Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit D to the Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit E to the Request for Judicial Notice)(Summerfield, Adam)
August 22, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss ;Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 9/19/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Summerfield, Adam)
August 22, 2019 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Clear Recon Corp., re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #63 , Declaration (Motion related), #64 served on 08/22/2019. (Winters, Fred)
August 22, 2019 Filing 64 DECLARATION of Fred T. Winters in relation to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #63 filed by Defendant Clear Recon Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Winters, Fred)
August 22, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Clear Recon Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 9/19/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum) (Winters, Fred)
August 21, 2019 Filing 62 Amended Certificate of Corporate Interest for Bank of America, N.A. CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A., identifying Bank of America Corporation. (Summerfield, Adam)
August 8, 2019 Filing 61 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Cara C. Jones, Curtis M. Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to the First Amended Complaint)(IronCastle, Michele)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin.Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #35 is granted. *See Order for dates, deadlines and requirements.* (iv)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION #53 AND FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The application is denied in part and granted in part. Jury trial continued to 2/4/2020 at 8:45 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for continued dates and deadlines.* (vdr)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin Re: Motion #52 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): Local Rule 7-3, meet and confer prior to filing motion must be done at least seven days prior to filing. (vdr)
June 20, 2019 Filing 56 OPPOSITION Defendants' Ex Parte re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Vacating Dates And Deadlines And Setting Further Scheduling Conference #53 filed by Plaintiffs Cara C. Jones, Curtis M. Jones. (IronCastle, Michele)
June 20, 2019 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Clear Recon Corp., re Request for Judicial Notice, #54 , Motion Related Document #52 served on 06/20/2019. (Winters, Fred)
June 20, 2019 Filing 54 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the Pleadings #35 filed by Defendant Clear Recon Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Winters, Fred)
June 20, 2019 Filing 53 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Vacating Dates And Deadlines And Setting Further Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fred T Winters In Support of Ex Parte Application, #2 Declaration of Adam F Summerfield In Support of Ex Parte Application, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Adam F Summerfield, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Adam F Summerfield, #5 Proposed Order Vacating Dates And Deadlines And Setting Further Scheduling Conference) (Summerfield, Adam)
June 20, 2019 Filing 52 **STRICKEN** CLEAR RECON CORP'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS re MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the Pleadings #35 filed by Defendant Clear Recon Corp. Hearing set for 7/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Winters, Fred) Modified on 6/21/2019 (vdr).
April 25, 2019 Filing 51 STATUS REPORT RE SETTLEMENT filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A.. (Summerfield, Adam)
April 23, 2019 Filing 50 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) James DeRoche: Mediation held on April 22, 2019. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link: #MediationParticipantSurvey(DeRoche, James)
April 2, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) James DeRoche has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
March 29, 2019 Filing 48 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that James DeRoche may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 4/22/2019 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Plaintiffs Cara C. Jones, Curtis M. Jones(IronCastle, Michele)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ON REQUEST #44 FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The request of Curtis Jones to substitute Michele E. Ironcastle as attorney of record instead of Curtis Jones is GRANTED. (iv)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ON REQUEST #43 FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The request of Cara C. Jones to substitute Michele E. Ironcastle as attorney of record instead of Pro Se is GRANTED. (iv)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION #42 TO EXTEND ADR COMPLETION CUT-OFF DATE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Settlement Conference Completion Date, as set by the Court's Scheduling and Case Management Order, is hereby extended to April 30, 2019. (iv)
March 5, 2019 Filing 44 First REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Michele E. IronCastle in place of attorney Curtis M, Jones filed by Plaintiff Curtis Jones Curtis M. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Michele Eileen IronCastle added to party Curtis M. Jones(pty:pla)) (IronCastle, Michele)
March 5, 2019 Filing 43 First REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Michele E. IronCastle in place of attorney Cara C. Jones filed by Cara Jones Cara C. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Michele Eileen IronCastle added to party Cara C. Jones(pty:pla)) (IronCastle, Michele)
March 4, 2019 Filing 42 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation to Extend ADR Completion Cut-off Date filed by defendant Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Summerfield, Adam)
January 18, 2019 Filing 41 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #35 is taken off the 1/24/2019 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 1/24/2019. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 10, 2019 Filing 40 PLAINTIFFS CARA C. JONES & CURTIS M. JONES SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA'S REPLY filed by Plaintiffs Cara C. Jones, Curtis M. Jones. (iv)
January 10, 2019 Filing 39 INITIAL DISCLOSURES OF PLAINTIFFS CARA C. JONES & CURTIS M. JONES filed by Plaintiffs Cara C. Jones, Curtis M. Jones. (iv)
January 4, 2019 Filing 38 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the Pleadings #35 filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A.. (Summerfield, Adam)
January 3, 2019 Filing 37 PLAINTIFFS CARA C. JONES & CURTIS M. JONES OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGEMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIALLY NOTICED DOCUMENTS: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES re: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the Pleadings #35 filed by Plaintiffs Cara C. Jones, Curtis M. Jones. (iv)
December 19, 2018 Filing 36 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the Pleadings #35 filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Summerfield, Adam)
December 19, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) (Summerfield, Adam) Modified on 12/21/2018 (vdr).
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin Re: MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #32 ; Request for Judicial Notice #33 . The following documents be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. January 17, 2019 is a closed hearing date. Counsel were notified and the filings were not correct, so they are stricken. (vdr)
December 17, 2018 Filing 33 **DOCUMENT STRICKEN** REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the Pleadings #32 filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Summerfield, Adam) Modified on 12/18/2018 (vdr).
December 17, 2018 Filing 32 **DOCUMENT STRICKEN** NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) (Summerfield, Adam) Modified on 12/18/2018 (vdr).
December 7, 2018 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Adam F Summerfield counsel for Defendant Bank of America N.A.. E Christine Hehir is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Bank of America NA. (Summerfield, Adam)
December 7, 2018 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Adam F Summerfield counsel for Defendant Bank of America N.A.. Adding Adam F Summerfield as counsel of record for Bank of America NA for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Bank of America NA. (Attorney Adam F Summerfield added to party Bank of America N.A.(pty:dft))(Summerfield, Adam)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Final Pretrial Conference and hearing on motions in limine set for 9/6/2019 at 10:00 AM. Trial set for 9/24/2019 at 9:00 AM. *See Order for dates, deadlines and requirements.* (iv)
August 30, 2018 Filing 28 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 2 filed. Parties request to appear before a neutral selected from the court's Mediation Panel for mediation. Filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A.(Hehir, E)
August 30, 2018 Filing 27 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 DAYS, filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A... (Hehir, E)
August 22, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendant Clear Recon Corp..(Winters, Fred)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
August 13, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Bank of America N.A., identifying BANA Holding Corporation; BAC North America Holding Company; NB Holdings Corporation; Bank of America Corporation. (Hehir, E)
August 13, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses filed by defendant Bank of America N.A..(Hehir, E)
August 6, 2018 Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court's Order to Show Cause #17 is hereby discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION #19 TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Answer to the Complaint is due on or before August 13, 2018. Plaintiffs Application to Enter Default by Clerk #18 is deemed moot. (iv)
August 2, 2018 Filing 20 PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS OF NON-MONETARY STATUS OF CLEAR RECON CORP filed by Plaintiff Cara C. Jones. (iv)
August 2, 2018 Filing 19 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cara C. Jones answer now due 8/13/2018, re APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Bank of America N.A. #18 filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney E Christine Hehir added to party Bank of America N.A.(pty:dft))(Hehir, E)
July 30, 2018 Filing 18 PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO ENTER DEFAULT BY THE CLERK AGAINST DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA N.A. FOR FAILING TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT WITHIN THE ALLOWED TIME (21) DAYS AFTER BEING SERVED filed by Plaintiff Cara C. Jones. (iv)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 8/3/2018. (vdr)
July 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Party with Financial Interest. filed by defendant Clear Recon Corp.. (Winters, Fred)
July 18, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE Declaration of non monetary status filed by defendant Clear Recon Corp.. (Winters, Fred)
July 17, 2018 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Clear Recon Corp., upon Defendant Clear Recon Corp. served on 7/2/2018, answer due 7/23/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz-SOP Intake Specialist Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service, no service by mail was executed. Original Summons NOT returned. (iv)
July 17, 2018 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cara C. Jones, upon Defendant Bank of America N.A. served on 7/2/2018, answer due 7/23/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz-SOP Intake Specialist Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (iv)
July 17, 2018 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Clear Recon Corp., re Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction #10 served on 7/5/2018. (iv)
July 17, 2018 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Cara C. Jones, re Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction #10 served on 7/5/2018 (iv).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED THAT plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #6 is denied. (iv)
July 13, 2018 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.The hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction #6 is hereby continued to 8/2/2018 at 10:00 AM.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner to the calendar of Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:18-cv-05631 FMO(JEMx). (rn)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-05631 RGK(JEMx). (rn)
July 2, 2018 Filing 6 PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Plaintiff Cara C. Jones. Motion set for hearing on 7/30/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (shb)
June 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Cara C. Jones. (et)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendants Bank of America N.A., Clear Recon Corp. (et)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Bank of America N.A., Clear Recon Corp., Does 1 through 10, inclusive. Case assigned to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (Filing fee $ 400 FEE PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Cara C. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cara C. Jones v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp.
Represented By: Casper J Rankin
Represented By: Fred T Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: E Christine Hehir
Represented By: Adam F Summerfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cara C. Jones
Represented By: Michele Eileen IronCastle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis M. Jones
Represented By: Michele Eileen IronCastle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: James DeRoche
Represented By: James D DeRoche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?