Jon Wright v. Ludwig
Plaintiff: Jon Wright
Defendant: LAPD Officer Ludwig
Case Number: 2:2018cv06150
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon.IT IS ORDERED that within 20 days from the date of this Order, plaintiff shall show cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. The filing of a First Amended Complaint within 20 days shall discharge the Order to Show Cause. (See document for details.) (sbou)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. If plaintiff still desires to pursue this action, he is ORDERED to file a First Amended Complaint no later than August 31, 2018, remedying the pleading deficiencies discussed above. In addition, if plaintiff no longer wishes to pursue this action, he may request a voluntary dismissal of the action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a). (See documents for further details.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (sbou)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE CIVIL RIGHTS CASE by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for pre-trial proceedings. All future pleadings shall be addressed to Ilene Bernal, Clerk to Magistrate Judge MacKinnon, United States Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. Until the complaint has been screened and the Court has ordered that service of process may occur, plaintiff may not proceed with service of process upon defendant(s). (See document for further details.) (sbou)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sbou)
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Jon Wright. (et)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jon Wright. (et)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Ludwig. Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon., filed by Plaintiff Jon Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jon Wright v. Ludwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAPD Officer Ludwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?