Luis Landeros Castro v. On Habeas Corpus
Petitioner: Luis Landeros Castro
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Case Number: 2:2018cv07439
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SUMMARILY DISMISSING PETITION AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS ORDERED that (1) the Petition is dismissed without prejudice; and (2) a certificate of appealability is denied. (See document for further details.) Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (sbou)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV38 Letter re Habeas Corpus Transfer-in) (et)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/23/2018. (Hellings, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/24/2018.]
August 24, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Luis Landeros Castro. (Hellings, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/24/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Luis Landeros Castro. (Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/24/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against On Habeas Corpus by Luis Landeros Castro.(Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/24/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luis Landeros Castro v. On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luis Landeros Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?