Techtop Industries, Inc. v. De Well Container Shipping, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Techtop Industries, Inc.
Defendant: De Well Container Shipping, Inc., Maersk Line A/S and Maersk Line A S
Case Number: 2:2018cv07584
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Maersk Line A S, identifying Techtop Industries, Inc.; De Well Container Shipping, Inc.; Maersk Line A/S. (Moghaddam, B)
October 25, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Maersk Line A S.(Moghaddam, B)
October 18, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Crossclaim, #15 , CROSSCLAIM against Maersk Line A S filed by Defendant and Cross-Claimant De Well Container Shipping, Inc..(Arenas, Paul)
October 18, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS #17 RE: Answer and Crossclaim, #15 by Clerk of Court. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by October 19, 2018. (bm)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to, Crossclaim #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of attached document should also include the counterclaim caption In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
October 9, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant and Cross-claimant De Well Container Shipping, Inc., identifying Shanghai De Well Container Transport Co. Ltd.. (Arenas, Paul)
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 10/18/18, DOCUMENT #19 . ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 and, CROSSCLAIM against Maersk Line A S filed by Defendant and Corss-claimant De Well Container Shipping, Inc..(Attorney Paul B Arenas added to party De Well Container Shipping, Inc.(pty:dft))(Arenas, Paul) Modified on 10/18/2018 (bm).
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Maersk Line A S answer now due 10/25/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Maersk Line A S.(Attorney B Alexander Moghaddam added to party Maersk Line A S(pty:dft))(Moghaddam, B)
September 24, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to De Well Container Shipping, Inc. answer now due 10/9/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Techtop Industries, Inc..(Ou, Chih)
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Techtop Industries, Inc., upon Defendant De Well Container Shipping, Inc. served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Soon K Choi - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ou, Chih)
September 10, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Techtop Industries, Inc., upon Defendant Maersk Line A S served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Demonte - CT Corporation System - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ou, Chih)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cw)
August 31, 2018 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant De Well Container Shipping, Inc. (ghap)
August 31, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Maersk Line A S. (ghap)
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Techtop Industries, Inc., identifying Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. DC1603019. (Ou, Chih)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Techtop Industries, Inc.. (Ou, Chih)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Techtop Industries, Inc.. (Ou, Chih)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Techtop Industries, Inc.. (Ou, Chih)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22343178 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Techtop Industries, Inc.. (Attorney Chih Yu Ou added to party Techtop Industries, Inc.(pty:pla))(Ou, Chih)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Techtop Industries, Inc. v. De Well Container Shipping, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Techtop Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Chih Yu Ou
Represented By: G Geoffrey Robb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Well Container Shipping, Inc.
Represented By: Paul B Arenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maersk Line A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maersk Line A S
Represented By: B Alexander Moghaddam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?