Moldex-Metric, Inc. v. McKeon Products, Inc.

Plaintiff: Moldex-Metric, Inc.
Defendant: McKeon Products, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv06953
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Dale S Fischer
1 Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (dp)
September 24, 2018 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant McKeon Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Robert L Meylan added to party McKeon Products, Inc.(pty:dft))(Meylan, Robert)
August 21, 2018 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Moldex-Metric, Inc., upon Defendant McKeon Products, Inc. served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dan Asma Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Paunovich, Joseph)
August 20, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge John F. Walter, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-cv-03502 JFW(AGRx) (rn)
August 15, 2018 11 Featured Case STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dp)
August 15, 2018 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant McKeon Products, Inc. (ghap)
August 15, 2018 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 15, 2018 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap)
August 14, 2018 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Moldex-Metric, Inc. (Paunovich, Joseph)
August 14, 2018 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Moldex-Metric, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-03502-JFW (AGRx) (Paunovich, Joseph)
August 14, 2018 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Moldex-Metric, Inc.. (Paunovich, Joseph)
August 14, 2018 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Moldex-Metric, Inc., identifying Moldex-Metric, Inc.. (Paunovich, Joseph)
August 14, 2018 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Moldex-Metric, Inc.. (Paunovich, Joseph)
August 14, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Moldex-Metric, Inc.. (Paunovich, Joseph)
August 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22251275 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Moldex-Metric, Inc.. (Attorney Joseph M Paunovich added to party Moldex-Metric, Inc.(pty:pla))(Paunovich, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moldex-Metric, Inc. v. McKeon Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moldex-Metric, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M Paunovich
Represented By: Ali Moghaddas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKeon Products, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L Meylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?