Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd. v. Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd., et al

Plaintiff: Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., LTD.
Defendant: Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv07873
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Maria A Audero
1 Judge: S James Otero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 22 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge S. James Otero. The Court Orders that cases CV 18-05847 SJO (MAAx) Starr Indemnity and LiabilityCompany v. Apex Maritime Co., Inc. et al and CV 18-07873 SJO (MAAx) MitsuiSumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd. v. Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd., et al, shall be consolidated for all purposes pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42. The lower numbered case, CV 18-05847 SJO (MAAx) Starr Indemnity and Liability Company v. Apex Maritime Co., Inc. et al, is hereby designated the Master File. All documents filed hereafter shall bear the names and numbers of both the original action and the Master File. The name and number of the Master File will always appear above the name and number of the original file. The Court sets the following schedule: Jury Trial: Tuesday, September 24, 2019 9:00 a.m.Pretrial Conference: Tuesday, September 16, 2019 9:00 a.m. Motion Cutoff: Monday, July 22, 2019 10:00 a.m.Discovery Cutoff: Monday, June 24, 2019.Last Date to Amend: Not set. Reference of the above case to the Alternative Dispute Resolution Program is vacated. Settlement is referred to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings.All discovery disputes are to be brought before the Magistrate Judge assigned to the case. Parties reminded of requirements of FRCP 26-1(a); counsel are advised all pretrial documents (as listed) must be filed in compliance with Courts Initial Standing order. Court Reporter: Carol Zurborg. (lc)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 21 ORDER by Judge S. James Otero, GRANTING Stipulation for Order Advancing Scheduling Conference #19 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference in this matter is advanced to October 29, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. (shb)
October 3, 2018 20 NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL filed by Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd.. (Chung, Janet)
October 3, 2018 19 Joint STIPULATION for Order ADVANCING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE filed by Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chung, Janet)
October 2, 2018 18 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd... (Chung, Janet)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge S. James Otero. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/19/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 16 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
September 24, 2018 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Cormac J. Carney. Effective October 9, 2018, Judge Cormac J. Carney will be located in the First Street U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 7C, on the 7th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 7C of the First Street U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All required mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered and placed in the drop box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the First Street Courthouse. Judge Carney's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Melissa H. Kunig, may be reached at (714) 338-2849.The location for filing civil and/or criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing is at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180, Los Angeles, California 90012. Documents under this exemption may also be filed in the Santa Ana or Riverside courthouses.Please refer to Judge Carney's Procedures & Schedules Page on the Court's website **UPDATED AS OF SEPTEMBER 24, 2018** for updated procedures regarding mandatory chambers copies. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-05847 SJO(MAAx). Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal to Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-07873 SJO(MAAx). Signed by Judge S. James Otero (rn)
September 21, 2018 13 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd., (Cammarano, Dennis)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #10 Non-Resident Attorney Kathryn Blythe Daly APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd., designating Janet Chung as local counsel. (jp)
September 18, 2018 11 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd..(Chung, Janet)
September 18, 2018 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kathryn Blythe Daly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22440947) filed by Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chung, Janet)
September 11, 2018 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd.. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-05847-SJO-MAA (Chung, Janet)
September 11, 2018 8 NOTICE filed by Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd.. DEFENDANT ORIENT OVERSEAS CONTAINER LINE, LTD.S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH 27 U.S.C. 1446(D); AND SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS (Chung, Janet)
September 11, 2018 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 11, 2018 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (esa)
September 10, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd., upon Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd. served on 8/21/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeanine Susi, Human Resources Manager, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Filed in state court 8/31/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa)
September 10, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd., filed by plaintiff Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd. (Filed in state court 8/9/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
September 10, 2018 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd., (Chung, Janet)
September 10, 2018 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd. (Chung, Janet)
September 10, 2018 3 DECLARATION of JANET CHUNG re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd.. (Chung, Janet)
September 10, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd.. (Chung, Janet)
September 10, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Receipt No: 0973-22396349 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Proof of Service) (Attorney Janet Chung added to party Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Chung, Janet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., Ltd. v. Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Co., LTD.
Represented By: Dennis A Cammarano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orient Overseas Container Line, Ltd.
Represented By: Janet Chung
Represented By: Kathryn Blythe Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?