Francis Richard Manzano v. Linda Margaret Larsen et al

Plaintiff: Francis Richard Manzano
Defendant: Raymond Wade Larsen, Michael Francis Scott Larsen, Linda Margaret Larsen and DOES 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv07831
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: R Gary Klausner
1 Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for December 17, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/10/2018. (sw)
September 12, 2018 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Linda Margaret Larsen, Michael Francis Scott Larsen, Raymond Wade Larsen, identifying John Scott Manzano. (Lyon, David)
September 12, 2018 7 Featured Case STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
September 11, 2018 6 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action filed by Defendants Linda Margaret Larsen, Michael Francis Scott Larsen, Raymond Wade Larsen. (Lyon, David)
September 11, 2018 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil)
September 11, 2018 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 11, 2018 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
September 7, 2018 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Linda Margaret Larsen, Michael Francis Scott Larsen, and Raymond Wade Larsen in Los Angeles Superior Court, attached as Exhibit D. (jtil)
September 7, 2018 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Francis Richard Manzano in Los Angeles Superior Court on 6/29/2018, attached as Exhibit B.(jtil)
September 7, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Linda Margaret Larsen, Michael Francis Scott Larsen, Raymond Wade Larsen. (Lyon, David)
September 7, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court North Central District, case number EC068583 Receipt No: 0973-22387317 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Raymond Wade Larsen, Michael Francis Scott Larsen, Linda Margaret Larsen. (Attorney David Jason Lyon added to party Linda Margaret Larsen(pty:dft), Attorney David Jason Lyon added to party Michael Francis Scott Larsen(pty:dft), Attorney David Jason Lyon added to party Raymond Wade Larsen(pty:dft))(Lyon, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis Richard Manzano v. Linda Margaret Larsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Wade Larsen
Represented By: David Jason Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Francis Scott Larsen
Represented By: David Jason Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Margaret Larsen
Represented By: David Jason Lyon
Represented By: Rita Maria Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Richard Manzano
Represented By: James V Kosnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?