Maersk Line A/S v. K-Link Logistics, Inc.

Plaintiff: Maersk Line A/S
Defendant: K-Link Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv07964
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to K-Link Logistics, Inc (lc)
November 2, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant K-Link Logistics, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Maersk Line A/S. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of B. Alexander Moghaddam in Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit 1 to Moghaddam Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Moghaddam Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Moghaddam Declaration) (Moghaddam, B)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than November 8, 2018 why this actionshould not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on orbefore the above date: !Plaintiff's request for entry of default as to the defendants. In the event both documents are filed before the above date, the answer will take precedence. Answer by the defendant(s). No oralargument on this Order to Show Cause will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maersk Line A/S, upon Defendant K-Link Logistics, Inc. served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Peter Phie, agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Moghaddam, B)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-07964 ODW(GJSx). (rn)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant K-Link Logistics, Inc. (esa)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Maersk Line A/S, identifying Maersk Line A/S and K-Link Logistics, Inc. (Moghaddam, B)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Maersk Line A/S. (Moghaddam, B)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Maersk Line A/S. (Moghaddam, B)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22417027 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Maersk Line A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney B Alexander Moghaddam added to party Maersk Line A/S(pty:pla))(Moghaddam, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maersk Line A/S v. K-Link Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maersk Line A/S
Represented By: B Alexander Moghaddam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-Link Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?