Michele Ammons v. Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michele Ammons
Defendant: Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv06489
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL FRCP 16, 26(f) ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2018, at 1:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. See document for details. (smo)
September 5, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc., (Iglesias, Lawrence)
September 5, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc..(Attorney Lawrence K Iglesias added to party Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc.(pty:dft))(Iglesias, Lawrence)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Stipulation Extending defendant's Time to Answer complaint until 9/7/2018 #10 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
August 31, 2018 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc. answer now due 9/7/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michele Ammons. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brazier, Brian)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-06489 ODW(MAAx). (rn)
August 2, 2018 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michele Ammons, upon Defendant Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc. served on 8/1/2018, answer due 8/22/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cathy Prechard, designated by law to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brazier, Brian)
July 30, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc.. (lh)
July 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Michele Ammons. (Brazier, Brian)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michele Ammons, (Brazier, Brian)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michele Ammons. (Brazier, Brian)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22159777 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Michele Ammons. (Attorney Brian James Brazier added to party Michele Ammons(pty:pla))(Brazier, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michele Ammons v. Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence K Iglesias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Ammons
Represented By: Brian James Brazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?