Starr Indemnity and Liability Company v. APL Co. Pte Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive and APL Co. Pte Ltd
Case Number: 2:2018cv06653
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
2 Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 12 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to APL Co. Pte Ltd answer now due 10/10/2018, filed by Defendant APL Co. Pte Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marissen, James)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to APL Co. Pte Ltd answer now due 9/26/2018, filed by Defendant APL Co. Pte Ltd.(Marissen, James)
August 23, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:18-cv-06653 GW(MAAx). (rn)
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant APL Co. Pte Ltd. (Attorney James Arthur Henry Marissen added to party APL Co. Pte Ltd(pty:dft))(Marissen, James)
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity and Liability Company, upon Defendant APL Co. Pte Ltd served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent for Service of Process, CSC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cammarano, Dennis)
August 3, 2018 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant APL Co. Pte Ltd. (ghap)
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed) (ghap)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Cammarano, Dennis)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, (Cammarano, Dennis)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Cammarano, Dennis)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22192816 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Attorney Dennis A Cammarano added to party Starr Indemnity & Liability Company(pty:pla))(Cammarano, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company v. APL Co. Pte Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APL Co. Pte Ltd
Represented By: Rachel A Weitzman
Represented By: James Arthur Henry Marissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company
Represented By: Dennis A Cammarano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?