Luis Villegas v. Heavenly Mountain, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Luis Villegas
Defendant: Does 1-10, Heavenly Mountain, LLC and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv06716
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 20 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Heavenly Mountain, LLC (lc)
September 11, 2018 Filing 19 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Heavenly Mountain, LLC filed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Grace, Phyl)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL FRCP 16, 26(f) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2018, at 1:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. See document for details. (smo)
September 6, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): Wrong event and form used, the correct event is "Notice">"Notice of Lodging" and the correct form CV 11D form has to be attached. Please refer to General Order 12-01.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
September 5, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Cathy L Arias on behalf of Defendant Starbucks Corporation (Attorney Cathy L Arias added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Arias, Cathy)
September 5, 2018 Filing 15 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Zong, Julie)
September 5, 2018 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation identifying Starbucks Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Zong, Julie)
September 5, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, identifying Starbucks Corporation. (Zong, Julie)
September 5, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Starbucks Corporation Starbucks Corporation.(Attorney Julie Yin Zong added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Zong, Julie)
August 22, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas, upon Defendant Heavenly Mountain, LLC served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: MIRI PHIL RYU in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
August 20, 2018 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY,Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
August 8, 2018 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lom)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. See attached document for details. (lom)
August 7, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Heavenly Mountain, LLC, Starbucks Corporation. (car)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (car)
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Planitiff Luis Villegas. (Carson, Chris)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas, (Carson, Chris)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas. (Carson, Chris)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22202211 - Fee: $400, filed by Planitiff Luis Villegas. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Luis Villegas(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luis Villegas v. Heavenly Mountain, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heavenly Mountain, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Cathy L Arias
Represented By: Julie Yin Zong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Villegas
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?