Rebecca Reutter v. Hartford Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: REBECCA REUTTER, individually and as Trustee of the KIRK REUTTER FAMILY TRUST and Rebecca Reutter
Defendant: Omnicare, Inc., CVSHEALTH, Hartford Life Insurance Company and UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv07492
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Charles Kelechi Chineduh on behalf of Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Attorney Charles Kelechi Chineduh added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Chineduh, Charles)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION #49 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The administrative record shall be lodged by 6/21/2019. (vdr)
May 30, 2019 Filing 49 Joint STIPULATION for Order to Extend Time to Lodge the Administrative Record filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Horn, Heather)
May 10, 2019 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, identifying Rebecca Reutter, individually and as Trustee of the Kirk Reutter Family Trust; and Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Horn, Heather)
May 10, 2019 Filing 47 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #38 filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Blohm, Nicole)
April 9, 2019 Filing 46 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #38 filed by Defendant Hartford Life Insurance Company.(Nalty, Sean)
April 9, 2019 Filing 45 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America answer now due 5/10/2019, re Amended Complaint #38 filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Heather E Horn added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Horn, Heather)
April 3, 2019 Filing 44 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #38 filed by Defendants CVSHEALTH, Omnicare, Inc..(Srsic, Daniel)
April 2, 2019 Filing 43 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rebecca Reutter, upon Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 3/21/2019, answer due 4/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent, by serving Becky Degeorge - Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kassan, Alan)
March 19, 2019 Filing 42 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint #38 as to Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (iv)
March 15, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #39 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). Summons is addressed to Unum Life Insurance Company of America, which is not a named defendant on the First Amended Complaint. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (iv)
March 14, 2019 Filing 40 First Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rebecca Reutter, (Kassan, Alan)
March 14, 2019 Filing 39 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint #38 filed by Plaintiff Rebecca Reutter. (Kassan, Alan)
March 13, 2019 Filing 38 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Defendant CVSHEALTH, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Omnicare, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Rebecca Reutter. (iv)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION #34 FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is deemed to be filed as of the date of this order. Defendants shall file responsive pleadings within 21 days of the date of this order. (iv)
March 11, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file File First Amended Complaint #34 filed by Defendant Hartford Life Insurance Company. (Nalty, Sean)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #33 Non-Resident Attorney Daniel W. Srsic APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants CVSHEALTH and Omnicare, Inc, designating Carlos Jimenez as local counsel. (lt)
March 1, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Rebecca Reutter. Motion set for hearing on 4/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Leave To File First Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration Of Alan E. Kassan In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To File First Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order) (Kassan, Alan)
February 25, 2019 Filing 33 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel W. Srsic to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants CVSHEALTH, Omnicare, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23271234) filed by Defendants CVSHEALTH, Omnicare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Carlos Jimenez added to party CVSHEALTH(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Jimenez added to party Omnicare, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Jimenez, Carlos)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: denying #26 Non-Resident Attorney Daniel W. Srsic APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants CVSHEALTH and Omnicare, Inc. Pursuant to Local Ruyle 83-2.1.3.4; Local Counsel does not maintain an office in the District. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the pro hac vice application fee, if paid, be refunded. (lt)
February 4, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION to Supplement Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel W. Srsic to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants CVSHEALTH, Omnicare, Inc. (Pro Hac Vic #28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Case number is incorrect or missing. Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lt)
February 4, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel W. Srsic to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants CVSHEALTH, Omnicare, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23118069) #26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
February 4, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel W. Srsic to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants CVSHEALTH, Omnicare, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23118069) #26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
February 4, 2019 Filing 28 SUPPLEMENT TO APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel W. Srsic to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants CVSHEALTH, Omnicare, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23118069) #26 Certificate of Good Standing filed by Defendants CVSHEALTH, Omnicare, Inc.. (Iskander, Gregory) Modified on 2/4/2019 (vdr).
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION #25 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for continued deadlines.* (vdr)
January 29, 2019 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel W. Srsic to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants CVSHEALTH, Omnicare, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23118069) filed by Defendant CVSHEALTH, Omnicare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Iskander, Gregory)
January 18, 2019 Filing 25 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Case Deadlines from Various Dates to Various Dates Re: Order #14 filed by Defendants CVSHEALTH, Omnicare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Renee Cheryl Snyder Feldman added to party CVSHEALTH(pty:dft), Attorney Renee Cheryl Snyder Feldman added to party Omnicare, Inc.(pty:dft))(Feldman, Renee)
November 20, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Administrative Record re Order #14 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nalty, Sean)
October 31, 2018 Filing 23 Certification And Notice of Interested Parties NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CVSHEALTH, identifying Omnicare, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Iskander, Gregory)
October 31, 2018 Filing 22 Certificate And Notice of Interested Parties NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Omnicare, Inc., identifying CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Iskander, Gregory)
October 30, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hartford Life Insurance Company, identifying Hartford Life, Inc.; Hartford Holdings, Inc.; The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Nalty, Sean)
October 29, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answers #18 and #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Compliance with Local Rule 7.1-1 for is required no later than 10/31/2018, or the answers may be stricken. (vdr)
October 26, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants CVSHEALTH, Omnicare, Inc..(Iskander, Gregory)
October 26, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Hartford Life Insurance Company.(Nalty, Sean)
October 22, 2018 Filing 17 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to CVSHEALTH answer now due 10/26/2018; Omnicare, Inc. answer now due 10/26/2018, filed by Defendants CVSHEALTH; Omnicare, Inc..(Iskander, Gregory)
October 12, 2018 Filing 16 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hartford Life Insurance Company answer now due 10/26/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant Hartford Life Insurance Company.(Nalty, Sean)
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to CVSHEALTH answer now due 10/22/2018; Omnicare, Inc. answer now due 10/22/2018, filed by Defendants CVSHEALTH; Omnicare, Inc..(Attorney Gregory G Iskander added to party CVSHEALTH(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory G Iskander added to party Omnicare, Inc.(pty:dft))(Iskander, Gregory)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for deadlines and requirements.* (cw)
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hartford Life Insurance Company answer now due 10/12/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Hartford Life Insurance Company.(Attorney Sean P Nalty added to party Hartford Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Nalty, Sean)
October 2, 2018 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-07492 FMO(PLAx). (rn)
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rebecca Reutter, upon Defendant Omnicare, Inc. served on 9/16/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Plan Administrator, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kassan, Alan)
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rebecca Reutter, upon Defendant CVSHEALTH served on 9/16/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Plan Administrator, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kassan, Alan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rebecca Reutter, upon Defendant Hartford Life Insurance Company served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kassan, Alan)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants CVSHEALTH, Hartford Life Insurance Company, Omnicare, Inc. (jp)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (jp)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff REBECCA REUTTER, individually and as Trustee of the KIRK REUTTER FAMILY TRUST, (Kassan, Alan)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff REBECCA REUTTER, individually and as Trustee of the KIRK REUTTER FAMILY TRUST. (Kassan, Alan)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff REBECCA REUTTER, individually and as Trustee of the KIRK REUTTER FAMILY TRUST. (Kassan, Alan)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22322184 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff REBECCA REUTTER, individually and as Trustee of the KIRK REUTTER FAMILY TRUST. (Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party REBECCA REUTTER, individually and as Trustee of the KIRK REUTTER FAMILY TRUST(pty:pla))(Kassan, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rebecca Reutter v. Hartford Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnicare, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory G Iskander
Represented By: Carlos Jimenez
Represented By: Daniel W Srsic
Represented By: Renee Cheryl Snyder Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVSHEALTH
Represented By: Gregory G Iskander
Represented By: Carlos Jimenez
Represented By: Daniel W Srsic
Represented By: Renee Cheryl Snyder Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Sean P Nalty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Charles Kelechi Chineduh
Represented By: Nicole Y Blohm
Represented By: Heather E Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA REUTTER, individually and as Trustee of the KIRK REUTTER FAMILY TRUST
Represented By: Alan E Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Reutter
Represented By: Alan E Kassan
Represented By: Glenn R Kantor
Represented By: Mitchell O Hefter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?