Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. Aetna Life Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Aetna Life Insurance Co.
Case Number: 2:2018cv06829
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Cause of Action, Plaintiff's Second Cause of Action, Plaintiff's claim for punitive damages , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's First Cause of Action, Plaintiff's Second Cause of Action, Plaintiff's claim for punitive damages filed by Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Co.. Motion set for hearing on 11/9/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Ernster, Shannon)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Co., identifying 1.Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC, Plaintiff; 2.California Spine and Neurosurgery Institute, assignor of rights to Plaintiff; 3.Aetna Life Insurance Company, Defendant. (Ernster, Shannon)
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Aetna Life Insurance Co. answer now due 10/4/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Co..(Attorney Shannon Lissa Ernster added to party Aetna Life Insurance Co.(pty:dft))(Ernster, Shannon)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
August 9, 2018 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Co.. (lh)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC, (Stieglitz, Jonathan)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC. (Stieglitz, Jonathan)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22224556 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz added to party Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC(pty:pla))(Stieglitz, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. Aetna Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Shannon Lissa Ernster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?