Karluk M. Mayweathers v. B.W. Evans et al
Petitioner: Karluk M. Mayweathers
Respondent: A. Laskowski, J Gastelo, B.W. Evans, T. Carminati and Mr P Noland
Case Number: 2:2018cv06487
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish re failure to comply with Court Order and Possible Dismissal. IT IS ORDERED as follows: If Plaintiff wishes this action to proceed, then by no later than October 5, 2018, he shall comply with the August 7 Order by filing a First Amended Complaint that is complete in itself, along with either a payment of the full filing fee or the documents required under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2) if he wishes to seek leave to proceed without prepayment of the full filing fee. (ec)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, ORDERING Letter to United States District Judge Labeled "First Amended Complaint" submitted by Petitioner Karluk M. Mayweathers received on 08/31/18 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: No letters to the judge; See document for further details. (sbou)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, ORDERING Random pleading page submitted by Petitioner Karluk M. Mayweathers received on 8/8/18 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Incomplete portion of a pleading. To amend his now-dismissed Complaint, Plaintiff must file a First Amended Complaint, pursuant to District Judge Gee's 8/7/18 Order [Dkt. 7]. (ec)
August 8, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Petitioner Karluk M. Mayweathers. (rn)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Denying #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, with leave to amend within 30 days. Plaintiff may re-submit the IFP application and Complaint to this Court, if submitted with the Certified Trust Account Statement and Disbursement Authorization. Plaintiff shall utilize the same case number. If plaintiff fails to submit the required documents within 30 days, this case shall be DISMISSED. IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. Reasons: Inadequate showing of indigency. Frivolous, malicious, or fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Failure to authorize disbursements from prison trust account to pay the filing fees. Failure to provide certified copy of trust fund statement for the last six months. (gk)
July 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa)
July 27, 2018 Filing 5 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
July 26, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Karluk M. Mayweathers. (Henshaw, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/27/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/26/2018 ORDERING CASE TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California. (Henshaw, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/27/2018.]
July 17, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Karluk M. Mayweathers. (Zignago, K.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/27/2018.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Zignago, K.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/27/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Karluk M. Mayweathers. (Zignago, K.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/27/2018.] Modified on 7/27/2018 (esa).
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Karluk M. Mayweathers. (Zignago, K.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/27/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karluk M. Mayweathers v. B.W. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karluk M. Mayweathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A. Laskowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J Gastelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B.W. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: T. Carminati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mr P Noland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?