Lisa Corson v. The Sunset Team, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Corson
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 and The Sunset Team, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv06927
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. upon The Sunset Team, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/24/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Brandon Stroy, Esq. - Maynard Cooper & Gale. (Doniger, Stephen)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant The Sunset Team, Inc. (esa)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Doniger, Stephen)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Lisa Corson. (Doniger, Stephen)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Doniger, Stephen)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson, (Doniger, Stephen)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22244890 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Lisa Corson(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisa Corson v. The Sunset Team, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sunset Team, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Corson
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Frank Gregory Casella
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?