3015327 Canada Inc. v. Sale Co Enterprises LLC et al

Plaintiff: 3015327 Canada Inc.
Defendant: Warner Wheeler Henry Revocable Trust, Henry Huntington Park Parcel 1 LLC, Sale Co Enterprises, LLC, Does 1 through 8, inclusive and Paul J. Livadrary
Petitioner: 3015327 dba Blankets & Beyond, Paul J. Livadrary, successor trustee of the Warner W. Henry Family Trust and Sale Co Enterprises, LLC a California limited liability company
Case Number: 2:2018cv07676
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2018 23 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff 3015327 Canada Inc., re Amended Complaint/Petition, #15 AMENDED COMPLAINT served on 10/16/2018. (Brown, Adam)
October 31, 2018 22 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff 3015327 Canada Inc., re Amended Complaint/Petition, #15 AMENDED COMPLAINT served on 10/16/2018. (Brown, Adam)
October 31, 2018 21 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff 3015327 Canada Inc., re Amended Complaint/Petition, #15 AMENDED COMPLAINT served on 10/24/2018. (Brown, Adam)
October 31, 2018 20 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff 3015327 Canada Inc., re Amended Complaint/Petition, #15 AMENDED COMPLAINT served on 10/16/2018. (Brown, Adam)
October 17, 2018 19 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff 3015327 Canada Inc., upon Defendant Sale Co Enterprises, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Sid Salehpous, Agent for Defendant Sale Co Enterprises, Agent and Manager. (Brown, Adam)
October 12, 2018 18 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Paul J. Livadrary.(Attorney Kevin L Place added to party Paul J. Livadrary(pty:dft))(Place, Kevin)
October 9, 2018 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #15 as to All Defendants. (sbou)
October 8, 2018 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #15 , Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form #4 filed by Plaintiff 3015327 Canada Inc.. (Brown, Adam)
October 8, 2018 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Sale Co. Enterprises LLC, Paul J. Livadrary, successor trustee of the Warner W. Henry Family Trust B dated June 24, 1969; Warner Wheeler Henry Revocable Trust; Henry Huntington Park Parcel 1 LLC; and Does 1 through 8 inclusive All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff 3015327 Canada Inc.(Brown, Adam)
October 3, 2018 14 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sale Co Enterprises, LLC answer now due 11/13/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff 3015327 Canada Inc..(Brown, Adam)
October 3, 2018 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff 3015327 Canada Inc., upon Defendant Sale Co Enterprises, LLC served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe, person in charge for Sid Reza Salehpour, Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brown, Adam)
October 3, 2018 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff 3015327 Canada Inc., upon Defendant Paul J. Livadrary served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Luis Leyva, Employee of Defendant Paul J. Livadrary in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brown, Adam)
September 10, 2018 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #7 , Summons Request, #6 . The following error(s) was found: Duplicate request as to Defendant Sale Co Enterprises LLC. (sbou)
September 10, 2018 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Paul J. Livadrary. (sbou)
September 10, 2018 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Sale Co Enterprises, LLC. (sbou)
September 10, 2018 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form #4 filed by Plaintiff 3015327 Canada Inc.. (Brown, Adam)
September 7, 2018 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form #4 filed by Plaintiff 3015327 Canada Inc.. (Brown, Adam)
September 7, 2018 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form #4 filed by Plaintiff 3015327 Canada Inc.. (Brown, Adam)
September 6, 2018 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (In Chambers) by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams under the Civil Consent Pilot Project. The parties are reminded to review the time requirements for consent set forth in the Notice to Counsel that was issued at the time of the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff is instructed to forthwith serve a copy of this Order on all parties that have already been served with the summons and complaint, or to serve all parties with a copy of this Order at the time of service of the summons and complaint. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 5, 2018 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (car)
September 4, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff 3015327 dba Blankets & Beyond, identifying 3015327 Canada Inc., a Canadian corporation. (Brown, Adam)
September 4, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant 3015327 dba Blankets & Beyond. (Brown, Adam)
September 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22361717 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff 3015327 dba Blankets & Beyond. (Attorney Adam C Brown added to party 3015327 dba Blankets & Beyond(pty:bkmov))(Brown, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 3015327 Canada Inc. v. Sale Co Enterprises LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 3015327 dba Blankets & Beyond
Represented By: Adam C Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul J. Livadrary, successor trustee of the Warner W. Henry Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sale Co Enterprises, LLC a California limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Wheeler Henry Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Huntington Park Parcel 1 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sale Co Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 8, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J. Livadrary
Represented By: Kevin L Place
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3015327 Canada Inc.
Represented By: Adam C Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?