LEAF Capital Funding, LLC v. Nino Jefferson Lim et al
Plaintiff: LEAF Capital Funding, LLC
Defendant: Fresno Supermarket Inc., Island Pacific Supermarkets, Inc., Island Pacific Oxnard, Inc., Island Pacific National City, Inc., Long Beach Seafood Market Inc., Island Pacific Enterprises Inc., Kababayan Development, Inc., Nino Jefferson Lim, Azusa Supermarket, Inc., Oishi Supermarket, Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv05864
Filed: July 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 56 ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC and against Azusa Supermarket, Inc., Fresno Supermarket Inc., Island Pacific Enterprises Inc., Island Pacific National City, Inc., Island Pacific Oxnard, Inc., Island Pacific Supermarkets, Inc., Kababayan Development, Inc., Long Beach Seafood Market Inc., Oishi Supermarket, Inc. in the principal amount of $ 1,054,725.93, interest in the amount of $ 0.00, attorneys fees of $ 0.00, costs of $ 0.00. RE: Judgment, #55 . (mrgo)
January 9, 2019 Filing 55 JUDGMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, in favor of plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC against defendants Azusa Supermarket, Inc., Fresno Supermarket Inc., Island Pacific Enterprises Inc., Island Pacific National City, Inc., Island Pacific Oxnard, Inc., Island Pacific Supermarkets, Inc., Kababayan Development, Inc., Long Beach Seafood Market Inc., Oishi Supermarket, Inc. in the principal amount of $1,054,725.93, interest in the amount of $0.00, attorneys fees of $0.00, costs of $0.00 for a total judgment of $1,054,725.93. Related to: Stipulation for Judgment #54 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mrgo)
November 30, 2018 Filing 54 STIPULATION for Judgment as to Complaint against Entity Defendants in the amount of $1,054,725.93 filed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Judgment)(Dooley, Nathan)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
November 28, 2018 Filing 52 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Initial Status Conference set for 12/3/2019 is vacated and off-calendar. Jury trial is set for 4/2/2019 at 9:00 a.m., with a pretrial conference set for 3/25/2019 at 3:00 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Stipulation to Continue, #50 . (Scheduling Conference reset for 12/3/2018 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson.) (mrgo)
September 25, 2018 Filing 50 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from October 15, 2018 to mid December 2018 filed by Defendants Azusa Supermarket, Inc., Fresno Supermarket Inc., Island Pacific Enterprises Inc., Island Pacific National City, Inc., Island Pacific Oxnard, Inc., Island Pacific Supermarkets, Inc., Kababayan Development, Inc., Nino Jefferson Lim, Long Beach Seafood Market Inc., Oishi Supermarket, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tan, Arnel)
September 11, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Azusa Supermarket, Inc., Fresno Supermarket Inc., Island Pacific Enterprises Inc., Island Pacific National City, Inc., Island Pacific Oxnard, Inc., Island Pacific Supermarkets, Inc., Kababayan Development, Inc., Nino Jefferson Lim, Long Beach Seafood Market Inc., Oishi Supermarket, Inc., identifying Abacus Business Capital, Inc.. (Tan, Arnel)
September 5, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Unavailability of Defendants' Counsel filed by Defendants Azusa Supermarket, Inc., Fresno Supermarket Inc., Island Pacific Enterprises Inc., Island Pacific National City, Inc., Island Pacific Oxnard, Inc., Island Pacific Supermarkets, Inc., Kababayan Development, Inc., Nino Jefferson Lim, Long Beach Seafood Market Inc., Oishi Supermarket, Inc.. (Tan, Arnel)
September 5, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #45 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 10/15/2018 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 31, 2018 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Azusa Supermarket, Inc., Fresno Supermarket Inc., Island Pacific Enterprises Inc., Island Pacific National City, Inc., Island Pacific Oxnard, Inc., Island Pacific Supermarkets, Inc., Kababayan Development, Inc., Nino Jefferson Lim, Long Beach Seafood Market Inc., Oishi Supermarket, Inc..(Attorney Arnel O Tan added to party Azusa Supermarket, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Arnel O Tan added to party Fresno Supermarket Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Arnel O Tan added to party Island Pacific Enterprises Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Arnel O Tan added to party Island Pacific National City, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Arnel O Tan added to party Island Pacific Oxnard, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Arnel O Tan added to party Island Pacific Supermarkets, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Arnel O Tan added to party Kababayan Development, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Arnel O Tan added to party Nino Jefferson Lim(pty:dft), Attorney Arnel O Tan added to party Long Beach Seafood Market Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Arnel O Tan added to party Oishi Supermarket, Inc.(pty:dft))(Tan, Arnel)
August 20, 2018 Filing 44 IN CHAMBERS ONLY TEXT-ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Order to Show Cause, issued on 8/16/2018, is DISCHARGED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 17, 2018 Filing 43 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Order to Show Cause, #42 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC.(Dooley, Nathan)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below.Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than August 23, 2018 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. (pc)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 30, 2018 Filing 40 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC, upon Defendant Oishi Supermarket, Inc. served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 39 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC, upon Defendant Long Beach Seafood Market Inc. served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 38 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC, upon Defendant Kababayan Development, Inc. served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 37 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC, upon Defendant Island Pacific Supermarkets, Inc. served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 36 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC, upon Defendant Island Pacific Oxnard, Inc. served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 35 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC, upon Defendant Island Pacific National City, Inc. served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 34 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC, upon Defendant Island Pacific Enterprises Inc. served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 33 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC, upon Defendant Azusa Supermarket, Inc. served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 32 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC, upon Defendant Fresno Supermarket Inc. served on 7/25/2018, answer due 8/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 31 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC, upon Defendant Nino Jefferson Lim served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-05864 SVW(PJWx). (rn)
July 19, 2018 Filing 29 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Fresno Supermarket Inc.. (shb)
July 19, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Summons Issued #20 . The summons issued was missing the signature of the clerk. Another summons will be issued. (shb)
July 11, 2018 Filing 27 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Oishi Supermarket, Inc.. (shb)
July 11, 2018 Filing 26 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Long Beach Seafood Market Inc.. (shb)
July 11, 2018 Filing 25 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Kababayan Development, Inc.. (shb)
July 11, 2018 Filing 24 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Island Pacific Supermarkets, Inc.. (shb)
July 11, 2018 Filing 23 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Island Pacific Oxnard, Inc.. (shb)
July 11, 2018 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Island Pacific National City, Inc.. (shb)
July 11, 2018 Filing 21 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Island Pacific Enterprises Inc.. (shb)
July 11, 2018 Filing 20 [Summons re-issued see G-11 issued 7/19/2018] - 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Fresno Supermarket Inc.. (shb) Modified on 7/19/2018 (shb).
July 11, 2018 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Azusa Supermarket, Inc.. (shb)
July 11, 2018 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Nino Jefferson Lim. (shb)
July 10, 2018 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 10, 2018 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 10, 2018 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 10, 2018 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 10, 2018 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 10, 2018 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 10, 2018 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 10, 2018 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 10, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 10, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-cv-03529 ODW(MRWx) (rn)
July 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (et)
July 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-03529-ODW-MRW (Dooley, Nathan)
July 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying LEAF Commercial Capital Inc., People's United Financial Inc.. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 3, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC. (Dooley, Nathan)
July 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 07/03/2018, receipt number 26AOA2SN), filed by Plaintiff LEAF Capital Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15) (Attorney Nathan Dooley added to party LEAF Capital Funding, LLC(pty:pla))(Dooley, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEAF Capital Funding, LLC v. Nino Jefferson Lim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno Supermarket Inc.
Represented By: Arnel O Tan
Represented By: Claire N Espina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Pacific Supermarkets, Inc.
Represented By: Arnel O Tan
Represented By: Claire N Espina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Pacific Oxnard, Inc.
Represented By: Arnel O Tan
Represented By: Claire N Espina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Pacific National City, Inc.
Represented By: Arnel O Tan
Represented By: Claire N Espina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Beach Seafood Market Inc.
Represented By: Arnel O Tan
Represented By: Claire N Espina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Pacific Enterprises Inc.
Represented By: Arnel O Tan
Represented By: Claire N Espina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kababayan Development, Inc.
Represented By: Arnel O Tan
Represented By: Claire N Espina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nino Jefferson Lim
Represented By: Arnel O Tan
Represented By: Claire N Espina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azusa Supermarket, Inc.
Represented By: Arnel O Tan
Represented By: Claire N Espina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oishi Supermarket, Inc.
Represented By: Arnel O Tan
Represented By: Claire N Espina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEAF Capital Funding, LLC
Represented By: Nathan Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?