Richard Baek et al v. John O. Halvorson et al
Plaintiff: Richard Baek, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC and Baek 153, LLC
Defendant: John O. Halvorson, PCC Fund 1, LLC, Jerry Ann Randall, JH RE Holdings LLC, Dan L. Halvorson, Commercial Income Advisors, Inc. and Granite Bay Partners II, LLC
Trustee: Weneta M.A. Kosmala
Case Number: 2:2018cv07046
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: James V Selna
2 Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 73 (IN CHAMBERS) The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the HEARING on Plaintiff's MOTION to: (1) Refer Action to Bankruptcy Court; and (2) Confirm and/or Substitute the Trustee as the Real Party in Interest #64 , previously scheduled for 10/15/2018 at 1:30 PM, to MONDAY, 10/22/2018 at 1:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 4, 2018 Filing 72 (IN CHAMBERS) The Court, having considered the Request for Clarification #71 , hereby WITHDRAWS the Order #70 entered 10/2/2018. The Court GRANTS the Request to file their 40 page brief filed on 9/24/2018 #66 . The Court reminds counsel that permission for filings that exceed page limits should be requested well in advance of the filings due date to avoid future issues with filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 3, 2018 Filing 71 REQUEST for Order for Clarification of Court's October 2, 2018 Order Granting Leave to Submit a Consolidated Brief in Excess of 25 Pages filed by Plaintiffs Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC. (Katzman, Steven)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 WITHDRAWN at 10/4/2018 72 - ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #66 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TOSUBMIT A CONSOLIDATED BRIEF IN EXCESS OF 25 PAGES. IT IS ORDERED: 1. The Application is granted. 2. The Plaintiffs are permitted to file a consolidated brief with a memorandum of points and authorities not to exceed thirty pages in length. (es) Modified on 10/4/2018 (kt). Modified on 10/4/2018 (kt).
October 1, 2018 Filing 69 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Referral of The Action Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion to: (1) Refer Action to Bankruptcy Court; and (2) Confirm and/or Substitute the Trustee as the Real Party in Interest; Declaration of Jeffrey I. Golden in Suppor #64 Joinder in Chapter 7 Trustee's Reply and Reply to Plaintiffs' Consolidation Opposition to: Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion for Order (1) Referring Action to Bankruptcy Court; and (2) Confirming and/or Substituting the Trustee as the Real Party in Interest; and "Joinder" in Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion for Order filed by Defendants Dan L. Halvorson, Jerry Ann Randall. (Bowie, Peter)
October 1, 2018 Filing 68 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Referral of The Action Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion to: (1) Refer Action to Bankruptcy Court; and (2) Confirm and/or Substitute the Trustee as the Real Party in Interest; Declaration of Jeffrey I. Golden in Suppor #64 Chapter 7 Trustee's Reply to Consolidated Opposition to Motion for Order: (1) Referring Action to Bankruptcy Court; and (2) Confirming and/or Substituting the Trustee as the Real Party in Interest filed by Trustee Weneta M.A. Kosmala. (Attorney Jeffrey Ian Golden added to party Weneta M.A. Kosmala(pty:trust))(Golden, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2018 Filing 67 Consolidated Opposition in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Referral of The Action Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion to: (1) Refer Action to Bankruptcy Court; and (2) Confirm and/or Substitute the Trustee as the Real Party in Interest; Declaration of Jeffrey I. Golden in Suppor #64 and Dan Halvorson and Jerry Ann Randall's Joinder [Dkt. 65] filed by Plaintiffs Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ali Matin)(Attorney Thomas H Bienert, Jr added to party Richard Baek(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas H Bienert, Jr added to party Baek 153, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas H Bienert, Jr added to party Pacific Commercial Group, LLC(pty:pla))(Bienert, Thomas)
September 24, 2018 Filing 66 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation for Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Trustee's Motion re Referral to Bankruptcy Court and Substitution, and Joinder filed by Plaintiffs Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Matin, Ali)
September 14, 2018 Filing 65 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Referral of The Action Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion to: (1) Refer Action to Bankruptcy Court; and (2) Confirm and/or Substitute the Trustee as the Real Party in Interest; Declaration of Jeffrey I. Golden in Suppor #64 filed by Defendants Dan L. Halvorson, Jerry Ann Randall. (Bowie, Peter)
September 14, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Referral of The Action Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion to: (1) Refer Action to Bankruptcy Court; and (2) Confirm and/or Substitute the Trustee as the Real Party in Interest; Declaration of Jeffrey I. Golden in Support Thereof (with Proof of Service) filed by Plaintiff Weneta M.A. Kosmala. Motion set for hearing on 10/15/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attorney Reem J Bello added to party Weneta M.A. Kosmala(pty:trust)) (Bello, Reem)
August 27, 2018 Filing 63 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:17-cv-02024 JVS. Case transferred from Judge Otis D. Wright, II to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-07046 JVS(RAOx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna (rn)
August 15, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Dan L. Halvorson. Related Case(s): 8:18-cv-00519-JVS; 8:18-cv-00520-JVS; 8:18-cv-00525-JVS; 8:18-cv-00528-JVS; 8:15-BK-13556-MV; 8:15-ap-01391-MW (Bowie, Peter)
August 15, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 15, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car)
August 15, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 2:15-cv-01425-WBS-DB, from U.S. District Court Eastern District of California (Sacramento). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:18-cv-07046-ODW-RAOx. (car)
August 15, 2018 Filing 57 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/10/18, ORDERING that the Trustee's #39 Motion for Changing Venue, which the answering defendants have joined, is GRANTED. Case TRANSFERRED to the Central District of California. All other currently pending motions #17 , #18 are MOOT. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 55 REPLY by Weneta M.A. Kosmala re #52 Statement. (Golden, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 54 REPLY by Dan L. Halvorson, Jerry Ann Randall re #52 Statement. (Bowie, Peter) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Weneta M.A. Kosmala for proceedings held on 08/06/2018 before Judge Hon. William Shubb. Court Reporter Kacy Barajas. (Golden, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 52 STATEMENT of Letter re Case Law re August 6, 2018 Hearing by Plaintiffs Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC re #51 Transcript,, 49 Motion Hearing. (Matin, Ali) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Re: Hearing on Motions held on August 6, 2018, before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, filed by Court Reporter Kacy Barajas, Phone number 916-426-7640 E-mail kbarajas.csr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 8/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2018. (Barajas, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 50 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC for proceedings held on August 6, 2018 before Judge William Shubb. Court Reporter Kacy Barajas. (Katzman, Steven) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 49 MINUTES (Text Only) by Relief Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for MOTION HEARING proceedings before Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/6/2018. All parties present. The Court and counsel discussed the pending #17 Motion for Stay, #18 Motion for Order, and #39 Motion to Substitute and Motion to Change Venue. Matter submitted. Court order to issue. Plaintiffs Counsel Kyle Kveton and Steven Katzman present. Defendants Counsel Peter Bowie, Christopher Celentino, and Jeff Golden present. Court Reporter: Kacy Barajas. (Anderson, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 48 REPLY by Weneta M.A. Kosmala re #46 Opposition to Motion. (Golden, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 47 REPLY by Dan L. Halvorson, Jerry Ann Randall re #46 Opposition to Motion. (Bowie, Peter) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 46 OPPOSITION by Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC to #39 Motion to Substitute and Motion to Change Venue. (Kveton, Kyle) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 45 JOINDER by Dan L. Halvorson, Jerry Ann Randall in re #39 Motion to Substitute and Motion to Change Venue filed by Weneta M.A. Kosmala. (Bowie, Peter) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
June 13, 2018 Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Re: Hearing on Motions held on June 11, 2018, before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, filed by Court Reporter Kacy Barajas, Phone number 916-426-7640 E-mail kbarajas.csr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 7/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2018. (Barajas, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 43 AUDIO RECORDING REQUEST by Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC for proceedings held on 6/11/218 before Judge William B. Shubb. (Katzman, Steven) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 42 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC for proceedings held on 6/11/2018 before Judge William B. Shubb. Court Reporter Kacy Barajas. (Katzman, Steven) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 41 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: MOTION HEARING held on 6/11/2018 re #17 Plaintiffs' Motion for Stay Relief to Voluntarily Dismiss Non-Answering Defendants and #18 Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Confirm the Validity of This Court's Prior Orders and to Enforce Such Orders. Counsel argue. Court continues #17 , #18 Motions Hearing to 8/6/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Plaintiffs' Counsel Steven Katzman, Kyle Kveton present. Defendants' Counsel Christopher Celentino, Peter Bowie present. Trustee's Counsel Jeffrey Golden present. Court Reporter: Kacy Barajas. (Kirksey Smith, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 40 SUPPLEMENT by Weneta M.A. Kosmala re #29 Opposition to Motion. (Golden, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION to SUBSTITUTE Trustee as Real Party in Interest, MOTION to CHANGE VENUE to the United States District Court Central District of California by Weneta M.A. Kosmala. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Golden, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/8/2018 (Kirksey Smith, K). Modifi [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 38 REPLY by Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC re #16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #18 Motion for Order, #17 Motion for Stay. (Attachments: #1 Objections to Declaration of Caron Burke, #2 Proof of Service)(Matin, Ali) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of LODGING re Order to Show Cause Issuance by Bankruptcy Court by Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order to Show Cause, #2 Proof of Service)(Katzman, Steven) Modified on 6/5/2018 (Kaminski, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/4/2018 DENYING Weneta Kosmala's Requests for Continuance #19 , #34 . (Kirksey Smith, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 35 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiffs Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC to #34 Request. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service)(Katzman, Steven) Modified on 6/4/2018 (Kaminski, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 34 REQUEST for CONTINUANCE of hearing by Weneta M.A. Kosmala re #16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #18 Motion for Order, #17 Motion for Stay. (Golden, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/4/2018 (Kaminski, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kyle Kveton on behalf of Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC. Attorney Kveton, Kyle added. (Kveton, Kyle) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/1/2018 DENYING #31 Debtor John O. Halvorson attorney's Motion to Appear Telephonically. (Kirksey Smith, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
May 30, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION to APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY re #17 and #18 Motions by John O. Halvorson. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Forsythe, Marc) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
May 30, 2018 Filing 30 JOINDER in #29 Opposition by Dan L. Halvorson, Jerry Ann Randall in. (Bowie, Peter) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 29 OPPOSITION by Weneta M.A. Kosmala to #18 Motion for Order, #17 Motion for Stay. (Golden, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 28 OPPOSITION by Dan L. Halvorson, Jerry Ann Randall to #18 Motion for Order, #17 Motion for Stay. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Celentino, Christopher) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/25/2018 re #26 Attorney Mark Forsythe's MOTION to Appear Telephonically at the 6/11/2018 motions hearing: No opposition has yet been filed regarding those motions. The court wishes to reserve decision on counsel's request to appear telephonically until after any opposition to the underlying motions has been filed. Counsel is directed to re-submit his request after the opposition has been filed. (Kirksey Smith, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY re #17 and #18 Motions by John O. Halvorson. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Forsythe, Marc) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Steven J. Katzman on behalf of Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC. Attorney Katzman, Steven J. added. (Katzman, Steven) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 24 JOINDER in #23 Notice by Dan L. Halvorson, Jerry Ann Randall (Bowie, Peter) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of AUTOMATIC STAY Pursuant to 11 U.S.C Section 362 by Weneta M.A. Kosmala (Golden, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 22 OPPOSITION by Plaintiffs Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC to #19 Motion to Continue, #20 Joinder. (Matin, Ali) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Peter W Bowie on behalf of Dan L. Halvorson, Jerry Ann Randall. Attorney Bowie, Peter W added. (Bowie, Peter) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 20 JOINDER in #19 Motion for Continuance by Dan L. Halvorson, Jerry Ann Randall in. Attorney Celentino, Christopher added. (Celentino, Christopher) Modified on 5/21/2018 (Benson, A.). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to CONTINUE Hearing re #18 Motion for Order, MOTION to STAY by Weneta M.A. Kosmala. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Attorney Golden, Jeffrey added. (Golden, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/21/2018 (York, M). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for ORDER to Confirm the Validity of This Court's Prior Orders and to Enforce Such Orders re #13 Notice of Removal, by Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Matin, Ali) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for STAY RELIEF to Voluntarily Dismiss Non-Answering Defendants re #16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Matin, Ali) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC. Attorney Matin, Ali added. (Matin, Ali) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill: Due to the appointment of *Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes* to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from *Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman* to Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes for all further proceedings. (Donati, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the elevation of Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd to the position of District Judge, this action is temporarily assigned to *Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman*. (Donati, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
October 21, 2015 Filing 13 [DISREGARD- ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO INITIATE NEW ACTION] NOTICE of REMOVAL to U.S. Bankruptcy Court - Central District of California, Santa Ana Division (case # 8:15-AP-01391-MW) by all defendants. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6135914) (Gaschen, Beth) Modified on 10/22/2015 (Marciel, M) [FILING FEE REFUNDED on 10/30/2015] Modified on 10/30/2015 (Donati, J). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/09/15 ORDERING that all proceedings in this action are STAYED pending the resolution of the Bankruptcy Proceedings, or until the Court lifts the stay; all dates and deadlines currently pending in the action are VACATED. The Court will hold a new Status Conference after resolution of the Bankruptcy Proceedings until the Court lifts the stay. Case stayed (Benson, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
October 9, 2015 Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Stay Pending Resolution of Bankruptcy Proceedings by Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC. (Perez, Phillip) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
October 8, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE of FILING BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Weneta M.A. Kosmala (Gaschen, Beth) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
September 16, 2015 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement by Richard Baek, Baek 153, LLC, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC. (Perez, Phillip) Modified on 9/17/2015 (Kaminski, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
August 10, 2015 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 First Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand, by Dan L. Halvorson, Jerry Ann Randall. Attorney Cabrera, Guillermo ADDED. (Cabrera, Guillermo) Modified on 8/11/2015 (Michel, G.). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
July 20, 2015 Filing 7 AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by John O. Halvorson. (Forsythe, Marc) Modified on 7/22/2015 (Michel, G.). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
July 20, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by John O. Halvorson. (Forsythe, Marc) Modified on 7/22/2015 (Michel, G.). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
July 14, 2015 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commercial Income Advisors, Inc., Granite Bay Partners II, LLC, JH Re Holdings, LLC, PCC Fund 1, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Phillip Allan Trajan Perez* *MILLER NASH GRAHAM & DUNN, LLP* *100 Oceangate, Suite 300* *Long Beach, CA 90802*. (Michel, G.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
July 13, 2015 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dan L. Halvorson, John O. Halvorson, Jerry Ann Randall, PCC Fund 1, LLC, Granite Bay Partners II, LLC, JH Re Holdings, LLC, Commercial Income Advisors, Inc. by Richard Baek, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC, Baek 153, LLC.(Perez, Phillip) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
July 6, 2015 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/26/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kaminski, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
July 6, 2015 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Dan L. Halvorson, John O. Halvorson, Jerry Ann Randall* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Phillip Allan Trajan Perez* *Graham & Dunn* *100 Oceangate, Suite 300* *Long Beach, CA 90802*. (Kaminski, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
July 6, 2015 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-5970165. (Perez, Phillip) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]
July 2, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Richard Baek, Pacific Commercial Group, LLC, Baek 153, LLC. Attorney Perez, Phillip Allan Trajan added. (Filing fee $ 400) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perez, Phillip) Modified on 7/6/2015 (Kaminski, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/15/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Baek et al v. John O. Halvorson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Weneta M.A. Kosmala
Represented By: Beth E Gaschen
Represented By: Jeffrey Golden
Represented By: Reem J Bello
Represented By: Jeffrey Ian Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Baek
Represented By: Steven Jay Katzman
Represented By: Ali Matin
Represented By: Phillip Allan Trajan Perez
Represented By: Kyle Kveton
Represented By: Thomas H Bienert, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Commercial Group, LLC
Represented By: Steven Jay Katzman
Represented By: Ali Matin
Represented By: Phillip Allan Trajan Perez
Represented By: Kyle Kveton
Represented By: Thomas H Bienert, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baek 153, LLC
Represented By: Steven Jay Katzman
Represented By: Ali Matin
Represented By: Phillip Allan Trajan Perez
Represented By: Kyle Kveton
Represented By: Thomas H Bienert, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John O. Halvorson
Represented By: Marc C Forsythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCC Fund 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Ann Randall
Represented By: Peter W Bowie
Represented By: Guillermo Cabrera
Represented By: Christopher Celentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JH RE Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan L. Halvorson
Represented By: Peter W Bowie
Represented By: Guillermo Cabrera
Represented By: Christopher Celentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Income Advisors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Bay Partners II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?