Abel Contreras et al v. XPO Cartage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Abimael Hernandez, Jose F. Castro, Manuel D. Martinez Mejia, Rogelio Trujillo, Alfonso Limon Campos, Francisco Rivera, Manuel O. Martinez, Byron D. Monzon, Juan Carlos Meza, Manuel Avalos Melgar, Vincente Arceo, Ramon A. Michel, Hugo Odilio Sandoval, Pedro Michel, Juan Diaz, Erick Roldan, Juan Raul Berdugo, Michael F. Torres, Rigoberto Guardado, Miguel Angel Bautista, Ruben Garcia, Jose Saul Perez, Alexander Sosa, Jesus Castro, Isidoro Carrillo, Oscar A. Lopez Fuentes, Gumesindo Valdez, Rafael Valdivia Cruz, Carlos A. Perez, Jose M. Padilla, Gabriel Cruz, Ricardo Rivas, Javier Delgado, Jose Barreto, Michael White, Marco A. Valdez, Noe A. Sigaran, Javier Maldonado, Antonio Magana, Martin Rodriguez, Benigno Ramirez, Juan Soto, Jose Erasto Ruiz, Eber Linares, Albert Disus, Luis A. Guerrero, Alfonso Hernandez, Jaime F. Salcido, Javier G. Ortiz, Jose M. Diaz, Franklin Figueroa, Jose De Jesus Salazar, Nicanor Ramirez, Margarita Bonilla, Benjamin A. Barrera, Ricardo O. Gonzalez, Martin Ramirez Fernandez, Jose F. Ruiz, Rafael Dominguez, Rember Martinez, Julio A. Caminos, Jose Ines Mireles Felix, Osmed Alexander Flores, Janis A. Guzman, Reyes Santiago, Saul Ramirez, Francisco Gonzalez Camacho, William Penate, Ruben Ochoa, Alejandro Velasco, Isidro Salazar, William I. Funes, Raul Hernandez Velazquez, Angel Gomez, Carlos A. Ramirez, Alfredo Rodriguez Cortez, Marcos A. Ramirez Rivas, Fernando Sanchez, Gonsalo Alba Rodriguez, Ana Avalos, Benjamin Alfaro, Jose Javier Rangel, Arturo Real, Gustavo Jaramillo, Waldomero Marroquin, Jose Alfredo Garcia, Alejandro Garcia, Israel Ochoa, Lex Argueta, Juan Quan, Wilfredo Perez Hernandez, Jose J. Solis Sanchez, Delia Rendon, Felipe Sagrero, Gerardo Sanchez, Armando Henriquez, Pedro Zavala, Edgar Galeano, Cosme Valdez, Leodan Paredes, Manuel Gonzalez, Feliberto Sosa, Carlos Macias, Candelario Garcia, Felix Ortiz, Alma Delia Escobar Angulo, Gabriel Gomez, Constantino Gonzalez, Jose Iscoa, Vahe Olmassakian, Javier Pablo Pahuamba, Abel Contreras, Jaime Villalvazo, Ramon Rodriguez, Robert Camargo, Gregorio Hernandez Lomeli, Ricardo Franco, Humberto Canales, Victor Garcia, Miguel Lopez, Manuel Sanchez Quintero and Eladio Marquez
Defendant: XPO Port Services, Inc., XPO Logistics, Inc., XPO Logistics Port Services, Inc., XPO Cartage, Inc., XPO Logistics Cartage, LLC, XPO Logistics and Does 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv05725
Filed: June 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2018 Filing 29 Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp)
August 2, 2018 Filing 28 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (bp)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Remanding Action to State Court by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The action is hereby remanded to state court for all further proceedings. Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
August 2, 2018 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants XPO Logistics Port Services, Inc., XPO Logistics, Inc., re Notice (Other) #22 , Answer to Complaint, #23 , Notice (Other) #24 , Answer to Complaint #21 , Notice (Other) #25 served on 8-2-18. (Riley, Kathryn)
August 2, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Consent and Joinder in Removal filed by Defendants XPO Logistics Port Services, Inc., XPO Logistics, Inc.. (Riley, Kathryn)
August 2, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant XPO Logistics Port Services, Inc.. (Riley, Kathryn)
August 2, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant XPO Logistics Port Services, Inc..(Attorney Kathryn Bridget Riley added to party XPO Logistics Port Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Bridget Riley added to party XPO Logistics Port Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Riley, Kathryn)
August 2, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant XPO Logistics, Inc.. (Riley, Kathryn)
August 2, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant XPO Logistics, Inc..(Attorney Kathryn Bridget Riley added to party XPO Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Bridget Riley added to party XPO Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft))(Riley, Kathryn)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand #16 , for the following reasons: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. (lom)
July 31, 2018 Filing 19 Notice of Withdrawal of Declaration (Motion related) #18 , Memorandum in Support of Motion #15 , Motion to Remand Case to State Court,,,,,,,,, #16 , Declaration (Motion related), #17 filed by Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants Benjamin Alfaro, Alma Delia Escobar Angulo, Vincente Arceo, Lex Argueta, Ana Avalos, Benjamin A. Barrera, Jose Barreto, Miguel Angel Bautista, Juan Raul Berdugo, Margarita Bonilla, Francisco Gonzalez Camacho, Robert Camargo, Julio A. Caminos, Alfonso Limon Campos, Humberto Canales, Isidoro Carrillo, Jesus Castro, Jose F. Castro, Abel Contreras, Alfredo Rodriguez Cortez, Gabriel Cruz, Rafael Valdivia Cruz, Javier Delgado, Jose M. Diaz, Juan Diaz, Albert Disus, Rafael Dominguez, Jose Ines Mireles Felix, Martin Ramirez Fernandez, Franklin Figueroa, Osmed Alexander Flores, Ricardo Franco, Oscar A. Lopez Fuentes, William I. Funes, Edgar Galeano, Alejandro Garcia, Candelario Garcia, Jose Alfredo Garcia, Ruben Garcia, Victor Garcia, Angel Gomez, Gabriel Gomez, Constantino Gonzalez, Manuel Gonzalez, Ricardo O. Gonzalez, Rigoberto Guardado, Luis A. Guerrero, Janis A. Guzman, Armando Henriquez, Abimael Hernandez, Alfonso Hernandez, Wilfredo Perez Hernandez, Jose Iscoa, Gustavo Jaramillo, Eber Linares, Gregorio Hernandez Lomeli, Miguel Lopez, Carlos Macias, Antonio Magana, Javier Maldonado, Eladio Marquez, Waldomero Marroquin, Manuel O. Martinez, Rember Martinez, Manuel D. Martinez Mejia, Manuel Avalos Melgar, Juan Carlos Meza, Pedro Michel, Ramon A. Michel, Byron D. Monzon, Israel Ochoa, Ruben Ochoa, Vahe Olmassakian, Felix Ortiz, Javier G. Ortiz, Jose M. Padilla, Javier Pablo Pahuamba, Leodan Paredes, William Penate, Carlos A. Perez, Jose Saul Perez, Juan Quan, Manuel Sanchez Quintero, Benigno Ramirez, Carlos A. Ramirez, Nicanor Ramirez, Saul Ramirez, Jose Javier Rangel, Arturo Real, Delia Rendon, Marcos A. Ramirez Rivas, Ricardo Rivas, Francisco Rivera, Gonsalo Alba Rodriguez, Martin Rodriguez, Ramon Rodriguez, Erick Roldan, Jose F. Ruiz, Jose Erasto Ruiz, Felipe Sagrero, Isidro Salazar, Jose De Jesus Salazar, Jaime F. Salcido, Fernando Sanchez, Gerardo Sanchez, Jose J. Solis Sanchez, Hugo Odilio Sandoval, Reyes Santiago, Noe A. Sigaran, Alexander Sosa, Feliberto Sosa, Juan Soto, Michael F. Torres, Rogelio Trujillo, Cosme Valdez, Gumesindo Valdez, Marco A. Valdez, Alejandro Velasco, Raul Hernandez Velazquez, Jaime Villalvazo, Michael White, Pedro Zavala. (Shackelford, Patricia)
July 31, 2018 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Jesse L. Wright IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #16 filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Alfaro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shackelford, Patricia)
July 31, 2018 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Patricia A. Shackelford IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #16 filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Alfaro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Shackelford, Patricia)
July 31, 2018 Filing 16 STRICKEN, see docket entry no. 20 - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants Benjamin Alfaro, Alma Delia Escobar Angulo, Vincente Arceo, Lex Argueta, Ana Avalos, Benjamin A. Barrera, Jose Barreto, Miguel Angel Bautista, Juan Raul Berdugo, Margarita Bonilla, Francisco Gonzalez Camacho, Robert Camargo, Julio A. Caminos, Alfonso Limon Campos, Humberto Canales, Isidoro Carrillo, Jesus Castro, Jose F. Castro, Abel Contreras, Alfredo Rodriguez Cortez, Gabriel Cruz, Rafael Valdivia Cruz, Javier Delgado, Jose M. Diaz, Juan Diaz, Albert Disus, Rafael Dominguez, Jose Ines Mireles Felix, Martin Ramirez Fernandez, Franklin Figueroa, Osmed Alexander Flores, Ricardo Franco, Oscar A. Lopez Fuentes, William I. Funes, Edgar Galeano, Alejandro Garcia, Candelario Garcia, Jose Alfredo Garcia, Ruben Garcia, Victor Garcia, Angel Gomez, Gabriel Gomez, Constantino Gonzalez, Manuel Gonzalez, Ricardo O. Gonzalez, Rigoberto Guardado, Luis A. Guerrero, Janis A. Guzman, Armando Henriquez, Abimael Hernandez, Alfonso Hernandez, Wilfredo Perez Hernandez, Jose Iscoa, Gustavo Jaramillo, Eber Linares, Gregorio Hernandez Lomeli, Miguel Lopez, Carlos Macias, Antonio Magana, Javier Maldonado, Eladio Marquez, Waldomero Marroquin, Manuel O. Martinez, Rember Martinez, Manuel D. Martinez Mejia, Manuel Avalos Melgar, Juan Carlos Meza, Pedro Michel, Ramon A. Michel, Byron D. Monzon, Israel Ochoa, Ruben Ochoa, Vahe Olmassakian, Felix Ortiz, Javier G. Ortiz, Jose M. Padilla, Javier Pablo Pahuamba, Leodan Paredes, William Penate, Carlos A. Perez, Jose Saul Perez, Juan Quan, Manuel Sanchez Quintero, Benigno Ramirez, Carlos A. Ramirez, Nicanor Ramirez, Saul Ramirez, Jose Javier Rangel, Arturo Real, Delia Rendon, Marcos A. Ramirez Rivas, Ricardo Rivas, Francisco Rivera, Gonsalo Alba Rodriguez, Martin Rodriguez, Ramon Rodriguez, Erick Roldan, Jose F. Ruiz, Jose Erasto Ruiz, Felipe Sagrero, Isidro Salazar, Jose De Jesus Salazar, Jaime F. Salcido, Fernando Sanchez, Gerardo Sanchez, Jose J. Solis Sanchez, Hugo Odilio Sandoval, Reyes Santiago, Noe A. Sigaran, Alexander Sosa, Feliberto Sosa, Juan Soto, Michael F. Torres, Rogelio Trujillo, Cosme Valdez, Gumesindo Valdez, Marco A. Valdez, Alejandro Velasco, Raul Hernandez Velazquez, Jaime Villalvazo, Michael White, Pedro Zavala. Motion set for hearing on 8/20/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Shackelford, Patricia) Modified on 8/1/2018 (lom).
July 31, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Alfaro. (Shackelford, Patricia)
July 26, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #13 . The following error(s) was found: The summons should indicate "Summons on Amended Complaint". The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (yl)
July 24, 2018 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Alfaro, Alma Delia Escobar Angulo, Vincente Arceo, Lex Argueta, Ana Avalos, Benjamin A. Barrera, Jose Barreto, Miguel Angel Bautista, Juan Raul Berdugo, Margarita Bonilla, Francisco Gonzalez Camacho, Robert Camargo, Julio A. Caminos, Alfonso Limon Campos, Humberto Canales, Isidoro Carrillo, Jesus Castro, Jose F. Castro, Abel Contreras, Alfredo Rodriguez Cortez, Gabriel Cruz, Rafael Valdivia Cruz, Javier Delgado, Jose M. Diaz, Juan Diaz, Albert Disus, Rafael Dominguez, Jose Ines Mireles Felix, Martin Ramirez Fernandez, Franklin Figueroa, Osmed Alexander Flores, Ricardo Franco, Oscar A. Lopez Fuentes, William I. Funes, Edgar Galeano, Alejandro Garcia, Candelario Garcia, Jose Alfredo Garcia, Ruben Garcia, Victor Garcia, Angel Gomez, Gabriel Gomez, Constantino Gonzalez, Manuel Gonzalez, Ricardo O. Gonzalez, Rigoberto Guardado, Luis A. Guerrero, Janis A. Guzman, Armando Henriquez, Abimael Hernandez, Alfonso Hernandez, Wilfredo Perez Hernandez, Jose Iscoa, Gustavo Jaramillo, Eber Linares, Gregorio Hernandez Lomeli, Miguel Lopez, Carlos Macias, Antonio Magana, Javier Maldonado, Eladio Marquez, Waldomero Marroquin, Manuel O. Martinez, Rember Martinez, Manuel D. Martinez Mejia, Manuel Avalos Melgar, Juan Carlos Meza, Pedro Michel, Ramon A. Michel, Byron D. Monzon, Israel Ochoa, Ruben Ochoa, Vahe Olmassakian, Felix Ortiz, Javier G. Ortiz, Jose M. Padilla, Javier Pablo Pahuamba, Leodan Paredes, William Penate, Carlos A. Perez, Jose Saul Perez, Juan Quan, Manuel Sanchez Quintero, Benigno Ramirez, Carlos A. Ramirez, Nicanor Ramirez, Saul Ramirez, Jose Javier Rangel, Arturo Real, Delia Rendon, Marcos A. Ramirez Rivas, Ricardo Rivas, Francisco Rivera, Gonsalo Alba Rodriguez, Martin Rodriguez, Ramon Rodriguez, Erick Roldan, Jose F. Ruiz, Jose Erasto Ruiz, Felipe Sagrero, Isidro Salazar, Jose De Jesus Salazar, Jaime F. Salcido, Fernando Sanchez, Gerardo Sanchez, Jose J. Solis Sanchez, Hugo Odilio Sandoval, Reyes Santiago, Noe A. Sigaran, Alexander Sosa, Feliberto Sosa, Juan Soto, Michael F. Torres, Rogelio Trujillo, Cosme Valdez, Gumesindo Valdez, Marco A. Valdez, Alejandro Velasco, Raul Hernandez Velazquez, Jaime Villalvazo, Michael White, Pedro Zavala. (Attachments: #1 List of Plaintiffs and Defendants)(Shackelford, Patricia)
July 18, 2018 Filing 12 Certificate of Compliance filed by Defendant XPO Logistics Cartage, LLC (Riley, Kathryn)
July 16, 2018 Filing 11 All Cross Defendants' ANSWER to Counterclaim,,,,,,,,, Answer to Cross-Complaint of Defendant XPO Logistic Cartage, LLC filed by Cross Defendants Abel Contreras.(Shackelford, Patricia)
July 2, 2018 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant XPO Logistics Cartage, LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #9 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 by Mail served on 7-2-18. (Riley, Kathryn)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2018, at 9:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (smo)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (smo)
June 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (esa)
June 28, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COUNTERCLAIM FILED AS CROSS-COMPLAINT IN STATE COURT against Counter-defendants Benjamin Alfaro, Alma Delia Escobar Angulo, Vincente Arceo, Lex Argueta, Ana Avalos, Benjamin A. Barrera, Jose Barreto, Miguel Angel Bautista, Juan Raul Berdugo, Margarita Bonilla, Francisco Gonzalez Camacho, Robert Camargo, Julio A. Caminos, Alfonso Limon Campos, Humberto Canales, Isidoro Carrillo, Jesus Castro, Jose F. Castro, Abel Contreras, Alfredo Rodriguez Cortez, Gabriel Cruz, Rafael Valdivia Cruz, Javier Delgado, Jose M. Diaz, Juan Diaz, Albert Disus, Rafael Dominguez, Jose Ines Mireles Felix, Martin Ramirez Fernandez, Franklin Figueroa, Osmed Alexander Flores, Ricardo Franco, Oscar A. Lopez Fuentes, William I. Funes, Edgar Galeano, Alejandro Garcia, Candelario Garcia, Jose Alfredo Garcia, Ruben Garcia, Victor Garcia, Angel Gomez, Gabriel Gomez, Constantino Gonzalez, Manuel Gonzalez, Ricardo O. Gonzalez, Rigoberto Guardado, Luis A. Guerrero, Janis A. Guzman, Armando Henriquez, Abimael Hernandez, Alfonso Hernandez, Wilfredo Perez Hernandez, Jose Iscoa, Gustavo Jaramillo, Eber Linares, Gregorio Hernandez Lomeli, Miguel Lopez, Carlos Macias, Antonio Magana, Javier Maldonado, Eladio Marquez, Waldomero Marroquin, Manuel O. Martinez, Rember Martinez, Manuel D. Martinez Mejia, Manuel Avalos Melgar, Juan Carlos Meza, Pedro Michel, Ramon A. Michel, Byron D. Monzon, Israel Ochoa, Ruben Ochoa, Vahe Olmassakian, Felix Ortiz, Javier G. Ortiz, Jose M. Padilla, Javier Pablo Pahuamba, Leodan Paredes, William Penate, Carlos A. Perez, Jose Saul Perez, Juan Quan, Manuel Sanchez Quintero, Benigno Ramirez, Carlos A. Ramirez, Nicanor Ramirez, Saul Ramirez, Jose Javier Rangel, Arturo Real, Delia Rendon, Marcos A. Ramirez Rivas, Ricardo Rivas, Francisco Rivera, Gonsalo Alba Rodriguez, Martin Rodriguez, Ramon Rodriguez, Erick Roldan, Jose F. Ruiz, Jose Erasto Ruiz, Felipe Sagrero, Isidro Salazar, Jose De Jesus Salazar, Jaime F. Salcido, Fernando Sanchez, Gerardo Sanchez, Jose J. Solis Sanchez, Hugo Odilio Sandoval, Reyes Santiago, Noe A. Sigaran, Alexander Sosa, Feliberto Sosa, Juan Soto, Michael F. Torres, Rogelio Trujillo, Cosme Valdez, Gumesindo Valdez, Marco A. Valdez, Alejandro Velasco, Raul Hernandez Velazquez, Jaime Villalvazo, Michael White, Pedro Zavala, filed by Counter-claimant XPO Logistics Cartage, LLC. (Filed in state court 6/25/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 7) (esa)
June 28, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to First Amended Complaint, filed by defendant XPO Logistics Cartage, LLC. (Filed in state court 6/25/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 6)(esa)
June 28, 2018 COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Abel Contreras, et al, upon Defendant XPO Logistics Cartage, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 5/10/2018. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 4) (esa)
June 28, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1-50, inclusive, XPO Cartage, Inc., XPO Logistics Cartage, LLC, XPO Logistics Port Services, Inc., XPO Logistics, Inc., XPO Port Services, Inc., filed by plaintiffs Abel Contreras, et al. (Filed in state court 4/26/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 2)(esa)
June 28, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1-50, inclusive, XPO Cartage, Inc., XPO Logistics Cartage, LLC, XPO Logistics Port Services, Inc., XPO Logistics, Inc., XPO Port Services, Inc., filed by plaintiffs Abel Contreras, et al. (Filed in state court 2/28/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
June 28, 2018 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant XPO Logistics Cartage, LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Declaration, #4 by Overnight Mail served on 6-28-2018. (Riley, Kathryn)
June 28, 2018 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Kathryn Riley Grasso re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant XPO Logistics Cartage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Riley, Kathryn)
June 28, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant XPO Logistics Cartage, LLC, identifying XPO Intermodal Solutions, Inc., XPO Intermodal, Inc., XPO Logistics, Inc.. (Riley, Kathryn)
June 28, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant XPO Logistics Cartage, LLC. (Riley, Kathryn)
June 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior, case number BC 695795 Receipt No: 0973-22009044 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant XPO Logistics Cartage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Corrected Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Proof of Service, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Answer, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - Cross-Complaint) (Attorney Kathryn Bridget Riley added to party XPO Logistics Cartage, LLC(pty:dft))(Riley, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abel Contreras et al v. XPO Cartage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abimael Hernandez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose F. Castro
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel D. Martinez Mejia
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio Trujillo
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Limon Campos
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Rivera
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel O. Martinez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron D. Monzon
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Meza
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Avalos Melgar
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincente Arceo
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon A. Michel
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Odilio Sandoval
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Michel
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Diaz
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Roldan
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Raul Berdugo
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael F. Torres
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rigoberto Guardado
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Bautista
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Garcia
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Saul Perez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Sosa
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Castro
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isidoro Carrillo
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar A. Lopez Fuentes
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gumesindo Valdez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Valdivia Cruz
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos A. Perez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M. Padilla
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Cruz
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Rivas
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Delgado
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Barreto
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael White
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco A. Valdez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noe A. Sigaran
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Maldonado
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Magana
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Rodriguez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benigno Ramirez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Soto
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Erasto Ruiz
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eber Linares
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Disus
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis A. Guerrero
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Hernandez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime F. Salcido
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier G. Ortiz
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M. Diaz
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Figueroa
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose De Jesus Salazar
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicanor Ramirez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Bonilla
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin A. Barrera
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo O. Gonzalez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Ramirez Fernandez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose F. Ruiz
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Dominguez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rember Martinez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio A. Caminos
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ines Mireles Felix
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osmed Alexander Flores
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janis A. Guzman
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reyes Santiago
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul Ramirez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Gonzalez Camacho
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Penate
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Ochoa
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Velasco
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isidro Salazar
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William I. Funes
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Hernandez Velazquez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Gomez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos A. Ramirez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Rodriguez Cortez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos A. Ramirez Rivas
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Sanchez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonsalo Alba Rodriguez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Avalos
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Alfaro
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Javier Rangel
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Real
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Jaramillo
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waldomero Marroquin
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Alfredo Garcia
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Garcia
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Ochoa
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lex Argueta
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Quan
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Perez Hernandez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose J. Solis Sanchez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delia Rendon
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Sagrero
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Sanchez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Henriquez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Zavala
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Galeano
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cosme Valdez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leodan Paredes
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Gonzalez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feliberto Sosa
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Macias
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candelario Garcia
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Ortiz
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Delia Escobar Angulo
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Gomez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constantino Gonzalez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Iscoa
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vahe Olmassakian
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Pablo Pahuamba
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel Contreras
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Villalvazo
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Rodriguez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Camargo
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregorio Hernandez Lomeli
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Franco
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humberto Canales
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Garcia
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Lopez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Sanchez Quintero
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eladio Marquez
Represented By: Patricia Ann Shackelford
Represented By: D. Briana Rivera
Represented By: D Briana Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Port Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Bridget Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics Port Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Bridget Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Cartage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics Cartage, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn Bridget Riley
Represented By: Mary C Dollarhide
Represented By: Kevin D Harlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?